Biogen International GmbH v. Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Plaintiff / Appellant: BIOGEN MA, INC. and BIOGEN INTERNATIONAL GMBH
Defendant / Appellee: MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC.
Case Number: 20-1933
Filed: June 29, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Federal Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2020 Filing 40 Amended Certificate of Interest for Appellants Biogen International GmbH and Biogen MA, Inc.. Service: 08/13/2020 by email. [714701] [20-1933] [William Lee] [Entered: 08/13/2020 12:30 PM]
August 13, 2020 Filing 39 NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Appellants Biogen International GmbH and Biogen MA, Inc., Opening Brief [ # 38 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant document is due on 08/20/2020. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [714613] [LMN] [Entered: 08/13/2020 08:58 AM]
August 7, 2020 Filing 38 MODIFIED ENTRY: OPENING BRIEF FILED for Appellants Biogen International GmbH and Biogen MA, Inc. Number of Pages: 63. Service: 08/07/2020 by email. Unless ordered otherwise, any responsive deadline runs from the date of service of this brief. See Fed. Cir. R. 31. [713502] --[Edited 08/13/2020 by LMN - compliance review complete] [William Lee] [Entered: 08/07/2020 06:30 PM]
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER filed denying [ # 14 ] the motion for an injunction pending appeal. The interim injunction granted in the court's June 30, 2020 order is lifted. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [711199] [LMS] [Entered: 07/30/2020 09:12 AM]
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER filed granting the motions [ # 707514-2 ] [ # 35 ] to the following extent: (1) the above-captioned appeals shall be considered companion cases and assigned to the same merits panel; and (2) in each of the above-captioned appeals, the opening brief is due no later than August 7, 2020; the response brief is due no later than September 11, 2020; the reply brief is due no later than September 30, 2020; the joint appendix is due no later than October 5, 2020; and the cases will be placed on the next available oral argument calendar after briefing is complete in both of the appeals. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [710733] [20-1673, 20-1933] [LMS] [Entered: 07/28/2020 04:25 PM]
July 14, 2020 Filing 35 MOTION of Appellants Biogen International GmbH and Biogen MA, Inc. to expedite briefing schedule [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 07/14/2020 by email. [707515] [20-1933] [William Lee] [Entered: 07/14/2020 04:50 PM]
July 13, 2020 Filing 34 Docketing Statement for the Appellee Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.. Service: 07/13/2020 by email. [707175] [20-1933] [Nathan Kelley] [Entered: 07/13/2020 06:00 PM]
July 13, 2020 Filing 33 Certificate of Interest for Appellee Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.. Service: 07/13/2020 by email. [707174] [20-1933] [Nathan Kelley] [Entered: 07/13/2020 05:59 PM]
July 13, 2020 Filing 32 Corrected Entry of appearance for Matthew Greinert as counsel for Appellee Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.. Service: 07/13/2020 by email. [707088] [20-1933] [Matthew Greinert] [Entered: 07/13/2020 03:16 PM]
July 13, 2020 Filing 31 NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Appellee Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc., Entry of Appearance [ # 29 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant document due on 07/20/2020. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [707073] [KMH] [Entered: 07/13/2020 02:46 PM]
July 13, 2020 Filing 30 Docketing Statement for the Appellants Biogen International GmbH and Biogen MA, Inc.. Service: 07/13/2020 by email. [706926] [20-1933] [William Lee] [Entered: 07/13/2020 09:56 AM]
July 10, 2020 Filing 29 Entry of appearance for Matthew Greinert as counsel for Appellee Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.. Service: 07/10/2020 by email. [706706] [20-1933] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No.[ # 31 ] [Matthew Greinert] [Entered: 07/10/2020 01:00 PM]
July 9, 2020 Filing 28 Confidential Reply in Support of Appellant Biogen MA Inc. Emergency Motion for an Injunction Pending Resolution of Appeal filed by Appellant Biogen MA, Inc. corresponding to Doc. No. [ # 27 ]. Service: 07/09/2020 by email. [706523] [20-1933] [William Lee] [Entered: 07/09/2020 07:06 PM]
July 9, 2020 Filing 27 REPLY of Appellant Biogen MA, Inc. to response [ # 25 ]. Service: 07/09/2020 by email. [706522] [20-1933] [William Lee] [Entered: 07/09/2020 07:01 PM]
July 6, 2020 Filing 26 Confidential Mylan's opposition to Biogen's Rule 8 Motion filed by Appellee Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. corresponding to Doc. No. [ # 25 ]. Service: 07/06/2020 by email. [705696] [20-1933] [Nathan Kelley] [Entered: 07/06/2020 11:58 PM]
July 6, 2020 Filing 25 RESPONSE of Appellee Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. to the motion [ # 14 ] filed by Appellant Biogen MA, Inc.. Service: 07/06/2020 by email. [705694] [20-1933] [Nathan Kelley] [Entered: 07/06/2020 11:56 PM]
July 6, 2020 Filing 24 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE: re: Doc No. [ # 23 ], ERROR: The Entry of Appearance for Attorney Dufresne was completed on an outdated version of Form 8. CORRECTION: All future form submissions must be completed on the most up-to-date version of the form available on the courts website. THIS MESSAGE IS FOR INFORMATIONAL PURPOSES ONLY. [705400] [EKD] [Entered: 07/06/2020 10:07 AM]
July 2, 2020 Filing 23 Entry of appearance for Andrew T. Dufresne as counsel for Appellee Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.. Service: 07/02/2020 by clerk. [705159] [20-1933] [Andrew Dufresne] [Entered: 07/02/2020 12:00 PM]
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER filed directing Mylan to respond to the [ # 14 ] motion for an injunction pending appeal no later than seven days from the date of filing of this order. Any reply in support of the motion is due no later than three days thereafter. Biogen MA's request for an interim injunction is granted to the extent that Mylan is enjoined from launching its generic version of Biogen MA's Tecfidera pending the court's consideration of Biogen MA's request for an injunction pending appeal. (Per Curiam). Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [704589] [LMS] [Entered: 06/30/2020 11:00 AM]
June 29, 2020 Filing 21 Entry of appearance for Nathan K. Kelley as of counsel for Appellee Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.. Service: 06/29/2020 by email. [704345] [20-1933] [Brandon White] [Entered: 06/29/2020 01:36 PM]
June 29, 2020 Filing 20 Entry of appearance for Dan L. Bagatell as of counsel for Appellee Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.. Service: 06/29/2020 by email. [704342] [20-1933] [Brandon White] [Entered: 06/29/2020 01:34 PM]
June 29, 2020 Filing 19 Entry of appearance for Brandon M. White as of counsel for Appellee Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.. Service: 06/29/2020 by email. [704336] [20-1933] [Brandon White] [Entered: 06/29/2020 01:31 PM]
June 29, 2020 Filing 18 Entry of appearance for David L. Anstaett as of counsel for Appellee Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.. Service: 06/29/2020 by email. [704333] [20-1933] [David Anstaett] [Entered: 06/29/2020 01:27 PM]
June 29, 2020 Filing 17 Entry of appearance for Emily J. Greb as of counsel for Appellee Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.. Service: 06/29/2020 by email. [704330] [20-1933] [Emily Greb] [Entered: 06/29/2020 01:22 PM]
June 29, 2020 Filing 16 Entry of appearance for Shannon M. Bloodworth as principal counsel for Appellee Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.. Service: 06/29/2020 by email. [704325] [20-1933] [Shannon Bloodworth] [Entered: 06/29/2020 01:16 PM]
June 29, 2020 Filing 15 Confidential Appellant Biogen MA Inc.'s Emergency Motion for Injunction Pending Appeal filed by Appellant Biogen MA, Inc. corresponding to Doc. No. [ # 14 ]. Service: 06/29/2020 by email. [704283] [20-1933] [William Lee] [Entered: 06/29/2020 12:03 PM]
June 29, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION of Appellant Biogen MA, Inc. for an emergency stay pending appeal under Rule 8/18 [Consent: opposed]. Service: 06/29/2020 by email. [704280] [20-1933] [William Lee] [Entered: 06/29/2020 12:01 PM]
June 29, 2020 Filing 13 Certificate of Interest for Appellants Biogen International GmbH and Biogen MA, Inc.. Service: 06/29/2020 by email. [704278] [20-1933] [William Lee] [Entered: 06/29/2020 11:58 AM]
June 29, 2020 Filing 12 Entry of appearance for J. Michael Jakes as of counsel for Appellants Biogen International GmbH and Biogen MA, Inc.. Service: 06/29/2020 by email. [704238] [20-1933] [J. Jakes] [Entered: 06/29/2020 10:31 AM]
June 29, 2020 Filing 11 Entry of appearance for Jason L. Romrell as of counsel for Appellants Biogen International GmbH and Biogen MA, Inc.. Service: 06/29/2020 by email. [704236] [20-1933] [Jason Romrell] [Entered: 06/29/2020 10:28 AM]
June 29, 2020 Filing 10 Entry of appearance for Paul W. Browning as of counsel for Appellants Biogen International GmbH and Biogen MA, Inc.. Service: 06/29/2020 by email. [704230] [20-1933] [Paul Browning] [Entered: 06/29/2020 10:23 AM]
June 29, 2020 Filing 9 Entry of appearance for James B. Monroe as of counsel for Appellants Biogen International GmbH and Biogen MA, Inc.. Service: 06/29/2020 by email. [704227] [20-1933] [James Monroe] [Entered: 06/29/2020 10:21 AM]
June 29, 2020 Filing 8 Entry of appearance for Scott G. Greene as of counsel for Appellants Biogen International GmbH and Biogen MA, Inc.. Service: 06/29/2020 by email. [704223] [20-1933] [Scott Greene] [Entered: 06/29/2020 10:05 AM]
June 29, 2020 Filing 7 Entry of appearance for Madeleine C. Laupheimer as of counsel for Appellants Biogen International GmbH and Biogen MA, Inc.. Service: 06/29/2020 by email. [704222] [20-1933] [Madeleine Laupheimer] [Entered: 06/29/2020 10:02 AM]
June 29, 2020 Filing 6 Entry of appearance for Annaleigh E. Curtis as of counsel for Appellants Biogen International GmbH and Biogen MA, Inc.. Service: 06/29/2020 by email. [704221] [20-1933] [Annaleigh Curtis] [Entered: 06/29/2020 10:00 AM]
June 29, 2020 Filing 5 Entry of appearance for Lisa J. Pirozzolo as of counsel for Appellants Biogen International GmbH and Biogen MA, Inc.. Service: 06/29/2020 by email. [704220] [20-1933] [Lisa Pirozzolo] [Entered: 06/29/2020 09:58 AM]
June 29, 2020 Filing 4 Entry of appearance for Thomas G. Saunders as of counsel for Appellants Biogen International GmbH and Biogen MA, Inc.. Service: 06/29/2020 by email. [704217] [20-1933] [Thomas Saunders] [Entered: 06/29/2020 09:55 AM]
June 29, 2020 Filing 3 Entry of appearance for William G. McElwain as of counsel for Appellants Biogen International GmbH and Biogen MA, Inc.. Service: 06/29/2020 by email. [704216] [20-1933] [William McElwain] [Entered: 06/29/2020 09:54 AM]
June 29, 2020 Filing 2 Entry of appearance for William F. Lee as principal counsel for Appellants Biogen International GmbH and Biogen MA, Inc.. Service: 06/29/2020 by email. [704214] [20-1933] [William Lee] [Entered: 06/29/2020 09:52 AM]
June 29, 2020 Filing 1 Appeal docketed. Received: 06/25/2020. [704187] Entry of Appearance is due 07/13/2020. Certificate of Interest is due on 07/13/2020. Docketing Statement is due 07/13/2020. Appellants' brief is due 08/28/2020.--[Edited 06/29/2020 by CAB - to revise docket text] [LMN] [Entered: 06/29/2020 09:10 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Biogen International GmbH v. Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: BIOGEN MA, INC.
Represented By: William G. McElwain Esq.
Represented By: James B. Monroe
Represented By: J. Michael Jakes
Represented By: Lisa Jon Pirozzolo Esq.
Represented By: William F. Lee
Represented By: Scott G. Greene
Represented By: Paul William Browning
Represented By: Annaleigh E. Curtis
Represented By: Thomas Saunders
Represented By: Jason Lee Romrell
Represented By: Madeleine C. Laupheimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: BIOGEN INTERNATIONAL GMBH
Represented By: William G. McElwain Esq.
Represented By: James B. Monroe
Represented By: J. Michael Jakes
Represented By: Lisa Jon Pirozzolo Esq.
Represented By: William F. Lee
Represented By: Scott G. Greene
Represented By: Paul William Browning
Represented By: Annaleigh E. Curtis
Represented By: Thomas Saunders
Represented By: Jason Lee Romrell
Represented By: Madeleine C. Laupheimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC.
Represented By: David Lee Anstaett
Represented By: Brandon Michael White
Represented By: Nathan K. Kelley
Represented By: Shannon Bloodworth
Represented By: Emily Jane Greb Esq.
Represented By: Dan L. Bagatell
Represented By: Matthew Greinert
Represented By: Andrew Dufresne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?