Apple Inc. v. Wi-LAN Inc.
Plaintiff / Appellant: APPLE INC.
Defendant / Appellee: WI-LAN INC.
Case Number: 20-2011
Filed: July 21, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Federal Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2020 Filing 14 **TEXT ONLY** ORDER granting motion to extend time to file brief [ # 13 ] filed by Appellant Apple Inc. The opening brief is due 11/20/2020. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. This order has been issued without an attached document and is official and binding. [721634] [KMH] [Entered: 09/15/2020 11:09 AM]
September 14, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION of Appellant Apple Inc. to extend the time to 11/20/2020 to file brief. [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 09/14/2020 by email. [721397] [20-2011] [Mark Davies] [Entered: 09/14/2020 03:37 PM]
September 11, 2020 Filing 12 Amended Entry of appearance for Mark S. Davies; Katherine M. Kopp; James Anglin Flynn; Sean C. Cunningham; Stanley J. Panikowski; Erin P. Gibson as counsel for Appellant Apple Inc.. Service: 09/11/2020 by email. [721091] [20-2011] [Mark Davies] [Entered: 09/11/2020 04:34 PM]
August 10, 2020 Filing 11 Corrected Entry of appearance for Jeffrey A. Lamken; Lucas M. Walker; Rayiner I. Hashem; Leonid Grinberg; Mike McCool; Scott Cole; Brett Cooper as counsel for Cross-Appellant Wi-LAN Inc.. Service: 08/10/2020 by email. [713912] [20-2011] [Jeffrey Lamken] [Entered: 08/10/2020 06:01 PM]
August 7, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Cross-Appellant Wi-LAN Inc., Entry of Appearance [ # 4 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant document due on 08/14/2020. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [713345] [KMH] [Entered: 08/07/2020 12:30 PM]
August 4, 2020 Filing 9 Docketing Statement for the Appellant Apple Inc.. Service: 08/04/2020 by email. [712569] [20-2011] [Sean Cunningham] [Entered: 08/04/2020 09:47 PM]
August 4, 2020 Filing 8 Certificate of Interest for Appellant Apple Inc.. Service: 08/04/2020 by email. [712568] [20-2011] [Sean Cunningham] [Entered: 08/04/2020 09:44 PM]
August 4, 2020 Filing 7 Entry of appearance for Sean C. Cunningham; Stanley J. Panikowski; Erin P. Gibson as counsel for Appellant Apple Inc.. Service: 08/04/2020 by email. [712567] [20-2011] [Sean Cunningham] [Entered: 08/04/2020 09:42 PM]
August 4, 2020 Filing 6 Docketing Statement for the Cross-Appellant Wi-LAN Inc.. Service: 08/04/2020 by email. [712543] [20-2011] [Jeffrey Lamken] [Entered: 08/04/2020 06:28 PM]
August 4, 2020 Filing 5 Certificate of Interest for Cross-Appellant Wi-LAN Inc.. Service: 08/04/2020 by email. [712541] [20-2011] [Jeffrey Lamken] [Entered: 08/04/2020 06:23 PM]
August 4, 2020 Filing 4 Entry of appearance for Jeffrey A. Lamken; Lucas M. Walker; Rayiner I. Hashem; Leonid Grinberg; Mike McCool; Scott Cole; Brett Cooper as counsel for Cross-Appellant Wi-LAN Inc.. Service: 08/04/2020 by email. [712321] [20-2011] [Jeffrey Lamken] [Entered: 08/04/2020 11:39 AM]
July 29, 2020 Filing 3 Official caption revised to reflect Cross-Appeal 20-2094. (see attached). Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [711111] [KMH] [Entered: 07/29/2020 04:30 PM]
July 29, 2020 Filing 2 Note to File: The following cases are consolidated: 20-2011 Lead with 20-2094 Cross-Appeal. The parties must file all documents in the lead appeal only. [711110] [20-2011, 20-2094] [KMH] [Entered: 07/29/2020 04:29 PM]
July 21, 2020 Filing 1 Appeal docketed. Received: 07/15/2020. [708806] Entry of Appearance is due on 08/04/2020. Certificate of Interest is due on 08/04/2020. Docketing Statement is due on 08/04/2020. Appellant's brief is due on 09/21/2020. [KMH] [Entered: 07/21/2020 09:42 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Apple Inc. v. Wi-LAN Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: APPLE INC.
Represented By: Sean C. Cunningham
Represented By: James Anglin Flynn
Represented By: Mark S. Davies Esq.
Represented By: Stanley Joseph Panikowski III
Represented By: Katherine M. Kopp
Represented By: Erin Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WI-LAN INC.
Represented By: Ashley Nicole Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?