Intellectual Ventures I LLC v. Lenovo Group Ltd.
Defendant: LENOVO GROUP LTD. and LENOVO GROUP LIMITED
Defendant / Appellee: NETAPP INC, LENOVO (UNITED STATES) INC., LENOVOEMC PRODUCTS USA, LLC and EMC CORP.
Plaintiff / Appellant: INTELLECTUAL VENTURES I LLC and INTELLECTUAL VENTURES II LLC
Case Number: 20-2280
Filed: September 16, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Federal Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
June 21, 2021 INTELLECTUAL VENTURES I LLC v. LENOVO GROUP LTD.

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2020 Filing 12 **TEXT ONLY** ORDER granting motion to extend time to file brief [ # 11 ] filed by Appellants Intellectual Ventures I LLC and Intellectual Ventures II LLC. The opening brief is due 12/16/2020. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. This order has been issued without an attached document and is official and binding. [734005] [EKD] [Entered: 11/05/2020 03:13 PM]
November 4, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION of Appellants Intellectual Ventures I LLC and Intellectual Ventures II LLC to extend the time to 12/16/2020 to file brief. Service: 11/04/2020 by email. [733634] [20-2280] [Brian Ledahl] [Entered: 11/04/2020 01:52 PM]
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting [ # 9 ] the motion. The revised official caption is reflected in this order. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [726531] [LMS] [Entered: 10/05/2020 01:46 PM]
September 30, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION of Appellants Intellectual Ventures I LLC and Intellectual Ventures II LLC to modify the official caption [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 09/30/2020 by email. [725661] [20-2280] [Brian Ledahl] [Entered: 09/30/2020 06:55 PM]
September 30, 2020 Filing 8 Transcript Purchase Order Form for the Appellants Intellectual Ventures I LLC and Intellectual Ventures II LLC indicating that a transcript is already on file. Service: 09/30/2020 by email. [725656] [20-2280] [Brian Ledahl] [Entered: 09/30/2020 06:16 PM]
September 30, 2020 Filing 7 Docketing Statement for the Appellants Intellectual Ventures I LLC and Intellectual Ventures II LLC. Service: 09/30/2020 by email. [725655] [20-2280] [Brian Ledahl] [Entered: 09/30/2020 06:12 PM]
September 30, 2020 Filing 6 Certificate of Interest for Appellants Intellectual Ventures I LLC and Intellectual Ventures II LLC. Service: 09/30/2020 by email. [725654] [20-2280] [Brian Ledahl] [Entered: 09/30/2020 06:09 PM]
September 30, 2020 Filing 5 Entry of appearance for Brian D. Ledahl; Adam S. Hoffman; Theresa M. Troupson; Minna Y. Chan as counsel for Appellants Intellectual Ventures I LLC and Intellectual Ventures II LLC. Service: 09/30/2020 by email. [725652] [20-2280] [Brian Ledahl] [Entered: 09/30/2020 06:04 PM]
September 29, 2020 Filing 4 Certificate of Interest for Appellee Lenovo (United States) Inc.. Service: 09/29/2020 by email. [725186] [20-2280] [David Simons] [Entered: 09/29/2020 03:11 PM]
September 29, 2020 Filing 3 Docketing Statement for the Appellee Lenovo (United States) Inc.. Service: 09/29/2020 by email. [725185] [20-2280] [David Simons] [Entered: 09/29/2020 03:09 PM]
September 29, 2020 Filing 2 Entry of appearance for David A. Simons and Christopher Centurelli as counsel for Appellee Lenovo (United States) Inc. Service: 09/29/2020 by email. [725183] [20-2280]--[Edited 09/30/2020 by EKD to correct docket text] [David Simons] [Entered: 09/29/2020 03:07 PM]
September 16, 2020 Filing 1 Appeal docketed. Received: 09/14/2020. [722214] Entry of Appearance is due on 09/30/2020. Certificate of Interest is due on 09/30/2020. Docketing Statement is due on 09/30/2020. Appellants' brief is due on 11/16/2020. [EKD] [Entered: 09/16/2020 04:04 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Intellectual Ventures I LLC v. Lenovo Group Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NETAPP INC
Represented By: Benjamin Hershkowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LENOVO (UNITED STATES) INC.
Represented By: Christopher Centurelli Esq.
Represented By: David Andrew Simons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LENOVOEMC PRODUCTS USA, LLC
Represented By: Christopher Centurelli Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: EMC CORP.
Represented By: Cynthia D. Vreeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LENOVO GROUP LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LENOVO GROUP LIMITED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: INTELLECTUAL VENTURES I LLC
Represented By: Brian David Ledahl
Represented By: Minna Chan
Represented By: Theresa Mary Troupson
Represented By: Adam Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: INTELLECTUAL VENTURES II LLC
Represented By: Brian David Ledahl
Represented By: Minna Chan
Represented By: Theresa Mary Troupson
Represented By: Adam Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?