Shure Incorporated v. ClearOne, Inc.
Plaintiff / Appellant: SHURE INCORPORATED
Defendant / Appellee: CLEARONE, INC.
Case Number: 21-1024
Filed: October 8, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Federal Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2020 Filing 15 **TEXT ONLY** ORDER granting motion to extend time to file brief [ # 14 ] filed by Appellant Shure Incorporated. The opening brief is due 01/11/2021. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. This order has been issued without an attached document and is official and binding. [738322] [EKD] [Entered: 11/25/2020 09:38 AM]
November 24, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION of Appellant Shure Incorporated to extend the time to 01/11/2021 to file brief. Service: 11/24/2020 by email. [738029] [21-1024] [J. McCorquindale] [Entered: 11/24/2020 12:04 PM]
November 3, 2020 Filing 13 Docketing Statement for the Appellee ClearOne, Inc.. Service: 11/03/2020 by email. [733378] [21-1024] [Douglas Dixon] [Entered: 11/03/2020 03:28 PM]
October 30, 2020 Filing 12 Notice to Appellee ClearOne, Inc.: The record of this case indicates that no Docketing Statement under FCR 33.1(a) has been filed. Failure to file required documents may result in adverse action. See FCR 25(h). Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [732666] [EKD] [Entered: 10/30/2020 04:27 PM]
October 27, 2020 Filing 11 Entry of appearance for Douglas J. Dixon as counsel for Appellee ClearOne, Inc.. Service: 10/27/2020 by email. [731675] [21-1024] [Douglas Dixon] [Entered: 10/27/2020 01:04 PM]
October 27, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Appellee ClearOne, Inc., Entry of Appearance for D. Dixon [ # 9 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant document is due on 11/03/2020. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [731626] [EKD] [Entered: 10/27/2020 11:29 AM]
October 23, 2020 Filing 9 Entry of appearance for Douglas J. Dixon as counsel for Appellee ClearOne, Inc. Service: 10/23/2020 by email. [731150] [21-1024] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No. [ # 10 ] [Douglas Dixon] [Entered: 10/23/2020 03:41 PM]
October 23, 2020 Filing 8 Amended Entry of appearance for J. Derek McCorquindale; Vladimir Arezina; Elliot C. Cook; Luke H. MacDonald as counsel for Appellant Shure Incorporated. Service: 10/23/2020 by email. [731118] [21-1024] [J. McCorquindale] [Entered: 10/23/2020 02:08 PM]
October 22, 2020 Filing 7 Docketing Statement for the Appellant Shure Incorporated. Service: 10/22/2020 by email. [730929] [21-1024] [J. McCorquindale] [Entered: 10/22/2020 09:03 PM]
October 22, 2020 Filing 6 Certificate of Interest for Appellee ClearOne, Inc.. Service: 10/22/2020 by email. [730902] [21-1024] [Christina Rayburn] [Entered: 10/22/2020 05:13 PM]
October 22, 2020 Filing 5 Entry of appearance for Douglas J. Dixon as counsel for Appellee ClearOne, Inc.. Service: 10/22/2020 by email. [730901] [21-1024] [Christina Rayburn] [Entered: 10/22/2020 05:11 PM]
October 14, 2020 Filing 4 Transcript Purchase Order Form for the Appellant Shure Incorporated indicating that a transcript is already on file. Service: 10/14/2020 by email. [728757] [21-1024] [J. McCorquindale] [Entered: 10/14/2020 10:15 PM]
October 14, 2020 Filing 3 Certificate of Interest for Appellant Shure Incorporated. Service: 10/14/2020 by email. [728756] [21-1024] [J. McCorquindale] [Entered: 10/14/2020 10:14 PM]
October 14, 2020 Filing 2 Entry of appearance for J. Derek McCorquindale; Vladimir Arezina; as counsel for Appellant Shure Incorporated. Service: 10/14/2020 by email. [728755] [21-1024] [J. McCorquindale] [Entered: 10/14/2020 10:13 PM]
October 8, 2020 Filing 1 Appeal docketed. Received: 10/02/2020. [727608] Entry of Appearance is due on 10/22/2020. Certificate of Interest is due on 10/22/2020. Docketing Statement is due on 10/22/2020. Appellant's brief is due on 12/07/2020. [EKD] [Entered: 10/08/2020 11:41 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Shure Incorporated v. ClearOne, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: SHURE INCORPORATED
Represented By: Vladimir Arezina
Represented By: Luke Hampton MacDonald
Represented By: Elliot Cook
Represented By: J. Derek McCorquindale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CLEARONE, INC.
Represented By: Garret A. Leach
Represented By: Douglas Dixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?