Biogen International GmbH v. Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC
Defendant / Appellee: SANDOZ INC., S&B PHARMA, INC., GRAVITI PHARMACEUTICALS PVT. LTD., MACLEODS PHARMA USA, INC., MACLEODS PHARMACEUTICALS LTD., MSN LABORATORIES PRIVATE LTD., GRAVITI PHARMACEUTICALS INC., SHILPA MEDICARE LIMITED, CIPLA USA INC., HETERO LABS LIMITED UNIT-III, CIPLA LIMITED, WINDLAS HEALTHCARE PVT. LTD., LUPIN ATLANTIS HOLDINGS SA, PHARMATHEN S.A., PRINSTON PHARMACEUTICAL INC., ALKEM LABORATORIES LTD., TORRENT PHARMA INC., SLAYBACK PHARMA LLC, TORRENT PHARMACEUTICALS LTD., ACCORD HEALTHCARE INC., AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS LLC, TWI PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., HETERO USA INC., TWI PHARMACEUTICALS INC., SLAYBACK PHARMA INDIA LLP, IMPAX LABORATORIES LLC, MSN PHARMACEUTICALS INC., ZYDUS PHARMACEUTICALS (USA) INC. and HETERO LABS LIMITED
Plaintiff / Appellant: BIOGEN INTERNATIONAL GMBH and BIOGEN MA INC.
Case Number: 21-1078
Filed: October 21, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Federal Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting motion to extend time to file brief [ # 49 ]. The opening brief is due 02/04/2021. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [743936] [NL] [Entered: 12/18/2020 03:15 PM]
December 17, 2020 Filing 51 Notice from Appellees Hetero USA Inc., Hetero Labs Limited, Hetero Labs Limited Unit-III and Shilpa Medicare Limited Entry of Appearance for Saukshmya Trichi. Service: 12/17/2020 by email. [743488] [21-1078] [Saukshmya Trichi] [Entered: 12/17/2020 01:11 PM]
December 16, 2020 Filing 50 NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submissions of Appellees Hetero Labs Limited, Hetero Labs Limited Unit-III, Hetero USA Inc., and Shilpa Medicare Limited, Certificates of Interest [ # 46 ], [ # 48 ], are not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant document is due on 12/23/2020. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [743057] [EKD] [Entered: 12/16/2020 08:45 AM]
December 14, 2020 Filing 49 MOTION of Appellants Biogen International GmbH and Biogen MA Inc. to extend the time to 02/04/2021 to file brief. Service: 12/14/2020 by email. [742508] [21-1078] [William Lee] [Entered: 12/14/2020 03:01 PM]
December 8, 2020 Filing 48 Certificate of Interest for Appellee Shilpa Medicare Limited. Service: 12/08/2020 by email. [741192] [21-1078] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No. [ # 50 ] [Todd Werner] [Entered: 12/08/2020 03:50 PM]
December 8, 2020 Filing 47 Entry of appearance for Todd S. Werner; Peter M. Kohlhepp as counsel for Appellee Shilpa Medicare Limited. Service: 12/08/2020 by email. [741188] [21-1078] [Todd Werner] [Entered: 12/08/2020 03:48 PM]
December 8, 2020 Filing 46 Certificate of Interest for Appellees Hetero Labs Limited, Hetero Labs Limited Unit-III and Hetero USA Inc.. Service: 12/08/2020 by email. [741182] [21-1078] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No. [ # 50 ] [Todd Werner] [Entered: 12/08/2020 03:43 PM]
December 8, 2020 Filing 45 Entry of appearance for Todd S. Werner; Peter M. Kohlhepp as counsel for Appellees Hetero Labs Limited, Hetero Labs Limited Unit-III and Hetero USA Inc.. Service: 12/08/2020 by email. [741178] [21-1078] [Todd Werner] [Entered: 12/08/2020 03:40 PM]
December 4, 2020 Filing 44 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE: re: Doc No. [ # 41 ], ERROR: The document contains a non-compliant signature. CORRECTION: For future filings, please use an electronic signature consisting of the printed name of the individual preceded by the mark /s/ entered on the signature line. THIS MESSAGE IS FOR INFORMATIONAL PURPOSES ONLY. [740443] [EKD] [Entered: 12/04/2020 04:15 PM]
December 4, 2020 Filing 43 Docketing Statement for the Appellee Pharmathen S.A.. Service: 12/04/2020 by email. [740306] [21-1078] [H. Sabharwal] [Entered: 12/04/2020 11:53 AM]
December 3, 2020 Filing 42 Docketing Statement for the Appellee Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc.. Service: 12/03/2020 by email. [740187] [21-1078] [Jonathan Turpin] [Entered: 12/03/2020 09:12 PM]
December 3, 2020 Filing 41 Docketing Statement for the Appellees MSN Laboratories Private Ltd., MSN Pharmaceuticals Inc., Sandoz Inc. and Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc.. Service: 12/03/2020 by email. [740001] [21-1078] [Maureen Rurka] [Entered: 12/03/2020 01:40 PM]
December 2, 2020 Filing 40 Notice to Appellees Accord Healthcare Inc., Graviti Pharmaceuticals Inc., Graviti Pharmaceuticals Pvt. Ltd., Hetero Labs Limited, Hetero Labs Limited Unit-III, Hetero USA Inc., Impax Laboratories LLC, Macleods Pharma USA, Inc., Macleods Pharmaceuticals Ltd., Shilpa Medicare Limited, Slayback Pharma India LLP, Slayback Pharma LLC, TWi Pharmaceuticals Inc., Torrent Pharma Inc., Torrent Pharmaceuticals Ltd., Twi Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., and Windlas Healthcare Pvt. Ltd.: The record of this case indicates that no Entry of Appearance under FCR 47.3(b) has been filed. The record of this case indicates that no Certificate of Interest under FCR 47.4 has been filed. The record of this case indicates that no Docketing Statement under FCR 33.1(a) has been filed. Failure to file required documents may result in adverse action. See FCR 25(h). Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [739757] [EKD] [Entered: 12/02/2020 04:31 PM]
December 2, 2020 Filing 39 Notice to Appellees MSN Laboratories Private Ltd., MSN Pharmaceuticals Inc., Pharmathen S.A., Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc., Sandoz Inc., and Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc.: The record of this case indicates that no Docketing Statement under FCR 33.1(a) has been filed. Failure to file required documents may result in adverse action. See FCR 25(h). Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [739747] [EKD] [Entered: 12/02/2020 04:24 PM]
November 24, 2020 Filing 38 Corrected Certificate of Interest for Appellees Alkem Laboratories Ltd. and S&B Pharma, Inc.. Service: 11/24/2020 by email. [738061] [21-1078] [George Barry] [Entered: 11/24/2020 01:48 PM]
November 19, 2020 Filing 37 NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Appellees Alkem Laboratories Ltd. and S&B Pharma, Inc., Certificate of Interest [ # 34 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant document is due on 11/30/2020. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [736979] [EKD] [Entered: 11/19/2020 01:53 PM]
November 18, 2020 Filing 36 Entry of appearance for Timothy H. Kratz; George J. Barry III as counsel for Appellees Alkem Laboratories Ltd. and S&B Pharma, Inc.. Service: 11/18/2020 by email. [736709] [21-1078] [George Barry] [Entered: 11/18/2020 03:05 PM]
November 18, 2020 Filing 35 Docketing Statement for the Appellees Alkem Laboratories Ltd. and S&B Pharma, Inc.. Service: 11/18/2020 by email. [736706] [21-1078] [George Barry] [Entered: 11/18/2020 03:03 PM]
November 18, 2020 Filing 34 Certificate of Interest for Appellees Alkem Laboratories Ltd. and S&B Pharma, Inc. Service: 11/18/2020 by email. [736705] [21-1078] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No. [ # 37 ] [George Barry] [Entered: 11/18/2020 03:02 PM]
November 9, 2020 Filing 33 Corrected Docketing Statement for the Appellees Cipla Limited and Cipla USA Inc.. Service: 11/09/2020 by email. [734597] [21-1078] [William Zimmerman] [Entered: 11/09/2020 07:26 PM]
November 9, 2020 Filing 32 Corrected Certificate of Interest for Appellees Cipla Limited and Cipla USA Inc.. Service: 11/09/2020 by email. [734596] [21-1078] [William Zimmerman] [Entered: 11/09/2020 07:24 PM]
November 9, 2020 Filing 31 Corrected Entry of appearance for William R. Zimmerman, principal counsel; Thomas P. Krzeminski, of cousel; Joseph M. Reisman, of counsel as counsel for Appellees Cipla Limited and Cipla USA Inc.. Service: 11/09/2020 by email. [734595] [21-1078] [William Zimmerman] [Entered: 11/09/2020 07:21 PM]
November 9, 2020 Filing 30 Certificate of Interest for Appellees Sandoz Inc. and Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc.. Service: 11/09/2020 by email. [734515] [21-1078] [Maureen Rurka] [Entered: 11/09/2020 02:37 PM]
November 6, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submissions of Appellees Cipla Limited and Cipla USA Inc. Entry of Appearance, and Appellees Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc. and Sandoz Inc. Certificates of Interest [ # 9 ], [ # 15 ], [ # 17 ], are not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant documents are due on 11/16/2020. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [734206] [EKD] [Entered: 11/06/2020 12:11 PM]
November 6, 2020 Filing 28 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE: re: Doc No. [ # 12 ], Doc No. [ # 13 ], Doc No. [ # 14 ], Doc No. [ # 16 ], Doc No. [ # 21 ], Doc No. [ # 22 ], ERROR: The case number on the document is incomplete. CORRECTION: For future filings, please include all consolidated case numbers. THIS MESSAGE IS FOR INFORMATIONAL PURPOSES ONLY. [734203] [EKD] [Entered: 11/06/2020 12:06 PM]
November 6, 2020 Filing 27 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE: re: Doc No. [ # 7 ], Doc No. [ # 8 ], Doc No. [ # 10 ], Doc No. [ # 11 ], Doc No. [ # 23 ], Doc No. [ # 24 ], Doc No. [ # 25 ], ERROR: The case number on the document is incomplete. The caption provided on the document does not follow the official caption provided by the Clerk. Please refrain from using "et al." CORRECTION: For future filings, please include all consolidated case numbers. For future filings, see Docket Entry #2 for the caption. THIS MESSAGE IS FOR INFORMATIONAL PURPOSES ONLY. [734200] [EKD] [Entered: 11/06/2020 12:03 PM]
November 5, 2020 Filing 26 Entry of appearance for James B. Monroe; Paul W. Browning; J. Michael Jakes; Jason L. Romrell as counsel for Appellants Biogen MA Inc. and Biogen International GmbH. Service: 11/05/2020 by email. [734052] [21-1078] [James Monroe] [Entered: 11/05/2020 07:05 PM]
November 5, 2020 Filing 25 Certificate of Interest for Appellee Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC. Service: 11/05/2020 by email. [733853] [21-1078] [David Zimmer] [Entered: 11/05/2020 11:36 AM]
November 5, 2020 Filing 24 Docketing Statement for the Appellee Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC. Service: 11/05/2020 by email. [733852] [21-1078] [David Zimmer] [Entered: 11/05/2020 11:33 AM]
November 5, 2020 Filing 23 Entry of appearance for David J. Zimmer; Huiya Wu; Samuel E. Sherry as counsel for Appellee Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC. Service: 11/05/2020 by email. [733851] [21-1078] [David Zimmer] [Entered: 11/05/2020 11:28 AM]
November 4, 2020 Filing 22 Certificate of Interest for Appellee Pharmathen S.A.. Service: 11/04/2020 by email. [733743] [21-1078] [Yun Wei] [Entered: 11/04/2020 11:32 PM]
November 4, 2020 Filing 21 Entry of appearance for H. Keeto Sabharwal; Yun Wei as counsel for Appellee Pharmathen S.A.. Service: 11/04/2020 by email. [733742] [21-1078] [Yun Wei] [Entered: 11/04/2020 11:30 PM]
November 4, 2020 Filing 20 Docketing Statement for the Appellee Lupin Atlantis Holdings SA. Service: 11/04/2020 by email. [733734] [21-1078] [Imron Aly] [Entered: 11/04/2020 06:29 PM]
November 4, 2020 Filing 19 Certificate of Interest for Appellee Lupin Atlantis Holdings SA. Service: 11/04/2020 by email. [733733] [21-1078] [Imron Aly] [Entered: 11/04/2020 06:27 PM]
November 4, 2020 Filing 18 Entry of appearance for Imron T. Aly as counsel for Appellee Lupin Atlantis Holdings SA. Service: 11/04/2020 by email. [733732] [21-1078] [Imron Aly] [Entered: 11/04/2020 06:26 PM]
November 4, 2020 Filing 17 Certificate of Interest for Appellee Sandoz Inc.. Service: 11/04/2020 by email. [733729] [21-1078] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No. [ # 29 ] [Maureen Rurka] [Entered: 11/04/2020 05:45 PM]
November 4, 2020 Filing 16 Entry of appearance for Maureen L. Rurka as counsel for Appellee Sandoz Inc.. Service: 11/04/2020 by email. [733728] [21-1078] [Maureen Rurka] [Entered: 11/04/2020 05:43 PM]
November 4, 2020 Filing 15 Certificate of Interest for Appellee Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc.. Service: 11/04/2020 by email. [733727] [21-1078] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No. [ # 29 ] [Maureen Rurka] [Entered: 11/04/2020 05:41 PM]
November 4, 2020 Filing 14 Entry of appearance for Maureen L. Rurka as counsel for Appellee Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc.. Service: 11/04/2020 by email. [733725] [21-1078] [Maureen Rurka] [Entered: 11/04/2020 05:39 PM]
November 4, 2020 Filing 13 Certificate of Interest for Appellees MSN Laboratories Private Ltd. and MSN Pharmaceuticals Inc.. Service: 11/04/2020 by email. [733723] [21-1078] [John McNair] [Entered: 11/04/2020 05:35 PM]
November 4, 2020 Filing 12 Entry of appearance for George Lombardi; John R. McNair; Jovial Wong; Maureen L. Rurka as counsel for Appellees MSN Laboratories Private Ltd. and MSN Pharmaceuticals Inc.. Service: 11/04/2020 by email. [733722] [21-1078] [John McNair] [Entered: 11/04/2020 05:33 PM]
November 4, 2020 Filing 11 Certificate of Interest for Appellees Cipla Limited and Cipla USA Inc.. Service: 11/04/2020 by email. [733717] [21-1078] [William Zimmerman] [Entered: 11/04/2020 05:28 PM]
November 4, 2020 Filing 10 Docketing Statement for the Appellees Cipla Limited and Cipla USA Inc.. Service: 11/04/2020 by email. [733716] [21-1078] [William Zimmerman] [Entered: 11/04/2020 05:26 PM]
November 4, 2020 Filing 9 Entry of appearance for William R. Zimmerman, principal counsel; Thomas P. Krzeminski, of counsel; Joseph M. Reisman, of counsel as counsel for Appellees Cipla Limited and Cipla USA Inc.. Service: 11/04/2020 by email. [733713] [21-1078] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No. [ # 29 ] [William Zimmerman] [Entered: 11/04/2020 05:24 PM]
November 4, 2020 Filing 8 Certificate of Interest for Appellee Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc.. Service: 11/04/2020 by email. [733676] [21-1078] [Jonathan Turpin] [Entered: 11/04/2020 03:48 PM]
November 4, 2020 Filing 7 Entry of appearance for Michael J. Gaertner; Hugh S. Balsam; David B. Abramowitz; Timothy F. Peterson; Jonathan B. Turpin as counsel for Appellee Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc.. Service: 11/04/2020 by email. [733670] [21-1078] [Jonathan Turpin] [Entered: 11/04/2020 03:32 PM]
November 4, 2020 Filing 6 Docketing Statement for the Appellants Biogen International GmbH and Biogen MA Inc.. Service: 11/04/2020 by email. [733640] [21-1078] [William Lee] [Entered: 11/04/2020 02:10 PM]
November 4, 2020 Filing 5 Certificate of Interest for Appellants Biogen International GmbH and Biogen MA Inc.. Service: 11/04/2020 by email. [733638] [21-1078] [William Lee] [Entered: 11/04/2020 02:09 PM]
November 4, 2020 Filing 4 Entry of appearance for William F. Lee; William G. McElwain; Lisa J. Pirozzolo; Thomas G. Saunders; Madeleine C. Laupheimer; Annaleigh E. Curtis; Scott G. Greene as counsel for Appellants Biogen International GmbH and Biogen MA Inc.. Service: 11/04/2020 by email. [733635] [21-1078] [William Lee] [Entered: 11/04/2020 02:07 PM]
October 23, 2020 Filing 3 Note to File: The following cases are consolidated: 21-1078 Lead with 21-1084, 21-1086, 21-1087, 21-1088, 21-1090, 21-1091, 21-1092, 21-1093, 21-1094, 21-1095, 21-1096, 21-1097, and 21-1098 Consolidated Member Cases. The parties must file all documents in the lead appeal only. [731161] [21-1078, 21-1084, 21-1086, 21-1087, 21-1088, 21-1090, 21-1091, 21-1092, 21-1093, 21-1094, 21-1095, 21-1096, 21-1097, 21-1098] [EKD] [Entered: 10/23/2020 04:09 PM]
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER consolidating appeals 21-1078, 21-1084, 21-1086, 21-1087, 21-1088, 21-1090, 21-1091, 21-1092, 21-1093, 21-1094, 21-1095, 21-1096, 21-1097, and 21-1098. The opening brief for the consolidated appeals is due within 60 days from issuance of this order. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [731158] [21-1078, 21-1084, 21-1086, 21-1087, 21-1088, 21-1090, 21-1091, 21-1092, 21-1093, 21-1094, 21-1095, 21-1096, 21-1097, 21-1098] [EKD] [Entered: 10/23/2020 04:03 PM]
October 21, 2020 Filing 1 Appeal docketed. Received: 10/20/2020. [730610] Entry of Appearance is due on 11/04/2020. Certificate of Interest is due on 11/04/2020. Docketing Statement is due on 11/04/2020. Appellants' brief is due on 12/21/2020. [EKD] [Entered: 10/21/2020 02:50 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Biogen International GmbH v. Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SANDOZ INC.
Represented By: David A. Bilson
Represented By: Maureen L. Rurka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: S&B PHARMA, INC.
Represented By: David E. Moore Esq.
Represented By: George Barry III
Represented By: Timothy Kratz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GRAVITI PHARMACEUTICALS PVT. LTD.
Represented By: Eve H. Ormerod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MACLEODS PHARMA USA, INC.
Represented By: Stamatios Stamoulis Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MACLEODS PHARMACEUTICALS LTD.
Represented By: Stamatios Stamoulis Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MSN LABORATORIES PRIVATE LTD.
Represented By: David A. Bilson
Represented By: Maureen L. Rurka
Represented By: John Reynolds McNair
Represented By: Jovial Wong
Represented By: George C. Lombardi Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GRAVITI PHARMACEUTICALS INC.
Represented By: Eve H. Ormerod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SHILPA MEDICARE LIMITED
Represented By: Stephen Brauerman Esq.
Represented By: Todd S. Werner
Represented By: Peter M. Kohlhepp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CIPLA USA INC.
Represented By: Thomas P. Krzeminski
Represented By: William R. Zimmerman
Represented By: Joseph M. Reisman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HETERO LABS LIMITED UNIT-III
Represented By: Stephen Brauerman Esq.
Represented By: Todd S. Werner
Represented By: Peter M. Kohlhepp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CIPLA LIMITED
Represented By: Thomas P. Krzeminski
Represented By: William R. Zimmerman
Represented By: Joseph M. Reisman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WINDLAS HEALTHCARE PVT. LTD.
Represented By: Richard L. Renck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LUPIN ATLANTIS HOLDINGS SA
Represented By: Kelly Farnan
Represented By: Imron T. Aly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PHARMATHEN S.A.
Represented By: Adam Wyatt Poff
Represented By: H. Keeto Sabharwal Esq.
Represented By: Yun Wei
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PRINSTON PHARMACEUTICAL INC.
Represented By: David A. Bilson
Represented By: Maureen L. Rurka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ALKEM LABORATORIES LTD.
Represented By: David E. Moore Esq.
Represented By: George Barry III
Represented By: Timothy Kratz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TORRENT PHARMA INC.
Represented By: Benjamin J. Schladweiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SLAYBACK PHARMA LLC
Represented By: Eve H. Ormerod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TORRENT PHARMACEUTICALS LTD.
Represented By: Benjamin J. Schladweiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ACCORD HEALTHCARE INC.
Represented By: Benjamin J. Schladweiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS LLC
Represented By: Anne Shea Gaza Esq.
Represented By: David Zimmer
Represented By: Samuel Sherry
Represented By: Huiya Wu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TWI PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.
Represented By: David A. Bilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HETERO USA INC.
Represented By: Stephen Brauerman Esq.
Represented By: Todd S. Werner
Represented By: Peter M. Kohlhepp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TWI PHARMACEUTICALS INC.
Represented By: David A. Bilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SLAYBACK PHARMA INDIA LLP
Represented By: Eve H. Ormerod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: IMPAX LABORATORIES LLC
Represented By: David A. Bilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MSN PHARMACEUTICALS INC.
Represented By: David A. Bilson
Represented By: Maureen L. Rurka
Represented By: John Reynolds McNair
Represented By: Jovial Wong
Represented By: George C. Lombardi Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ZYDUS PHARMACEUTICALS (USA) INC.
Represented By: David A. Bilson
Represented By: Jonathan B. Turpin
Represented By: Hugh S. Balsam Esq.
Represented By: David Brian Abramowitz
Represented By: Timothy Flynn Peterson
Represented By: Michael John Gaertner Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HETERO LABS LIMITED
Represented By: Stephen Brauerman Esq.
Represented By: Todd S. Werner
Represented By: Peter M. Kohlhepp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: BIOGEN INTERNATIONAL GMBH
Represented By: Steven J. Balick
Represented By: James B. Monroe
Represented By: Paul William Browning
Represented By: Madeleine C. Laupheimer
Represented By: William G. McElwain Esq.
Represented By: J. Michael Jakes
Represented By: Annaleigh E. Curtis
Represented By: Thomas Saunders
Represented By: Scott G. Greene
Represented By: Jason Lee Romrell
Represented By: Lisa Jon Pirozzolo Esq.
Represented By: William F. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: BIOGEN MA INC.
Represented By: Steven J. Balick
Represented By: James B. Monroe
Represented By: Paul William Browning
Represented By: Madeleine C. Laupheimer
Represented By: William G. McElwain Esq.
Represented By: J. Michael Jakes
Represented By: Annaleigh E. Curtis
Represented By: Thomas Saunders
Represented By: Scott G. Greene
Represented By: Jason Lee Romrell
Represented By: Lisa Jon Pirozzolo Esq.
Represented By: William F. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?