Voip-Pal.com, Inc.In re: Voip-Pal.com, Inc.
Petitioner: In re: VOIP-PAL.COM, INC.
Respondent: AT&T MOBILITY LLC, AT&T CORP., CELLCO PARTNERSHIP, dba Verizon Wireless, AT&T SERVICES, INC. and APPLE INC.
Case Number: 21-112
Filed: January 13, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Federal Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
February 19, 2021 In Re VOIP-PAL.COM, INC.

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2021 Filing 10 Corrected Certificate of Interest for Respondent AT&T Corp., AT&T Mobility LLC and AT&T Services, Inc.. Service: 01/14/2021 by email. [749576] [21-112] [Michael Hawes] [Entered: 01/14/2021 03:48 PM]
January 14, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Respondent AT&T Corp., AT&T Mobility LLC and AT&T Services, Inc., Corrected Certificate of Interest [ # 7 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant document due on 01/25/2021. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [749563] [MMA] [Entered: 01/14/2021 03:27 PM]
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER filed directing Apple Inc. et al. to respond to the petition [ # 2 ] no later than seven days from the date of filing of this order. Any reply in support of the petition is due no later than three days thereafter. (Per Curiam). Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [749558] [LMS] [Entered: 01/14/2021 03:09 PM]
January 14, 2021 Filing 7 Corrected Certificate of Interest for Respondent AT&T Corp., AT&T Mobility LLC and AT&T Services, Inc.. Service: 01/14/2021 by email. [749444] [21-112] This document is non-compliant. See Doc. No. [ # 9 ] [Michael Hawes] [Entered: 01/14/2021 12:04 PM]
January 14, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Respondent AT&T Corp., AT&T Mobility LLC and AT&T Services, Inc., Certificate of Interest [ # 5 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant document due on 01/25/2021. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [749437] [MMA] [Entered: 01/14/2021 11:49 AM]
January 14, 2021 Filing 5 Certificate of Interest for Respondent AT&T Corp., AT&T Mobility LLC and AT&T Services, Inc.. Service: 01/14/2021 by email. [749424] [21-112] This document is non-compliant. See Doc. No. [ # 6 ] [Michael Hawes] [Entered: 01/14/2021 11:20 AM]
January 14, 2021 Filing 4 Entry of appearance for Michael Hawes as counsel for Respondent AT&T Corp., AT&T Mobility LLC and AT&T Services, Inc.. Service: 01/14/2021 by email. [749423] [21-112] [Michael Hawes] [Entered: 01/14/2021 11:17 AM]
January 13, 2021 Filing 3 Entry of appearance for Lewis Emery Hudnell, III and Nicolas Spiros Gikkas as counsel for Petitioner Voip-Pal.com, Inc.. Service: 01/13/2021 by clerk. [749068] [MMA] [Entered: 01/13/2021 11:15 AM]
January 13, 2021 Filing 2 PETITION of Petitioner Voip-Pal.com, Inc. for Writ of Mandamus pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 21. Service: 01/12/2021 by email. [749066] [MMA] [Entered: 01/13/2021 11:13 AM]
January 13, 2021 Filing 1 Miscellaneous case docketed. Received: 01/12/2021. [749058] Entry of Appearance due 01/27/2021. Certificate of Interest is due on 01/27/2021. [MMA] [Entered: 01/13/2021 11:04 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Voip-Pal.com, Inc.In re: Voip-Pal.com, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: AT&T MOBILITY LLC
Represented By: Michael Hawes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: AT&T CORP.
Represented By: Michael Hawes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: CELLCO PARTNERSHIP, dba Verizon Wireless
Represented By: William Hector
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: AT&T SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: Michael Hawes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: APPLE INC.
Represented By: Ameet Modi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: In re: VOIP-PAL.COM, INC.
Represented By: Nicolas Spiros Gikkas
Represented By: Lewis Emery Hudnell Esq. III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?