Celgene Corporation v. Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Defendant / Appellee: MYLAN INC., MYLAN N.V. and MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC.
Plaintiff / Appellant: CELGENE CORPORATION
Case Number: 21-1154
Filed: November 5, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Federal Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2020 Filing 9 **TEXT ONLY** ORDER granting motion to extend time to file brief [ # 8 ] filed by Appellant Celgene Corporation. The opening brief is due 01/19/2021. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. This order has been issued without an attached document and is official and binding. [744987] [EKD] [Entered: 12/23/2020 09:47 AM]
December 18, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION of Appellant Celgene Corporation to extend the time to 01/19/2021 to file brief. Service: 12/18/2020 by email. [743795] [21-1154] [Francis Cerrito] [Entered: 12/18/2020 12:45 PM]
November 19, 2020 Filing 7 Docketing Statement for the Appellees Mylan Inc., Mylan N.V. and Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.. Service: 11/19/2020 by email. [737121] [21-1154] [Tung Kong] [Entered: 11/19/2020 07:39 PM]
November 19, 2020 Filing 6 Certificate of Interest for Appellees Mylan Inc., Mylan N.V. and Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.. Service: 11/19/2020 by email. [737120] [21-1154] [Tung Kong] [Entered: 11/19/2020 07:38 PM]
November 19, 2020 Filing 5 Entry of appearance for Tung-On Kong; Elham F. Steiner; Kristina M. Hanson as counsel for Appellees Mylan Inc., Mylan N.V. and Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.. Service: 11/19/2020 by email. [737119] [21-1154] [Tung Kong] [Entered: 11/19/2020 07:36 PM]
November 19, 2020 Filing 4 Docketing Statement for the Appellant Celgene Corporation. Service: 11/19/2020 by email. [737100] [21-1154] [Eric Stops] [Entered: 11/19/2020 06:11 PM]
November 19, 2020 Filing 3 Certificate of Interest for Appellant Celgene Corporation. Service: 11/19/2020 by email. [737099] [21-1154] [Eric Stops] [Entered: 11/19/2020 06:09 PM]
November 19, 2020 Filing 2 Entry of appearance for F. Dominic Cerrito; Eric C. Stops; Frank C. Calvosa; Ellyde R. Thompson; Jennifer L. Swize; Matthew J. Hertko as counsel for Appellant Celgene Corporation. Service: 11/19/2020 by email. [737098] [21-1154] [Eric Stops] [Entered: 11/19/2020 06:08 PM]
November 5, 2020 Filing 1 Appeal docketed. Received: 10/29/2020. [733958] Entry of Appearance is due 11/19/2020. Certificate of Interest is due 11/19/2020. Docketing Statement is due 11/19/2020. Appellant's brief is due 01/04/2021. [KMH] [Entered: 11/05/2020 01:57 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Celgene Corporation v. Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MYLAN INC.
Represented By: Arnold B. Calmann
Represented By: Kristina M. Hanson
Represented By: Elham Firouzi Steiner Esq.
Represented By: Tung On Kong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MYLAN N.V.
Represented By: Arnold B. Calmann
Represented By: Kristina M. Hanson
Represented By: Elham Firouzi Steiner Esq.
Represented By: Tung On Kong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC.
Represented By: Arnold B. Calmann
Represented By: Kristina M. Hanson
Represented By: Elham Firouzi Steiner Esq.
Represented By: Tung On Kong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CELGENE CORPORATION
Represented By: Charles Michael Lizza
Represented By: Francis Dominic Cerrito Esq.
Represented By: Ellyde R. Thompson Esq.
Represented By: Jennifer L. Swize
Represented By: Frank Charles Calvosa
Represented By: Matthew J. Hertko
Represented By: Eric C. Stops
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?