Koopmann v. US
Plaintiff: EUGENE R. BISCAILUZ, JAMES H. BIESTEK, ROBERT L. BEAVIS, RONALD L. BLASH, PAUL L. BAILEY, LAWRENCE C. BECKER, JON R. BOSTON, GEORGE A. BLEYLE, STANLEY M. ANDERSON, ROBERT M. BENZIES, CHARLES M. ADAMS, LOUIS C. ATKINS, WAYNE E. ALLEN, WILLIAM C. BARHAM, JOSEPH E. ARMSTEAD, DONALD A. BLANCHARD and JAMES R. ALLEN
Plaintiff / Appellant: WILLIAM C. BRASHEAR and WILLIAM KOOPMANN
Defendant / Appellee: UNITED STATES
Case Number: 21-1329
Filed: November 25, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Federal Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Appellants William C. Brashear and William Koopmann, Notice of Unrepresented Person [ # 10 ], [ # 12 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant document due on 01/26/2021. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [748632] [MMA] [Entered: 01/12/2021 09:19 AM]
December 30, 2020 Filing 12 MODIFIED ENTRY: Notice of Unrepresented Person Appearance for Appellant William C. Brashear. Service: 01/05/2021 by clerk. [747167]--[Edited 01/12/2021 by MMA] This document is non-compliant. See Doc. No. [ # 13 ] [JCP] [Entered: 01/05/2021 08:37 PM]
December 28, 2020 Filing 11 MODIFIED ENTRY: MOTION of Appellants William C. Brashear and William Koopmann to extend time. Service: 01/05/2021 by clerk. [747166]--[Edited 01/11/2021 by MMA] [JCP] [Entered: 01/05/2021 08:36 PM]
December 28, 2020 Filing 10 MODIFIED ENTRY: Notice of Unrepresented Person Appearance for Appellant William Koopmann. Service: 01/05/2021 by clerk. [747163]--[Edited 01/12/2021 by MMA] This document is non-compliant. See Doc. No. [ # 13 ] [JCP] [Entered: 01/05/2021 08:35 PM]
December 10, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Appellant William Koopmann, Notice of Unrepresented Person [ # 6 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant document due on 12/28/2020. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [741743] [MMA] [Entered: 12/10/2020 10:33 AM]
December 9, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION of Appellee US to dismiss appeal because the court of Federal claims has not entered the required Judgment. Cases to be terminated: 21-1329. (Briefing suspended pursuant to FCR 31 pending resolution of the motion). Service: 12/09/2020 by US mail, email. [741395]--[Edited 12/09/2020 by MMA - Reason: to correct relief] [Janet Bradley] [Entered: 12/09/2020 11:51 AM]
December 9, 2020 Filing 7 Entry of appearance for Michael J. Haungs as counsel for Appellee US. Service: 12/09/2020 by US mail, email. [741349] [21-1329] [Michael Haungs] [Entered: 12/09/2020 10:26 AM]
December 7, 2020 Filing 5 Corrected Entry of appearance for Janet A. Bradley as counsel for Appellee US. Service: 12/07/2020 by US mail, email. [740673] [21-1329] [Janet Bradley] [Entered: 12/07/2020 12:57 PM]
December 4, 2020 Filing 6 MODIFIED ENTRY: Notice of Unrepresented Person Appearance for Appellant William Koopmann. Service: 12/08/2020 by clerk. [741027]--[Edited 12/10/2020 by MMA] This document is non-compliant. See Doc. No. [ # 9 ] [JCP] [Entered: 12/08/2020 10:37 AM]
December 2, 2020 Filing 4 Entry of appearance for Janet A. Bradley as counsel for Appellee US. Service: 12/02/2020 by US mail, email. [739507] [21-1329] [Janet Bradley] [Entered: 12/02/2020 09:36 AM]
December 1, 2020 Filing 3 Filing fee paid in the United States Court of Federal Claims on 11/12/2020. [739166] [MMA] [Entered: 12/01/2020 11:01 AM]
December 1, 2020 Filing 2 Amended docket sheet from United States Court of Federal Claims. [739165] [MMA] [Entered: 12/01/2020 10:58 AM]
November 25, 2020 Filing 1 Appeal docketed. Received: 11/12/2020. [738470] Fee/IFP due on 12/14/2020. Entry of Appearance due 12/14/2020. Appellants' Informal brief are due 12/24/2020.--[Edited 11/25/2020 by MMA to modify deadlines due to mailing] [MMA] [Entered: 11/25/2020 02:32 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Koopmann v. US
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EUGENE R. BISCAILUZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES H. BIESTEK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT L. BEAVIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RONALD L. BLASH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAUL L. BAILEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAWRENCE C. BECKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JON R. BOSTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEORGE A. BLEYLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STANLEY M. ANDERSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT M. BENZIES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHARLES M. ADAMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LOUIS C. ATKINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WAYNE E. ALLEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM C. BARHAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSEPH E. ARMSTEAD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DONALD A. BLANCHARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES R. ALLEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: WILLIAM C. BRASHEAR
Represented By: William C. Brashear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: WILLIAM KOOPMANN
Represented By: William Koopmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITED STATES
Represented By: Director, Tax Division
Represented By: Michael J. Haungs
Represented By: Janet A. Bradley Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?