AuthWallet, LLC v. Block, Inc.
Plaintiff / Appellant: AUTHWALLET, LLC
Defendant / Appellee: BLOCK, INC.
Case Number: 22-1842
Filed: May 31, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Federal Circuit
Nature of Suit: Patent Infringement (Fed. Qst.)
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 6, 2022 Filing 9 Notice to Appellant AuthWallet, LLC: The record of this case indicates that no Corrected Entry of Appearance under FCR 47.3(b) has been filed. Failure to file required documents may result in dismissal or other action as deemed appropriate by the court. See FCR 25(h). Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [859273] [ALK] [Entered: 07/06/2022 12:21 PM]
June 22, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Appellant AuthWallet, LLC, Entry of Appearance [ # 5 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant document due on 06/29/2022. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [856710] [JCW] [Entered: 06/22/2022 10:18 AM]
June 21, 2022 Filing 7 Docketing Statement for the Appellant AuthWallet, LLC. Service: 06/21/2022 by email. [856539] [22-1842] [William Ramey] [Entered: 06/21/2022 03:18 PM]
June 21, 2022 Filing 6 Certificate of Interest for Appellant AuthWallet, LLC. Service: 06/21/2022 by email. [856538] [22-1842] [William Ramey] [Entered: 06/21/2022 03:17 PM]
June 21, 2022 Filing 5 Entry of appearance for William P. Ramey, III as counsel for Appellant AuthWallet, LLC. Service: 06/21/2022 by email. [856536] [22-1842] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No.[ # 8 ] [William Ramey] [Entered: 06/21/2022 03:16 PM]
June 14, 2022 Filing 4 Docketing Statement for the Appellee Block, Inc.. Service: 06/14/2022 by email. [855474] [22-1842] [Daniel Block] [Entered: 06/14/2022 12:14 PM]
June 14, 2022 Filing 3 Certificate of Interest for Appellee Block, Inc.. Service: 06/14/2022 by email. [855473] [22-1842] [Daniel Block] [Entered: 06/14/2022 12:13 PM]
June 14, 2022 Filing 2 Entry of appearance for Daniel S. Block as counsel for Appellee Block, Inc.. Service: 06/14/2022 by email. [855470] [22-1842] [Daniel Block] [Entered: 06/14/2022 12:10 PM]
May 31, 2022 Filing 1 Appeal docketed. Received: 05/26/2022. [852607] Entry of Appearance is due on 06/14/2022. Certificate of Interest is due on 06/14/2022. Docketing Statement is due on 06/14/2022. Appellant's brief is due on 08/01/2022. [ALK] [Entered: 05/31/2022 09:42 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: AuthWallet, LLC v. Block, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: AUTHWALLET, LLC
Represented By: David J. Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BLOCK, INC.
Represented By: Chandrika Vira
Represented By: Daniel S. Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?