Apple Inc. v. Vidal
Plaintiff: GOOGLE LLC, CISCO SYSTEMS, INC., EDWARDS LIFESCIENCES LLC, INTEL CORPORATION, APPLE INC. and EDWARDS LIFESCIENCES CORPORATION
Defendant: KATHERINE K. VIDAL, Under Secretary of Commerce for Intellectual Property and Director of the United States Patent and Trademark Office
Case Number: 24-1864
Filed: May 23, 2024
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Federal Circuit
Nature of Suit: Admin Proc Act/Rvw Ag Dec (US Def.)
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2024 Filing 15 **TEXT ONLY** ORDER granting motion to extend time to file brief [ # 14 ] filed by Appellants Apple Inc., Cisco Systems, Inc., Intel Corporation and Google LLC. The opening brief is due 08/05/2024. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. This order has been issued without an attached document and is official and binding. [1018708] [JSP] [Entered: 07/18/2024 09:35 AM]
July 15, 2024 Filing 14 MOTION of Appellants Apple Inc., Cisco Systems, Inc., Google LLC and Intel Corporation to extend the time to 08/05/2024 to file brief. Service: 07/15/2024 by email. [1017917] [24-1864] [Catherine Carroll] [Entered: 07/15/2024 07:38 PM]
June 28, 2024 Filing 13 Docketing Statement for the Appellee Katherine K. Vidal. Service: 06/28/2024 by email. [1014342] [24-1864] [Weili Shaw] [Entered: 06/28/2024 04:17 PM]
June 24, 2024 Filing 12 Docketing Statement for the Appellants Apple Inc., Cisco Systems, Inc. and Intel Corporation. Service: 06/24/2024 by email. [1012777] [24-1864] [Catherine Carroll] [Entered: 06/24/2024 11:23 AM]
June 7, 2024 Filing 11 Corrected Docketing Statement for the Appellant Google LLC. Service: 06/07/2024 by email. [1009599] [24-1864] [Nathan Kelley] [Entered: 06/07/2024 12:04 PM]
June 7, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Appellant Google LLC, Docketing Statement [ # 3 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant document due on 06/14/2024. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [1009582] [GWK] [Entered: 06/07/2024 11:29 AM]
June 6, 2024 Filing 9 Entry of Appearance for Nathan K. Kelley; Andrew T. Dufresne as counsel for Appellant Google LLC. Service: 06/06/2024 by email. [1009393] [24-1864] [Nathan Kelley] [Entered: 06/06/2024 02:30 PM]
June 6, 2024 Filing 8 Notice of Related Case Information for Appellants Apple Inc., Cisco Systems, Inc. and Intel Corporation. Service: 06/06/2024 by email. [1009371] [24-1864] [Catherine Carroll] [Entered: 06/06/2024 01:43 PM]
June 6, 2024 Filing 7 Certificate of Interest for Appellants Apple Inc., Cisco Systems, Inc. and Intel Corporation. Service: 06/06/2024 by email. [1009369] [24-1864] [Catherine Carroll] [Entered: 06/06/2024 01:42 PM]
June 6, 2024 Filing 6 Entry of Appearance for Catherine M.A. Carroll; Mark D. Selwyn; Gary M. Fox; Alyson M. Zureick as counsel for Appellants Apple Inc., Cisco Systems, Inc. and Intel Corporation. Service: 06/06/2024 by email. [1009368] [24-1864] [Catherine Carroll] [Entered: 06/06/2024 01:41 PM]
June 6, 2024 Filing 5 Notice of Related Case Information for Appellant Google LLC. Service: 06/06/2024 by email. [1009310] [24-1864] [Nathan Kelley] [Entered: 06/06/2024 12:10 PM]
June 6, 2024 Filing 4 Certificate of Interest for Appellant Google LLC. Service: 06/06/2024 by email. [1009307] [24-1864] [Nathan Kelley] [Entered: 06/06/2024 12:09 PM]
June 6, 2024 Filing 3 Docketing Statement for the Appellant Google LLC. Service: 06/06/2024 by email. [1009304] [24-1864] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No. [ # 10 ] [Nathan Kelley] [Entered: 06/06/2024 12:06 PM]
June 6, 2024 Filing 2 Entry of Appearance for Weili J. Shaw; Joshua M. Salzman as counsel for Appellee Katherine K. Vidal. Service: 06/06/2024 by email. [1009285] [24-1864] [Weili Shaw] [Entered: 06/06/2024 11:46 AM]
May 23, 2024 Filing 1 Appeal docketed. Received: 05/17/2024. [1006260] Entry of Appearance due 06/06/2024. Certificate of Interest is due on 06/06/2024. Docketing Statement due 06/24/2024. Appellant's brief is due 07/22/2024. [GWK] [Entered: 05/23/2024 04:28 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Apple Inc. v. Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GOOGLE LLC
Represented By: Andrew Dufresne
Represented By: Nathan K. Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CISCO SYSTEMS, INC.
Represented By: Alyson Zureick
Represented By: Gary M. Fox
Represented By: Catherine Carroll
Represented By: Mark D. Selwyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EDWARDS LIFESCIENCES LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: INTEL CORPORATION
Represented By: Alyson Zureick
Represented By: Gary M. Fox
Represented By: Catherine Carroll
Represented By: Mark D. Selwyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: APPLE INC.
Represented By: Alyson Zureick
Represented By: Gary M. Fox
Represented By: Catherine Carroll
Represented By: Mark D. Selwyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EDWARDS LIFESCIENCES CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KATHERINE K. VIDAL, Under Secretary of Commerce for Intellectual Property and Director of the United States Patent and Trademark Office
Represented By: Joshua Marc Salzman
Represented By: Weili J. Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?