Hippely v. US
Plaintiff: JEROME CAICCO, nka Jerry Caicco, ERIC FINCHAM, CARMELLA WILLIAMS, WARREN R.C. INC., DEBORAH A. GWIN, JOHN CAICCO, MARILYN LANNING, ROSALIE LANNING, BENNETT COBB, SR., JOSEPH CAICCO, RICHARD L. GWIN, RICHARD MOWEN, OHIO EDISON CO., JOHN HIPPELY, ELAINE MOWEN and HAROLD LANNING
Defendant: UNITED STATES
Case Number: 25-1100
Filed: October 24, 2024
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Federal Circuit
Nature of Suit: Taking - Rails to Trails

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
February 6, 2025 HIPPELY v. US

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2024 Filing 13 **TEXT ONLY** ORDER granting motion to extend time to file brief [ # 12 ] filed by Appellant US. No further extensions should be anticipated. The opening brief is due 02/21/2025. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. This order has been issued without an attached document and is official and binding. [1054402] [IMH] [Entered: 12/16/2024 12:04 PM]
December 12, 2024 Filing 12 MOTION of Appellant US to extend the time to 02/21/2025 to file brief. Service: 12/12/2024 by email. [1053828] [25-1100] [Michael Gray] [Entered: 12/12/2024 12:45 PM]
November 21, 2024 Filing 11 Docketing Statement for the Appellant US. Service: 11/21/2024 by email. [1048999] [25-1100] [Michael Gray] [Entered: 11/21/2024 03:26 PM]
November 21, 2024 Filing 10 Docketing Statement for the Appellees Jerome Caicco, John Caicco, Joseph Caicco, Bennett Cobb, Sr., Eric Fincham, Deborah A. Gwin, Richard L. Gwin, John Hippely, Harold Lanning, Marilyn Lanning, Rosalie Lanning, Elaine Mowen, Richard Mowen, Ohio Edison Co., Warren R.C. Inc. and Carmella Williams. Service: 11/21/2024 by email. [1048793] [25-1100] [Thomas Stewart] [Entered: 11/21/2024 12:07 PM]
November 7, 2024 Filing 9 Corrected Certificate of Interest for Appellees Jerome Caicco, John Caicco, Joseph Caicco, Bennett Cobb, Sr., Eric Fincham, Deborah A. Gwin, Richard L. Gwin, John Hippely, Harold Lanning, Marilyn Lanning, Rosalie Lanning, Elaine Mowen, Richard Mowen, Ohio Edison Co., Warren R.C. Inc. and Carmella Williams. Service: 11/07/2024 by email. [1045598] [25-1100] [Thomas Stewart] [Entered: 11/07/2024 01:37 PM]
November 7, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Appellees Jerome Caicco, John Caicco, Joseph Caicco, Bennett Cobb, Sr., Eric Fincham, Deborah A. Gwin, Richard L. Gwin, John Hippely, Harold Lanning, Marilyn Lanning, Rosalie Lanning, Elaine Mowen, Richard Mowen, Ohio Edison Co., Warren R.C. Inc. and Carmella Williams, Certificate of Interest [ # 7 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant document due on 11/15/2024. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [1045488] [GWK] [Entered: 11/07/2024 09:23 AM]
November 5, 2024 Filing 7 Corrected Certificate of Interest for Appellees Jerome Caicco, John Caicco, Joseph Caicco, Bennett Cobb, Sr., Eric Fincham, Deborah A. Gwin, Richard L. Gwin, John Hippely, Harold Lanning, Marilyn Lanning, Rosalie Lanning, Elaine Mowen, Richard Mowen, Ohio Edison Co., Warren R.C. Inc. and Carmella Williams. Service: 11/05/2024 by email. [1044939] [25-1100] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No. [ # 8 ] [Thomas Stewart] [Entered: 11/05/2024 11:36 AM]
November 5, 2024 Filing 6 Entry of Appearance for Thomas S. Stewart; Reed W. Ripley as counsel for Appellees Jerome Caicco, John Caicco, Joseph Caicco, Bennett Cobb, Sr., Eric Fincham, Deborah A. Gwin, Richard L. Gwin, John Hippely, Harold Lanning, Marilyn Lanning, Rosalie Lanning, Elaine Mowen, Richard Mowen, Ohio Edison Co., Warren R.C. Inc. and Carmella Williams. Service: 11/05/2024 by email. [1044937] [25-1100] [Thomas Stewart] [Entered: 11/05/2024 11:34 AM]
November 5, 2024 Filing 5 Entry of Appearance for Michael T. Gray as counsel for Appellant US. Service: 11/05/2024 by email. [1044865] [25-1100] [Michael Gray] [Entered: 11/05/2024 09:30 AM]
November 4, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Appellees Jerome Caicco, John Caicco, Joseph Caicco, Bennett Cobb, Sr., Eric Fincham, Deborah A. Gwin, Richard L. Gwin, John Hippely, Harold Lanning, Marilyn Lanning, Rosalie Lanning, Elaine Mowen, Richard Mowen, Ohio Edison Co., Warren R.C. Inc. and Carmella Williams, Entry of Appearance, Certificate of Interest [ # 2 ], [ # 3 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant document due on 11/12/2024. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [1044700] [GWK] [Entered: 11/04/2024 04:18 PM]
November 4, 2024 Filing 3 Certificate of Interest for Appellees Jerome Caicco, John Caicco, Joseph Caicco, Bennett Cobb, Sr., Eric Fincham, Deborah A. Gwin, Richard L. Gwin, John Hippely, Harold Lanning, Marilyn Lanning, Rosalie Lanning, Elaine Mowen, Richard Mowen, Ohio Edison Co., Warren R.C. Inc. and Carmella Williams. Service: 11/04/2024 by email. [1044596] [25-1100] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No. [ # 4 ] [Thomas Stewart] [Entered: 11/04/2024 02:36 PM]
November 4, 2024 Filing 2 Entry of Appearance for Thomas S. Stewart; Reed W. Ripley as counsel for Appellees Jerome Caicco, John Caicco, Joseph Caicco, Bennett Cobb, Sr., Eric Fincham, Deborah A. Gwin, Richard L. Gwin, John Hippely, Harold Lanning, Marilyn Lanning, Rosalie Lanning, Elaine Mowen, Richard Mowen, Ohio Edison Co., Warren R.C. Inc. and Carmella Williams. Service: 11/04/2024 by email. [1044593] [25-1100] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No. [ # 4 ] [Thomas Stewart] [Entered: 11/04/2024 02:35 PM]
October 24, 2024 Filing 1 Appeal docketed. Received: 10/21/2024. [1042246] Entry of Appearance due 11/07/2024. Certificate of Interest is due on 11/07/2024. Docketing Statement due 11/25/2024. Appellant's brief is due 12/23/2024. [GWK] [Entered: 10/24/2024 10:59 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Hippely v. US
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEROME CAICCO, nka Jerry Caicco
Represented By: Thomas Scott Stewart
Represented By: Reed W. Ripley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ERIC FINCHAM
Represented By: Thomas Scott Stewart
Represented By: Reed W. Ripley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARMELLA WILLIAMS
Represented By: Thomas Scott Stewart
Represented By: Reed W. Ripley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WARREN R.C. INC.
Represented By: Thomas Scott Stewart
Represented By: Reed W. Ripley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEBORAH A. GWIN
Represented By: Thomas Scott Stewart
Represented By: Reed W. Ripley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN CAICCO
Represented By: Thomas Scott Stewart
Represented By: Reed W. Ripley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARILYN LANNING
Represented By: Thomas Scott Stewart
Represented By: Reed W. Ripley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROSALIE LANNING
Represented By: Thomas Scott Stewart
Represented By: Reed W. Ripley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BENNETT COBB, SR.
Represented By: Thomas Scott Stewart
Represented By: Reed W. Ripley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSEPH CAICCO
Represented By: Thomas Scott Stewart
Represented By: Reed W. Ripley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD L. GWIN
Represented By: Thomas Scott Stewart
Represented By: Reed W. Ripley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD MOWEN
Represented By: Thomas Scott Stewart
Represented By: Reed W. Ripley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OHIO EDISON CO.
Represented By: Thomas Scott Stewart
Represented By: Reed W. Ripley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN HIPPELY
Represented By: Thomas Scott Stewart
Represented By: Reed W. Ripley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELAINE MOWEN
Represented By: Thomas Scott Stewart
Represented By: Reed W. Ripley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HAROLD LANNING
Represented By: Thomas Scott Stewart
Represented By: Reed W. Ripley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES
Represented By: Michael Thomas Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?