USA v. Bolton
Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: Paul K. Bolton
Garnishee: Spectracell Laboratories, Inc. and Mueller-Dean Inc
Case Number: 1:2000cv01754
Filed: September 6, 2000
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Lewis T. Babcock
Nature of Suit: Recovery of Defaulted Student Loans (Excl. Veterans)
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER denying as moot 40 Motion for Contempt, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 10/31/2014.(tscha, )
May 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MINUTE ORDER granting 35 Plaintiff USA's Motion to Compel Answers to Plaintiff's Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents. Defendant Bolton shall provide full and complete responses to Plaintiff USA's Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents on or before 6/9/2014. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 5/20/2014.(emill)
April 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER DISMISSING GARNISHMENT: Granting 33 Motion to Dismiss Garnishment, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 4/22/2013. (eseam)
February 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 32 GARNISHEE ORDER re: 30 Motion, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 2/13/2013. (eseam)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. Bolton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: Spectracell Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: Mueller-Dean Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul K. Bolton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Lisa A Christian
Represented By: Mustafa Ahmed Hersi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?