Simpson, et al v. University CO Bldr
Plaintiff: Jane Doe, Lisa Simpson and Anne Gilmore
Defendant: University of Colorado at Boulder
Intervenor: John Doe
Interested Party: Denver Publishing Company, Marques Harris and Colt Brennan
Case Number: 1:2002cv02390
Filed: December 23, 2002
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
Presiding Judge: Robert E Blackburn
Referring Judge: Craig B Shaffer
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 20 U.S.C. ยง 1681 Title IX Educational Amendments 1992
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 1025 MINUTE ORDER re: #1024 Order on Motion for Release of Funds,The matter is before the court sua sponte for entry of an order directing payment of accrued interest. On January 30, 2008, the court entered an order, see #1024 directing the payment of previously deposited funds in the principal amount of $170,000. The order did not address the distribution of accrued interest in the amount of $466. Accrued interest should be remitted to plaintiff, Anne Gilmore. THEREFORE, IT IS ORDERED that the clerk is authorized and directed to pay accrued interest of $466 to plaintiff, Anne Gilmore.. Signed by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 2/7/08. (erv, )
January 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 1024 ORDER granting #1023 Stipulated Motion for Release of Funds Deposited in the Registry of the Court; and, Denying as moot #1009 Motion for Order to Enforce Attorney's Lien. Signed by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 1/30/08.(erv, )
January 30, 2008 Filing 1023 Stipulated MOTION for Release of Funds and to Dismiss with Prejudice by Plaintiff Anne Gilmore. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Benezra, Seth)
January 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 1022 MINUTE ORDER granting Plaintiff Gilmore's #1020 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline to respond to the #1009 MOTION for Order to Enforce Attorney's Lien is extended to Feburary 1, 2008 and the reply deadline is extended to February 15, 2008. Entered by Magistrate Judge Craig B Shaffer on 1/17/08. [Text only entry - No document attached](cbssec)
January 17, 2008 Filing 1021 MEMORANDUM regarding #1020 Unopposed MOTION For Extension of Time to Respond to the Motion to Enforce Attorney's Lien filed by Anne Gilmore. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Craig B Shaffer by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 1/17/08. (Text Only Entry - No Document Attached) (rebsec, )
January 17, 2008 Filing 1020 Unopposed MOTION For Extension of Time to Respond to the Motion to Enforce Attorney's Lien by Plaintiff Anne Gilmore. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Benezra, Seth)
December 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 1018 ORDER granting Plaintiff Anne Gilmore and Defendant Regents of the University of Colorado's Stipulated #1016 Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice. Trial preparation conference and jury trial are vacated. Action is dismissed with prejudice. Court retains jurisdiction over the Motion to Enforce Attorney's Liens. Signed by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 12/26/07.(gms, )
December 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 1017 ORDER granting Plaintiff Lisa Simpson's and Defendant Regents of the University of Colorado's Stipulated #1015 Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice. Action is dismissed with prejudice as between the plaintiff Lisa Simpson and the defendant, with parties to pay their own attorney fees and costs. Signed by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 12/26/07.(gms, )
December 21, 2007 Filing 1019 RECEIPT for $170,000.00 per #1013 Order of 12/21/07 from Benezra and Culver (gms, )
December 21, 2007 Filing 1016 Stipulated MOTION to Dismiss by Plaintiff Anne Gilmore. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Culver, John)
December 21, 2007 Filing 1015 Stipulated MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice by Plaintiff Lisa Simpson. (Hult, Kimberly)
December 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 1013 MINUTE ORDER directing Plaintiff Gilmore to deposit $170,000.00 (USD) into the Registry of the U.S. District Court in conjunction with the pending MOTION #1009 for Order to Enforce Attorney's Lien, by Magistrate Judge Craig B Shaffer on 12/21/07. (cbssec)
December 20, 2007 Filing 1014 Courtroom Minutes/Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B Shaffer. Telephonic Status Conference held on 12/20/2007: The Response to the Motion to Enforce Attorney's Lien #1009 shall be due by 1/22/2008; and the reply is due by 2/6/2008. (Court Reporter FTR - Ben Van Dyke) (cbscd)
December 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 1012 MINUTE ORDER setting a Telephonic Status Conference for 12/20/2007 at 4:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Craig B Shaffer. Counsel shall create a conference call, then contact the Court at (303) 844-2117 to participate in the hearing, by Magistrate Judge Craig B Shaffer on 12/19/07. (Text Entry Only - No Document Attached) (cbssec, )
December 18, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 1011 MINUTE ORDER setting briefing schedule on #1009 MOTION for Order to Enforce Attorney's Lien filed by Anne Gilmore. IT IS ORDERED that parties are directed to D.C.ColoL.CivR. 7.1 C for the deadline(s) relating to the filing of response and reply brief(s). Signed by Magistrate Judge Craig B Shaffer on 12/18/07. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY - No Document Attached)(cbssec, )
December 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 1010 MEMORANDUM regarding #1009 MOTION for Order to Enforce Attorney's Lien filed by Anne Gilmore. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Craig B Shaffer by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 12/17/07. (Text Only Entry - No Document Attached) (rebsec, )
December 17, 2007 Filing 1009 MOTION for Order to Enforce Attorney's Lien against Plaintiff Anne Gilmore. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Barnhart, W.) (Modified on 12/17/2007 to reflect that the lidn is against the Pla)(erv2, ).
December 6, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 1008 MINUTE ORDER, Set Deadlines: Dismissal Paper due by 12/21/2007. by Magistrate Judge Craig B Shaffer on 12/6/07. (erv, )
December 3, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 1007 MINUTE ORDER Per telephonic communication with counsel on December 3, 2007, parties have advised the court that they require a two week extension of time to continue preparing this matter for scheduling. Therefore, counsel are directed to contact the court (303.844.2117), no later than December 21, 2007, to set a date for a scheduling conference. by Magistrate Judge Craig B Shaffer on 12/3/07. (erv, )
November 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 1006 MINUTE ORDER Due to a conflict on the court's calendar, the November 27, 2007 status conference and related deadline for submission of status reports and confidential settlement statements are VACATED. Parties are directed to contact the court (303.844.2117) no later than December 3, 2007 to reset the conference. by Magistrate Judge Craig B Shaffer on 11/20/07. (erv, )
November 19, 2007 Filing 1005 MANDATE of USCA as to #955 Notice of Appeal, filed by Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson, Jane Doe, #992 USCA Opinion and Judgment, #986 Notice of Appeal filed by Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson, Jane Doe : We Reverse the grant of summary judgment to CU and Remand for further proceedings consistent with this opinion. (USCA Case No. 06-1184 & 07-1182) (bjr2, )
November 13, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 1004 MINUTE ORDER, Set Hearings: Status Conference set for 11/27/2007 11:00 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B Shaffer. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that on or before 12:00 p.m. on November 26, 2007, parties shall email to Judge Shaffer their individual confidential settlement statements and file individual status reports indicating what steps they believe are necessary to prepare the case for trial. by Magistrate Judge Craig B Shaffer on 11/13/07. (erv, )
November 12, 2007 Filing 1003 NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING TENTH CIRCUIT DECISION by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder (Reilly, Daniel)
October 17, 2007 Filing 1002 TRANSCRIPT of Status Conference held on 3-25-05 before Magistrate Judge Shaffer. Pages: 1-45. Per statute, copies of transcripts are available for inspection in the clerk's office. Parties interested in a copy may contact the court reporter or, in the case of a transcript prepared from a digital-audio taped record, the courtroom deputy for the judicial officer. (Avery Woods Reporting, )
October 11, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 1001 MINUTE ORDER granting #998 Dfts Renewed Motion to Vacate Minute Orders. Parties are not required to submit status reports or confidential settlement statements and the October 18, 2007 hearing is VACATED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that counsel shall notify the court within 72 hours of receipt of a decision by the Tenth Circuit. by Magistrate Judge Craig B Shaffer on 10/11/07.(erv, )
October 11, 2007 Filing 1000 SUPPLEMENT/AMENDMENT to #998 Renewed MOTION to Vacate #997 Order on Motion to Vacate, by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Reilly, Daniel)
October 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 999 MEMORANDUM regarding #998 Renewed MOTION to Vacate #997 Order on Motion to Vacate, filed by University of Colorado at Boulder by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 10/10/07. (Text Only Entry - No Document Attached)Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Craig B Shaffer (rebsec, )
October 9, 2007 Filing 998 Renewed MOTION to Vacate #997 Order on Motion to Vacate, by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Reilly, Daniel)
September 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 997 MINUTE ORDER denying #995 Dfts Motion to Vacate Minute Orde. The October 18, 2007 hearing will not be vacated at this time. The court may reconsider itsposition in light of further developments. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the deadline for parties' status reports and confidential settlement statements is extended to on or before October 15, 2007. by Magistrate Judge Craig B Shaffer on 9/21/07.(erv, )
September 20, 2007 Filing 996 SUPPLEMENT/AMENDMENT to #995 MOTION to Vacate #993 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,,,,, by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder. (Reilly, Daniel)
September 19, 2007 Filing 995 MOTION to Vacate #993 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,,,,, by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder. (Reilly, Daniel)
September 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 994 MINUTE ORDER, Set Hearings: Six Week Jury Trial set for 1/12/2009 08:30 AM in Courtroom A 701 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn.,Trial Preparation Conference set for 12/19/2008 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom A 701 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 9/17/07. (erv, )
September 14, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 993 MINUTE ORDER In view of the Tenth Circuit decision of September 6, 2007 remanding this case for further proceedings before the trial court, IT IS ORDERED: A scheduling conference is set for October 18, 2007 at 1:30 p.m. (Mountain Time) in Courtroom A-402, Fourth Floor, of the Alfred A. Arraj U.S. Courthouse, 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado; On or before September 24, 2007 parties are to submit separate status reports indicating what steps they believe are necessary to prepare this case for trial; and On or before September 24, 2007 parties shall submit updated confidential settlement statements. Parties are to e-mail their confidential settlement statement, in PDF format, to Shaffer_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov. Status Report due by 9/24/2007.,Scheduling Conference set for 10/18/2007 01:30 PM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B Shaffer. by Magistrate Judge Craig B Shaffer on 9/14/07. (erv, )
September 6, 2007 Filing 992 USCA Opinion and Judgment as to #955 Notice of Appeal, filed by Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson, Jane Doe, and #986 Notice of Appeal filed by Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson, Jane Doe : We Reverse the grant of summary judgment to CU and Remand for further proceedings consistent with this opinion. (USCA Case No. 06-1184 & 07-1182) (This document is not the Mandate) (Attachments: #1 Judgment#2 Letter)(bjr2, )
May 9, 2007 Filing 991 LETTER TO USCA and all counsel certifying the record is complete as to #986 Notice of Appeal filed by Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson, Jane Doe. ( Appeal No. 07-1182) (bjr2, )
May 7, 2007 Filing 990 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM re #986 Notice of Appeal by Plaintiff Anne Gilmore (Culver, John)
May 2, 2007 Filing 989 USCA Appeal Fees (USCA Case No. 07-1182); received payment of $ 455, receipt number 1080 re #986 Notice of Appeal filed by Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson, Jane Doe (bjr2, )
April 27, 2007 Filing 988 USCA Case Number 07-1182 for #986 Notice of Appeal filed by Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson, Jane Doe. Appellants have 30 days to either pay the $455.00 filing fee or file a proper 1915 motion with the district court. (bjr2, )
April 26, 2007 Filing 987 LETTER re Appeal to all counsela advising of the transmittal of the #986 Notice of Appeal filed by Lisa Simpson and Anne Gilmore to the U.S. Court of Appeals. (Retained counsel; Fees not paid) (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeal#2 Docket Sheet)(bjr2, )
April 25, 2007 Filing 986 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #985 Order on Motion to Alter Judgment by Plaintiffs Jane Doe, Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson (Hult, Kimberly)
April 24, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 985 ORDER denying #965 Plas Joint Motion to Alter Judgment. Signed by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 4/24/07.(erv, )
April 20, 2007 Filing 983 Docket Annotation re: #982 Reply to Response to Motion, #981 Response to Motion, The excessive text was corrected due to and internal systems error. Text only entry - no document attached. (erv, )
April 19, 2007 Filing 982 REPLY to Response to Motion re #965 MOTION to Alter Judgment re 669 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Order on Motion in Limine, Order on Motion for Joinder, Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, Order on Motion for Protective Order, filed by Plaintiffs Jane Doe, Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson. (Kerr, Baine) (Modified on 4/20/2007 to adjust the excessive text)(erv, ).
April 19, 2007 Filing 981 RESPONSE to Motion re #965 MOTION to Alter Judgment re 669 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,, Order on Motion in Limine,, Order on Motion for Joinder, Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, Order on Motion for Protective Order, filed by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Joni Gordanier#2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Ronald Hahn)(O'Rourke, Patrick) (Modified on 4/20/2007 to adjust excessive text)(erv, ).
April 18, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 980 ORDER STRIKING #965 University's Responseto Joint MOTION to Alter Judgment re 669 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Order on Motion in Limine,, Order on Motion for Joinder, Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, Order on Motion for Protective Order, The Dft shall have to 4/20/07 to file a response by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 4/18/07. (erv, )
April 18, 2007 Filing 979 Docket Annotation re: #978 Response to Motion, This pleading has had the excessive text removed, there is an internal error that duplicated the entries. It now reflects the correct format and text. Text only entry - no document attached. (erv, )
April 17, 2007 Filing 978 RESPONSE to Motion re #965 MOTION to Alter Judgment re 669 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Order on Motion in Limine, Order on Motion for Joinder, Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, Order on Motion for Protective Order, filed by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Joni Gordanier#2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Ronald Hahn)(O'Rourke, Patrick) (Modified on 4/18/2007 to remove the duplicate text)(erv, ).
April 17, 2007 Filing 977 RESPONSE to #970 Plaintiffs' Second Supplement to their #779 Joint Reply to #778 Defendant's Response to the Court's July 1, 2006 Show Cause Order #870 by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder. (O'Rourke, Patrick)
April 17, 2007 Filing 976 NOTICE of Change of Address by Seth J. Benezra (Benezra, Seth)
April 11, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 975 ORDER of USCA as to #955 Notice of Appeal filed by Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson, Jane Doe: Appellants motion to postpone oral argument is denied. (USCA case no. 06-1184) (bjr2, )
April 10, 2007 Filing 974 NOTICE re #965 MOTION to Alter Judgment re 669 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,, Order on Motion in Limine,, Order on Motion for Joinder, Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, Order on Motion for Protective Order, Order on Motion for (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B - Substituted)(Kerr, Baine) (Modified on 4/11/2007 to correct the text that was duplicated) (erv2, ).
April 5, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 973 ORDER granting #962 Plas' Unopposed Motion to Seal Document Unredacted Copy of Plas' Joint Motion for Rule 967 60(b)(6) Relief or, Alternatively, Action for Equitable Relief From Judgment and Exhibits C-E, I-J, P-Q, S-T, and V-W Thereto. Signed by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 4/5/07.(erv, )
April 4, 2007 Filing 972 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Submit DVD with Exhibit A to #965 Redacted Version of Plaintiffs' Joint Motion for Rule 60(b)6) Relief by Plaintiff Lisa Simpson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Kerr, Baine)
April 3, 2007 Filing 971 NOTICE re Substitution Regarding Exhibit D to 966 Joint MOTION for Order to by Plaintiffs Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson (Public entry for SEALED Document #969 , filed 4/2/07) Text Only Entry - No Document Attached (erv, )
April 2, 2007 Filing 970 REPLY to #778 Response to Order to Show Cause Second Supplement to Their Joint Reply by Plaintiff Lisa Simpson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Media#2 Exhibit B - Media#3 Exhibit C - Deposition Excerpts#4 Exhibit D - Media)(Kerr, Baine)
April 2, 2007 Filing 969 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Lisa Simpson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Substituted Exhibit D)(Kerr, Baine)
April 2, 2007 Filing 968 NOTICE re #965 MOTION to Alter Judgment re 669 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Order on Motion in Limine, Order on Motion for Joinder, Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, Order on Motion for Protective Order, Order on Motion for Leave, Substitution Regarding Exhibit D by Plaintiff Lisa Simpson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Substituted Exhibit D)(Kerr, Baine) (Modified on 4/2/2007 to modify the text taking out unnecessary Triplicated text)(erv, ).
March 30, 2007 Filing 984 Conventionally Submitted Material : Exhibit A DVD, redacted version of Joint Motion for Rule 60(b)(6) Relief 3/29/07 by Plaintiffs Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson. (Placed in Manila Envelope and put in oversized docketing) Text Only Entry - No Document Attached (erv, )
March 29, 2007 Filing 967 Exhibit G to Plas' Joint Motion for Rule 60(b)(6) Relief or, Alternatively, Action for Equitable Relief from Judgment. (Pulic Entry for SEALED Document #964 , filed 2/29/07) Text Only Entry - No Document Attached(erv, )
March 29, 2007 Filing 966 Joint MOTION for Order for Rule 60(b)(6) Relief, or, Alternatively. Action for Equitable Relief From Judgment by Plaintiffs (Public Entry for SEALED Document #963 , filed 3/29/07) Text Only Entry - No Document Attached (erv, )
March 29, 2007 Filing 965 MOTION to Alter Judgment re 669 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,, Order on Motion in Limine, Order on Motion for Joinder, Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, Order on Motion for Protective Order, Order on Motion for Leave,Order on Motion to Compel, Order on Motion to Withdraw Document, Order on Motion for Order, Order on Motion for Extension of Time, Order on Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court, Order on Motion to Seal, Redacted Version of Plaintiffs' Joint Motion for Rule 60(b)(6) Relief or, Alternatively, Action for Equitable Relief from Judgment by Plaintiff Lisa Simpson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Transcript of KUSA Interview (Surrell)#2 Exhibit B - Motion for Limited Remand#3 Exhibit C (Redacted - Affidavit for Arrest Warrant#4 Exhibit D (Redacted) - Deposition Transcript Excerpts (Surrell)#5 Exhibit E - Anonymous Letter to Investigator#6 Exhibit F - Declaration (Kerr)#7 Exhibit G (Redacted) - Deposition Transcript Excerpts (Barnett)#8 Exhibit H (Redacted) - Deposition Transcript Excerpts (Chichester)#9 Exhibit I - Filed Under Seal designation#10 Exhibit J (Part 1) - Aurora Police Report#11 Exhibit J (Part 2) - Aurora Police Report#12 Exhibit K - Surrell Stats (2003)#13 Exhibit L - 3/14/07 KUSA News Story#14 Exhibit M - Declaration (Chapman)#15 Exhibit N - Vance Joseph Statement#16 Exhibit O - Deposition Transcript Excerpts (Keenan)#17 Exhibit P - Filed Under Seal designation#18 Exhibit Q - Police Report#19 Exhibit R - Correspondence (Heckenbach/Chambers)#20 Exhibit S - Filed Under Seal designation#21 Exhibit T - Deposition Transcripts Excerpts (Harris)#22 Exhibit U - Affidavit (Gillaspie)#23 Exhibit V - Police Interview#24 Exhibit W (Redacted) - Deposition Transcript Excerpts (Long)#25 Exhibit X - 03/05/07 KUSA News Story)(Kerr, Baine) (Modified on 3/30/2007 to correct text size)(erv, ).
March 29, 2007 Filing 964 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Lisa Simpson. (Kerr, Baine)
March 29, 2007 Filing 963 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Lisa Simpson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C - Affidavit for Arrest Warrant#2 Exhibit D - Deposition Transcript Excerpts (Surrell)#3 Exhibit H - Deposition Transcript Excerpts (Chichester)#4 Exhibit I - Declaration (Stene)#5 Exhibit P - Declaration (Crane)#6 Exhibit S - Affidavit (Student Trainer B)#7 Exhibit T - Deposition Transcript Excerpts (Harris)#8 Exhibit W - Deposition Transcript Excerpts (Long))(Kerr, Baine)
March 29, 2007 Filing 962 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document Unredacted Copy of Plaintiffs' Joint Motion for Rule 60(b)(6) Relief or, Alternatively, Action for Equitable Relief from Judgment and Exhibits C-E, I-J, P-Q, S-T and V-W Thereto by Plaintiff Lisa Simpson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Granting Motion to Seal)(Kerr, Baine)
October 6, 2006 Filing 961 NOTICE of Change of Address of Office of University Counsel by David P. Temple (Temple, David)
May 1, 2006 Filing 960 LETTER re Appeal to USCA and all counsel advising that the record on appeal is now complete as to #955 Notice of Appeal. (djs, )
April 28, 2006 Filing 959 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM re #955 Notice of Appeal,, by Plaintiffs Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson (Benezra, Seth)
April 27, 2006 Filing 958 USCA Case Number 06-1184 for #955 Notice of Appeal filed by Jane Doe, Lisa Simpson, Anne Gilmore. (djs, )
April 24, 2006 Filing 957 USCA Appeal Fees received $ 455 receipt number 267761 re #955 Notice of Appeal filed by Jane Doe, Lisa Simpson, Anne Gilmore. (djs, )
April 24, 2006 Filing 956 LETTER re Appeal to all counsel advising of the transmittal of the #955 Notice of Appeal to the U.S. Court of Appeals. (Retained counsel, Fees not paid) (djs, )
April 21, 2006 Filing 955 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 669 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Order on Motion in Limine, Order on Motion for Joinder, Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, Order on Motion for Protective Order, Order on Motion for Leave, Order on Motion to Compel, Order on Motion to Withdraw Document, Order on Motion for Order, Order on Motion for Extension of Time, Order on Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court, Order on Motion to Seal, #952 Order on Motion to Alter Judgment, Order on Motion for Review,, Order on Motion to Stay, 670 Clerk's Judgment, by Plaintiffs Jane Doe, Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson (Hult, Kimberly)
March 23, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 954 MINUTE ORDER denying #802 Pla's Joint Request (MOTION) for Ruling that certain notes withheld by dft from its 7/15/05 production be produced forthwith by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 3/23/06. (dlb, )
March 23, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 953 MINUTE ORDER granting #933 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw Document re #916 AMENDED #865 Sealed Document Redacted Supplement to Their #688 Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment or for Relief From Judgment in Light of Production of Documents Pursuant to the Court's September 21, 2005 Order by Plaintiffs by Magistrate Judge Craig B Shaffer on 3/23/06. (dlb, )
March 23, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 952 ORDER denying 687 REDACTED MOTION to Alter or Amend Judgment or for Relief from Judgment and Exhibits A-H Thereto by Plaintiffs. Denying 743 MOTION for Review of Bill of Costs Award by Defendant. Denying as moot #760 MOTION to Stay re #688 REDACTED MOTION to Alter Judgment by Plaintiffs . Signed by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 3/23/06. (dlb, )
February 22, 2006 Filing 951 MEMORANDUM referring to Magistrate Judge Shaffer : #933 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw Document re #916 Amended Document, filed by Lisa Simpson, Anne Gilmore, by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 2/22/06. (Text Only Entry - No Document Attached) (rebsec, )
February 21, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 950 ORDER: #852 Joint MOTION to Compel Production of Disciplinary Records by Plaintiffs is moot. 581 Plaintiffs' Motion to Seal is granted. #921 MOTION to Seal Response to Plaintiffs' Joint Motion to Compel Production of Disciplinary records file is granted. #924 MOTION to Seal Unredacted Response to Plaintiffs' Joint Motion to Compel Production of Disciplinary Records is granted. #938 MOTION to Seal Document Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Joint Motion to Compel Production of Disciplinary Records by Plaintiffs is granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Craig B Shaffer on 2/21/06. (dlb, )
February 14, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 949 ORDER taking under advisement #852 Joint MOTION to Compel Production of Disciplinary Records by Plaintiffs pursuant to courtroom minutes by Magistrate Judge Craig B Shaffer on 2/14/06. [Text Only Order - No Document Attached]. (dlb, )
February 14, 2006 Filing 948 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Craig B Shaffer : Status Conference held on 2/14/2006 re #852 Joint MOTION to Compel Production of Disciplinary Records by Plaintiffs is taken under advisement. (Court Reporter FTR - Ellen Miller.) (dlb, )
February 6, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 947 ORDER granting #945 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Joanne M. McDevitt and Michael W. Schreiner by Defendant. Added attorney Daniel M. Reilly for University of Colorado at Boulder, David P. Temple for University of Colorado at Boulder. Attorney Michael W. Schreiner and Schreiner are relieved of any further representation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Craig B Shaffer on 2/6/06. (dlb, )
February 6, 2006 Filing 946 MEMORANDUM referring to Magistrate Judge Shaffer : #945 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Joanne M. McDevitt and Michael W. Schreiner filed by University of Colorado at Boulder, by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 2/6/06. (Text Only Entry - No Document Attached) (rebsec, )
February 6, 2006 Filing 945 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Joanne M. McDevitt and Michael W. Schreiner by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Order Granting Unopposed Motion of Joanne M. McDevitt and MIchael W. Schreiner to Withdraw as Counsel for the Regents of the University of Colorado)(Schreiner, Michael)
February 3, 2006 Filing 944 RESPONSE to Motion re #938 MOTION to Seal Document Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Joint Motion to Compel Production of Disciplinary Records filed by Interested Party Denver Publishing Company. (Flink, Marc)
January 30, 2006 Filing 943 UNREDACTED REPLY to Response to Motion re #570 Pla's JOINT MOTION to Compel production of disciplinary records filed by Plaintiffs. [Public Entry for SEALED DOCUMENT #941 - Text Only Entry - No Document Attached].(dlb, )
January 30, 2006 Filing 942 REPLY to Response to Motion re #921 MOTION to Seal Denver Publishing Company's Objections to Marques Harris' Motion to File Under Seal Marques Harris' Response to Plaintiffs' Joint Motion to Compel Production of Disciplinary Records filed by Interested Party Marques Harris. (Attachments: #1 Continuation of Main Document)(Rubino, Louis)
January 30, 2006 Filing 941 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson. (Benezra, Seth)
January 30, 2006 Filing 940 REPLY to Response to Motion re #570 MOTION to Compel Production of Disciplinary Records filed by Plaintiffs Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson. (Benezra, Seth)
January 30, 2006 Filing 939 MEMORANDUM referring to Magistrate Judge 1/30/06 : #938 MOTION to Seal Document Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Joint Motion to Compel Production of Disciplinary Records filed by Jane Doe, Lisa Simpson, by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 1/30/06. (Text Only Entry - No Document Attached) (rebsec, )
January 30, 2006 Filing 938 MOTION to Seal Document Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Joint Motion to Compel Production of Disciplinary Records by Plaintiffs Jane Doe, Lisa Simpson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Benezra, Seth)
January 25, 2006 Filing 937 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re: #931 Sealed Document, 932 Response to Motion, 930 Response to Motion Addressed to Louis A. J. Rubino. (dlb, )
January 24, 2006 Filing 936 RESPONSE to Motion re #921 MOTION to Seal [Objection to #921 ] filed by Interested Party Denver Publishing Company. (Flink, Marc)
January 24, 2006 Filing 935 RESPONSE to Motion re #924 MOTION to Seal Unredacted Response to Plaintiffs' Joint Motion to Compel Production of Disciplinary Records [Objection to #924 ] filed by Interested Party Denver Publishing Company. (Flink, Marc)
January 19, 2006 Filing 934 RESPONSE to Motion re #852 Joint MOTION to Compel Production of Disciplinary Records filed by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B)(Pozner, Larry)
January 19, 2006 Filing 933 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw Document re #916 AMENDED #865 Sealed Document Redacted Supplement to Their #688 Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment or for Relief From Judgment in Light of Production of Documents Pursuant to the Court's September 21, 2005 Order by Plaintiffs Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Document Granting Motion to Withdraw and Substitute#2 Exhibit A - Substituted Redacted Supplement)(Hult, Kimberly) (Modified on 1/19/2006 to add linkage) (dlb, ).
January 19, 2006 Filing 929 Docket Annotation re: #928 RESPONSE to Motion to Compel Disciplinary Records by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder filed in error - to be refiled by counsel. Text only entry - no document attached. (dlb, )
January 18, 2006 Filing 932 RESPONSE to Motion re #852 Joint MOTION to Compel Production of Disciplinary Records by Plaintiffs filed by Interested Party Marques Harris. [Public Entry for SEALED DOCUMENT #931 - Text Only Entry - No Document Attached]. (dlb, )
January 18, 2006 Filing 931 SEALED DOCUMENT by Interested Party Marques Harris. (dlb, )
January 18, 2006 Filing 930 RESPONSE to Motion re #852 Joint MOTION to Compel Production of Disciplinary Records by Plaintiffs filed by Interested Party Colt Brennan. [Public Entry for SEALED DOCUMENT #927 - Text Only Entry - No Document Attached]. (dlb, )
January 18, 2006 Filing 928 RESPONSE to Motion to Compel Disciplinary Records by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B)(Pozner, Larry)
January 18, 2006 Filing 927 SEALED DOCUMENT by Interested Party Colt Brennan. (Lewis, Forrest)
January 18, 2006 Filing 926 MEMORANDUM referring to Magistrate Judge Shaffer : #924 MOTION to Seal Unredacted Response to Plaintiffs' Joint Motion to Compel Production of Disciplinary Records filed by Colt Brennan, by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 1/18/06. (Text Only Entry - No Document Attached) (rebsec, )
January 18, 2006 Filing 925 SEALED DOCUMENT. (dlb, )
January 18, 2006 Filing 924 MOTION to Seal Unredacted Response to Plaintiffs' Joint Motion to Compel Production of Disciplinary Records by Interested Party Colt Brennan. (Lewis, Forrest)
January 18, 2006 Filing 923 RESPONSE to Motion re 687 MOTION to Alter Judgment (Amended Redacted Version) filed by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder. (Pozner, Larry)
January 18, 2006 Filing 922 MEMORANDUM referring to Magistrate Judge Shaffer : #921 MOTION to Seal filed by Marques Harris, by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 1/18/06. (Text Only Entry - No Document Attached) (rebsec, )
January 18, 2006 Filing 921 MOTION to Seal Response to Plaintiffs' Joint Motion to Compel Production of Disciplinary records file. [Public Entry for SEALED DOCUMENT #925 - Text Only Entry - No Document Attached]. (dlb, ) (Modified on 1/18/2006 to SEAL PDF file) (dlb, ).
January 13, 2006 Filing 920 AMENDED #772 Objections,, Redacted Version of Plaintiffs' Objections to Portions of #758 July 1, 2005 Memorandum Order Regarding #545 Plaintiffs' Joint Motion for Sanctions for Defendant's Concealment of Football Recruiting Sexual Harassment and Plaintiffs' Joint Motion to Compel by Plaintiffs Jane Doe, Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson. (Hult, Kimberly)
January 13, 2006 Filing 919 AMENDED 687 MOTION to Alter Judgment - REDACTED by Plaintiffs Jane Doe, Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Supplemental Response in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment (w/o Exhibits))(Hult, Kimberly)
January 13, 2006 Filing 918 AMENDED #699 Reply to Response to Motion for Sanctions and to Compel - REDACTED by Plaintiffs Jane Doe, Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 4/8/04 Daily Camera article#2 Exhibit B - 4/21/05 Silver and Gold article#3 Exhibit C - 2001 Sports Medicine Student Intern Handbook Excerpts#4 Exhibit G - NCAA Guideline 01-06)(Hult, Kimberly)
January 13, 2006 Filing 917 AMENDED #805 Supplement/Amendment, to Their Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment or for Relief From Judgment and Request for Additional Discovery in Light of the Court's July 1, 2005 Order by Plaintiffs Jane Doe, Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson. (Hult, Kimberly)
January 13, 2006 Filing 916 AMENDED #865 Sealed Document Redacted Supplement to Their #688 Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment or for Relief From Judgment in Light of Production of Documents Pursuant to the Court's September 21, 2005 Order by Plaintiffs Jane Doe, Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson. (Hult, Kimberly)
January 13, 2006 Filing 915 AMENDED #869 Supplement/Amendment,, to Their Unredacted Joint Reply #798 to Defendant's Response #778 to the Court's July 1, 2005 Show Cause Order #758 by Plaintiffs Jane Doe, Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson. (Hult, Kimberly)
January 13, 2006 Filing 914 AMENDED Redacted Copy of Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of the Supplement #865 to Their #688 Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment or for Relief From Judgment and Request for Additional Discovery in Light of Documents Produced Pursuant to the Court's September 21, 2005 Order by Plaintiffs Jane Doe, Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Filed Under Seal Designation#2 Exhibit B - Filed Under Seal Designation)(Hult, Kimberly)
January 12, 2006 Filing 913 CERTIFICATE of Mailing/Service re #903 Order, by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder. (Pozner, Larry)
January 9, 2006 Filing 912 Docket Annotation: #802 Pla's Joint Request (MOTION) for Ruling that certain notes withheld by dft from its 7/15/05 production be produced forthwith. [Modified on 1/9/2006 to attach PDF pursuant to minute order UNSEALING document]. #910 UNREDACTED VERSION OF PLAS' JOINT REPLY to #778 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. [Entry UNSEALED pursuant to Order dated 1/9/06]. #911 UNREDACTED RESPONSE to #881 UNREDACTED COPY OF PLA'S SUPPLEMENT 799 JOINT REPLY to #778 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder [Entry UNSEALED pursuant to order dated 1/9/06]. Text only entry - no document attached. (dlb, )
January 9, 2006 Filing 911 UNREDACTED RESPONSE to #881 UNREDACTED COPY OF PLA'S SUPPLEMENT 799 JOINT REPLY to #778 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B) (UNSEALED pursuant to order dated 1/9/06)(dlb, )
January 9, 2006 Filing 910 UNREDACTED VERSION OF PLAS' JOINT REPLY to #778 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (UNSEALED pursuant to Order dated 1/9/06)(dlb, )
January 9, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 909 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER REGARDING MOTIONS TO SEAL: #796 MOTION to Seal Document Unredacted Copy of Plaintiffs' Joint Reply to Defendant's Response #778 to Court's July 1, 2005 Show Cause Order #758 by Plaintiffs is denied. The Clerk of the Court is directed to UNSEAL the Unredacted Version of Plaintiff?s Joint Reply to Defendant's Response to the Court?s 7/1/05 Show Cause Order (Document #798). #800 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document Plaintiffs' Joint Request for Ruling that Certain Notes withheld by Defendant from Its July 15, 2005, Production be Produced Forthwith by Plaintiffs is granted in part and denied in part. The Clerk of the Court is directed to UNSEAL the text of Plaintiffs' Joint Request for Ruling that Certain Notes Withheld by dft from its 7/15/05 Production be Produced Forthwith (Document #801). The Clerk of the Court is directed to SEAL Exhibits B and C attached. #880 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Unredacted Response to Plaintiffs' Supplement by Defendant is denied. The Clerk of the Court is directed to UNSEAL the University of Colorado's Response to Plaintiffs' Supplement to Their Joint Reply to Dft's Response to the 7/1/05 Show Cause Order (Document #881). Signed by Magistrate Judge Craig B Shaffer on 1/9/06. (dlb, )
January 6, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 908 MINUTE ORDER: #795 MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Defendant's Response #778 to the Court's July 1, 2005 Show Cause Order #758 by Plaintiffs; #821 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply (File Response to Plaintiffs' Joint Reply) re: #765 REPLY to Response to Motion re 743 MOTION for Review of Bill of Costs Award filed by Defendant; #879 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Response to Plaintiffs' Supplement by Defendants are granted by Magistrate Judge Craig B Shaffer on 1/6/06. (dlb, )
January 6, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 907 MEMORANDUM referring to Magistrate Judge Shaffer : #821 MOTION for Leave to File Response to Plaintiffs' Joint Reply to Defendant's Response to the Court's July 1, 2005 Show Cause Order filed by University of Colorado at Boulder, #879 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Response to Plaintiffs' Supplement filed by University of Colorado at Boulder, #880 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Unredacted Response to Plaintiffs' Supplement filed by University of Colorado at Boulder, #796 MOTION to Seal Document Unredacted Copy of Plaintiffs' Joint Reply to Defendant's Response #778 to Court's July 1, 2005 Show Cause Order #758 filed by Lisa Simpson, Anne Gilmore, #800 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Leave to file Under Seal Plaintiffs' Joint Request for Ruling that Certain Notes withheld by Defendant from Its July 15, 2005, Production be Produced filed by Lisa Simpson, Anne Gilmore, #802 MOTION for Ruling on #801 Sealed Document filed by Lisa Simpson, Anne Gilmore, #795 MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Defendant's Response #778 to the Court's July 1, 2005 Show Cause Order #758 filed by Lisa Simpson, Anne Gilmore, by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 1/6/06. (Text Only Entry - No Document Attached) (rebsec, )
January 6, 2006 Filing 906 RESPONSE to #887 UNREDACTED RESPONSE to 871 UNREDACTED COPY OF PLA'S SUPPLEMENT 799 JOINT REPLY to #778 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder, [Document UNSEALED pursuant to order dated 1/6/06, #905]. (dlb, )
January 6, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 905 ORDER REGARDING PENDING MOTIONS TO SEAL: 568 Plaintiff Gilmore's MOTION for leave to file under Seal Motions in Limine #1 through #8 is granted. 649 MOTION to Seal Defendants' SUPPLEMENT to 534 470 Plas' Joint MOTION for Protective Order that the deposition of John Grefe not be had by Plaintiffs is granted. 695 Unopposed MOTION to file under Seal Dft's RESPONSE to Pla's JOINT MOTION for Sanctions and MOTION to Compel production of documents by Defendant is granted. 708 MOTION to Seal Exhibits 1 - 6 to Dft's TENDERED Bill of Costs to 670 Clerk's Judgment by Defendant is granted. 729 MOTION to Seal Certificate of Attempted Compliance with Local Rule 54.1 and Dft's Notice of AMENDMENT (AMENDED DOCUMENT) to 707 TENDERED Bill by Defendant is granted. 735 Pla's Unopposed MOTION for leave to Seal Exhibits G, M and N to 687 Pla's REPLY in support of 687 REDACTED MOTION to Alter or Amend Judgment or for Relief from Judgment by Plaintiffs is granted. 745 MOTION to file under Seal Exhibits to 743 MOTION for Review of Bill of Costs Award by Defendant is granted. (SEALED DOCUMENT #748) #770 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Unredacted Copy of Plaintiffs' Objections to Portions of #758 July 1, 2005 Memorandum Order and Exhibits A and H Thereto by Plaintiffs is granted SUBJECT to the following condition: within 10 days of this order, plas are directed to file an Amended Redacted Objections to portions of 7/1/05. #784 Amended MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Unredacted Version of Plaintiffs' Joint Request for Ruling Ordering Production of Police Interview of Student-Trainer B Maintained in Defendant's Office of Sexual Harassment File by Plaintiffs is granted. #839 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Exhibits A and B to Motion to Stay for One Week Ruling on Order to Show Cause by Plaintiffs is granted. #843 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document Exhibits A and B to Motion to Stay for One Week Determination of Plaintiffs' Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment or for Relief From Judgment #688 by Plaintiffs is granted. 689 MOTION to Seal UNREDACTED MOTION to Alter or Amend Judgment or for Relief from Judgment and Exhibits A-H Thereto by Plaintiffs is granted SUBJECT to the following condition: within 10 days of this order, plas are directed to file an Amended Redacted Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment. As for Exhibits A-H to plas? original Redacted Motion, some of the redactions are unnecessary. Plas Amended Redacted Motion MUST include an Exhibit A that is UNREDACTED save for the attachments thereto. I find all other exhibits were properly redacted. 700 Unopposed MOTION for leave to file under Seal Pla's Joint REPLY to #545 JOINT MOTION for Sanctions by Plaintiffs and #637 MOTION to Compel production of documents by Plaintiffs is granted. 714 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Exhibits A, B, C, E and F to 712 REDACTED RESPONSE to 687 REDACTED MOTION to Alter or Amend Judgment or for Relief from Judgment by Plaintiffs filed by Defendant is granted. #804 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document Unredacted Copy of Plaintiffs' Supplement to Their #688 Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment or for Relief From Judgment and Request for Additional Discovery in Light of the Court's July 1, 2005 Order and Exhibits A, C, D, and G Thereto by Plaintiffs is granted. #864 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document Plaintiffs' Supplement to Their [688 ] Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment or for Relief From Judgment in Light of Production of Documents Pursuant to Court's September 21, 2005 Order by Plaintiffs is granted. #867 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document Unredacted Copy of Plaintiffs' Supplement to Their #797 Joint Reply to #778 Defendant's Response to #758 Court's July 1, 2005 Show Cause Order and Exhibits A through D Thereto by Plaintiffs is granted. #886 MOTION to Seal Unredacted Response to Plaintiffs' Supplement to Alter/Amend by Defendant is denied. The Clerk of the Court is directed to UNSEAL Dft's Unredacted Response to Pla's Supplement to their motion dated 10/27/05. #892 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document Unredacted Copy of Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of the Supplement #865 to Their #688 Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment or for Relief From Judgment and Request for Additional Discovery in Light of Documents Produced Pursuant to the Court's September 21, 2005 Order and Exhibits A and B Thereto by Plaintiffs is granted in part and portions do not require sealing. Within 10 days plas to file an amended Redacted Copy of Plas' Reply in support of the Supplement, #894. THE COURT FURTHER ORDERS that any future motions to seal filed describe materials or proceedings at issue, private or public interests, clearly define the injury that would result, why a less restrictive alternative relief is not available. Signed by Magistrate Judge Craig B Shaffer on 1/6/06. (dlb, ) Modified on 1/6/2006 (dlb, ).
January 4, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 904 MINUTE ORDER denying as moot #840 MOTION to Stay re #758 Memorandum & Opinion,, For One Week Ruling on Order to Show Cause by Plaintiffs by Magistrate Judge Craig B Shaffer on 1/4/06. (dlb, )
December 29, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 903 MINUTE ORDER Defendant or any interested non-parties must file a response to #852 Joint MOTION to Compel Production of Disciplinary Records filed by Lisa Simpson, Anne Gilmore no later than 1/18/06. Plaintiffs may reply 10 days thereafter. Defendant responsible for providing a copy of this minute order to counsel for Redacted Student One, Redacted Student Two and the 2 unnamed student athletes, signed by Magistrate Judge Craig B Shaffer on 12/29/05. (gms, )
December 29, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 902 Minute ORDER, granting Plaintiffs' #866 Motion for Leave to File Their Joint Reply to Defendants' Response to Court 7/1/05 Show Cause Order, denying as moot Plaintiff Simpson's #862 Motion to Stay Ruling on Order to Show Cause, by Magistrate Judge Craig B Shaffer on 12/29/05. (gms, )
December 20, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 901 ORDER: 643 MOTION to file Exhibit A to 641 Objections (APPEAL) OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court by University of Colorado at Boulder re 584 MEMORANDUM ORDER is granted. 690 MOTION for Order to release to the public the Snyder Deposition pursuant to the Magistrate Judge's 3/17/05 order by Interested Party is denied as moot. #755 MOTION to Clarify Order (Status) of Magistrate Judge's March 17, 2005 Order 584 by Interested Party is denied as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Craig B Shaffer on 12/20/05. (dlb, )
November 21, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 900 MINUTE ORDER granting #891 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw Stephen S. Dunham as Attorney for Defendant by Magistrate Judge Craig B Shaffer on 11/21/05. (dlb, )
November 16, 2005 Filing 899 REPLY to Response to Motion re #886 MOTION to Seal Unredacted Response to Plaintiffs' Supplement to Alter/Amend filed by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder. (Pozner, Larry)
November 8, 2005 Filing 898 RESPONSE to Motion re #892 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document Unredacted Copy of Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of the Supplement #865 to Their #688 Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment or for Relief From Judgment and Request for Additional Discovery in Light of Documents Pro Objections filed by Interested Party Denver Publishing Company. (Flink, Marc)
November 8, 2005 Filing 897 REPLY to Response to Motion re #880 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Unredacted Response to Plaintiffs' Supplement to Joint Reply re Show Cause Order filed by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder. (Pozner, Larry)
November 8, 2005 Filing 896 MEMORANDUM referring to Magistrate Judge Shaffer : #891 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by University of Colorado at Boulder, #892 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document Unredacted Copy of Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of the Supplement #865 to Their #688 Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment or for Relief From Judgment and Request for Additional Discovery in Light of Documents Pro filed by Lisa Simpson, Anne Gilmore, by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 11/8/05. (Text Only Entry - No Document Attached) (rebsec, )
November 7, 2005 Filing 895 UNREDACTED Copy of Pla's Reply (BRIEF) in Support of #688 UNREDACTED MOTION to Alter or Amend Judgment or for Relief from Judgment and Exhibits A-H and to 871 UNREDACTED COPY OF PLA'S SUPPLEMENT filed by Plaintiffs Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson. [Public Entry for SEALED DOCUMENT #893 - Text Only Entry - No Document Attached]. (dlb, ) (Modified on 11/8/2005 to add linkage to #871) (dlb, ).
November 7, 2005 Filing 894 REDACTED COPY of Pla's Reply (BRIEF) in Support 687 687 REDACTED MOTION to Alter or Amend Judgment or for Relief from Judgment and Exhibits A-H Thereto by Plaintiffs and #869 REDACTED COPY OF PLA'S SUPPLEMENT filed by Plaintiffs Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Filed Separately Under Seal#2 Exhibit B - Filed Separately Under Seal)(Hult, Kimberly) (Modified on 11/8/2005 to correct linkage) (dlb, ).
November 7, 2005 Filing 893 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Excerpts from Deposition of Stephen Willard#2 Exhibit B - 11/04/05 Letter and Enclosures from CU Counsel)(Hult, Kimberly)
November 7, 2005 Filing 892 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document Unredacted Copy of Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of the Supplement #865 to Their #688 Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment or for Relief From Judgment and Request for Additional Discovery in Light of Documents Produced Pursuant to the Court's September 21, 2005 Order and Exhibits A and B Thereto by Plaintiffs Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Granting Motion to Seal)(Hult, Kimberly)
November 3, 2005 Filing 891 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw Stephen S. Dunham as Attorney for Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Dunham, Stephen) Modified on 11/4/2005 to clarify entry)(dlb, ).
November 1, 2005 Filing 890 RESPONSE to Motion re #886 MOTION to Seal Unredacted Response to Plaintiffs' Supplement to Alter/Amend #688 filed by Interested Party Denver Publishing Company. (Flink, Marc)
October 27, 2005 Filing 889 MEMORANDUM referring to Magistrate Judge Shaffer : #886 MOTION to Seal Unredacted Response to Plaintiffs' Supplement to Alter/Amend by Defendant (Text Only Entry - No Document Attached) by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 10/27/05. (dlb, )
October 27, 2005 Filing 888 UNREDACTED RESPONSE to 871 UNREDACTED COPY OF PLA'S SUPPLEMENT 799 JOINT REPLY to #778 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder. [Public Entry for SEALED DOCUMENT #887 filed 10/27/05 - Text Only Entry - No Document Attached]. (dlb, )
October 27, 2005 Filing 887 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder. (Reilly, Daniel) (Modified on 1/6/2006 to UNSEAL document pursuant to order dated 1/6/06, #905 - redocketed See Document #906) (dlb, ).
October 27, 2005 Filing 886 MOTION to Seal Unredacted Response to Plaintiffs' Supplement to Alter/Amend by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Reilly, Daniel)
October 27, 2005 Filing 885 RESPONSE to #869 REDACTED COPY OF PLA'S SUPPLEMENT to 799 UNREDACTED VERSION OF PLAS' JOINT REPLY to 778 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder. [Public Entry for SEALED DOCUMENT #798 filed 8/3/05 by Plaintiffs by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder. (Reilly, Daniel) (Modified on 10/27/2005 to correct linkage) (dlb, ).
October 24, 2005 Filing 884 RESPONSE to Motion re #880 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Unredacted Response to Plaintiffs' Supplement filed by Interested Party Denver Publishing Company. (Flink, Marc)
October 18, 2005 Filing 883 UNREDACTED RESPONSE to #881 UNREDACTED COPY OF PLA'S SUPPLEMENT 799 JOINT REPLY to #778 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder. [Public Entry for SEALED DOCUMENT #870 filed 10/6/05 [Public entry for SEALED DOCUMENT #881 - Text Only Entry - No Document Attached]. (dlb, )
October 18, 2005 Filing 882 REDACTED RESPONSE to #869 REDACTED COPY OF PLA'S SUPPLEMENT to 799 UNREDACTED VERSION OF PLAS' JOINT REPLY to #778 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder. [Public Entry for SEALED DOCUMENT #798 filed 8/3/05 filed by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B)(Reilly, Daniel) Modified on 10/19/2005 (dlb, ).
October 18, 2005 Filing 881 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B)(Reilly, Daniel) (Modified on 1/9/2006 to indicate UNSEALED pursuant to minute order) (dlb, ).
October 18, 2005 Filing 880 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Unredacted Response to Plaintiffs' Supplement by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Reilly, Daniel)
October 18, 2005 Filing 879 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Response to Plaintiffs' Supplement by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Reilly, Daniel)
October 13, 2005 Filing 878 TRANSCRIPT of Telephone Discovery Conference held on October 3, 2005 before Judge Craig B. Shaffer. Prepared by: Avery/Woods. Pages: 1 - 13. (certified copy) Text Only Entry - Available in paper format at the Clerk's Office (dlb, )
October 12, 2005 Filing 877 RESPONSE to Motion re #864 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document Plaintiffs' Supplement to Their #688 Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment or for Relief From Judgment in Light of Production of Documents Pursuant to Court's September 21, 2005 Order filed by Interested Party Denver Publishing Company. (Flink, Marc)
October 12, 2005 Filing 876 RESPONSE to Motion re #867 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document Unredacted Copy of Plaintiffs' Supplement to Their #797 Joint Reply to #778 Defendant's Response to #758 Court's July 1, 2005 Show Cause Order and Exhibits A through D Thereto filed by Interested Party Denver Publishing Company. (Flink, Marc)
October 7, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 875 MINUTE ORDER #873 Order of 10/7/05 is withdrawn. Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Supplement to #688 Plaintiffs' Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment or for Relief from Judgment in Light of Production of Documents Pursuant to the Court's 9/21/05 Order [#863] is GRANTED and the Plaintiffs' Supplement to Their #688 Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment or for Relief From Judgment and Request for Additional Discovery in Light of the Court's Documents Produced Pursuant to the Court's 9/21/05 Order is ACCEPTED for filing. Defendants' response due 10/27/05, reply may be filed by 11/7/05. Signed by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 10/7/05. (gms, )
October 7, 2005 Filing 874 Docket Annotation re: #873 Order on Motion for Leave. This docket entry was modified to correct punctuation error. Text only entry - no document attached. (gms, )
October 7, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 873 Minute ORDER granting Plaintiff's #863 Motion for Leave to File Supplement to #688 Plaintiffs' Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment or for Relief from Judgment in Light of Production of Documents Pursuant to the Court's September 21, 2005 Order, by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 10/7/05. )(Withdrawn per minute order of 10/7/05) (gms, ) (Modified on 10/7/2005 to correct punctuation error (gms, ). (Modified on 10/7/2005 to indicate withdrawn) (gms, ).
October 6, 2005 Filing 872 PLA'S SUPPLEMENT to #688 UNREDACTED MOTION to Alter or Amend Judgment or for Relief from Judgment and Exhibits A-H Thereto by Plaintiffs. [Public entry for SEALED DOCUMENT #865 - Text Only Entry - No Document Attached.] (dlb, )
October 6, 2005 Filing 871 UNREDACTED COPY OF PLA'S SUPPLEMENT 799 JOINT REPLY to #778 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder. [Public Entry for SEALED DOCUMENT #870 filed 10/6/05 - Text Only Entry - No Document Attached]. (dlb, )
October 6, 2005 Filing 870 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A#2 Exhibit Exhibit B#3 Exhibit Exhibit C#4 Exhibit Exhibit D)(Hult, Kimberly)
October 6, 2005 Filing 869 REDACTED COPY OF PLA'S SUPPLEMENT to 799 UNREDACTED VERSION OF PLAS' JOINT REPLY to #778 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder. [Public Entry for SEALED DOCUMENT #798 filed 8/3/05 by Plaintiffs Jane Doe, Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A (Under Seal Notice)#2 Exhibit Exhibit B (Under Seal Notice)#3 Exhibit Exhibit C (Under Seal Notice)#4 Exhibit Exhibit D (Under Seal Notice)#5 Exhibit Exhibit E)(Hult, Kimberly) (Modified on 10/7/2005 to correct linkage and verbiage) (dlb, ).
October 6, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 868 MEMORANDUM referring to Magistrate Judge Shaffer : #867 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document Unredacted Copy of Plaintiffs' Supplement to Their #797 Joint Reply to #778 Defendant's Response to #758 Court's July 1, 2005 Show Cause Order and Exhibits A through D Thereto filed by Lisa Simpson, Anne Gilmore,, #862 MOTION to Stay Ruling on Order to Show Cause (Additional Three-Day Stay) filed by Lisa Simpson, #864 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document Plaintiffs' Supplement to Their #688 Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment or for Relief From Judgment in Light of Production of Documents Pursuant to Court's September 21, 2005 Order filed by Lisa Simpson, Anne Gilmore,, #866 MOTION for Leave to File Supplement to Their #797 Joint Reply to #778 Defendant's Response to #758 Court's July 1, 2005 Show Cause Order filed by Lisa Simpson, Anne Gilmore, by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 10/6/05.(Text Only Entry - No Document Attached) (rebsec, )
October 6, 2005 Filing 867 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document Unredacted Copy of Plaintiffs' Supplement to Their #797 Joint Reply to #778 Defendant's Response to #758 Court's July 1, 2005 Show Cause Order and Exhibits A through D Thereto by Plaintiffs Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Order Granting Motion to Seal Supplement to Reply to Show Cause Order)(Hult, Kimberly)
October 6, 2005 Filing 866 MOTION for Leave to File Supplement to Their #797 Joint Reply to #778 Defendant's Response to #758 Court's July 1, 2005 Show Cause Order by Plaintiffs Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Order Granting Motion for Leave to Supplement to Their Joint Reply to Show Cause Order)(Hult, Kimberly)
October 6, 2005 Filing 865 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A#2 Exhibit Exhibit B#3 Exhibit Exhibit C#4 Exhibit Exhibit D)(Hult, Kimberly)
October 6, 2005 Filing 864 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document Plaintiffs' Supplement to Their #688 Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment or for Relief From Judgment in Light of Production of Documents Pursuant to Court's September 21, 2005 Order by Plaintiffs Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Document Granting Motion to Seal Supplement to Motion to Alter or Amend)(Hult, Kimberly)
October 6, 2005 Filing 863 MOTION for Leave to File Supplement to #688 Plaintiffs' Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment or for Relief From Judgment in Light of Production of Documents Pursuant to the Court's September 21, 2005 Order by Plaintiffs Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Proposed Order Granting Motion for Leave to File Supplement to Motion to Alter or Amend)(Hult, Kimberly)
October 3, 2005 Filing 862 MOTION to Stay Ruling on Order to Show Cause (Additional Three-Day Stay) by Plaintiff Lisa Simpson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Proposed Order Granting Motion for Additional Three-Day Stay)(Hult, Kimberly)
October 3, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 861 ORDER granting #851 MOTION to Stay Determination of Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend or Alter Judgment or for Relief From Judgment #688 by Plaintiffs is granted. The court will allow pla an extension of three days to 10/6/05 pursuant to courtroom minutes by Magistrate Judge Craig B Shaffer on 10/3/05. [Text Only Order - No Document attached.] (dlb, )
October 3, 2005 Filing 860 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Craig B Shaffer : Telephonic Discovery Conference held on 10/3/2005. re #851 Amended MOTION to Stay re #845 MOTION to Stay Determination of Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend or Alter Judgment or for Relief From Judgment #688 by Plaintiffs is granted. The court will allow pla an extension of three days to 10/6/05.(Court Reporter FTR Reporter Deck - Ctrm A402.) (dlb, )
October 3, 2005 Filing 859 MEMORANDUM referring to Magistrate Judge Shaffer : #851 Amended MOTION to Stay re #845 MOTION to Stay Determination of Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend or Alter Judgment or for Relief From Judgment #688 filed by Lisa Simpson, Anne Gilmore, by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 10/3/05. (Text Only Entry - No Document Attached) (rebsec, )
September 29, 2005 Filing 858 TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing held on September 21, 2005 before Judge Craig B. Shaffer. Prepared by: Avery/Woods. Pages: 1 - 40. (certified copy) Text Only Entry - Available in paper format at the Clerk's Office (dlb, )
September 29, 2005 Filing 857 RESPONSE to Motion re #843 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document Exhibits A and B to Motion to Stay for One Week Determination of Plaintiffs' Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment or for Relief From Judgment #688 filed by Interested Party Denver Publishing Company. (Flink, Marc)
September 29, 2005 Filing 856 RESPONSE to Motion re #839 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Exhibits A and B to Motion to Stay for One Week Ruling on Order to Show Cause filed by Interested Party Denver Publishing Company. (Flink, Marc)
September 27, 2005 Filing 855 MEMORANDUM referring to Magistrate Judge Shaffer : #852 Joint MOTION to Compel Production of Disciplinary Records filed by Lisa Simpson, Anne Gilmore, by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 9/27/05. (Text Only Entry - No Document Attached) (rebsec, )
September 26, 2005 Filing 854 Exhibit re #851 Amended MOTION to Stay re #845 MOTION to Stay Determination of Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend or Alter Judgment or for Relief From Judgment #688 by Plaintiffs [Public Entry for SEALED DOCUMENT #847 - Text Only Entry - No Document Attached]. (dlb, )
September 26, 2005 Filing 853 Exhibit re #851 Amended MOTION to Stay re #845 MOTION to Stay Determination of Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend or Alter Judgment or for Relief From Judgment #688 by Plaintiffs. [Public Entry for SEALED DOCUMENT #848 - Text Only Entry - No Document Attached]. (dlb, )
September 26, 2005 Filing 852 Joint MOTION to Compel Production of Disciplinary Records by Plaintiffs Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C#4 Exhibit D#5 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Benezra, Seth)
September 26, 2005 Filing 851 Amended MOTION to Stay re #845 MOTION to Stay Determination of Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend or Alter Judgment or for Relief From Judgment #688 by Plaintiffs Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson. (Hult, Kimberly)
September 26, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 850 MEMORANDUM referring to Magistrate Judge Shaffer : #845 MOTION to Stay Determination of Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend or Alter Judgment or for Relief From Judgment #688 filed by Lisa Simpson, Anne Gilmore, #839 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Exhibits A and B to Motion to Stay for One Week Ruling on Order to Show Cause filed by Lisa Simpson, Anne Gilmore, #840 MOTION to Stay re #758 Memorandum & Opinion, For One Week Ruling on Order to Show Cause filed by Lisa Simpson, Anne Gilmore, #843 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document Exhibits A and B to Motion to Stay for One Week Determination of Plaintiffs' Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment or for Relief From Judgment #688 filed by Lisa Simpson, Anne Gilmore, by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 9/26/05. (Text Only Entry - No Document Attached)(rebsec, )
September 26, 2005 Filing 849 Exhibit B to plas' motion to stay re #758 MEMORANDUM ORDER by Plaintiffs Jane Doe, Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson. [Public Entry for SEALED DOCUMENT #842 - Text Only Entry - No Document Attached]. (dlb, )
September 26, 2005 Filing 848 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson. (Hult, Kimberly)
September 26, 2005 Filing 847 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson. (Hult, Kimberly)
September 26, 2005 Filing 846 Exhibit A to plas' motion to stay re: #758 MEMORANDUM ORDER by Plaintiffs Jane Doe, Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson. [Public Entry for SEALED DOCUMENT #841 - Text Only Entry - No Document Attached]. (dlb, )
September 26, 2005 Filing 845 MOTION to Stay Determination of Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend or Alter Judgment or for Relief From Judgment #688 by Plaintiffs Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A Under Seal Designation#2 Exhibit Exhibit B Under Seal Designation#3 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Proposed Order Granting Motion to Stay Determination)(Hult, Kimberly)
September 26, 2005 Filing 844 Docket Annotation re: 544 Supplemental RESPONSE and brief in opposition - Exhibits remain SEALED. The Supplemental Response itself is UNSEALED. 546 MOTION for leave to file supplemental response and brief in opposition to dft's mtn for sum jgm and to Seal by Plaintiffs is UNSEALED. 547 Unopposed MOTION for leave to file Joint motion for sanctions and to Seal by Plaintiffs is UNSEALED pursuant to courtroom minutes dated 9/21/05, #837. [Text only entry - no document attached]. (dlb, )
September 26, 2005 Filing 843 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document Exhibits A and B to Motion to Stay for One Week Determination of Plaintiffs' Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment or for Relief From Judgment #688 by Plaintiffs Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Proposed Order Granting Motion to Seal Exhibits)(Hult, Kimberly)
September 26, 2005 Filing 842 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson. (Hult, Kimberly)
September 26, 2005 Filing 841 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson. (Hult, Kimberly)
September 26, 2005 Filing 840 MOTION to Stay re #758 Memorandum & Opinion,, For One Week Ruling on Order to Show Cause by Plaintiffs Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A Under Seal Designation#2 Exhibit Exhibit B Under Seal Designation#3 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Proposed Order Granting Motion to Stay Ruling)(Hult, Kimberly)
September 26, 2005 Filing 839 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Exhibits A and B to Motion to Stay for One Week Ruling on Order to Show Cause by Plaintiffs Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Proposed Order Granting Motion to Seal)(Hult, Kimberly)
September 21, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 838 ORDER: #813 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw Document re 1. #812 Errata,,, #805 Supplement/Amendment,, #810 Errata,, Previously Filed Exhibit F to #805 Supplement, #810 Notice of Substitution, and #812 Second Notice of Substitution by Plaintiffs is granted. Exhibit F is withdrawn. Plas' notice of substitution is withdrawn. Plas' second notice of substitution is withdrawn AN UN-REDACTED EXHIBIT F in its entirety is substituted and filed UNDER SEAL. 671 Unopposed MOTION For Extension of Time to comply to 4/6/05 re: 653 On or before 4/1/05 counsel shall have determined if any of the pending motions could be withdrawn and will file written motions to withraw by Plaintiffs is denied as moot. #780 Request (MOTION) for Ruling on the production of interview... by Defendant is granted. The enforcement of this Order/Production is STAYED FIVE DAYS. #785 REDACTED VERSION of Plas' Joint Request (MOTION) for Ruling Ordering Production of Police Interview of Student-Trainer B Maintained in Defendant's Office of Sexual Harassment File by Plaintiffs [which is the redacted version of #786] is granted. The enforcement of this Order/Production is STAYED FIVE DAYS. The "Trainer-C Police Report" shall be produced under the same ruling as #780 and #785. 546 MOTION for leave to file supplemental response and brief in opposition to dft's mtn for sum jgm and to Seal by Plaintiffs Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson [*motion filed under seal, located in sealed area] is granted in part and denied in part. The Exhibits attached to the Supplemental Response shall remain SEALED the Supplemental Response itself (#544) SHALL BE UNSEALED. 547 Unopposed MOTION for leave to file Joint motion for sanctions and to Seal by Plaintiffs Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson [*motion filed under seal, located in sealed area] is granted. The underlying document #545 and all related exhibits SHALL BE SEALED. 548 MOTION to Seal two motions filed by Plaintiffs by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder is DENIED. Therefore the two motions #546 and #547 are NOT SEALED. 554 Unopposed MOTION for leave to file under Seal Pla's motion in limine for order precluding introduction of irrelevant evidence regarding Ms. Simpson's Childhood by Plaintiff is granted. #552 SHALL BE SEALED. 557 Unopposed MOTION for leave to file under Seal MOTION in Limine to preclude certain opinions of defense Psychiatrict Barkhorn by Plaintiff is granted. #556 SHALL BE SEALED. 581 MOTION for leave to file Plas' Joint Motion to Compel Production of Disciplinary records under Seal by Plaintiffs is granted in part and denied in part. #570 shall be redacted in such a way to protect privacy. The REDACTED VERSION #570 shall NOT BE SEALED. Pla shall submit a REDACTED version of #570 within FIVE DAYS of date. 589 Unopposed MOTION for leave to file under Seal TENDERED UNREDACTED COPY of Plas' MOTION for Order Directing Dft to Request the Release of Documents Provided to the Attorney General and Grand Jury and for Order Permitting Plaintiffs Access to Grand Jury Witness Transcripts by Plaintiffs is granted. The court will allow the dft to file UNDER SEAL the unredacted copy of the motion. 638 Unopposed MOTION for leave to file under Seal their joint MOTION to Compel production of documents by Plaintiffs is granted. #637 and exhibits SHALL BE SEALED. 640 Unopposed MOTION for leave to file under Seal Joint MOTION for Leave to supplement motion for sanctions by Plaintiffs is granted. #639 SHALL BE SEALED pursuant to courtroom minutes on 9/21/05 by Magistrate Judge Craig B Shaffer on 9/21/05. [Text Only Order - No Document Attached]. (dlb, )
September 21, 2005 Filing 837 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Craig B Shaffer : In Court Hearing held on 9/21/2005. (Court Reporter FTR Reporter Deck - Ctrm A402.) (dlb, )
September 21, 2005 Filing 836 NOTICE of Submission of REDACTED Deposition Transscript of Steven Snyder in Accordance with 584 MEMORANDUM ORDER dated 3/17/05 by Plaintiff Lisa Simpson (Attachments: #1 Continuation of Main Document Redacted Snyder Deposition (Part 2)#2 Continuation of Main Document Redacted Snyder Deposition (Part 3)#3 Continuation of Main Document Redacted Snyder Deposition (Part 4))(Hult, Kimberly) (Modified on 9/22/2005 to clarify entry) (dlb, ).
September 19, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 835 ORDER denying as overruled 641 Objections (APPEAL) OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court by University of Colorado at Boulder . Signed by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 9/19/05. (dlb, )
September 16, 2005 Filing 834 Docket Annotation re: 641 Objections (APPEAL) OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court by University of Colorado at Boulder was reactivated as pending pursuant to the 669 ORDER dated 3/31/05. [These two enteries were modified to to reactivate document #641 and edit the text of #669]. Text only entry - no document attached. (dlb, ) Modified on 9/30/2005 (dlb, ).
September 13, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 833 MINUTE ORDER granting #803 MOTION for Leave to File Supplement to #688 Plaintiffs' Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment or for Relief from Judgment in Light of Court's July 1, 2005 Order by Plaintiffs by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 9/13/05. (dlb, )
September 9, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 832 MINUTE ORDER resetting Motion Hearing set for 9/21/2005 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B Shaffer by Magistrate Judge Craig B Shaffer on 9/9/05. (dlb, )
September 8, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 831 MINUTE ORDER : In Court Hearing set for 9/14/2005 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B Shaffer by Magistrate Judge Craig B Shaffer on 9/8/05. (dlb, )
September 6, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 830 MINUTE ORDER granting #828 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Joint Reply to #826 The University of Colorado's Response to #805 Plaintiffs' Supplement to Their Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment or for Relief From Judgment and Request for Additional Discovery in Light of the Court's July 1, 2005 Order by Plaintiffs by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 9/6/05. (dlb, )
September 6, 2005 Filing 829 REPLY to Response to Motion re #826 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Response to Plaintiffs' Supplement to Their Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment Etc #805 filed by Plaintiffs Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson. (Hult, Kimberly)
September 6, 2005 Filing 828 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Joint Reply to #826 The University of Colorado's Response to #805 Plaintiffs' Supplement to Their Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment or for Relief From Judgment and Request for Additional Discovery in Light of the Court's July 1, 2005 Order by Plaintiffs Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson. (Hult, Kimberly)
August 31, 2005 Filing 827 Docket Annotation re: #758 Memorandum & Opinion was modified to add linkage of the Response, Reply and Response to Reply to the Order to Show Cause) Text only entry - no document attached. (lam, )
August 29, 2005 Filing 826 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Response to Plaintiffs' Supplement to Their Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment Etc #805 by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) #2 Proposed Document University's Response to Plaintiffs' Supplement to Their Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment Etc #805 #3 Exhibit A to University's Response)(Pozner, Larry)
August 26, 2005 Filing 825 NOTICE of Filing re #824 by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder (Pozner, Larry)
August 26, 2005 Filing 824 RESPONSE to #797 Reply to Defendant's Response to the Court's July 1, 2005 Show Cause Order by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B)(Pozner, Larry)
August 19, 2005 Filing 823 RESPONSE to Motion re #813 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw Document re #812 Errata,,, #805 Supplement/Amendment,, #810 Errata,, Previously Filed Exhibit F to #805 Supplement, #810 Notice of Substitution, and #812 Second Notice of Substitution filed by Interested Party Denver Publishing Company. (Flink, Marc)
August 19, 2005 Filing 822 MEMORANDUM referring to Magistrate Judge Shaffer : #821 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply (File Response to Plaintiffs' Joint Reply) re: #765 REPLY to Response to Motion re 743 MOTION for Review of Bill of Costs Award filed by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 8/19/05. (Text Only Entry - No Document Attached)(rebsec, ) (Modified on 8/19/2005 to clarify entry)(dlb, ).
August 18, 2005 Filing 821 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply (File Response to Plaintiffs' Joint Reply) re: #765 REPLY to Response to Motion re 743 MOTION for Review of Bill of Costs Award filed by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder. (Pozner, Larry) (Modified on 8/19/2005 to create linkage and clarify entry) (dlb, ).
August 16, 2005 Filing 820 NOTICE of Submission for "In Camera" Review Exhibits B and C to #819 Response to Motion (routed to Judge Blackburn's chambers) by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder (Pozner, Larry) (Modified on 8/17/2005 to clarify document location) (dlb, ). (Modified on 1/10/2006 to indicate documents routed to Judge Shaffer's chambers)(dlb, ).
August 16, 2005 Filing 819 RESPONSE to Motion re #802 MOTION for Ruling on #801 Sealed Document filed by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Pozner, Larry)
August 12, 2005 Filing 818 Exhibit F to #805 SUPPLEMENT to #688 MOTION to Alter Judgment or for Relief From Judgment and Request for Additional Discovery in Light of the Court's July 1, 2005 Order by Plaintiffs and #814 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs. [Public Entry for SEALED DOCUMENT - Text Only Entry - No Document Attached]. (dlb, )
August 12, 2005 Filing 817 RESPONSE to Motion re #796 MOTION to Seal Document Unredacted Copy of Plaintiffs' Joint Reply to Defendant's Response #778 to Court's July 1, 2005 Show Cause Order #758 , #800 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Leave to file Under Seal Plaintiffs' Joint Request for Ruling that Certain Notes withheld by Defendant from Its July 15, 2005, Production be Produced filed by Interested Party Denver Publishing Company. (Flink, Marc)
August 12, 2005 Filing 816 MEMORANDUM referring to Magistrate Judge Shaffer : #813 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw Document re #812 Errata, #805 Supplement/Amendment, #810 Errata, Previously Filed Exhibit F to #805 Supplement, #810 Notice of Substitution, and #812 Second Notice of Substitution filed by Lisa Simpson, Anne Gilmore, by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 8/12/05. (Text Only Entry - No Document Attached)(rebsec, )
August 12, 2005 Filing 815 RESPONSE to Motion re #804 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document Unredacted Copy of Plaintiffs' Supplement to Their #688 Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment or for Relief From Judgment and Request for Additional Discovery in Light of the Court's July 1, 2005 Order and Exh filed by Interested Party Denver Publishing Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit American Friends decision)(Flink, Marc)
August 12, 2005 Filing 814 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson. (Hult, Kimberly)
August 12, 2005 Filing 813 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw Document re #812 Errata,,, #805 Supplement/Amendment,, #810 Errata,, Previously Filed Exhibit F to #805 Supplement, #810 Notice of Substitution, and #812 Second Notice of Substitution by Plaintiffs Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Hult, Kimberly)
August 11, 2005 Filing 812 ERRATA re #805 Supplement/Amendment,, #810 Errata,, Second Notice of Substitition Regarding Exhibit F to Redacted Copy of Plaintiffs' Supplement to Their #688 Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment or for Relief from Judgment and Request for Additional Discovery in Light of the Court's July 1, 2005 Order by Plaintiffs Jane Doe, Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit F to #805 Redacted Copy of Plaintiffs' Supplement to Their Motiont o Alter or Amend Judgment or for Relief From Judgment and Request for Additional Discovery in Light of the Court's July 1, 2005 Order)(Hult, Kimberly)
August 11, 2005 Filing 811 OBJECTIONS to Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion #803 by Interested Party Denver Publishing Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Flink, Marc)
August 11, 2005 Filing 810 ERRATA re #805 Supplement/Amendment, Notice of Substitution Regarding Exhibit F to Redacted Copy of Plaintiffs' Supplement to Their #688 Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment or for Relief from Judgment and Request for Additional Discovery in Light of the Court's July 1, 2005 Order by Plaintiffs Jane Doe, Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit F to Redacted Copy of Plaintiffs' Supplement to Their #688 Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment or for Relief from Judgment and Request for Additional Discovery in Light of the Court's July 1, 2005 Order)(Hult, Kimberly)
August 10, 2005 Filing 809 OBJECTIONS to #796 MOTION to Seal Document Unredacted Copy of Plaintiffs' Joint Reply to Defendant's Response #778 to Court's July 1, 2005 Show Cause Order #758 , #800 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Leave to file Under Seal Plaintiffs' Joint Request for Ruling that Certain Notes withheld by Defendant from Its July 15, 2005, Production be Produced by Interested Party Denver Publishing Company. (Flink, Marc)
August 9, 2005 Filing 808 UNREDACTED COPY OF PLA'S SUPPLEMENT to 687 and #688 REDACTED MOTION to Alter or Amend Judgment or for Relief from Judgment and Exhibits A-H Thereto by Plaintiffs [Public Entry for SEALED DOCUMENT #806 filed 8/9/05 - Text Only Entry - No Document Attached] (dlb, ) (Modified on 8/15/2005 to add Public Entry)(dlb, ).
August 9, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 807 MEMORANDUM referring to Magistrate Judge Shaffer : #804 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document Unredacted Copy of Plaintiffs' Supplement to Their #688 Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment or for Relief From Judgment and Request for Additional Discovery in Light of the Court's July 1, 2005 Order and Exh filed by Lisa Simpson, Anne Gilmore, by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 8/9/05. (Text Only Entry - No Document Attached)(rebsec, )
August 9, 2005 Filing 806 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A#2 Exhibit Exhibit C#3 Exhibit Exhibit D - Part 1#4 Exhibit Exhibit D - Part 2#5 Exhibit Exhibit D - Part 3#6 Exhibit Exhibit D - Part 4#7 Exhibit Exhibit G)(Hult, Kimberly)
August 9, 2005 Filing 805 SUPPLEMENT/AMENDMENT to #688 MOTION to Alter Judgment or for Relief From Judgment and Request for Additional Discovery in Light of the Court's July 1, 2005 Order by Plaintiffs Jane Doe, Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A#2 Exhibit Exhibit B#3 Exhibit Exhibit C#4 Exhibit Exhibit D#5 Exhibit Exhibit E#6 Exhibit Exhibit F#7 Exhibit Exhibit G)(Hult, Kimberly)
August 9, 2005 Filing 804 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document Unredacted Copy of Plaintiffs' Supplement to Their #688 Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment or for Relief From Judgment and Request for Additional Discovery in Light of the Court's July 1, 2005 Order and Exhibits A, C, D, and G Thereto by Plaintiffs Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Proposed Order)(Hult, Kimberly)
August 9, 2005 Filing 803 MOTION for Leave to File Supplement to #688 Plaintiffs' Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment or for Relief from Judgment in Light of Court's July 1, 2005 Order by Plaintiffs Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Proposed Order)(Hult, Kimberly)
August 4, 2005 Filing 802 Pla's Joint Request (MOTION) for Ruling that certain notes withheld by dft from its 7/15/05 production be produced forthwith. (dlb, ) Main Document and Exhibit A attached on 1/9/2006 (dlb, ). (Modified on 1/9/2006 to attach PDF pursuant to minute order UNSEALING document)(dlb, ).
August 4, 2005 Filing 801 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Joint Request#2 Exhibit B to Joint Request#3 Exhibit C to Joint Request)(Hult, Kimberly) (Modified on 1/9/2006 to indicate Main Document and Exhibit A UNSEALED, Exhibit B and C to remain SEALED pursuant to minute order dated 1/9/06). (dlb, ).
August 4, 2005 Filing 800 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document Plaintiffs' Joint Request for Ruling that Certain Notes withheld by Defendant from Its July 15, 2005, Production be Produced Forthwith by Plaintiffs Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Proposed Order)(Hult, Kimberly) (Modified on 8/5/2005 to correct verbiage) (dlb, ).
August 3, 2005 Filing 799 UNREDACTED VERSION OF PLAS' JOINT REPLY to #778 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder. [Public Entry for SEALED DOCUMENT #798 filed 8/3/05 - Text Only Entry - No Document Attached.] (dlb, )
August 3, 2005 Filing 798 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Hult, Kimberly) (Modified on 1/9/2006 to indicate UNSEALED pursuant to minute order) (dlb, ).
August 3, 2005 Filing 797 REPLY to #778 Response to Order to Show Cause by Plaintiffs Jane Doe, Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A#2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Hult, Kimberly)
August 3, 2005 Filing 796 MOTION to Seal Document Unredacted Copy of Plaintiffs' Joint Reply to Defendant's Response #778 to Court's July 1, 2005 Show Cause Order #758 by Plaintiffs Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Proposed Order)(Hult, Kimberly)
August 3, 2005 Filing 795 MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Defendant's Response #778 to the Court's July 1, 2005 Show Cause Order #758 by Plaintiffs Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Proposed Order)(Hult, Kimberly)
August 3, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 794 MINUTE ORDER STRIKING #792 AMENDED Certificate of Service Regarding August 1, 2005 Filings by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 8/3/05. (dlb, )
August 2, 2005 Filing 793 AMENDED Certificate of Service Regarding August 1, 2005 Filings [790, 791] by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder. (Pozner, Larry)
August 2, 2005 Filing 792 AMENDED Certificate of Service Regarding August 1, 2005 Filings [790, 791] by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder. (Pozner, Larry)
August 1, 2005 Filing 791 RESPONSE to Motion re 787 MOTION for Ruling Ordering Production of Police Interview of Student-Trainer B Maintained in Defendant's Office of Sexual Harassment File filed by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder. (Pozner, Larry)
August 1, 2005 Filing 790 RESPONSE to #772 REDACTED VERSION OF Plas' OBJECTIONS to Portions of 7/1/05 #758 MEMORANDUM ORDER: Regarding #545 Plaintiffs' Joint Motion for Sanctions for Defendant's Concealment of Football Recruiting Sexual Harassment and Plaintiffs' Joint Motion to Compel by Plaintiffs filed by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C)(Pozner, Larry) (Modified on 8/2/2005 to correct linkage) (dlb, ).
July 26, 2005 Filing 789 RESPONSE to Motion re #760 MOTION to Stay re #688 MOTION to Alter Judgment filed by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder. (Reilly, Daniel)
July 26, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 788 MEMORANDUM referring to Magistrate Judge Shaffer : #780 Request (MOTION) for Ruling on the production of interview... by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder; #784 Amended MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Unredacted Version of Plaintiffs' Joint Request for Ruling Ordering Production of Police Interview of Student-Trainer B Maintained in Defendant's Office of Sexual Harassment File by Plaintiffs; #785 REDACTED VERSION of Plas' Joint Request (MOTION) for Ruling Ordering Production of Police Interview of Student-Trainer B Maintained in Defendant's Office of Sexual Harassment File by Plaintiffs (Text Only Entry - No Document Attached) by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 7/26/05. (dlb, )
July 25, 2005 Filing 787 UNREDACTED VERSION of Plas' Joint Request (MOTION) for Ruling Ordering production of police interview of Student-Trainer B maintained in Dft's office of sexual harassment file by Plaintiffs [Public Entry for SEALED DOCUMENT #786 filed 7/25/05 - Text Only Entry - No Document Attached] (dlb, )
July 25, 2005 Filing 786 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson. (Hult, Kimberly)
July 25, 2005 Filing 785 REDACTED VERSION of Plas' Joint Request (MOTION) for Ruling Ordering Production of Police Interview of Student-Trainer B Maintained in Defendant's Office of Sexual Harassment File by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Hult, Kimberly) (Modified on 7/26/2005 to clarify entry) (dlb, ).
July 25, 2005 Filing 784 Amended MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Unredacted Version of Plaintiffs' Joint Request for Ruling Ordering Production of Police Interview of Student-Trainer B Maintained in Defendant's Office of Sexual Harassment File by Plaintiffs Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Proposed Order)(Hult, Kimberly)
July 25, 2005 Filing 783 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Unredacted Version of Plaintiffs' Joint Request for Ruling Ordering Production of Police Inteview of Student-Trainer B Maintained in Defendant's Office of Sexual Harassment File by Plaintiffs Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson. (Hult, Kimberly)
July 25, 2005 Filing 782 Pla's Reply (RESPONSE) in opposition to Denver Publishing Company's Objections (RESPONSE) to #770 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Unredacted Copy of Plaintiffs' Objections to Portions of #758 July 1, 2005 Memorandum Order and Exhibits A and H Thereto filed by Interested Party Denver Publishing Company filed by Plaintiff Lisa Simpson. (Hult, Kimberly) (Modified on 7/26/2005 to clarify entry) (dlb, ).
July 22, 2005 Filing 781 Denver Publishing Company's Objections (RESPONSE) to #770 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Unredacted Copy of Plaintiffs' Objections to Portions of #758 July 1, 2005 Memorandum Order and Exhibits A and H Thereto filed by Interested Party Denver Publishing Company. (Flink, Marc) (Modified on 7/26/2005 to clarify entry) (dlb, ).
July 21, 2005 Filing 780 Request (MOTION) for Ruling on the production of interview ... by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Pozner, Larry) (Modified on 7/22/2005 to clarify entry) (dlb, ).
July 20, 2005 Filing 779 RESPONSE to Motion re #755 MOTION to Clarify Status of Magistrate Judge's March 17, 2005 Order and to Release to the Public the Snyder Deposition filed by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder. (Pozner, Larry)
July 19, 2005 Filing 778 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Pozner, Larry)
July 19, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 777 MEMORANDUM referring to Magistrate Judge Shaffer : #770 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Unredacted Copy of Plaintiffs' Objections to Portions of #758 July 1, 2005 Memorandum Order and Exhibits A and H Thereto by Plaintiffs (Text Only Entry - No Document Attached) by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 7/19/05. (dlb, )
July 19, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 776 MEMORANDUM referring to Magistrate Judge Shaffer : #770 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Unredacted Copy of Plaintiffs' Objections to Portions of #758 July 1, 2005 Memorandum Order and Exhibits A and H Thereto by Plaintiffs filed by Lisa Simpson,, Anne Gilmore, (Text Only Entry - No Document Attached) by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 7/19/05. (dlb, )
July 19, 2005 Filing 775 Pla's NOTICE of Substitution regarding Exhibit A and the filing of Exhibit A to 773 UNREDACTED VERSIONS of Plas' OBJECTIONS to Portions of 7/1/05 #758 MEMORANDUM ORDER: #637 MOTION to Compel production of documents by Plaintiffs [Public Entry for Sealed Document #774 filed 7/19/05] (dlb, ) (Modified on 8/1/2005 to correct document number) (dlb, ).
July 19, 2005 Filing 774 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A (Filed Under Seal))(Hult, Kimberly)
July 18, 2005 Filing 773 UNREDACTED VERSIONS of Plas' OBJECTIONS to Portions of 7/1/05 #758 MEMORANDUM ORDER: #637 MOTION to Compel production of documents by Plaintiffs [Public Entry for Sealed Document #771 filed 7/18/05] (dlb, )
July 18, 2005 Filing 772 REDACTED VERSION OF Plas' OBJECTIONS to Portions of 7/1/05 #758 MEMORANDUM ORDER: Regarding #545 Plaintiffs' Joint Motion for Sanctions for Defendant's Concealment of Football Recruiting Sexual Harassment and Plaintiffs' Joint Motion to Compel by Plaintiffs . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C#4 Exhibit D#5 Exhibit E#6 Exhibit F#7 Exhibit G (Part 1)#8 Exhibit G (Part 2)#9 Exhibit G (Part 3)#10 Exhibit H)(Hult, Kimberly) (Modified on 7/19/2005 to clarify entry)(dlb, ).
July 18, 2005 Filing 771 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A (Filed Under Seal)#2 Exhibit Exhibit H (Filed Under Seal))(Hult, Kimberly)
July 18, 2005 Filing 770 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Unredacted Copy of Plaintiffs' Objections to Portions of #758 July 1, 2005 Memorandum Order and Exhibits A and H Thereto by Plaintiffs Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Order Granting Motion for Leave to File Under Seal)(Hult, Kimberly)
July 14, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 769 MINUTE ORDER granting to 7/19/05 #767 MOTION For Extension of Time to Respond to Show Cause Order by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder by Magistrate Judge Craig B Shaffer on 7/14/05. (dlb, )
July 14, 2005 Filing 768 RESPONSE to Motion re #767 MOTION For Extension of Time to Respond to Show Cause Order filed by Plaintiffs Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson. (Hult, Kimberly)
July 14, 2005 Filing 767 MOTION For Extension of Time to Respond to Show Cause Order by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder. (Pozner, Larry)
July 13, 2005 Filing 766 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Craig B Shaffer : Telephonic Discovery Hearing held on 7/13/2005 (Court Reporter FTR Reporter Deck - Ctrm A402.) (dlb, )
July 13, 2005 Filing 765 REPLY to Response to Motion re 743 MOTION for Review of Bill of Costs Award filed by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder. (Pozner, Larry)
July 12, 2005 Filing 764 TRANSCRIPT of Telephonic Discovery Dispute Conference held on March 24, 2005 before Judge Craig B. Shaffer. Prepared by: Avery/Woods. Pages: 1 - 17. (certified copy) Text Only Entry - Available in paper format at the Clerk's Office (dlb, )
July 12, 2005 Filing 763 TRANSCRIPT of Telephonic Conference held on June 2, 2005 before Judge Craig B. Shaffer. Prepared by: Avery/Woods. Pages: 1 - 13. (certified copy) Text Only Entry - Available in paper format at the Clerk's Office (dlb, )
July 8, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 762 ORDER granting #761 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify #749 Brief in Opposition to Motion,,,, Exhibit J to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motin for Review of Bill of Costs Filed on June 27, 2005 by Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 7/8/05. (dlb, )
July 7, 2005 Filing 761 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify #749 Brief in Opposition to Motion,,,, Exhibit J to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motin for Review of Bill of Costs Filed on June 27, 2005 by Plaintiffs Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit J to Plaintiffs' Third Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Corrected Exhibit J to Plaintiffs' Oppositin to Defendant's Motion for Review of Bill of Costs Filed on June 27, 2005#2 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Granting Plaintiffs' Third Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Corrected Exhibit J to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Review of Bill of Costs)(Benezra, Seth)
July 6, 2005 Filing 760 MOTION to Stay re #688 REDACTED MOTION to Alter Judgment by Plaintiffs Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Plaintiff's Proposed Order)(Hult, Kimberly) (Modified on 1/4/2006 to correct linkage) (dlb, ).
July 1, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 759 MEMORANDUM referring to Magistrate Judge Shaffer : #755 MOTION to Clarify Status of Magistrate Judge's March 17, 2005 Order by Interested Party Denver Publishing Company (Text Only Entry - No Document Attached) by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 7/1/05. (dlb, )
July 1, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 758 MEMORANDUM ORDER: #637 MOTION to Compel production of documents by Plaintiffs Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson is granted in part and denied in part as specified. #545 JOINT MOTION for Sanctions by Plaintiffs Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson is denied. 717 MOTION to Supplement record regarding plas' joint motion to compel and joint motion for sanctions by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder is granted. Defendant and its counsel shall within fourteen days from date show cause in writing why they should not be subject to sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Craig B Shaffer on 7/1/05. (dlb, ) (Modified on 8/31/2005 to add linkage to OSC of response #778 , reply #797 and response to reply #824 ) (lam, ).
July 1, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 757 MINUTE ORDER denying for failure to comply #756 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify Exhibit J to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Review of Bill of Costs filed on June 27, 2005 by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 7/1/05. (dlb, )
July 1, 2005 Filing 756 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify Exhibit J to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Review of Bill of Costs filed on June 27, 2005 by Plaintiffs Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit J to Plaintiffs' Second Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Corrected Exhibit J to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Review of Bill of Costs#2 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Granting Plaintiffs' Second Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Corrected Exhibit J to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Review of Bill of Costs)(Benezra, Seth)
July 1, 2005 Filing 755 MOTION to Clarify Order (Status) of Magistrate Judge's March 17, 2005 Order 584 by Interested Party Denver Publishing Company. (Pergament, Benjamin) (Modified on 7/8/2005 to correct linkage) (dlb, ).
July 1, 2005 Filing 754 RESPONSE to Motion re 745 MOTION to Seal filed by Interested Party Denver Publishing Company. (Flink, Marc)
June 30, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 753 MINUTE ORDER denying for failure to comply with REB Civ. Practice Standard V.C.1 #752 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify #749 Brief in Opposition to Motion,,,, Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Corrected Exhibit J by Plaintiffs Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 6/30/05. (dlb, )
June 29, 2005 Filing 752 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify #749 Brief in Opposition to Motion,,,, Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Corrected Exhibit J by Plaintiffs Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit J to Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Corrected Exhibit J to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Review of Bill of Costs#2 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Benezra, Seth)
June 28, 2005 Filing 751 MEMORANDUM referring to Magistrate Judge Shaffer : 748 *SEALED* Unopposed MOTION to Seal Exhibit D and E to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Review of Bill of Costs by Plaintiffs (Text Only Entry - No Document Attached) by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 6/28/05. (dlbsl, )
June 28, 2005 Filing 750 MEMORANDUM TO FILE: (STATEMENT) entry #478 has been SEALED. (dlb, )
June 27, 2005 Filing 749 BRIEF in Opposition re 743 MOTION for Review filed by Plaintiffs Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Review of Bill of Costs#2 Exhibit B to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Review of Bill of Costs#3 Exhibit C to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Review of Bill of Costs#4 Exhibit F to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Review of Bill of Costs#5 Exhibit G to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Review of Bill of Costs#6 Exhibit H to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Review of Bill of Costs#7 Exhibit I to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Review of Bill of Costs#8 Exhibit J to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Review of Bill of Costs#9 Exhibit K to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Review of Bill of Costs)(Benezra, Seth)
June 17, 2005 Filing 747 Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder's RESPONSE to Denver Publishing Co.'s 746 Objections to Defendants Motion to File Under Seal Defendant's Motion for Review of Bill of Costs Award. (djs, )
June 9, 2005 Filing 746 Objections (RESPONSE) to 745 MOTION to file under Seal Exhibits to 743 MOTION for Review of Bill of Costs Award by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder filed by Interested Party Denver Publishing Company. (dlb, )
June 6, 2005 Filing 745 MOTION to file under Seal Exhibits to 743 MOTION for Review of Bill of Costs Award by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder. (dlb, )
June 6, 2005 Filing 744 Exhibits to 743 MOTION for Review of Bill of Costs Award by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder *filed under seal, located in sealed area. (dlb, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/11/2018: #1 Continuation of Main Document, #2 Continuation of Main Document Part 1 of 3, #3 Continuation of Main Document part 2 of 3, #4 Continuation of Main Document part 3 of 3, #5 Continuation of Main Document, #6 Continuation of Main Document) (evana, ). (Modified on 5/11/2018 to add the document to the original entry and to note that the document is no longer available in paper format in the Clerk's Office) (evana, ).
June 6, 2005 Filing 743 MOTION for Review of Bill of Costs Award by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder. (dlb, )
June 2, 2005 Filing 742 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Craig B Shaffer : Telephonic Status Conference held on 6/2/2005 (Court Reporter FTR - Reporter Deck - Ctrm A402.) (dlb, )
May 27, 2005 Filing 741 Costs Taxed in amount of $ $24,682.69 against Plaintiffs (dlb, )
May 26, 2005 Filing 740 Dfts' Unopposed Addendum (SUPPLEMENT) to TENDERED Bill of Costs regarding copying costs to 670 Clerk's Judgment, by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder. (dlb, )
May 26, 2005 Filing 739 Dft's Response (REPLY) to Denver Publishing's Objection (Response) to 729 MOTION to File under Seal Exhibit 5 re: Certificate of Attempted Compliance with Local Rule 54.1 and Dft's Notice of AMENDMENT (AMENDED DOCUMENT) to 707 TENDERED Bill of Costs (Dkt. No. 732) by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder.(dlb, )
May 25, 2005 Filing 738 Objections (RESPONSE) to 735 Pla's Unopposed MOTION for leave to Seal Exhibits G, M and N to 687 Pla's REPLY in support of 687 REDACTED MOTION to Alter or Amend Judgment or for Relief from Judgment by Plaintiffs Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson filed by Denver Publishing Company. (dlb, )
May 25, 2005 Filing 737 "Notice of Substitution" (AMENDED DOCUMENT) to 733 Pla's REPLY in support of 687 REDACTED MOTION to Alter or Amend Judgment or for Relief from Judgment by Plaintiffs. (dlb, )
May 23, 2005 Filing 736 MEMORANDUM referring to Magistrate Judge Shaffer : 735 Pla's Unopposed MOTION for leave to Seal Exhibits G, M and N to 687 Pla's REPLY in support of 687 REDACTED MOTION to Alter or Amend Judgment or for Relief from Judgment by Plaintiffs Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 5/23/05. (dlb, )
May 19, 2005 Filing 735 Pla's Unopposed MOTION for leave to Seal Exhibits G, M and N to 687 Pla's REPLY in support of 687 REDACTED MOTION to Alter or Amend Judgment or for Relief from Judgment by Plaintiffs Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson. (dlb, )
May 19, 2005 Filing 734 Exhibits G, M and N to 687 Pla's REPLY in support of 687 REDACTED MOTION to Alter or Amend Judgment or for Relief from Judgment by Plaintiffs *filed under seal, located in sealed area(dlb, ) (evana, ). (Modified on 5/7/2018 to add the document to the original entry and to note that the document is no longer available in paper format in the Clerk's Office) (evana, ).
May 19, 2005 Filing 733 Pla's REPLY in support of 687 REDACTED MOTION to Alter or Amend Judgment or for Relief from Judgment by Plaintiffs (dlb, )
May 19, 2005 Filing 732 Objection (RESPONSE) to 729 MOTION to Seal Exhibit 5 to Certificate of Attempted Compliance with Local Rule 54.1 and Dft's Notice of AMENDMENT (AMENDED DOCUMENT) to 707 TENDERED Bill by Defendant filed by Interested Party Denver Publishing Company. (dlb, )
May 16, 2005 Filing 731 MEMORANDUM referring to Magistrate Judge Shaffer : 729 MOTION to Seal Certificate of Attempted Compliance with Local Rule 54.1 and Dft's Notice of AMENDMENT (AMENDED DOCUMENT) to 707 TENDERED Bill by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder. by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 5/16/05. (dlb, )
May 16, 2005 Filing 730 Pla's Supplemental OBJECTIONS to Pla's OBJECTIONS to TENDERED Bill of Costs to 670 Clerk's Judgment, by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder. (dlb, )
May 16, 2005 Filing 729 MOTION to Seal Certificate of Attempted Compliance with Local Rule 54.1 and Dft's Notice of AMENDMENT (AMENDED DOCUMENT) to 707 TENDERED Bill by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder. by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder. (dlb, ) (Modified on 5/16/2005 to correct typo) (dlb, ).
May 16, 2005 Filing 728 Certificate of Attempted Compliance with Local Rule 54.1 and Dft's Notice of AMENDMENT (AMENDED DOCUMENT) to 707 TENDERED Bill of Costs to 670 Clerk's Judgment, by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder *filed under seal, located in sealed area.(dlb, ) (Modified on 5/17/2005 to correct typo) (dlb, ). (evana, ). (Modified on 5/7/2018 to add the document to the original entry and to note that the document is no longer available in paper format in the Clerk's Office) (evana, ).
May 13, 2005 Filing 727 Plas' Joint RESPONSE to 717 MOTION to Supplement record regarding plas' joint motion to compel and joint motion for sanctions by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder. (dlb, )
May 13, 2005 Filing 726 Response (REPLY) to Colorado's Response to "Opposed" 708 MOTION to Seal Exhibits 1 - 6 to Dft's TENDERED Bill of Costs to 670 Clerk's Judgment by Defendant filed by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder. (dlb, )
May 13, 2005 Filing 725 Response (REPLY) to Denver Publishing Company's Objections (Response) to 695 Unopposed MOTION to file under Seal Dft's RESPONSE to Pla's JOINT MOTION for Sanctions and MOTION to Compel production of documents by Defendant and Notice of Submission of Documents for "In Camera" Review filed by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder. (dlb, )
May 12, 2005 Filing 724 Pla's OBJECTIONS to TENDERED Bill of Costs to 670 Clerk's Judgment, by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder. (dlb, )
May 12, 2005 Filing 722 RECEIPT for Exhibits (returned documents pursuant to Order dated 4/12/05) by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder re: 685 Dfts to retrieve the withdrawn motions from the clerk's office any time after 5/2/05, but prior to 5/13/05. [Motions previously under seal and returned are: 537,592,595,597, 607,609,611,613,615,618,620,623]. [Motions previously in court file and returned: 590,593,600,602,605,617,622,634,646]. (dlb, )
May 11, 2005 Filing 723 Objections (RESPONSE) to 714 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Exhibits A, B, C, E and F to 712 REDACTED RESPONSE to 687 REDACTED MOTION to Alter or Amend Judgment or for Relief from Judgment by Plaintiffs filed by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder filed by Interested Party Denver Publishing Company. (dlb, )
May 10, 2005 Filing 721 TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing held on April 27, 2005 before Judge Craig B. Shaffer. Prepared by: Avery/Woods. Pages: 1 - 231. (certified copy) (dlb, )
May 6, 2005 Filing 720 MEMORANDUM referring to Magistrate Judge Shaffer : 717 MOTION to Supplement Record Regarding Pla's Joint Motion to Compel and Joint Motion for Sanctions, filed by University of Colorado at Boulder, by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 5/6/05. (erv, )
May 6, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 719 ORDER REGARDING MOTIONS TO SEAL: 472 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Exhibit A to dft's reply re: motion in limine to preclude evidence of other incidents...that fall outside the Scope of Title IX by Defendant is granted. 478 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Exhibit A to dft's mtn for protective order by Defendant is granted. 490 Unopposed MOTION to file under Seal dft's resp to pla's mtn for proto that the depo of John Grefe not be had by Defendant is granted. 495 Unopposed MOTION to file motion to strike under Seal by Defendant is DENIED. I find that dft has failed to present compelling reasons for the sealing of the motion and attached exhibits. [Document #494 unsealed pursuant to clarification and direction of Magistrate Judge Shaffer's chambers] 515 MOTION to Seal EXHIBIT A & B to MOTION to Withdraw Document regarding 441 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Lisa Simpson (under seal) and SUBSTITUTE with redacted response in opposition by Plaintiffs is granted. 517 MOTION to Seal EXHIBIT A through C of Dft's Proposed redactions to 441 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff; 436 RESPONSE in opposition to 411 MOTION for Additional Discovery by Defendant filed by Plaintiff; 446 EXHIBITS A, D and E to plas' response in opposition to dft's mtn in limine to preclude evidence of other incidents by Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson by University of Colorado at Boulder is granted. 523 MOTION to Seal pla's resp to motion to strike.. suppl Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures by Plaintiff is DENIED. Accordingly, the Clerk's Office is directed to unseal Plaintiff Simpson's Response [Document #522]. 539 MOTION to Seal dft's reply in support of MOTION to Strike plaintiff Simpson's Supplemental Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures served on 1/31/05 and portions of plaintiff Simpson's Second Amended Witness List served on 2/4/05 by Defendant is DENIED. Accordingly the Clerk's Office is directed to unseal Defendant's Reply [Document #538]. Signed by Magistrate Judge Craig B Shaffer on 5/6/05. (dlb, ) (Modified on 5/9/2005 to indicate that pursuant to chambers document #494 is unsealed) (dlb).
May 6, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 718 MINUTE ORDER re: 717 MOTION to Supplement record regarding plas' joint motion to compel and joint motion for sanctions by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder. Pla's response due 5/13/05, a reply will not be permitted by Magistrate Judge Craig B Shaffer on 5/6/05. (dlb, )
May 5, 2005 Filing 717 MOTION to Supplement record regarding plas' joint motion to compel and joint motion for sanctions by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder. (dlb, )
May 5, 2005 TENDERED Offer of Proof for Brian Whitney to 717 MOTION to Supplement record regarding plas' joint motion to compel and joint motion for sanctions by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder. (dlb, )
May 5, 2005 Filing 716 MEMORANDUM referring to Magistrate Judge Shaffer : 714 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Exhibits A, B, C, E and F to 712 REDACTED RESPONSE to 687 REDACTED MOTION to Alter or Amend Judgment or for Relief from Judgment by Plaintiffs filed by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 5/5/05. (dlb, )
May 4, 2005 Filing 715 RESPONSE to 690 MOTION for Order to release to the public the Snyder Deposition pursuant to the Magistrate Judge's 3/17/05 order by Interested Party Denver Publishing Company filed by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder. (dlb, )
May 4, 2005 Filing 714 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Exhibits A, B, C, E and F to 712 REDACTED RESPONSE to 687 REDACTED MOTION to Alter or Amend Judgment or for Relief from Judgment by Plaintiffs filed by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder. (dlb, )
May 4, 2005 Filing 713 Exhibits A, B, C, E and F to 712 REDACTED RESPONSE to 687 REDACTED MOTION to Alter or Amend Judgment or for Relief from Judgment by Plaintiffs filed by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder *filed under seal, located in sealed area(dlb, ) (evana, ). (Modified on 5/7/2018 to add the document to the original entry and to note that the document is no longer available in paper format in the Clerk's Office) (evana, ).
May 4, 2005 Filing 712 REDACTED RESPONSE to 687 REDACTED MOTION to Alter or Amend Judgment or for Relief from Judgment by Plaintiffs filed by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder. (dlb, )
May 2, 2005 Filing 711 Objections (RESPONSE) to 708 MOTION to Seal Exhibits 1 - 6 to Dft's TENDERED Bill of Costs to 670 Clerk's Judgment by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder filed by Interested Party Denver Publishing Company. (dlb, )
April 27, 2005 Filing 710 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Craig B Shaffer : Motion Hearing held on 4/27/2005. TAKING UNDER ADVISEMENT #545 JOINT MOTION for Sanctions by Plaintiffs and #637 MOTION to Compel production of documents by Plaintiffs. (Court Reporter FTR - Reporter Deck - Ctrm A402.) (dlb, )
April 27, 2005 Opinion or Order ORDER TAKING UNDER ADVISEMENT #545 JOINT MOTION for Sanctions by Plaintiffs and #637 MOTION to Compel production of documents by Plaintiffs pursuant to courtroom minutes, #710 by Magistrate Judge Craig B Shaffer on 4/27/05. (dlb, )
April 27, 2005 Filing 709 MEMORANDUM referring to Magistrate Judge Shaffer : 708 MOTION to Seal filed by University of Colorado at Boulder, by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 4/27/05. (pap, )
April 26, 2005 Filing 708 MOTION to Seal Exhibits 1 - 6 to Dft's TENDERED Bill of Costs to 670 Clerk's Judgment by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder. (dlb, )
April 26, 2005 Filing 707 Exhibits 1 - 6 to Dft's TENDERED Bill of Costs to 670 Clerk's Judgment, by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder *filed under seal, located in sealed area (dlb, )
April 26, 2005 Filing 706 Objections (RESPONSE) to 695 Unopposed MOTION to file under Seal Dft's RESPONSE to Pla's JOINT MOTION for Sanctions and MOTION to Compel production of documents by Defendant AND [part of #695] Dfts' NOTICE of Submission of Documents for "In Camera" Review re #694 Dft's RESPONSE to Pla's JOINT MOTION for Sanctions and MOTION to Compel production of documents (*included in response) filed by Interested Party Denver Publishing Company. (dlb, )
April 26, 2005 Filing 705 NOTICE of Substitution re: #704 Exhibit G to #699 Joint REPLY to #545 JOINT MOTION for Sanctions by Plaintiffs and #637 MOTION to Compel production of documents by Plaintiffs (dlb, )
April 26, 2005 Filing 704 Exhibit G to #699 Joint REPLY to #545 JOINT MOTION for Sanctions by Plaintiffs and #637 MOTION to Compel production of documents by Plaintiffs *filed under seal, located in sealed area(dlb, ) (evana, ). (Modified on 5/7/2018 to add the document to the original entry and to note that the document is no longer available in paper format in the Clerk's Office) (evana, ).
April 26, 2005 TENDERED Bill of Costs to 670 Clerk's Judgment, by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder. (dlb, )
April 26, 2005 Filing 703 MEMORANDUM referring to Magistrate Judge Shaffer : 700 Unopposed MOTION for leave to file under Seal Pla's Joint REPLY to #545 JOINT MOTION for Sanctions by Plaintiffs and #637 MOTION to Compel production of documents by Plaintiffs by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 4/26/05. (dlb, )
April 25, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 702 MINUTE ORDER granting 697 Unopposed Joint MOTION for Leave to file reply to dft's response to plas' motion for sanctions and to compel (doc. nos. 545 and 637) by Plaintiffs. A hearing remains set for 4/27/05 at 9:30 a.m. by Magistrate Judge Craig B Shaffer on 4/25/05. (dlb, )
April 25, 2005 Filing 701 MEMORANDUM referring to Magistrate Judge Shaffer : 697 MOTION for Leave filed by Lisa Simpson,, Anne Gilmore, by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 4/25/05. (dlb, )
April 25, 2005 Filing 700 Unopposed MOTION for leave to file under Seal Pla's Joint REPLY to #545 JOINT MOTION for Sanctions by Plaintiffs and #637 MOTION to Compel production of documents by Plaintiffs (dlb, )
April 25, 2005 Filing 699 Joint REPLY to #545 JOINT MOTION for Sanctions by Plaintiffs and #637 MOTION to Compel production of documents by Plaintiffs *filed under seal, located in sealed area(dlb, ) (evana, ). (Modified on 5/7/2018 to add the document to the original entry and to note that the document is no longer available in paper format in the Clerk's Office) (evana, ).
April 22, 2005 Filing 698 Dft's Notice of ERRATA re #694 Dft's RESPONSE to Pla's #545 JOINT MOTION for Sanctions and #637 MOTION to Compel production of documents.(dlb, )
April 22, 2005 Filing 697 Unopposed Joint MOTION for Leave to file reply to dft's response to plas' motion for sanctions and to compel (doc. nos. 545 and 637) by Plaintiffs. (dlb, )
April 21, 2005 Filing 696 MEMORANDUM referring to Magistrate Judge Shaffer : 695 MOTION to Seal filed by University of Colorado at Boulder, by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 4/21/05. (dlb, )
April 20, 2005 Filing 695 Unopposed MOTION to file under Seal Dft's RESPONSE to Pla's JOINT MOTION for Sanctions and MOTION to Compel production of documents by Defendant. (dlb, )
April 20, 2005 Filing 694 Defendant's RESPONSE to Plaintiff's #545 JOINT MOTION for Sanctions and #637 MOTION to Compel production of documents *filed under seal, located in sealed area (dlb, ) (evana, ). (Modified on 5/16/2018 to add the document to the original entry and to note that the document is no longer available in paper format in the Clerk's Office) (evana, ).
April 20, 2005 Filing 693 Plaintiffs' Joint RESPONSE to 690 MOTION for Order to release to the public the Snyder Deposition pursuant to the Magistrate Judge's 3/17/05 order by Denver Publishing Company. (dlb, )
April 20, 2005 Filing 692 Objections (RESPONSE) to 689 MOTION to Seal UNREDACTED MOTION to Alter or Amend Judgment or for Relief from Judgment and Exhibits A-H Thereto by Plaintiffs Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson filed by Denver Publishing Company. (dlb, )
April 20, 2005 Dfts' NOTICE of Submission of Documents for "In Camera" Review re #694 Dft's RESPONSE to Pla's JOINT MOTION for Sanctions and MOTION to Compel production of documents *included in response, filed under seal and located in sealed area (#695)(dlb, )
April 15, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 691 MEMORANDUM referring to Magistrate Judge Shaffer : 689 MOTION to Seal filed by Lisa Simpson,, Anne Gilmore,, 690 MOTION for Order filed by Denver Publishing Company, by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 4/15/05. (dlb, )
April 14, 2005 Filing 690 MOTION for Order to release to the public the Snyder Deposition pursuant to the Magistrate Judge's 3/17/05 order by Interested Party Denver Publishing Company. (dlb, )
April 14, 2005 Filing 689 MOTION to Seal UNREDACTED MOTION to Alter or Amend Judgment or for Relief from Judgment and Exhibits A-H Thereto by Plaintiffs Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson. (dlb, )
April 14, 2005 Filing 688 UNREDACTED MOTION to Alter or Amend Judgment or for Relief from Judgment and Exhibits A-H Thereto by Plaintiffs Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson *filed under seal, located in sealed area (dlb, ) (evana, ). (Modified on 5/7/2018 to add the document to the original entry and to note that the document is no longer available in paper format in the Clerk's Office) (evana, ).
April 14, 2005 Filing 687 REDACTED MOTION to Alter or Amend Judgment or for Relief from Judgment and Exhibits A-H Thereto by Plaintiffs. *large document (dlb, ) (Modified on 7/26/2005 to clarify entry) (dlb, ).
April 13, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 686 MINUTE ORDER granting 680 Dft's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response until ruling on plas' "Joint Mtn for Reconsideration of denial of mtn to compel order of 3/31/05 re: #545 JOINT MOTION for Sanctions by Plaintiffs by Magistrate Judge Craig B Shaffer on 4/13/05. (dlb, )
April 12, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 685 MINUTE ORDER re: MINUTE ORDER granting 673 Motion to Withdraw Various Motions (Document) is AMENDED to reflect that the motion is granted and the withdrawn motions shall be removed from the court file and returned to the Defendant. Dfts to retrieve the withdrawn motions from the clerk's office any time after 5/2/05, but prior to 5/13/05. [Motions previously under seal and returned are: 537,592,595,597, 607,609,611,613,615,618,620,623]. [Motions previously in court file and returned: 590,593,600,602,605,617,622,634,646] Signed by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 4/12/05. (dlb, ) (Text Modified on 4/12/2005 to include when documents to be withdrawn) (gms, ).
April 12, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 684 ORDER granting 678 Motion for Reconsideration re #637 MOTION to Compel production of documents by Plaintiffs (filed under seal). Pla's motion shall not be denied as moot and shall remain pending until resolved on the merits. That the order granting dft's mtn for sum jgm [#669] filed 3/31/05 is amended to exclude the pla's mtn to compel. That the pla's motion to compel #637 filed 3/22/05 is referred to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. Signed by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 4/12/05. (dlb, )
April 12, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 683 ORDER granting 682 Unopposed MOTION For Extension of Time to file Bill of Costs for 15 days re: Clerk's Judgment, 670 by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder. Signed by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 4/12/05. (dlb, )
April 11, 2005 Filing 682 Unopposed MOTION For Extension of Time to file Bill of Costs for 15 days re: Clerk's Judgment, 670 by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder. (dlb, )
April 11, 2005 Filing 681 MEMORANDUM referring to Magistrate Judge Shaffer : 680 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #545 MOTION for Sanctions filed by University of Colorado at Boulder, by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 4/11/05. (dlb, )
April 8, 2005 Filing 680 Dft's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response until ruling on plas' "Joint Mtn for Reconsideration of denial of mtn to compel order of 3/31/05 re: #545 JOINT MOTION for Sanctions by Plaintiffs (dlb, )
April 8, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 679 MINUTE ORDER: Grnting 676 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw #558 Pla's General MOTIONS in Limine re: conduct by Plaintiffs Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson. Finding moot 559 Unopposed MOTION for leave to file under Seal Pla's General Motions in Limine by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 4/8/05. (dlb, )
April 7, 2005 Filing 678 Joint MOTION for Reconsideration re 669 Order dated 3/31/05 re: denial of motion to compel by Plaintiffs Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson. (dlb, )
April 6, 2005 Filing 676 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw #558 Pla's General MOTIONS in Limine re: conduct by Plaintiffs Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson. (dlb, )
April 5, 2005 Filing 677 MEMORANDUM referring to Magistrate Judge Shaffer : 671 MOTION For Extension of Time Motion Hearing 653 filed by Lisa Simpson,, Anne Gilmore, by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 4/5/05. (dlb, )
April 5, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 675 MINUTE ORDER: Oral argument hearing re: #545 JOINT MOTION for Sanctions by Plaintiffs Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson set for 4/27/2005 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B Shaffer by Magistrate Judge Craig B Shaffer on 5/5/05. (dlb, )
April 5, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 674 MINUTE ORDER granting 673 Motion to Withdraw Various Motions (Document). The following motions to seal are now rendered moot and are Denied as moot: [601, 634 , 600 , 596 , 604 , 608 , 610 , 612 , 614 , 616 , 619 , 621 , 624 and 540 by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 4/5/05. (dlb, )
April 1, 2005 Filing 673 MOTION to Withdraw Document regarding #590 MOTION in Limine #3 to exclude evidence of plaintiff Simpson's abondoned retaliation and publicity damages claims; which would moot 601 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Various Exhibits to Motions in Limine [Exhibits B and C to Motion in Limine #3; Exhibits A and B to Motion in Limine #5; Exhibits A, B and C to Motion in Limine #8] and #634. #592 MOTION in Limine #4 to exclude evidence about which witnesses do not have personal knowledge; which would moot 600 Unopposed MOTION to file Motions in Limine #4 to Exclude Evidence about which witnesses do not have personal knowledge and #7 to exclude improper opinion testimony by lay witnesses under Seal. #593 MOTION in Limine #5 to exclude Newspaper and other media evidence; which would moot #601 and #634. #595 MOTION in Limine #6 Omnibus Motion to Exclude Evidence under Fed.R.Evid. 401-403; which would moot 596 MOTION to file under Seal MOTION in Limine #6 Omnibus Motion to Exclude Evidence under Fed.R.Evid. 401-403 by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder. #597 MOTION in Limine #7 to Exclude Improper Opinion Testimony by Lay Witness; which would moot #600. #602 MOTION in Limine #9 to Exclude Testimony of Non-Party Witness; which would moot 604 MOTION to file under Seal Exhibit A to 602 MOTION in Limine #9 to Exclude Testimony of Non-Party Witness by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder. #605 MOTION in Limine #10 to Exclude Testimony of Pla's Proposed Expert Herman Houston; which is moot due to the Magistrate?s ruling on 3/25/05. #607 MOTION in Limine #12 to Exclude Testimony of Plas' Proposed Expert Elizabeth Lazarus; which would moot 608 Unopposed MOTION to Seal MOTION in Limine #12 to Exclude Testimony of Plas' Proposed Expert Elizabeth Lazarus by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder. #609 MOTION in Limine #13 to Exclude Testimony of Plas' Proposed Expert Marte McNally; which would moot 610 Unopposed MOTION to Seal MOTION in Limine #13 to Exclude Testimony of Plas' Proposed Expert Marte McNally by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder. #611 MOTION in Limine #14 to Exclude Testimony of Plas' Proposed Expert Lee Scriggins; which would moot 612 Unopposed MOTION to Seal MOTION in Limine #14 to Exclude Testimony of Plas' Proposed Expert Lee Scriggins by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder. #613 MOTION in Limine #15 to Exclude Testimony of Pla's Proposed Expert Dr. Schieve; which would moot 614 Unopposed MOTION to Seal MOTION in Limine #15 to Exclude Testimony of Pla's Proposed Expert Dr. Schieve by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder. #615 MOTION in Limine #16 to Exclude Testimony of Plas' Proposed Expert Elyse Morgan, Ph.D.; which would moot 616 Unopposed MOTION to Seal MOTION in Limine #16 to Exclude Testimony of Plas' Proposed Expert Elyse Morgan, Ph.D by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder. #617 MOTION in Limine #17 to Exclude Testimony of Plas' Proposed Expert Todd W. Crosset; which would moot 619 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Exhibit A and B to 617 MOTION in Limine #17 to Exclude Testimony of Plas' Proposed Expert Todd W. Crosset by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder. #620 MOTION in Limine #18 to Supplement Motion in limine to Preclude Evidence of Other Incidents; which would moot 621 Unopposed MOTION to Seal MOTION in Limine #18 to Supplement Motion in limine to Preclude Evidence of Other Incidents by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder. #623 MOTION in Limine #20 to Exclude Testimony of Plas' Proposed Expert David Stevens, Ph.D.; which would moot 624 Unopposed MOTION to Seal MOTION in Limine #20 to Exclude Testimony of Plas' Proposed Expert David Stevens, Ph.D by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder. #622 MOTION in Limine #19 to Preclude Evidence that refers to Post-December 7, 2001 events. #634 MOTION to Withdraw Document and Substitute regarding 601 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Various Exhibits to Motions in Limine [Exhibits B and C to Motion in Limine #3; Exhibits A and B to Motion in Limine #5; Exhibits A, B and C to Motion in Limine #8]. #537 MOTION for Protective Order to prohibit the deposition upon written questions of witness; which would moot 540 MOTION to Seal dft's mtn for protective order by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder. #646 MOTION to Withdraw Document and substitute attached Exhibit A 627 NOTICE of Motion in Limine Index. 548 MOTION to Seal two motions filed by Plaintiffs by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder. 539 MOTION to Seal dft's reply in support of MOTION to Strike plaintiff Simpson's Supplemental Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures served on 1/31/05 and portions of plaintiff Simpson's Second Amended Witness List served on 2/4/05 by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder. The withdrawal of this motion to seal will enable the reply to be unsealed by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder. (dlb, )
April 1, 2005 Filing 672 MEMORANDUM referring to Magistrate Judge Shaffer : 638 MOTION to Seal filed by Lisa Simpson,, Anne Gilmore,, 640 MOTION to Seal filed by Lisa Simpson,, Anne Gilmore,, 643 MOTION to Seal filed by University of Colorado at Boulder,, 649 MOTION to Seal filed by University of Colorado at Boulder, by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 4/1/05. (dlb, )
April 1, 2005 Filing 671 Unopposed MOTION For Extension of Time to comply to 4/6/05 re: 653 On or before 4/1/05 counsel shall have determined if any of the pending motions could be withdrawn and will file written motions to withraw by Plaintiffs Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson. (dlb, )
April 1, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 670 JUDGMENT by Clerk. JUDGMENT in favor of Defendant, University of Colorado, through its Board, The Regents of the University of Colorado against Plaintiffs, Lisa Simpson and Anne Gilmore. Signed by the Clerk of the Court pursuant to order dated 3/31/05 issued by Judge Robert E. Blackburn. (dlb, )
March 31, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 669 ORDER granting 219 University of Colorado's MOTION for summary judgment purs to Rule 56, Fed.R.Civ.P. on the single Title IX claim in the consolidated complaints. That plaintiff's First Amended Complaints are dismissed with prejudice; that JUDGMENT SHALL ENTER in favor fo the defendant and against the plaintiffs; That the defendant is AWARDED its costs, to be taxed by the Clerk of the Court; That the trial preparation conferences set for 5/6/05 and 5/27/05 are VACATED; That the trial set for 5/31/05 is VACATED. That any other pending motions are DENIED as MOOT: [denying as moot: 386 , 387 , 432 , 483 , 537 , 552 , 553 , 556 , 558 , 560 , 561 , 562 , 563 , 564 , 565 , 566 , 567 , #570 , 573 , 577 , 587 , 588 , 590 , 592 , 593 , 595 , 597 , 598 , 602 , 605 , 606 , 607 , 609 , 611 , 613 , 615 , 617 , 620 , 622 , 623 , 625 , 626 , 631 , 634 , #637 , #639 , 659 , 660 , 662 , 664 , 667 , 668 ]. EXCEPT for the pending motions to seal [#'s 472, 478, 490, 495, 515, 517, 523, 539, 540, 545, 546, 547, 548, 554, 557, 559, 568, 581, 589, 596, 600, 601, 608, 612, 614, 616, 619, 621, 624, 624, 638, 640, 643, and 649] and the pending motions for sanctions [#545}; and That the reference to the United States Magistrate Judge Craig B. shaffer of the extant pending motions to seal and motion for sanctions, listed above, shall remain in effect. Signed by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 3/31/05. (dlb, ) (Modified on 9/16/2005 to remove the termination of document #641) (dlb, ).
March 31, 2005 Filing 1026 TENDERED REDACTED response to dft's motion to strike to 668 MOTION to Withdraw and Substitute Redacted copy of 522 RESPONSE to 494 MOTION to Strike plaintiff Simpson's Supplemental Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures served on 1/31/05 and portions of plaintiff Simpson's Second Amended Witness List served on 2/4/05 by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder (under seal) filed by Plaintiff Lisa Simpson (dlb, ) (evana, ). (Modified on 5/9/2018 to add the document to the original entry and to note that the document is no longer available in paper format in the Clerk's Office) (evana, ).
March 31, 2005 Filing 668 MOTION to Withdraw and Substitute Redacted copy of 522 RESPONSE to 494 MOTION to Strike plaintiff Simpson's Supplemental Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures served on 1/31/05 and portions of plaintiff Simpson's Second Amended Witness List served on 2/4/05 by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder (under seal) filed by Plaintiff Lisa Simpson (dlb, )
March 31, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 667 MOTION to Seal Exhibit A to Pla's Joint Response (OBJECTION) to 641 Objections (APPEAL) OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court by University of Colorado at Boulder re 584 MEMORANDUM ORDER: Signed by Magistrate Judge Craig B Shaffer on 3/17/05 relating to Deposition Transcript of Steven Snyder by Plaintiffs Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson. (dlb, )
March 31, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 666 Exhibit A to 641 Pla's Joint Response (OBJECTION) to 641 Objections (APPEAL) OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court by University of Colorado at Boulder re 584 MEMORANDUM ORDER: Signed by Magistrate Judge Craig B Shaffer on 3/17/05 relating to Deposition Transcript of Steven Snyder *filed under seal, located in sealed area(dlb, ) (evana, ). (Modified on 5/7/2018 to add the document to the original entry and to note that the document is no longer available in paper format in the Clerk's Office) (evana, ).
March 31, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 665 Pla's Joint Response (OBJECTION) to 641 Objections (APPEAL) OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court by University of Colorado at Boulder re 584 MEMORANDUM ORDER: Signed by Magistrate Judge Craig B Shaffer on 3/17/05 relating to Deposition Transcript of Steven Snyder(dlb, )
March 31, 2005 Filing 664 MOTION for leave to File reply to plas' supplemental response and to file reply under Seal by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder. (dlb, )
March 31, 2005 Filing 663 REPLY to 544 Supplemental RESPONSE and brief in opposition to 219 University of Colorado's MOTION for summary judgment purs to Rule 56, Fed.R.Civ.P. on the single Title IX claim in the consolidated complaints by Plaintiffs Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder *filed under seal, located in sealed area (dlb, ) (evana, ). (Modified on 5/7/2018 to add the document to the original entry and to note that the document is no longer available in paper format in the Clerk's Office) (evana, ).
March 31, 2005 Filing 662 Unopposed Joint MOTION to Withdraw Document regarding 577 Plaintiffs' Joint MOTION to Compel defendant to produce documents requested in discovery. (dlb, )
March 31, 2005 TENDERED Unredacted Copy to 668 MOTION to Withdraw and Substitute Redacted copy of 522 RESPONSE to 494 MOTION to Strike plaintiff Simpson's Supplemental Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures served on 1/31/05 and portions of plaintiff Simpson's Second Amended Witness List served on 2/4/05 by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder by pla Simpson *filed under seal, located in sealed area(dlb, )
March 30, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 661 MINUTE ORDER: Consistent with the Court's ruling from the bench during the hrg on 3/25/05: 409 MOTION to Strike Certain of Pla Simpson's Rule 26(a)(2) Disclosures (Filed under SEAL and placed w/ SEALED Documents) by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. 530 MOTION for Protective Order prohibiting the third deposition of Robert Chichester by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder is GRANTED. 494 MOTION to Strike plaintiff Simpson's Supplemental Rule 26(a0(1) disclosures served on 1/31/05 and portions of plaintiff Simpson's Second Amended Witness List served on 2/4/05 by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder *filed under seal located in sealed area is DENIED. 527 MOTION for Join in Pla Simpson's response to dft's mtn to strike pla's supplemental Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures by Plaintiff Anne Gilmore is GRANTED. Discussion regarding numerous motions in limine. On or before 4/1/05 counsel shall have determined if any of the pending motions could be withdrawn and will file written motions to withraw. ORDERED: Counsel's oral mtn to ext ddl for responding to any remaining motions is granted to 4/14/05 by Magistrate Judge Craig B Shaffer on 3/30/05. (dlb, )
March 30, 2005 Filing 660 Plas' Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw and Substitute 546 MOTION for leave to file supplemental response and brief in opposition to dft's mtn for sum jgm and to Seal by Plaintiffs Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson [*motion filed under seal, located in sealed area]. (dlb, )
March 30, 2005 Filing 659 Plas' Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw and Substitute 547 Unopposed MOTION for leave to file Joint motion for sanctions and to Seal by Plaintiffs Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson [*motion filed under seal, located in sealed area]. (dlb, )
March 29, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 658 Response (OBJECTION) to 641 Objections (APPEAL) OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court by University of Colorado at Boulder re 584 MEMORANDUM ORDER: Signed by Magistrate Judge Craig B Shaffer on 3/17/05 relating to Deposition Transcript of Steven Snyder by Interested Party Denver Publishing Company. (dlb, )
March 29, 2005 Filing 657 REPLY in support of 537 MOTION for Protective Order to prohibit the deposition upon written questions of witness by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder (dlb, )
March 28, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 656 ORDER granting 646 MOTION to Withdraw Document and substitute attached Exhibit A 627 NOTICE of Motion in Limine Index by University of Colorado. Signed by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 3/28/05. (dlb, )
March 28, 2005 Filing 655 Amended CERTIFICATE of Mailing re 651 REPLY in support of 530 MOTION for Protective Order prohibiting the third deposition of Robert Chichester by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder. (dlb, )
March 28, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 654 MEMORANDUM referring to Magistrate Judge Shaffer : 649 MOTION to Seal Defendants' SUPPLEMENT to 534 470 Plas' Joint MOTION for Protective Order that the deposition of John Grefe not be had by Plaintiffs Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson re: [One Original Deposition Transcript of the Witness who is the Subject of this Court's Memorandum Order regarding plas' joint motion for protective order that the preservation deposition not be had, dated 2/11/05 [#502] (sic), and the deposition video tape, audio tape, and original deposition exhibits by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 3/28/05. (dlb, )
March 25, 2005 Filing 653 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Craig B Shaffer : Motion Hearing held on 3/25/2005. FOR THE REASONS STATED ON THE RECORD: 409 MOTION to Strike Certain of Pla Simpson's Rule 26(a)(2) Disclosures (Filed under SEAL and placed w/ SEALED Documents) by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. 530 MOTION for Protective Order prohibiting the third deposition of Robert Chichester by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder is GRANTED. 494 MOTION to Strike plaintiff Simpson's Supplemental Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures served on 1/31/05 and portions of plaintiff Simpson's Second Amended Witness List served on 2/4/05 by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder *filed under seal located in sealed area is DENIED. 527 MOTION for Join in Pla Simpson's response to dft's mtn to strike pla's supplemental Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures by Plaintiff Anne Gilmore is GRANTED. Discussion regarding numerous motions in limine. On or before 4/1/05 counsel shall have determined if any of the pending motions could be withdrawn and will file written motions to withraw. ORDERED: Counsel's oral mtn to ext ddl for responding to any remaining motions is granted to 4/14/05. (Court Reporter FTR Reporter Deck - Ctrm A402.) (dlb, )
March 25, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 652 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 409 MOTION to Strike Certain of Pla Simpson's Rule 26(a)(2) Disclosures (Filed under SEAL and placed w/ SEALED Documents) by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder. Dft's motion is granted to the extent it seeks to strike the 6/15/04 expert designation of Herman Houston, but is denied as to the 6/15/05 expert designation of Dr. DiBiaggio. Signed by Magistrate Judge Craig B Shaffer on 3/25/05. (dlb, )
March 25, 2005 Filing 651 REPLY in support of 530 MOTION for Protective Order prohibiting the third deposition of Robert Chichester by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder. (dlb, )
March 25, 2005 Opinion or Order ORDER FOR THE REASONS STATED ON THE RECORD: 409 MOTION to Strike Certain of Pla Simpson's Rule 26(a)(2) Disclosures (Filed under SEAL and placed w/ SEALED Documents) by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. 530 MOTION for Protective Order prohibiting the third deposition of Robert Chichester by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder is GRANTED. 494 MOTION to Strike plaintiff Simpson's Supplemental Rule 26(a0(1) disclosures served on 1/31/05 and portions of plaintiff Simpson's Second Amended Witness List served on 2/4/05 by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder *filed under seal located in sealed area is DENIED. 527 MOTION for Join in Pla Simpson's response to dft's mtn to strike pla's supplemental Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures by Plaintiff Anne Gilmore is GRANTED. Discussion regarding numerous motions in limine. On or before 4/1/05 counsel shall have determined if any of the pending motions could be withdrawn and will file written motions to withraw. ORDERED: Counsel's oral mtn to ext ddl for responding to any remaining motions is granted to 4/14/05 pursuant to courtroom minutes dated 3/25/05, #653 by Magistrate Judge Craig B Shaffer on 3/25/05. (dlb, )
March 25, 2005 Filing 649 MOTION to Seal Defendants' SUPPLEMENT to 534 470 Plas' Joint MOTION for Protective Order that the deposition of John Grefe not be had by Plaintiffs Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson re: [One Original Deposition Transcript of the Witness who is the Subject of this Court's Memorandum Order regarding plas' joint motion for protective order that the preservation deposition not be had, dated 2/11/05 [#502] (sic), and the deposition video tape, audio tape, and original deposition exhibits by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder. (dlb, )
March 25, 2005 Filing 648 Defendants' SUPPLEMENT to 534 470 Plas' Joint MOTION for Protective Order that the deposition of John Grefe not be had by Plaintiffs Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson *filed under seal, located in sealed area [One Original Deposition Transcript of the Witness who is the Subject of this Court's Memorandum Order regarding plas' joint motion for protective order that the preservation deposition not be had, dated 2/11/05 [#502] (sic), and the deposition video tape, audio tape, and original deposition exhibits(dlb, ) (evana, ). (Modified on 5/9/2018 to add the document to the original entry and to note that the document is no longer available in paper format in the Clerk's Office) (evana, ).
March 24, 2005 Filing 650 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Craig B Shaffer : Telephonic Discovery Hearing held on 3/24/2005. Court directs dfts to file one "Consolidated" response to both the motion for sanctions and the Motion to Compel file 3/22/05. A motion to strike is not to be filed. (Court Reporter FTR - Reporter Deck - Ctrm A402.) (dlb, )
March 24, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 647 Denver Publishing Company's Objection (RESPONSE) to the parties motions dated 3/18/05, 3/21/05 and 3/22/05 to file papers under seal re: 634 MOTION to Withdraw Document and Substitute regarding 601 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Various Exhibits to Motions in Limine [Exhibits B and C to Motion in Limine #3; Exhibits A and B to Motion in Limine #5; Exhibits A, B and C to Motion in Limine #8] by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder; 589 Unopposed MOTION for leave to file under Seal TENDERED UNREDACTED COPY of Plas' MOTION for Order Directing Dft to Request the Release of Documents Provided to the Attorney General and Grand Jury and for Order Permitting Plaintiffs Access to Grand Jury Witness Transcripts by Plaintiffs; 604 MOTION to file under Seal Exhibit A to 602 MOTION in Limine #9 to Exclude Testimony of Non-Party Witness by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder; 596 MOTION to file under Seal MOTION in Limine #6 Omnibus Motion to Exclude Evidence under Fed.R.Evid. 401-403 by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder; 600 Unopposed MOTION to file Motions in Limine #4 to Exclude Evidence about which witnesses do not have personal knowledge and #7 to exclude improper opinion testimony by lay witnesses under Seal by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder; 601 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Various Exhibits to Motions in Limine [Exhibits B and C to Motion in Limine #3; Exhibits A and B to Motion in Limine #5; Exhibits A, B and C to Motion in Limine #8] by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder; 624 Unopposed MOTION to Seal MOTION in Limine #20 to Exclude Testimony of Plas' Proposed Expert David Stevens, Ph.D by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder; 621 Unopposed MOTION to Seal MOTION in Limine #18 to Supplement Motion in limine to Preclude Evidence of Other Incidents by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder; 619 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Exhibit A and B to 617 MOTION in Limine #17 to Exclude Testimony of Plas' Proposed Expert Todd W. Crosset by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder; 616 Unopposed MOTION to Seal MOTION in Limine #16 to Exclude Testimony of Plas' Proposed Expert Elyse Morgan, Ph.D by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder; 614 Unopposed MOTION to Seal MOTION in Limine #15 to Exclude Testimony of Pla's Proposed Expert Dr. Schieve by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder; 612 Unopposed MOTION to Seal MOTION in Limine #14 to Exclude Testimony of Plas' Proposed Expert Lee Scriggins by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder; 610 Unopposed MOTION to Seal MOTION in Limine #13 to Exclude Testimony of Plas' Proposed Expert Marte McNally by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder; 608 Unopposed MOTION to Seal MOTION in Limine #12 to Exclude Testimony of Plas' Proposed Expert Elizabeth Lazarus by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder; 587 MOTION to Withdraw Previously filed #570 Pla's JOINT MOTION to Compel production of disciplinary records and Substitute with Motion to Compel Production of Disciplinary Records and Exhibits A, B and C Under Seal; 638 Unopposed MOTION for leave to file under Seal their joint MOTION to Compel production of documents by Plaintiffs Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson; 640 Unopposed MOTION for leave to file under Seal Joint MOTION for Leave to supplement motion for sanctions by Plaintiffs Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson; 643 MOTION to file Exhibit A to 641 Objections (APPEAL) OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court by University of Colorado at Boulder re 584 MEMORANDUM ORDER: Signed by Magistrate Judge Craig B Shaffer on 3/17/05 relating to Deposition Transcript of Steven Snyder under Seal by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder (dlb, )
March 24, 2005 Filing 646 MOTION to Withdraw Document and substitute attached Exhibit A 627 NOTICE of Motion in Limine Index by University of Colorado at Boulder (dlb, )
March 23, 2005 Filing 645 MEMORANDUM referring to Magistrate Judge Shaffer : 638 MOTION to Seal filed by Lisa Simpson,, Anne Gilmore,, #639 MOTION for Leave filed by Lisa Simpson,, Anne Gilmore,, 640 MOTION to Seal filed by Lisa Simpson,, Anne Gilmore,, 643 MOTION to Seal filed by University of Colorado at Boulder by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 3/23/05. (dlb, )
March 22, 2005 Filing 644 MEMORANDUM referring to Magistrate Judge Shaffer : 634 MOTION to Withdraw Document and Substitute regarding 601 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Various Exhibits to Motions in Limine [Exhibits B and C to Motion in Limine #3; Exhibits A and B to Motion in Limine #5; Exhibits A, B and C to Motion in Limine #8] by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 3/22/05. (dlb, )
March 22, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 643 MOTION to file Exhibit A to 641 Objections (APPEAL) OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court by University of Colorado at Boulder re 584 MEMORANDUM ORDER: Signed by Magistrate Judge Craig B Shaffer on 3/17/05 relating to Deposition Transcript of Steven Snyder under Seal by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder. (dlb, )
March 22, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 642 Exhibit A to 641 Objections (APPEAL) OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court by University of Colorado at Boulder re 584 MEMORANDUM ORDER: Signed by Magistrate Judge Craig B Shaffer on 3/17/05 relating to Deposition Transcript of Steven Snyder by Defendant *filed under seal, located in sealed area (dlb, )
March 22, 2005 Filing 640 Unopposed MOTION for leave to file under Seal Joint MOTION for Leave to supplement motion for sanctions by Plaintiffs Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson. (dlb, )
March 22, 2005 Filing 639 Joint MOTION for Leave to supplement motion for sanctions by Plaintiffs Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson *filed under seal, located in sealed area (dlb, ) (evana, ). (Modified on 5/7/2018 to add the document to the original entry and to note that the document is no longer available in paper format in the Clerk's Office) (evana, ).
March 22, 2005 Filing 638 Unopposed MOTION for leave to file under Seal their joint MOTION to Compel production of documents by Plaintiffs Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson (dlb, )
March 22, 2005 Filing 637 MOTION to Compel production of documents by Plaintiffs Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson *filed under seal, located in sealed area (dlb, ) (evana, ). (Modified on 5/7/2018 to add the document to the original entry and to note that the document is no longer available in paper format in the Clerk's Office) (evana, ).
March 22, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 641 Objections (APPEAL) OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court by University of Colorado at Boulder re 584 MEMORANDUM ORDER: Signed by Magistrate Judge Craig B Shaffer on 3/17/05 relating to Deposition Transcript of Steven Snyder (dlb, ) (dlb, ) (Modified on 9/16/2005 to reactive, terminated in error) (dlb, ). (Entered: 03/23/2005)
March 21, 2005 Filing 636 TRANSCRIPT of Telephonic Discovery Dispute held on March 14, 2005 before Judge Criag B. Shaffer. Prepared by: Avery/Woods. Pages: 1 - 57. (certified copy) (dlb, )
March 21, 2005 Filing 635 TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing held on February 10, 2005 before Judge Craig B. Shaffer. Prepared by: Avery/Woods. Pages: 1 - 96. (certified copy) (dlb, )
March 21, 2005 Filing 634 MOTION to Withdraw Document and Substitute regarding 601 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Various Exhibits to Motions in Limine [Exhibits B and C to Motion in Limine #3; Exhibits A and B to Motion in Limine #5; Exhibits A, B and C to Motion in Limine #8] by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder.(dlb, )
March 21, 2005 Filing 633 MEMORANDUM referring to Magistrate Judge Shaffer : 587 MOTION to Withdraw Document regarding #570 MOTION to Compel filed by Lisa Simpson,, Anne Gilmore,, 604 MOTION to Seal filed by University of Colorado at Boulder,, 621 MOTION to Seal filed by University of Colorado at Boulder,, 631 MOTION For Extension of Time filed by Lisa Simpson,, Anne Gilmore,, 608 MOTION to Seal filed by University of Colorado at Boulder,, 624 MOTION to Seal filed by University of Colorado at Boulder,, 589 MOTION to Seal filed by Lisa Simpson,, Anne Gilmore,, 610 MOTION to Seal filed by University of Colorado at Boulder,, 612 MOTION to Seal filed by University of Colorado at Boulder,, 614 MOTION to Seal filed by University of Colorado at Boulder,, 596 MOTION to Seal filed by University of Colorado at Boulder,, 616 MOTION to Seal filed by University of Colorado at Boulder,, 600 MOTION to Seal filed by University of Colorado at Boulder,, 601 MOTION to Seal filed by University of Colorado at Boulder, by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 3/21/05. (dlb, )
March 21, 2005 Filing 632 MEMORANDUM referring to Magistrate Judge Shaffer : 619 MOTION to Seal filed by University of Colorado at Boulder, by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 3/21/05. (dlb, )
March 18, 2005 Filing 1027 TENDERED UNREDACTED COPY of Plas' MOTION for Order Directing Dft to Request the Release of Documents Provided to the Attorney General and Grand Jury and for Order Permitting Plaintiffs Access to Grand Jury Witness Transcripts *filed under seal, located in sealed area RE: 588 REDACTED COPY of Plas' MOTION for Order Directing Dft to Request the Release of Documents Provided to the Attorney General and Grand Jury and for Order Permitting Plaintiffs Access to Grand Jury Witness Transcripts (dlb, ) (evana, ). (Modified on 5/9/2018 to add the document to the original entry and to note that the document is no longer available in paper format in the Clerk's Office) (evana, ).
March 18, 2005 Filing 631 Plaintiffs' Joint Unopposed MOTION For Extension of Time to file Motion to Compel to 3/22/05 by Plaintiffs Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson. (dlb, )
March 18, 2005 Filing 627 NOTICE of Motion in Limine Index by University of Colorado at Boulder (dlb, )
March 18, 2005 Filing 626 MOTION in Limine #22 "Daubert" Motion in Limine to Exclude Testimony of Plas' Proposed Expert John Dibiaggio by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder. (dlb, )
March 18, 2005 Filing 625 MOTION in Limine #21 to Exclude the Testimony of Jim Martin by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder. (dlb, )
March 18, 2005 Filing 624 Unopposed MOTION to Seal MOTION in Limine #20 to Exclude Testimony of Plas' Proposed Expert David Stevens, Ph.D by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder (dlb, )
March 18, 2005 Filing 623 MOTION in Limine #20 to Exclude Testimony of Plas' Proposed Expert David Stevens, Ph.D by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder *filed under seal, located in sealed area (dlb, )
March 18, 2005 Filing 622 MOTION in Limine #19 to Preclude Evidence that refers to Post-December 7, 2001 events by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder. (dlb, )
March 18, 2005 Filing 621 Unopposed MOTION to Seal MOTION in Limine #18 to Supplement Motion in limine to Preclude Evidence of Other Incidents by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder (dlb, )
March 18, 2005 Filing 620 MOTION in Limine #18 to Supplement Motion in limine to Preclude Evidence of Other Incidents by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder *filed under seal, located in sealed area (dlb, )
March 18, 2005 Filing 619 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Exhibit A and B to 617 MOTION in Limine #17 to Exclude Testimony of Plas' Proposed Expert Todd W. Crosset by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder (dlb, )
March 18, 2005 Filing 618 Exhibit A and B to 617 MOTION in Limine #17 to Exclude Testimony of Plas' Proposed Expert Todd W. Crosset by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder *filed under seal, located in sealed area (dlb, )
March 18, 2005 Filing 617 MOTION in Limine #17 to Exclude Testimony of Plas' Proposed Expert Todd W. Crosset by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder (Exhbits filed under seal, located in sealed area) (dlb, ) (Text Modified on 3/21/2005 to indicate exhibits are under seal) (gms, ).
March 18, 2005 Filing 616 Unopposed MOTION to Seal MOTION in Limine #16 to Exclude Testimony of Plas' Proposed Expert Elyse Morgan, Ph.D by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder. (dlb, )
March 18, 2005 Filing 615 MOTION in Limine #16 to Exclude Testimony of Plas' Proposed Expert Elyse Morgan, Ph.D by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder *filed under seal, located in sealed area (dlb, )
March 18, 2005 Filing 614 Unopposed MOTION to Seal MOTION in Limine #15 to Exclude Testimony of Pla's Proposed Expert Dr. Schieve by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder. (dlb, )
March 18, 2005 Filing 613 MOTION in Limine #15 to Exclude Testimony of Pla's Proposed Expert Dr. Schieve by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder *filed under seal, located in sealed area (dlb, )
March 18, 2005 Filing 612 Unopposed MOTION to Seal MOTION in Limine #14 to Exclude Testimony of Plas' Proposed Expert Lee Scriggins by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder. (dlb, )
March 18, 2005 Filing 611 MOTION in Limine #14 to Exclude Testimony of Plas' Proposed Expert Lee Scriggins by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder *filed under seal, located in sealed area (dlb, )
March 18, 2005 Filing 610 Unopposed MOTION to Seal MOTION in Limine #13 to Exclude Testimony of Plas' Proposed Expert Marte McNally by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder. (dlb, )
March 18, 2005 Filing 609 MOTION in Limine #13 to Exclude Testimony of Plas' Proposed Expert Marte McNally by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder *filed under seal, located in sealed area (dlb, )
March 18, 2005 Filing 608 Unopposed MOTION to Seal MOTION in Limine #12 to Exclude Testimony of Plas' Proposed Expert Elizabeth Lazarus by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder. (dlb, )
March 18, 2005 Filing 607 MOTION in Limine #12 to Exclude Testimony of Plas' Proposed Expert Elizabeth Lazarus by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder *filed under seal, located in sealed area. (dlb, )
March 18, 2005 Filing 606 MOTION in Limine #11 to Exclude Testimony of Plas' Proposed Expert Mary T. Keenan, Esq. by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder. (dlb, )
March 18, 2005 Filing 605 MOTION in Limine #10 to Exclude Testimony of Pla's Proposed Expert Herman Houston by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder. (dlb, )
March 18, 2005 Filing 604 MOTION to file under Seal Exhibit A to 602 MOTION in Limine #9 to Exclude Testimony of Non-Party Witness by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder (dlb, )
March 18, 2005 Filing 603 Exhibit A to 602 MOTION in Limine #9 to Exclude Testimony of Non-Party Witness by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder *filed under seal, located in sealed area (dlb, ) (evana, ). (Modified on 5/8/2018 to add the document to the original entry and to note that the document is no longer available in paper format in the Clerk's Office) (evana, ).
March 18, 2005 Filing 602 MOTION in Limine #9 to Exclude Testimony of Non-Party Witness by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder. (dlb, )
March 18, 2005 Filing 601 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Various Exhibits to Motions in Limine [Exhibits B and C to Motion in Limine #3; Exhibits A and B to Motion in Limine #5; Exhibits A, B and C to Motion in Limine #8] by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder. (dlb, )
March 18, 2005 Filing 600 Unopposed MOTION to file Motions in Limine #4 to Exclude Evidence about which witnesses do not have personal knowledge and #7 to exclude improper opinion testimony by lay witnesses under Seal by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder. (dlb, )
March 18, 2005 Filing 599 Exhibit A, B and C to 598 MOTION in Limine #8 to Exclude Police Reports and Police Interviews by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder *filed under seal, located in sealed area (dlb, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/7/2018: #1 Continuation of Main Document Part 2 of 3, #2 Continuation of Main Document Part 3 of 3) (evana, ). (Modified on 5/7/2018 to add the document to the original entry and to note that the document is no longer available in paper format in the Clerk's Office) (evana, ).
March 18, 2005 Filing 598 MOTION in Limine #8 to Exclude Police Reports and Police Interviews by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder. (dlb, )
March 18, 2005 Filing 597 MOTION in Limine #7 to Exclude Improper Opinion Testimony by Lay Witnesses by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder *filed under seal, located in sealed area (dlb, )
March 18, 2005 Filing 596 MOTION to file under Seal MOTION in Limine #6 Omnibus Motion to Exclude Evidence under Fed.R.Evid. 401-403 by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder.(dlb, )
March 18, 2005 Filing 595 MOTION in Limine #6 Omnibus Motion to Exclude Evidence under Fed.R.Evid. 401-403 by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder *filed under seal, located in sealed area (dlb, )
March 18, 2005 Filing 594 Exhibit A and B to 593 MOTION in Limine #5 to exclude Newspaper and other media evidence by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder *filed under seal, located in sealed area (dlb, ) (evana, ). (Modified on 5/9/2018 to add the document to the original entry and to note that the document is no longer available in paper format in the Clerk's Office) (evana, ).
March 18, 2005 Filing 593 MOTION in Limine #5 to exclude Newspaper and other media evidence by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder. (dlb, )
March 18, 2005 Filing 592 MOTION in Limine #4 to exclude evidence about which witnesses do not have personal knowledge by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder *filed under seal, located in sealed area (dlb, )
March 18, 2005 Filing 591 Exhibit B and C to 590 MOTION in Limine #3 to exclude evidence of plaintiff Simpson's abondoned retaliation and publicity damages claims by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder *filed under seal, located in sealed area (dlb, ) (Text Modified on 3/22/2005 to correct to exhibits B and C)(gms, ). (evana, ). (Modified on 5/7/2018 to add the document to the original entry and to note that the document is no longer available in paper format in the Clerk's Office) (evana, ).
March 18, 2005 Filing 590 MOTION in Limine #3 to exclude evidence of plaintiff Simpson's abondoned retaliation and publicity damages claims by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder. (dlb, )
March 18, 2005 Filing 589 Unopposed MOTION for leave to file under Seal TENDERED UNREDACTED COPY of Plas' MOTION for Order Directing Dft to Request the Release of Documents Provided to the Attorney General and Grand Jury and for Order Permitting Plaintiffs Access to Grand Jury Witness Transcripts by Plaintiffs. (dlb, )
March 18, 2005 Filing 588 Plas' MOTION for Order Directing Dft to Request the Release of Documents Provided to the Attorney General and Grand Jury and for Order Permitting Plaintiffs Access to Grand Jury Witness Transcripts. (dlb, )
March 18, 2005 Filing 587 MOTION to Withdraw Previously filed #570 Pla's JOINT MOTION to Compel production of disciplinary records and Substitute with Motion to Compel Production of Disciplinary Records and Exhibits A, B and C Under Seal(dlb, )
March 18, 2005 Filing 586 Exhibit D to #570 Pla's JOINT MOTION to Compel production of disciplinary records by Plaintiffs (dlb, ) (evana, ). (Attached Restricted Document in error, to remain restricted(
March 18, 2005 TENDERED Plas' Motion to Compel Production of Disciplinary Records and Exhibits A, B and C *filed under seal, located in sealed area to 587 MOTION to Withdraw Previously filed #570 Pla's JOINT MOTION to Compel production of disciplinary records and Substitute with Motion to Compel Production of Disciplinary Records and Exhibits A, B and C Under Seal (dlb, )
March 17, 2005 Filing 630 REDACTED RESPONSE by plaintiff Simpson to 411 MOTION for Additional Discovery by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder(dlb, )
March 17, 2005 Filing 629 REDACTED RESPONSE by plaintiffs to 362 MOTION in Limine to preclude evidence of other incidents of alleged misconduct that fall outside the scope of Title IX by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder (dlb, )
March 17, 2005 Filing 628 REDACTED RESPONSE to 411 MOTION for Additional Discovery by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder filed by Plaintiff Anne Gilmore. (dlb, )
March 17, 2005 Filing 585 Exhibits B & D re 558 Pla's General MOTIONS in Limine re: conduct *filed under seal, located in sealed area (dlb, ) (evana, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/7/2018: #1 Continuation of Main Document) (evana, ). (Modified on 5/7/2018 to add the document to the original entry and to note that the document is no longer available in paper format in the Clerk's Office) (evana, ).
March 17, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 584 MEMORANDUM ORDER: GRANTING 507 MOTION to Withdraw Document regarding 441 RESPONSE in Opposition re 411 MOTION for Additional Discovery by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder filed by Plaintiff Lisa Simpson and SUBSTITUTE with Redacted Response in opposition by Plaintiff Anne Gilmore. GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 509 MOTION to Seal EXHIBITS A & B to Plaintiff Gilmore's Motion to Withdraw previously filed response in opp to dft's mtn for add'l discovery filed 1/4/05 and SUBSTITUTE with redacted response.... by Plaintiff Anne Gilmore. GRANTING 510 MOTION to Withdraw Document regarding 441 RESPONSE in Opposition re 411 MOTION for Additional Discovery by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder filed by Plaintiff Lisa Simpson and SUBSTITUTE with redacted response in opposition by Plaintiff Lisa Simpson. GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 512 MOTION to Seal EXHIBIT A & B to MOTION to Withdraw Document regarding 441 RESPONSE in Opposition re 411 MOTION for Additional Discovery by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder filed by Plaintiff Lisa Simpson and SUBSTITUTE with redacted response in opposition by Plaintiff Lisa Simpson. In order to insure that the record is complete...I will DENY Pla Gilmore's and Pla Simpson's Motions for Leave to Withdraw previously filed response in opp to dft University?s motion for add'l discovery. GRANTING 438 Unopposed MOTION for leave to file under Seal Exhibits C,D and E to pla's resp in opp to dft's mtn for add'l discovery by Plaintiff Anne Gilmore and 442 Unopposed MOTION for leave to file under Seal response in opposition to dft's mtn for additional discovery by Plaintiff Lisa Simpson. GRANTING 447 Unopposed MOTION for leave to file Exhibits A, D and E to pla's resp in opp under Seal by Plaintiffs Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson. DENYING 477 MOTION for Protective Order (Exhibit A filed under seal, located in sealed area) by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder. GRANTING 506 MOTION for leave to file under Seal Exhibits A and B to pla's joint resp in opp to dft's mtn for protective order by Plaintiffs Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson. GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 513 MOTION to Withdraw Document regarding 445 Pla's RESPONSE in opposition to 387 MOTION in Limine to preclude evidence of other incidents of alleged misconduct that fall outside the scope of Title IX by Defendant and SUBSTITUTE redacted response in opposition by Plaintiffs Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson. In light of the foregoing rulings Denver Publishing Company's 462 Objection (RESPONSE) and 533 Objection (RESPONSE) are OVERRULED. GRANTING 499 MOTION to Intervene to oppose the dft's motion for protective order by Interested Party Denver Publishing Company was GRANTED in open court on 2/10/05. Signed by Magistrate Judge Craig B Shaffer on 3/17/05. (dlb, ) (Modified on 9/22/2005 to correct typo)(dlb, ).
March 16, 2005 Filing 583 MEMORANDUM referring to Magistrate Judge Shaffer : 581 MOTION to Seal filed by Lisa Simpson,, Anne Gilmore, by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 3/16/05. (dlb, )
March 15, 2005 Filing 581 MOTION for leave to file Plas' Joint Motion to Compel Production of Disciplinary records under Seal by Plaintiffs Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson. (dlb, )
March 15, 2005 Filing 580 SUPPLEMENT (signature page) to #570 Pla's JOINT MOTION to Compel production of disciplinary records *filed uner seal, located in sealed area (dlb, )
March 15, 2005 Filing 579 SUPPLEMENT (signature page) to 563 Plaintiff Gilmore's MOTION in Limine #4 *filed under seal, located in sealed area(dlb, )
March 15, 2005 Filing 578 MEMORANDUM referring to Magistrate Judge Shaffer : 568 MOTION to Seal filed by Lisa Simpson,, Anne Gilmore,, 554 MOTION to Seal filed by Lisa Simpson,, 557 MOTION to Seal filed by Lisa Simpson,, #570 MOTION to Compel filed by Lisa Simpson,, Anne Gilmore,, 577 MOTION to Compel filed by Lisa Simpson,, Anne Gilmore,, 559 MOTION to Seal filed by Lisa Simpson, by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 3/15/05. (dlb, )
March 14, 2005 Filing 582 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Craig B Shaffer : Telephonic Discovery Hearing held on 3/14/2005. Deadline for filing Motions in Limine is extended to 3/18/05. (Court Reporter FTR Reporter Deck - Ctrm A402.) (dlb, )
March 14, 2005 Filing 577 Plaintiffs' Joint MOTION to Compel defendant to produce documents requested in discovery.(dlb, )
March 14, 2005 Filing 576 Plaintiff Simpson's RESPONSE in opposition to 540 MOTION to Seal dft's mtn for protective order by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder. (dlb, )
March 14, 2005 Filing 575 Plaintiffs' Joint RESPONSE in opposition to 548 MOTION to Seal two motions filed by Plaintiffs by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder. (dlb, )
March 14, 2005 Filing 574 Plaintiff Simpson's RESPONSE in Opposition to 537 MOTION for Protective Order to prohibit the deposition upon written questions of witness by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder. (dlb, )
March 14, 2005 Filing 573 Plaintiff Simpson's Additional MOTIONS in Limine (dlb, )
March 14, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 572 MINUTE ORDER setting Status Conference set for 3/25/2005 03:30 PM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B Shaffer. Hearing concerning various pending motions and motions to withdraw. No telephonic appearances will be permitted by Magistrate Judge Craig B Shaffer on 3/14/05. (dlb, )
March 14, 2005 Filing 571 MEMORANDUM referring to Magistrate Judge Shaffer : 546 MOTION to Seal Supplemental Response Brief in Opposition to Dfts Motion for Sum Jgm, filed by Lisa Simpson, Anne Gilmore, 547 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Joint Motion for Sanctions, filed by Lisa Simpson, Anne Gilmore, 548 MOTION to Seal to motions, University of Colorado at Boulder, #545 Joint MOTION for Sanctions filed by Lisa Simpson, Anne Gilmore, by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 3/14/05. (erv, )
March 14, 2005 Filing 570 Pla's JOINT MOTION to Compel production of disciplinary records *filed uner seal, located in sealed area(dlb, ) (evana, ). (Modified on 5/10/2018 to add the document to the original entry and to note that the document is no longer available in paper format in the Clerk's Office) (evana, ).
March 14, 2005 Filing 569 CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE by Plaintiff Anne Gilmore re 561 MOTION in Limine, 562 MOTION in Limine, 563 MOTION in Limine, 564 MOTION in Limine, 565 MOTION in Limine, 566 MOTION in Limine, 567 MOTION in Limine, 560 MOTION in Limine 1 through 8. (dlb, )
March 14, 2005 Filing 568 Plaintiff Gilmore's MOTION for leave to file under Seal Motions in Limine #1 through #8 (dlb, )
March 14, 2005 Filing 567 Plaintiff Gilmore's MOTION in Limine #8 *filed under seal, located in sealed area (dlb, )
March 14, 2005 Filing 566 Plaintiff Gilmore's MOTION in Limine #7 *filed under seal, located in sealed area (dlb, )
March 14, 2005 Filing 565 Plaintiff Gilmore's MOTION in Limine #6 *filed under seal, located in sealed area (dlb, )
March 14, 2005 Filing 564 Plaintiff Gilmore's MOTION in Limine #5 *filed under seal, located in sealed area(dlb, )
March 14, 2005 Filing 563 Plaintiff Gilmore's MOTION in Limine #4 *filed under seal, located in sealed area (dlb, )
March 14, 2005 Filing 562 Plaintiff Gilmore's MOTION in Limine #3 *filed under seal, located in sealed area (dlb, )
March 14, 2005 Filing 561 Plaintiff Gilmore's MOTION in Limine #2 *filed under seal, located in sealed area(dlb, )
March 14, 2005 Filing 560 Plaintiff Gilmore's MOTION in Limine #1 *filed under seal, located in sealed area(dlb, )
March 14, 2005 Filing 559 Unopposed MOTION for leave to file under Seal Pla's General Motions in Limine. (dlb, )
March 14, 2005 Filing 558 Pla's General MOTIONS in Limine re: conduct *filed under seal, located in sealed area (dlb, ) (Text Modified on 3/16/2005 to add re: conduct) (gms, ).
March 14, 2005 Filing 557 Unopposed MOTION for leave to file under Seal MOTION in Limine to preclude certain opinions of defense Psychiatrict Barkhorn by Plaintiff Lisa Simpson. (dlb, )
March 14, 2005 Filing 556 MOTION in Limine to preclude certain opinions of defense Psychiatrict Barkhorn by Plaintiff Lisa Simpson *filed under seal, located in sealed area (dlb, )
March 14, 2005 Filing 555 CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE by Plaintiff Lisa Simpson re 552 MOTION in Limine for order precluding introduction of irrelevant evidence regarding Ms. Simpson's Childhood by Plaintiff Lisa Simpson and 553 MOTION in Limine regarding inadmissable evidence under FRE 412 by Plaintiffs Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson (dlb, )
March 14, 2005 Filing 554 Unopposed MOTION for leave to file under Seal Pla's motion in limine for order precluding introduction of irrelevant evidence regarding Ms. Simpson's Childhood by Plaintiff Lisa Simpson. (dlb, )
March 14, 2005 Filing 553 MOTION in Limine regarding inadmissable evidence under FRE 412 by Plaintiffs Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson. (dlb, )
March 14, 2005 Filing 552 MOTION in Limine for order precluding introduction of irrelevant evidence regarding Ms. Simpson's Childhood by Plaintiff Lisa Simpson *filed under seal, located in sealed area (dlb, )
March 14, 2005 Filing 551 AMENDED DOCUMENT [Replacement Page 4, Exhibit B, Exhibit R, Affidavit of Monique Gillaspie (originally included as Exhibit B, but renamed Exhibit R)] by Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson. Amendment to #545 JOINT MOTION for Sanctions by Plaintiffs Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson *filed under seal, located in sealed area (dlb, )
March 11, 2005 Filing 548 MOTION to Seal two motions filed by Plaintiffs by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder. (dlb, )
March 11, 2005 Filing 547 Unopposed MOTION for leave to file Joint motion for sanctions and to Seal by Plaintiffs Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson [*motion filed under seal, located in sealed area] (dlb, ) (Modified on 9/26/2005 to indicate UNSEALED pursuant to Courtroom minutes dated 9/21/05, #837)(dlb, ).
March 11, 2005 Filing 546 MOTION for leave to file supplemental response and brief in opposition to dft's mtn for sum jgm and to Seal by Plaintiffs Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson [*motion filed under seal, located in sealed area](dlb, ) (Modified on 9/26/2005 to indicate UNSEALED pursuant to courtroom minutes dated 9/21/05, #837) (dlb, ).
March 11, 2005 Filing 545 JOINT MOTION for Sanctions by Plaintiffs Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson *filed under seal, located in sealed area (dlb, ) (evana, ). (Modified on 5/8/2018 to add the document to the original entry and to note that the document is no longer available in paper format in the Clerk's Office) (evana, ).
March 11, 2005 Filing 544 Supplemental RESPONSE and brief in opposition to 219 University of Colorado's MOTION for summary judgment purs to Rule 56, Fed.R.Civ.P. on the single Title IX claim in the consolidated complaints by Plaintiffs Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson *filed under seal, located in sealed area (dlb, ) (Modified on 9/26/2005 to indicate the response itself is UNSEALED - the Exhibits remain SEALED pursuant to courtroom minutes dated 9/21/05, #837) (dlb, ).
March 10, 2005 Filing 550 RESPONSE in opposition to 530 MOTION for Protective Order prohibiting the third deposition of Robert Chichester by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder filed by Plaintiff Anne Gilmore (dlb, )
March 10, 2005 Filing 549 Objection (RESPONSE) to [540 ] MOTION to Seal dft's mtn for protective order by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder; 539 MOTION to Seal dft's reply in support of MOTION to Strike plaintiff Simpson's Supplemental Rule 26(a0(1) disclosures served on 1/31/05 and portions of plaintiff Simpson's Second Amended Witness List served on 2/4/05 by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder filed by Interested Party Denver Publishing Company. (dlb, )
March 10, 2005 Filing 542 RESPONSE to 530 MOTION for Protective Order prohibiting the third deposition of Robert Chichester by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder filed by Plaintiff Lisa Simpson. (dlb, )
March 10, 2005 MOTION for Leave to take Robert Chichester's Trial Preservation Deposition by Plaintiff Lisa Simpson. (dlb, )
March 9, 2005 Filing 543 MEMORANDUM referring to Magistrate Judge Shaffer : 539 MOTION to Seal filed by University of Colorado at Boulder, by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 3/9/05. (dlb, )
March 8, 2005 Filing 539 MOTION to Seal dft's reply in support of MOTION to Strike plaintiff Simpson's Supplemental Rule 26(a0(1) disclosures served on 1/31/05 and portions of plaintiff Simpson's Second Amended Witness List served on 2/4/05 by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder. (dlb, )
March 8, 2005 Filing 538 Dft's REPLY in support of 494 MOTION to Strike plaintiff Simpson's Supplemental Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures served on 1/31/05 and portions of plaintiff Simpson's Second Amended Witness List served on 2/4/05. (dlb, ) (Modified on 5/9/2005 to indicate reply Ordered unsealed pursuant to Order dated 5/6/05, #719) (dlb).
March 7, 2005 Filing 541 MEMORANDUM referring to Magistrate Judge Shaffer : 523 MOTION to Seal filed by Lisa Simpson,, 539 MOTION to Seal filed by University of Colorado at Boulder,, 540 MOTION to Seal filed by University of Colorado at Boulder, by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 3/7/05. (dlb, )
March 4, 2005 Filing 540 MOTION to Seal dft's mtn for protective order by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder. (dlb, )
March 4, 2005 Filing 537 MOTION for Protective Order to prohibit the deposition upon written questions of witness by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder *filed under seal, located in sealed area (dlb, )
March 3, 2005 Filing 536 Consolidated REPLY to Plas' Separate Responses to 483 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder. (gms, )
March 2, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 535 MEMORANDUM ORDER : 462 Objection (RESPONSE) to 452 Stipulated MOTION to file exhibit lists and witness lists to proposed final pretrial order under Seal by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder, Plaintiffs Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson; 447 Unopposed MOTION for leave to file Exhibits A, D and E to pla's resp in opp under Seal by Plaintiffs Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson; 442 Unopposed MOTION for leave to file under Seal response in opposition to dft's mtn for additional discovery by Plaintiff Lisa Simpson by Denver Publishing Company is OVERRULED; 452 Stipulated MOTION to file exhibit lists and witness lists to proposed final pretrial order under Seal by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder, Plaintiffs Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Craig B Shaffer on 3/2/05. (dlb, )
February 24, 2005 Filing 533 Objection (RESPONSE) to 506 MOTION for leave to file under Seal Exhibits A and B to pla's joint resp in opp to dft's mtn for protective order by Plaintiffs Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson; 509 MOTION to Seal EXHIBITS A & B to Plaintiff Gilmore's Motion to Withdraw previously filed response in opp to dft's mtn for add'l discovery filed 1/4/05 (under seal) and SUBSTITUTE with redacted response.... by Plaintiff Anne Gilmore; 512 MOTION to Seal EXHIBIT A & B to MOTION to Withdraw Document regarding 441 RESPONSE in Opposition re 411 MOTION for Additional Discovery by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder filed by Plaintiff Lisa Simpson (under seal) and SUBSTITUTE with redacted response in opposition by Plaintiff Lisa Simpson; 515 MOTION to Seal EXHIBIT A & B to MOTION to Withdraw Document regarding 441 RESPONSE in Opposition re 411 MOTION for Additional Discovery by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder filed by Plaintiff Lisa Simpson (under seal) and SUBSTITUTE with redacted response in opposition by Plaintiffs Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson; 517 MOTION to Seal EXHIBIT A through C of Dft's Proposed redactions to 441 RESPONSE in Opposition re 411 MOTION for Additional Discovery by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder filed by Plaintiff Lisa Simpson; 436 RESPONSE in opposition to 411 MOTION for Additional Discovery by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder filed by Plaintiff Anne Gilmore; 446 EXHIBITS A, D and E to plas' response in opposition to dft's mtn in limine to preclude evidence of other incidents by Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson by University of Colorado at Boulder; 523 MOTION to Seal pla's resp to motion to strike.. suppl Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures by Plaintiff Lisa Simpson filed by Interested Party Denver Publishing Company. (dlb, )
February 24, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 532 MEMORANDUM referring to Magistrate Judge Shaffer : 530 MOTION for Protective Order filed by University of Colorado at Boulder, by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 2/24/05. (erv, )
February 24, 2005 Filing 531 MEMORANDUM referring to Magistrate Judge Shaffer : 527 MOTION for Joinder in Pla Lisa Simpson's Response to Dfts Motion to Strike, Pla Simpson's Supplemental Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures, filed by Anne Gilmore, by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 2/24/05. (erv, )
February 24, 2005 Filing 530 MOTION for Protective Order prohibiting the third deposition of Robert Chichester by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder. (dlb, )
February 24, 2005 Filing 529 RESPONSE in opposition to 483 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder filed by Plaintiff Anne Gilmore. (dlb, )
February 24, 2005 Filing 528 Simpson's RESPONSE to 483 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder. (dlb, )
February 23, 2005 Filing 527 MOTION for Join in Pla Simpson's response to dft's mtn to strike pla's supplemental Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures by Plaintiff Anne Gilmore. (dlb, )
February 23, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 526 ORDER granting 521 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to 2/24/05 483 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder by Plaintiff Anne Gilmore. Signed by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 2/23/05. (dlb, )
February 23, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 525 ORDER granting 519 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to 2/24/05 483 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder by Plaintiff Lisa Simpson. Signed by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 2/23/05. (dlb, )
February 23, 2005 Filing 524 REPLY in support of 477 MOTION for Protective Order (Exhibit A filed under seal, located in sealed area) by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder filed by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder. (dlb, )
February 23, 2005 Filing 523 MOTION to Seal pla's resp to motion to strike.. suppl Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures by Plaintiff Lisa Simpson. (dlb, )
February 23, 2005 Filing 522 Pla's RESPONSE to 494 MOTION to Strike plaintiff Simpson's Supplemental Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures served on 1/31/05 and portions of plaintiff Simpson's Second Amended Witness List served on 2/4/05 by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder (dlb, ) (Modified on 5/9/2005 to indicate response Ordered unsealed pursuant to order dated 5/6/05, #719) (dlb).
February 22, 2005 Filing 521 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to 2/24/05 483 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder by Plaintiff Anne Gilmore. (dlb, )
February 22, 2005 Filing 520 MEMORANDUM referring to Magistrate Judge Shaffer : 512 MOTION to Seal filed by Lisa Simpson,, 513 MOTION to Withdraw Document regarding 445 Response to Motion filed by Lisa Simpson,, Anne Gilmore,, 507 MOTION to Withdraw Document regarding 441 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by Anne Gilmore,, 515 MOTION to Seal filed by Lisa Simpson,, Anne Gilmore,, 509 MOTION to Seal filed by Anne Gilmore,, 510 MOTION to Withdraw Document regarding 441 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by Lisa Simpson,, 517 MOTION to Seal filed by University of Colorado at Boulder, by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 2/22/05. (dlb, )
February 22, 2005 Filing 519 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to 2/24/05 483 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder by Plaintiff Lisa Simpson. (dlb, )
February 18, 2005 Filing 517 MOTION to Seal EXHIBIT A through C of Dft's Proposed redactions to 441 RESPONSE in Opposition re 411 MOTION for Additional Discovery by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder filed by Plaintiff Lisa Simpson; 436 RESPONSE in opposition to 411 MOTION for Additional Discovery by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder filed by Plaintiff Anne Gilmore; 446 EXHIBITS A, D and E to plas' response in opposition to dft's mtn in limine to preclude evidence of other incidents by Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson by University of Colorado at Boulder (dlb, )
February 18, 2005 Filing 516 EXHIBIT A through C of Dft's Proposed redactions to 441 RESPONSE in Opposition re 411 MOTION for Additional Discovery by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder filed by Plaintiff Lisa Simpson; 436 RESPONSE in opposition to 411 MOTION for Additional Discovery by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder filed by Plaintiff Anne Gilmore; 446 EXHIBITS A, D and E to plas' response in opposition to dft's mtn in limine to preclude evidence of other incidents by Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson by University of Colorado at Boulder *filed under seal, located in sealed area(dlb, )
February 18, 2005 Filing 515 MOTION to Seal EXHIBIT A & B to MOTION to Withdraw Document regarding 441 RESPONSE in Opposition re 411 MOTION for Additional Discovery by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder filed by Plaintiff Lisa Simpson (under seal) and SUBSTITUTE with redacted response in opposition by Plaintiffs Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson. (dlb, )
February 18, 2005 Filing 514 EXHIBITS A & B to MOTION to Withdraw Document regarding 445 Pla's RESPONSE in opposition to 387 MOTION in Limine to preclude evidence of other incidents of alleged misconduct that fall outside the scope of Title IX by Defendant and SUBSTITUTE redacted response in opposition by Plaintiffs Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson (Pursuant to Order of 3/17/05, Doc #584,Exhibit A and all exhibits thereto, with the exception of Exhibit A (contained within Exhibit A) attached to that response in opposition #515 and Exhibit B are unsealed. Exhibit A contained within Exhibit A is SEALED and placed with the SEALED Documents)(dlb, ) (Text Modified on 3/21/2005 to indicate which exhibits are sealed and unsealed)(gms, ).
February 18, 2005 Filing 513 MOTION to Withdraw Document regarding 445 Pla's RESPONSE in opposition to 387 MOTION in Limine to preclude evidence of other incidents of alleged misconduct that fall outside the scope of Title IX by Defendant and SUBSTITUTE redacted response in opposition by Plaintiffs Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson. (dlb, )
February 18, 2005 Filing 512 MOTION to Seal EXHIBIT A & B to MOTION to Withdraw Document regarding 441 RESPONSE in Opposition re 411 MOTION for Additional Discovery by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder filed by Plaintiff Lisa Simpson (under seal) and SUBSTITUTE with redacted response in opposition by Plaintiff Lisa Simpson (dlb, )
February 18, 2005 Filing 511 EXHIBIT A & B to MOTION to Withdraw Document regarding 441 RESPONSE in Opposition re 411 MOTION for Additional Discovery by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder filed by Plaintiff Lisa Simpson and SUBSTITUTE with redacted response in opposition by Plaintiff Lisa Simpson (Pursuant to Order of 3/17/05, Doc #584, Exhibit A and all exhibits thereto, with exception of Exhibit G (contained within Exhibit A) to pla's Simpson's motion for leave to file under seal #512, are unsealed. Exhibit G (contained within Exhibit A) and Exhibit B are SEALED and have been placed with the SEALED documents)(dlb, ) (Modified on 3/21/2005 to indicate which exhibits are sealed and unsealed) (gms, ).
February 18, 2005 Filing 510 MOTION to Withdraw Document regarding 441 RESPONSE in Opposition re 411 MOTION for Additional Discovery by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder filed by Plaintiff Lisa Simpson (under seal) and SUBSTITUTE with redacted response in opposition by Plaintiff Lisa Simpson. (dlb, )
February 18, 2005 Filing 509 MOTION to Seal EXHIBITS A & B to Plaintiff Gilmore's Motion to Withdraw previously filed response in opp to dft's mtn for add'l discovery filed 1/4/05 (under seal) and SUBSTITUTE with redacted response.... by Plaintiff Anne Gilmore. (dlb, )
February 18, 2005 Filing 508 EXHIBITS A & B to Plaintiff Gilmore's Motion to Withdraw previously filed response in opp to dft's mtn for add'l discovery filed 1/4/05 and SUBSTITUTE with redacted response (Pursuant to Order of 3/17/05, Doc #584, Exhibit A and all exhibits thereto to pla Gilmore's motion to withdraw #509 is unsealed. Exhibit B is to remain under SEAL and has been placed with the SEALED Documents) (dlb, ) (Text Modified on 3/21/2005 to indicate which exhibits are unsealed and sealed) (gms, ).
February 18, 2005 Filing 507 MOTION to Withdraw Document regarding 441 RESPONSE in Opposition re 411 MOTION for Additional Discovery by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder filed by Plaintiff Lisa Simpson and SUBSTITUTE with Redacted Response in opposition *filed under seal, located in sealed area by Plaintiff Anne Gilmore. (dlb, )
February 18, 2005 TENDERED Proposed Redactions to Pla Simpson's Response in Opposition to 441 RESPONSE in Opposition re 411 MOTION for Additional Discovery by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder filed by Plaintiff Lisa Simpson; 436 RESPONSE in opposition to 411 MOTION for Additional Discovery by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder filed by Plaintiff Anne Gilmore; 446 EXHIBITS A, D and E to plas' response in opposition to dft's mtn in limine to preclude evidence of other incidents by Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder *original routed to chambers (dlb, )
February 17, 2005 Filing 518 MEMORANDUM referring to Magistrate Judge Shaffer : 506 MOTION to Seal filed by Lisa Simpson,, Anne Gilmore, by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 2/17/05. (dlb, )
February 16, 2005 Filing 506 MOTION for leave to file under Seal Exhibits A and B to pla's joint resp in opp to dft's mtn for protective order by Plaintiffs Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson. (dlb, )
February 16, 2005 Filing 505 Pla's EXHIBITS A & B to Pla's joint response in opp to dft's mtn for protective order to designate the deposition of Steven Snyder as confidential *filed under seal, located in sealed area (dlb, )
February 16, 2005 Filing 504 Pla's Joint RESPONSE to 477 MOTION for Protective Order to designate the deposition of Steven Snyder confidential by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder(dlb, )
February 14, 2005 Filing 503 Objection (RESPONSE) to 495 Unopposed MOTION to file motion to strike under Seal by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder filed by Interested Party Denver Publishing Company. (dlb, )
February 11, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 502 MEMORANDUM ORDER denying 470 Plas' Joint Motion for Protective Order. The proposed preservation deposition will proceed without restrictions on the scope of counsels' etc . Signed by Magistrate Judge Craig B Shaffer on 2/11/05. (pap, )
February 10, 2005 Filing 534 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Craig B Shaffer : Motion Hearing held on 2/10/2005. 442 MOTION for Joinder in pla Simpson's response in opp to dft's mtn in limine to exlcude "IIC" report by Plaintiff Anne Gilmore is HELD IN ABEYANCE; 441 RESPONSE in Opposition re 411 MOTION for Additional Discovery by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder filed by Plaintiff Lisa Simpson is SEALED; 44 Unopposed MOTION for leave to file Exhibits A, D and E to pla's resp in opp under Seal by Plaintiffs Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson is HELD IN ABEYANCE; 446 EXHIBITS A, D and E to plas' response in opposition to dft's mtn in limine to preclude evidence of other incidents by Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson is SEALED; 478 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Exhibit A to dft's mtn for protective order by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder is HELD IN ABEYANCE; 452 Stipulated MOTION to file exhibit lists and witness lists to proposed final pretrial order under Seal by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder, Plaintiffs Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson is GRANTED; 471 Unopposed MOTION to Seal plas' joint motion for protective order by Plaintiffs Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson is GRANTED; 470 Plas' Joint MOTION for Protective Order that the deposition of John Grefe not be had by Plaintiffs Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson is DENIED and is SEALED. The motions hearing and pretrial conference are set for 4/27/05 at 9:00 a.m. (Court Reporter FTR Reporter Deck - Ctrm A402.) (dlb, )
February 10, 2005 Opinion or Order ORDER 442 MOTION for Joinder in pla Simpson's response in opp to dft's mtn in limine to exlcude "IIC" report by Plaintiff Anne Gilmore is HELD IN ABEYANCE; 441 RESPONSE in Opposition re 411 MOTION for Additional Discovery by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder filed by Plaintiff Lisa Simpson is SEALED; 44 Unopposed MOTION for leave to file Exhibits A, D and E to pla's resp in opp under Seal by Plaintiffs Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson is HELD IN ABEYANCE; 446 EXHIBITS A, D and E to plas' response in opposition to dft's mtn in limine to preclude evidence of other incidents by Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson is SEALED; 478 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Exhibit A to dft's mtn for protective order by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder is HELD IN ABEYANCE; 452 Stipulated MOTION to file exhibit lists and witness lists to proposed final pretrial order under Seal by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder, Plaintiffs Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson is GRANTED; 471 Unopposed MOTION to Seal plas' joint motion for protective order by Plaintiffs Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson is GRANTED; 470 Plas' Joint MOTION for Protective Order that the deposition of John Grefe not be had by Plaintiffs Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson is DENIED and is SEALED. The motions hearing and pretrial conference are set for 4/27/05 at 9:00 a.m. pursuant to courtroom minutes dated 2/10/05, #534. . Signed by Magistrate Judge Craig B Shaffer on 2/10/05. (dlb, )
February 10, 2005 Filing 501 MEMORANDUM referring to Magistrate Judge Shaffer : 499 MOTION to Intervene filed by Denver Publishing Company, by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 2/10/05. (dlb, )
February 10, 2005 Filing 499 MOTION to Intervene to oppose the dft's motion for protective order by Interested Party Denver Publishing Company. (dlb, )
February 10, 2005 Filing 498 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority by Denver Publishing Company re 462 Objection (RESPONSE) to 452 Stipulated MOTION to file exhibit lists and witness lists to proposed final pretrial order under Seal by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder, Plaintiffs Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson; 447 Unopposed MOTION for leave to file Exhibits A, D and E to pla's resp in opp under Seal by Plaintiffs Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson; 442 Unopposed MOTION for leave to file under Seal response in opposition to dft's mtn for additional discovery by Plaintiff Lisa Simpson by Denver Publishing Company; 472 Denver Publishing Company's Objection (RESPONSE) to 470 Plas' Joint MOTION for Protective Order that the deposition of John Grefe not be had by Plaintiffs Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson *filed under seal, located in sealed area;(dlb, )
February 10, 2005 Filing 497 Opposition (RESPONSE) to 477 MOTION for Protective Order (Exhibit A filed under seal, located in sealed area) by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder filed by Interested Party Denver Publishing Company. (dlb, )
February 9, 2005 Filing 500 MEMORANDUM referring to Magistrate Judge Shaffer : 494 MOTION to Strike filed by University of Colorado at Boulder,, 495 MOTION to Seal filed by University of Colorado at Boulder, by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 2/9/05. (dlb, )
February 9, 2005 Filing 496 Objection (RESPONSE) to 490 Unopposed MOTION to file under Seal dft's resp to pla's mtn for proto that the depo of John Grefe not be had by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder filed by Interested Party Denver Publishing Company. (dlb, )
February 8, 2005 Filing 495 Unopposed MOTION to file motion to strike under Seal by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder. (dlb, )
February 8, 2005 Filing 494 MOTION to Strike plaintiff Simpson's Supplemental Rule 26(a0(1) disclosures served on 1/31/05 and portions of plaintiff Simpson's Second Amended Witness List served on 2/4/05 by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder (dlb) (Modified on 5/9/2005 to indicate document unsealed pursuant to order on 5/6/05, #719 and clarification from chambers) (dlb).
February 7, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 493 MINUTE ORDER striking 491 MOTION to Intervene to oppose the dft's motion for protective order by Interested Party Denver Publishing Company by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 2/7/05. (dlb, )
February 7, 2005 Filing 488 TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing held on January 11, 2005 before Judge Craig B. Shaffer. Prepared by: Avery/Woods. Pages: 1 - 133. (certified copy) (dlb, )
February 4, 2005 Filing 492 MEMORANDUM referring to Magistrate Judge Shaffer : 490 MOTION to Seal filed by University of Colorado at Boulder, by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 2/4/05. (dlb, )
February 4, 2005 Filing 491 MOTION to Intervene to oppose the dft's motion for protective order by Interested Party Denver Publishing Company. (dlb, )
February 3, 2005 RESPONSE to 470 Plas' Joint MOTION for Protective Order that the deposition of John Grefe not be had by Plaintiffs Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson *filed under seal, located in sealed area filed by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder. (dlb, )
February 3, 2005 Filing 490 Unopposed MOTION to file under Seal dft's resp to pla's mtn for proto that the depo of John Grefe not be had by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder. (dlb, )
February 3, 2005 Filing 489 Dft's RESPONSE to 470 Expedited Amended MOTION to Continue Trial by Plaintiff Verdean Rogers *filed under seal, located in sealed area.(dlb, )
February 2, 2005 Filing 487 Objection (RESPONSE) to 478 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Exhibit A to dft's mtn for protective order by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder filed by Interested Party Denver Publishing Company. (dlb, )
February 1, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 485 MINUTE ORDER re: 477 MOTION for Protective Order (Exhibit A filed under seal, located in sealed area) by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder; plas to respond by 2/17/05 by Magistrate Judge Craig B Shaffer on 2/1/05. (dlb, )
February 1, 2005 Filing 484 RETURN OF SERVICE of subpoena(s) filed by Plaintiff Lisa Simpson executed upon Jesse Lamonte Wallace on 1/29/05 by personally (dlb, )
February 1, 2005 Filing 483 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder. (dlb, )
January 31, 2005 Filing 486 MEMORANDUM referring to Magistrate Judge Shaffer : 478 MOTION to Seal filed by University of Colorado at Boulder, by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 1/31/05. (dlb, )
January 31, 2005 Filing 482 Denver Publishing Company's Objection (RESPONSE) to 470 Plas' Joint MOTION for Protective Order that the deposition of John Grefe not be had by Plaintiffs Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson *filed under seal, located in sealed area; 472 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Exhibit A to dft's reply re: motion in limine to preclude evidence of other incidents...that fall outside the Scope of Title IX by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder.(dlb, )
January 31, 2005 Filing 481 University of colorado's RESPONSE to Denver Publishing Company's OBJECTIONS to 447 Stipulated MOTION to file exhibit lists and witness lists to proposed final pretrial order under Seal by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder, Plaintiffs Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson; 447 Unopposed MOTION for leave to file Exhibits A, D and E to pla's resp in opp under Seal by Plaintiffs Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson; 442 Unopposed MOTION for leave to file under Seal response in opposition to dft's mtn for additional discovery by Plaintiff Lisa Simpson(dlb, )
January 31, 2005 Filing 480 Joint Response (REPLY) to Denver Publishing Companys' Objection (Response) to 447 Stipulated MOTION to file exhibit lists and witness lists to proposed final pretrial order under Seal by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder, Plaintiffs Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson; 447 Unopposed MOTION for leave to file Exhibits A, D and E to pla's resp in opp under Seal by Plaintiffs Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson; 442 Unopposed MOTION for leave to file under Seal response in opposition to dft's mtn for additional discovery by Plaintiff Lisa Simpson. (dlb, )
January 28, 2005 Filing 478 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Exhibit A to dft's mtn for protective order by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder. (dlb, )
January 28, 2005 Filing 477 MOTION for Protective Order (Exhibit A filed under seal, located in sealed area) by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder. (dlb, )
January 27, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 479 MINUTE ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion 470 Plas' Joint MOTION for Protective Order that the deposition of John Grefe not be had by Plaintiffs Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson *filed under seal, located in sealed area; dft shall respond by 2/3/05; a reply will not be necessary; Motion Hearing set for 2/10/2005 01:30 PM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B Shaffer by Magistrate Judge Craig B Shaffer on 1/27/05. (dlb, )
January 25, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 476 MEMORANDUM referring to Magistrate Judge Shaffer : 470 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Lisa Simpson,, Anne Gilmore,, 471 MOTION to Seal filed by Lisa Simpson,, Anne Gilmore,, 472 MOTION to Seal filed by University of Colorado at Boulder, by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 1/25/05. (dlb, )
January 25, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 475 RECEIPT for Exhibits ordered returned re: MINUTE ORDER granting 392 MOTION to Withdraw Exhibit C filed on 12/7/04 and substitute with Exhibit C filed under seal re: 382 Plas' Joint MOTION to Compel dft to produce docs requested in discovery and for sanctions for failing to produce those and other documents *Exhibit C removed, filed under seal and located in sealed area and Motion to SEAL by Plaintiffs. 395 Unopposed MOTION for leave to file under Seal pla's response to dft's mtn to compel the completion of depo of Elizabeth Lazarus by Plaintiff Lisa Simpson. 397 Unopposed MOTION for leave to file under Seal pla's response in opp to dft's mtn to strike portions of pla's fifth supplemental Rule 26(A)(1) disclosures by Plaintiff Lisa Simpson; the original "Exhibit C" is STRICKEN from the record, shall be RETURNED to counsel for the plas and REPLACED with "Exhibit C" filed under seal on 12/13/04 by Magistrate Judge Craig B Shaffer on 12/22/04 (dlb, )
January 21, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 474 MINUTE ORDER 417 DENYING MOTION to Strike Plas' Disclosures of Daniel Predovich by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder; re: 462 Objection (RESPONSE) to 452 Stipulated MOTION to file exhibit lists and witness lists to proposed final pretrial order under Seal by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder, Plaintiffs Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson; 447 Unopposed MOTION for leave to file Exhibits A, D and E to pla's resp in opp under Seal by Plaintiffs Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson; 442 Unopposed MOTION for leave to file under Seal response in opposition to dft's mtn for additional discovery by Plaintiff Lisa Simpson by Denver Publishing Company, parties have to 1/31/05 to respond, if needed the motion will be discussed at the hrg previously set for 2/10/05 at 1:30 p.m.; 459 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Notice of Errata by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder is GRANTED by Magistrate Judge Craig B Shaffer on 1/21/05. (dlb, )
January 21, 2005 Filing 472 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Exhibit A to dft's reply re: motion in limine to preclude evidence of other incidents...that fall outside the Scope of Title IX by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder. (dlb, )
January 21, 2005 Filing 471 Unopposed MOTION to Seal plas' joint motion for protective order by Plaintiffs Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson. (dlb, )
January 21, 2005 Filing 470 Plas' Joint MOTION for Protective Order that the deposition of John Grefe not be had by Plaintiffs Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson *filed under seal, located in sealed area (dlb, )
January 21, 2005 Filing 469 EXHIBIT A to Dft's reply to pla's resp in opp to dft's mtn in limine to preclude evidence of other incidents of alleged misconduct by University of Colorado at Boulder. *filed under seal, located in sealed area(dlb, )
January 21, 2005 Filing 468 REPLY to Response to Motion re 387 MOTION in Limine to preclude evidence of other incidents of alleged misconduct that fall outside the scope of Title IX by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder (dlb, )
January 20, 2005 Filing 473 MEMORANDUM referring to Magistrate Judge Shaffer : 447 MOTION to Seal filed by Lisa Simpson,, Anne Gilmore, . Signed by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 1/20/05. (dlb, )
January 14, 2005 Filing 466 REPLY to Response to Motion re 387 MOTION in Limine to preclude evidence of other incidents of alleged misconduct that fall outside the scope of Title IX by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder.(dlb, )
January 13, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 467 MINUTE ORDER granting GRANTING 410 Unopposed MOTION to file Motion to Strike Certain of Pla Simpson's Rule 26(a)(2) Disclosures under Seal by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder; 412 Unopposed MOTION to File Its Motion for Additional Discovery Under Seal by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder; 425 MOTION for leave to file Simpson's Rule 37(c0(1) Motion for Sanctions under Seal by Plaintiff Lisa Simpson; 428 Unopposed MOTION for leave to file Dft's Reply in support of motion to strike under Seal by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder; 438 Unopposed MOTION for leave to file under Seal Exhibits C,D and E to pla's resp in opp to dft's mtn for add'l discovery by Plaintiff Anne Gilmore; 449 Unopposed MOTION for leave to file its resp to pla's Rule 37(c)(1) motion for sanctions under Seal by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder by Magistrate Judge Craig B Shaffer on 1/13/05. (dlb, )
January 12, 2005 Filing 465 Amended CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Denver Publishing Company re 462 Objection (RESPONSE) to 452 Stipulated MOTION to file exhibit lists and witness lists to proposed final pretrial order under Seal by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder, Plaintiffs Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson; 447 Unopposed MOTION for leave to file Exhibits A, D and E to pla's resp in opp under Seal by Plaintiffs Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson; 442 Unopposed MOTION for leave to file under Seal response in opposition to dft's mtn for additional discovery by Plaintiff Lisa Simpson by Denver Publishing Company (dlb, )
January 12, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 464 ORDER granting 444 Stipulated MOTION for Order for relief from Local Rule requiring parties to submit a set of stipulated jury instructions by Plaintiff Anne Gilmore. Signed by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 1/12/05. (dlb, )
January 12, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 463 MINUTE ORDER granting 457 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File (amend) and substitute proposed jury instructions filed 1/17/05 by Plaintiffs. *original proposed jury instructions routed to chambers by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 1/12/05. (dlb, )
January 12, 2005 Filing 462 Objection (RESPONSE) to 452 Stipulated MOTION to file exhibit lists and witness lists to proposed final pretrial order under Seal by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder, Plaintiffs Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson; 447 Unopposed MOTION for leave to file Exhibits A, D and E to pla's resp in opp under Seal by Plaintiffs Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson; 442 Unopposed MOTION for leave to file under Seal response in opposition to dft's mtn for additional discovery by Plaintiff Lisa Simpson by Denver Publishing Company (dlb, )
January 11, 2005 Filing 461 MEMORANDUM referring to Magistrate Shaffer 459 MOTION to Seal filed by University of Colorado at Boulder by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 1/11/05. (dlb, )
January 11, 2005 Filing 460 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Craig B Shaffer : Motion Hearing held on 1/11/2005 (Court Reporter FTR Reporter Deck - Ctrm A402.) (dlb, )
January 11, 2005 Opinion or Order ORDER denying 366 DENYING MOTION to Strike portions of pla Simpson's Fifth Supplemental Rule 26(a) Disclosures or MOTION to continue trial by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder ; 368 DENYING AS MOOT MOTION for Extension of Time to File pla's joint disclosure under Rul 26(a)(2)(A) Fed.R.Civ.Pro., of Daniel Predovich, CPA by Plaintiffs ; 409 TAKING UNDER ADVISEMENT MOTION to Strike Certain of Pla Simpson's Rule 26(a)(2) Disclosures (Filed under SEAL and placed w/ SEALED Documents) by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder; GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 411 MOTION for Additional Discovery by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder ; DENYING 424 Rule 37(c)(1) MOTION for Sanctions for dft University's misleading, evasive and false disclosures by Plaintiff Lisa Simpson ; GRANTING 454 MOTION to Join in pla's Simpson's Rule 37(s)(1) mtn for sanctions for dft's misleading evasive and false disclosures by Plaintiff Anne Gilmore; MOTIONS HEARING SET FOR 2/10/05 AT 1:30 P.M., ORDERED: briefing schedule is set regard to the filing of Motions in Limine: all motions by 3/14/05; all responses within 15 days thereafter; all replies within 8 days thereafter; all preservation depositions no later than 3/15/05; pursuant to courtroom minutes on 1/11/05, #460 by Magistrate Judge Craig B Shaffer on 1/11/05. (dlb, )
January 11, 2005 Filing 459 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Notice of Errata by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder. (dlb, )
January 10, 2005 Filing 458 Notice of ERRATA by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder *filed under seal, located in sealed area (dlb, )
January 10, 2005 Filing 457 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File (amend) and substitute proposed jury instructions filed 1/17/05 by Plaintiffs. *original proposed jury instructions routed to chambers(dlb, )
January 10, 2005 Filing 456 MEMORANDUM referring to Magistrate Shaffer 454 MOTION for Joinder filed by Anne Gilmore, by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 1/10/05. (dlb, )
January 10, 2005 Filing 455 MEMORANDUM referring to Magistrate Shaffer 452 MOTION to Seal filed by University of Colorado at Boulder,, Lisa Simpson,, Anne Gilmore, by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 1/10/05. (dlb, )
January 7, 2005 Filing 454 MOTION to Join in pla's Simpson's Rule 37(s)(1) mtn for sanctions for dft's misleading evasive and false disclosures by Plaintiff Anne Gilmore. (dlb, )
January 7, 2005 Filing 453 Addendum (SUPPLEMENT) to 449 Unopposed MOTION for leave to file its resp to pla's Rule 37(c)(1) motion for sanctions under Seal by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder (dlb, )
January 7, 2005 Filing 452 Stipulated MOTION to file exhibit lists and witness lists to proposed final pretrial order under Seal by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder, Plaintiffs Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson. (dlb, )
January 7, 2005 TENDERED Proposed Jury Instructions by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder (original/2 copies/CD Rom routed to chambers) (dlb, )
January 7, 2005 Filing 451 MEMORANDUM referring to Magistrate Shaffer 449 MOTION to Seal filed by University of Colorado at Boulder by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 1/7/05. (dlb, )
January 6, 2005 Filing 450 MEMORANDUM referring to Magistrate Shaffer 442 MOTION to Seal filed by Lisa Simpson by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 1/6/05. (dlb, )
January 6, 2005 Filing 449 Unopposed MOTION for leave to file its resp to pla's Rule 37(c)(1) motion for sanctions under Seal by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder. (dlb, )
January 6, 2005 Filing 448 RESPONSE to 424 Rule 37(c)(1) MOTION for Sanctions for dft University's misleading, evasive and false disclosures by Plaintiff Lisa Simpson filed by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder *filed under seal, located in sealed area (dlb, )
January 6, 2005 Filing 447 Unopposed MOTION for leave to file Exhibits A, D and E to pla's resp in opp under Seal by Plaintiffs Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson. (dlb, )
January 6, 2005 Filing 446 EXHIBITS A, D and E to plas' response in opposition to dft's mtn in limine to preclude evidence of other incidents by Anne Gilmore, Lisa Simpson *filed under seal, located in sealed area. (dlb, )
January 6, 2005 Filing 445 Pla's RESPONSE in opposition to 387 MOTION in Limine to preclude evidence of other incidents of alleged misconduct that fall outside the scope of Title IX by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder. (dlb, )
January 6, 2005 Filing 444 Stipulated MOTION for Order for relief from Local Rule requiring parties to submit a set of stipulated jury instructions by Plaintiff Anne Gilmore. (dlb, )
January 5, 2005 Filing 443 Plas' Joint RESPONSE to 417 MOTION to Strike Plas' Disclosures of Daniel Predovich by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder(dlb, )
January 5, 2005 Filing 442 Unopposed MOTION for leave to file under Seal response in opposition to dft's mtn for additional discovery by Plaintiff Lisa Simpson. (dlb, )
January 5, 2005 Filing 441 RESPONSE in Opposition re 411 MOTION for Additional Discovery by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder filed by Plaintiff Lisa Simpson *filed under seal, located in sealed area. (dlb, )
January 4, 2005 Filing 440 RETURN OF SERVICE of subpoena(s) filed by Plaintiff Lisa Simpson executed upon Clyde surrell on Decmeber 29, 2004 by Personal Service (dlb, )
January 4, 2005 Filing 439 MEMORANDUM referring to Magistrate Shaffer 438 MOTION to Seal filed by Anne Gilmore, by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 1/4/05. (dlb, )
January 4, 2005 Filing 438 Unopposed MOTION for leave to file under Seal Exhibits C,D and E to pla's resp in opp to dft's mtn for add'l discovery by Plaintiff Anne Gilmore. (dlb, )
January 4, 2005 Filing 437 EXHIBITS C,D,E to pla's response in opposition to dft's motion for add'l discovery by Anne Gilmore *filed under seal, located in sealed area (dlb, )
January 4, 2005 Filing 436 RESPONSE in opposition to 411 MOTION for Additional Discovery by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder filed by Plaintiff Anne Gilmore (dlb, ) (Text Modified on 1/5/2005 to remove reference to this document being under seal)(gms, ).
December 30, 2004 Filing 435 RESPONSE in opposition to 386 MOTION in Limine to exclude the report of the Independnent Investigative Commission (IIC) and related evidence by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder filed by Plaintiff Lisa Simpson. (dlb, )
December 30, 2004 Filing 434 MEMORANDUM referring to Magistrate Shaffer 428 MOTION to Seal filed by University of Colorado at Boulder,, 424 MOTION for Sanctions filed by Lisa Simpson,, 425 MOTION to Seal filed by Lisa Simpson, by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 12/30/04. (dlb, )
December 30, 2004 Filing 433 Pla Simpson's RESPONSE in opposition to 417 MOTION to Strike Plas' Disclosures of Daniel Predovich by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder (dlb, )
December 30, 2004 Filing 432 MOTION for Joinder in pla Simpson's response in opp to dft's mtn in limine to exlcude "IIC" report by Plaintiff Anne Gilmore. (dlb, )
December 29, 2004 Filing 431 RETURN OF SERVICE of subpoena(s) filed by Plaintiff Lisa Simpson executed upon Richard Tharp on December 22, 2004 by Personal Service (dlb, )
December 29, 2004 Filing 430 TENDERED Trial Subpoena issued to Richard Tharp by Plaintiff Lisa Simpson. (dlb, )
December 29, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 429 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion 424 Rule 37(c)(1) MOTION for Sanctions for dft University's misleading, evasive and false disclosures by Plaintiff Lisa Simpson; dft's response due 1/6/05; a reply will not be accepted: Motion Hearing set for 1/11/2005 01:30 PM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B Shaffer by Magistrate Judge Craig B Shaffer on 12/29/04. (dlb, )
December 29, 2004 Filing 428 Unopposed MOTION for leave to file Dft's Reply in support of motion to strike under Seal by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder. (dlb, )
December 29, 2004 Filing 427 Dft's REPLY in support of 409 MOTION to Strike Certain of Pla Simpson's Rule 26(a)(2) Disclosures by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder *filed under seal, located in sealed area(dlb, )
December 28, 2004 Filing 426 MEMORANDUM referring to Magistrate Shaffer 417 MOTION to Strike filed by University of Colorado at Boulder, by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 12/28/04. (dlb, )
December 28, 2004 Filing 425 MOTION for leave to file Simpson's Rule 37(c0(1) Motion for Sanctions under Seal by Plaintiff Lisa Simpson. (dlb, )
December 28, 2004 Filing 424 Rule 37(c)(1) MOTION for Sanctions for dft University's misleading, evasive and false disclosures by Plaintiff Lisa Simpson *filed under seal, located in sealed area. (dlb, )
December 27, 2004 Filing 423 TRANSCRIPT of Rule 16 Conference held on April 15, 2003 before Judge Craig B. Shaffer. Prepared by: Avery/Woods. Pages: 1 - 45. (certified copy) (dlb, )
December 27, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 422 MINUTE ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion 417 MOTION to Strike Plas' Disclosures of Daniel Predovich by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder; pla shall respond by close of business 1/6/05; replies will not be accepted: Motion Hearing set for 1/11/2005 01:30 PM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B Shaffer by Magistrate Judge Craig B Shaffer on 12/27/04. (dlb, )
December 23, 2004 Filing 421 MEMORANDUM referring to Magistrate Shaffer 411 MOTION for Discovery filed by University of Colorado at Boulder,, 412 MOTION to Seal filed by University of Colorado at Boulder, by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 12/23/04. (dlb, )
December 23, 2004 Filing 420 MEMORANDUM referring to Magistrate Shaffer 409 MOTION to Strike filed by University of Colorado at Boulder,, 410 MOTION to Seal filed by University of Colorado at Boulder, by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 12/23/04. (dlb, )
December 23, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 419 MINUTE ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion 409 MOTION to Strike Certain of Pla Simpson's Rule 26(a)(2) Disclosures (Filed under SEAL and placed w/ SEALED Documents) by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder and 411 MOTION for Additional Discovery by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder (Filed under SEAL and placed with SEALED Documents; responses are due by 1/5/05; no replies will be accepted; Motion Hearing set for 1/11/2005 01:30 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B Shaffer by Magistrate Judge Craig B Shaffer on 12/23/04. (dlb, )
December 23, 2004 Filing 417 MOTION to Strike Plas' Disclosures of Daniel Predovich by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder. (dlb, )
December 23, 2004 Filing 416 TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing held on November 26, 2003 before Judge Craig B. Shaffer. Prepared by: Avery/Woods. Pages: 1 - 76. (certified copy) (dlb, )
December 22, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 418 MINUTE ORDER granting 392 MOTION to Withdraw Exhibit C filed on 12/7/04 and substitute with Exhibit C filed under seal re: 382 Plas' Joint MOTION to Compel dft to produce docs requested in discovery and for sanctions for failing to produce those and other documents *Exhibit C removed, filed under seal and located in sealed area and Motion to SEAL by Plaintiffs. 395 Unopposed MOTION for leave to file under Seal pla's response to dft's mtn to compel the completion of depo of Elizabeth Lazarus by Plaintiff Lisa Simpson. 397 Unopposed MOTION for leave to file under Seal pla's response in opp to dft's mtn to strike portions of pla's fifth supplemental Rule 26(A)(1) disclosures by Plaintiff Lisa Simpson; the original "Exhibit C" is STRICKEN from the record, shall be RETURNED to counsel for the plas and REPLACED with "Exhibit C" filed under seal on 12/13/04 by Magistrate Judge Craig B Shaffer on 12/22/04. (dlb, )
December 22, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 415 MINUTE ORDER striking 407 MOTION to Strike Plas' disclosure of Daniel Predovich by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 12/22/04. (dlb, )
December 22, 2004 Filing 414 TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing held on December 16, 2004 before Judge Craig B. Shaffer. Prepared by: Avery/Woods. Pages: 1 - 27. (certified copy) (dlb, )
December 21, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 413 MINUTE ORDER denying plas' Joint 382 MOTION to Compel filed by Lisa Simpson,, Anne Gilmore and granting dft's 381 MOTION to Compel filed by University of Colorado at Boulder, by Magistrate Judge Craig B Shaffer on 12/17/04. (gms, )
December 21, 2004 Filing 412 Unopposed MOTION to File Its Motion for Additional Discovery Under Seal by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder. (gms, )
December 21, 2004 Filing 411 MOTION for Additional Discovery by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder (Filed under SEAL and placed with SEALED Documents). (gms, )
December 21, 2004 Filing 410 Unopposed MOTION to file Motion to Strike Certain of Pla Simpson's Rule 26(a)(2) Disclosures under Seal by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder. (gms, )
December 21, 2004 Filing 409 MOTION to Strike Certain of Pla Simpson's Rule 26(a)(2) Disclosures (Filed under SEAL and placed w/ SEALED Documents) by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder. (gms, )
December 21, 2004 Filing 408 Notice of ERRATA to Combined 407 MOTION to Strike and Opposition to Motion for extension of time to file plas' disclosure by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder. (gms, )
December 20, 2004 Filing 407 MOTION to Strike Plas' disclosure of Daniel Predovich by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder. (gms, )
December 20, 2004 Opposition (RESPONSE)to Plas' 368 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Plas' disclosure under rule 26 of Daniel Predovich filed by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder. (gms, )
December 17, 2004 Filing 405 TRANSCRIPT of Status Conference held on November 30, 2004 before Judge Craig B. Shafer (sic). Prepared by: Avery/Woods. Pages: 1 - 77. (certified copy) (dlb, )
December 16, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 406 ORDER granting 389 Unopposed MOTION for leave to file under Seal Exhibit A to the dft's mtn in limine to preclude evidence of other incidents of alleged misconduct tha fall outside the Scope of Title IV by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder. Signed by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 12/16/04. (dlb, )
December 16, 2004 Filing 404 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Craig B Shaffer : Motion Hearing held on 12/16/2004 re 382 382 Plas' Joint MOTION to Compel dft to produce docs requested in discovery and for sanctions for failing to produce those and other documents; ORDERED: oral motion to withdraw is GRANTED; motion deemed WITHDRAWN; 381 MOTION to Compel the completion of the deposition of Elizabeth Lazarus by Defendant. *filed under seal, located in sealed area is GRANTED for the reasons stated on the record. (Court Reporter FTR Reporter Deck Ctrm 3.) (dlb, )
December 16, 2004 Opinion or Order ORDER granting 381 re 382 Plas' Joint MOTION to Compel dft to produce docs requested in discovery and for sanctions for failing to produce those and other documents; ORDERED: oral motion to withdraw is GRANTED; motion deemed WITHDRAWN; 381 MOTION to Compel the completion of the deposition of Elizabeth Lazarus by Defendant. *filed under seal, located in sealed area is GRANTED for the reasons stated on the record pursuant to minutes dated 12/16/04, #404 (dlb, )
December 15, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 403 ORDER granting 399 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to 1/7/05 387 MOTION in Limine to preclude evidence of other incidents of alleged misconduct that fall outside the scope of Title IX by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder by plaintiffs by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 12/15/04. (dlb, )
December 15, 2004 Filing 402 RESPONSE to 382 Plas' Joint MOTION to Compel dft to produce docs requested in discovery and for sanctions for failing to produce those and other documents filed by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder. (dlb, )
December 14, 2004 Filing 401 MEMORANDUM referring to Magistrate Shaffer 392 MOTION to Seal MOTION to Withdraw Document regarding 382 MOTION to Compel MOTION to Seal MOTION to Withdraw Document regarding 382 MOTION to Compel filed by Lisa Simpson,, Anne Gilmore,, 389 MOTION to Seal filed by University of Colorado at Boulder,, 395 MOTION to Seal filed by Lisa Simpson, by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 12/14/04. (dlb, )
December 14, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 400 MINUTE ORDER granting 372 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Exhibit A to resp to dft's status report by Plaintiff Lisa Simpson and 383 Unopposed MOTION to Seal dft's Mtn to compel the completion of the depo of Elizabeth Lazarus by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder by Magistrate Judge Craig B Shaffer on 12/14/04. (dlb, )
December 14, 2004 Filing 399 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to 1/7/05 387 MOTION in Limine to preclude evidence of other incidents of alleged misconduct that fall outside the scope of Title IX by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder by plaintiffs (dlb, )
December 14, 2004 Filing 398 MEMORANDUM referring to Magistrate Judge Shaffer 397 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Response in Opposition to Dfts Motion to Strike. filed by Lisa Simpson, by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 12/14/04. (erv, )
December 14, 2004 Filing 397 Unopposed MOTION for leave to file under Seal pla's response in opp to dft's mtn to strike portions of pla's fifth supplemental Rule 26(A)(1) disclosures by Plaintiff Lisa Simpson. (dlb, )
December 14, 2004 Filing 396 Pla Simpson's RESPONSE to 366 MOTION to Strike portions of pla Simpson's Fifth Supplemental Rule 26(a) Disclosures or MOTION to continue trial by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder filed by Plaintiff Lisa Simpson. *filed under seal, located in sealed area (dlb, )
December 13, 2004 Filing 395 Unopposed MOTION for leave to file under Seal pla's response to dft's mtn to compel the completion of depo of Elizabeth Lazarus by Plaintiff Lisa Simpson. (dlb, )
December 13, 2004 Filing 394 Pla Simpson's RESPONSE to 381 MOTION to Compel the completion of the deposition of Elizabeth Lazarus by Defendant. *filed under seal, located in sealed area (dlb, )
December 13, 2004 Filing 393 EXHIBIT C to Pla's motion to Compel filed on 12/7/04 by plaintiffs *filed under seal, located in sealed area.(dlb, )
December 13, 2004 Filing 392 MOTION to Withdraw Exhibit C filed on 12/7/04 and substitute with Exhibit C filed under seal re: 382 Plas' Joint MOTION to Compel dft to produce docs requested in discovery and for sanctions for failing to produce those and other documents and Motion to SEAL by Plaintiffs. (Exhibit C submitted with this document has been returned to pla's counsel per order of 12/22/04)(dlb, ) (Text Modified on 12/29/2004 to indicate return of exhibit)(gms, ).
December 10, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 391 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion 381 MOTION to Compel the completion of the deposition of Elizabeth Lazarus by Defendant. *filed under seal, located in sealed area and 383 Unopposed MOTION to Seal dft's Mtn to compel the completion of the depo of Elizabeth Lazarus by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder; responses due by Noon on 12/15/04; Motion Hearing set for 12/16/2004 03:30 PM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B Shaffer by Magistrate Judge Craig B Shaffer on 12/10/04. (dlb, )
December 10, 2004 Filing 389 Unopposed MOTION for leave to file under Seal Exhibit A to the dft's mtn in limine to preclude evidence of other incidents of alleged misconduct tha fall outside the Scope of Title IV by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder. (dlb, )
December 10, 2004 Filing 388 EXHIBIT A (NOTICE) to 387 MOTION in Limine to preclude evidence of other incidents of alleged misconduct that fall outside the scope of Title IX by dft *filed under seal, located in sealed area. (dlb, )
December 10, 2004 Filing 387 MOTION in Limine to preclude evidence of other incidents of alleged misconduct that fall outside the scope of Title IX by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder. (dlb, )
December 10, 2004 Filing 386 MOTION in Limine to exclude the report of the Independnent Investigative Commission and related evidence by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder. (dlb, )
December 8, 2004 Filing 390 MEMORANDUM referring to Magistrate Judge Shaffer 383 Unopposed MOTION to Seal deposition of Elizabeth Lazurus filed by University of Colorado at Boulder, by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 12/8/04. (erv, )
December 8, 2004 Filing 385 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Craig B Shaffer on 11/30/04 : Status Conference held on 12/8/2004, Set/Reset Hearings: Pretrial order due 1/7/04; Initial Pretrial Conference set for 1/11/2005 01:30 PM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B Shaffer. (Court Reporter FTR Reporter Deck - Ctrm A402.) (dlb, )
December 8, 2004 Filing 384 MEMORANDUM referring to Magistrate Shaffer 382 MOTION to Compel filed by Lisa Simpson, Anne Gilmore, 381 MOTION to Compel filed by University of Colorado at Boulder by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 12/8/04. (dlb, )
December 8, 2004 Opinion or Order ORDER granting 365 MOTION to Seal and MOTION to Withdraw previously filed Document STATUS REPORT by University of Colorado at Boulder *filed under seal, located in sealed area by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder; 366 MOTION to Strike portions of pla Simpson's Fifth Supplemental Rule 26(a) Disclosures or MOTION to continue trial by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder *filed under seal, located in sealed area; MOTION to Seal and MOTION to withdraw document previously filed: MOTION to Strike portions of pla Simpson's Fifth Supplemental Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures or MOTION to continue trial by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder *filed under seal located in sealed area by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder pursuant to hearing held on 11/30/04 by Magistrate Judge Craig B Shaffer on 11/30/04. (dlb, )
December 8, 2004 Filing 383 Unopposed MOTION to Seal dft's Mtn to compel the completion of the depo of Elizabeth Lazarus by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder. (dlb, )
December 7, 2004 Filing 382 Plas' Joint MOTION to Compel dft to produce docs requested in discovery and for sanctions for failing to produce those and other documents.(dlb, )
December 7, 2004 Filing 381 MOTION to Compel the completion of the deposition of Elizabeth Lazarus by Defendant. *filed under seal, located in sealed area (dlb, )
December 3, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 380 ORDER striking 362 MOTION in Limine to preclude evidence of other incidents of alleged misconduct that fall outside the scope of Title IX by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder *filed under seal, located in sealed area. Signed by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 12/3/04. (dlb, )
December 1, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 379 ORDER denying as moot dft's 363 MOTION to file under Seal its mtn in limine to preclude evidence of other incidents of alleged midsconduct that fall outside the scope of Title IX by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 12/1/04. (dlb, )
December 1, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 378 ORDER denying 369 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages re: mtn in limine to preclude evidence of other incidents of alleged midsconduct that fall outside the scope of Title IX by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder;dft may refile by 12/10/04. Signed by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 12/1/04. (dlb, )
November 30, 2004 Filing 377 MEMORANDUM referring to Magistrate Shaffer 366 MOTION to Continue MOTION to Strike filed by University of Colorado at Boulder by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 11/30/04. (dlb, )
November 30, 2004 Filing 376 MEMORANDUM referring to Magistrate Shaffer 365 MOTION to Seal MOTION to Withdraw Document regarding Status Report filed by University of Colorado at Boulder by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 11/30/04. (dlb, )
November 30, 2004 Filing 375 MEMORANDUM referring to Magistrate Shaffer 372 MOTION to Seal filed by Lisa Simpson, 368 MOTION for Extension of Time to File filed by Lisa Simpson, Anne Gilmoreby Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 11/30/04. (dlb, )
November 29, 2004 Filing 374 RESPONSEby pla to dft's 363 MOTION to file under Seal its mtn in limine to preclude evidence of other incidents of alleged midsconduct that fall outside the scope of Title IX by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder. (dlb, )
November 29, 2004 Filing 373 RESPONSE by pla to dft's 369 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages re: mtn in limine to preclude evidence of other incidents of alleged midsconduct that fall outside the scope of Title IX by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder(dlb, )
November 29, 2004 Filing 372 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Exhibit A to resp to dft's status report by Plaintiff Lisa Simpson. (dlb, )
November 29, 2004 Filing 371 EXHIBIT A to Pla's Response to dft's Status Report by Lisa Simpson *filed under seal, located in sealed area.(dlb, )
November 29, 2004 Filing 370 RESPONSE to 364 STATUS REPORT by University of Colorado at Boulder *filed under seal, located in sealed area by Plaintiff Lisa Simpson. (dlb, )
November 26, 2004 Filing 367 MOTION to Seal and MOTION to withdraw document previously filed: MOTION to Strike portions of pla Simpson's Fifth Supplemental Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures or MOTION to continue trial by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder *filed under seal located in sealed area by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder. (dlb, )
November 26, 2004 Filing 366 MOTION to Strike portions of pla Simpson's Fifth Supplemental Rule 26(a) Disclosures or MOTION to continue trial by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder *filed under seal, located in sealed area. (dlb, )
November 26, 2004 Filing 365 MOTION to Seal and MOTION to Withdraw previously filed Document STATUS REPORT by University of Colorado at Boulder *filed under seal, located in sealed area by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder. (dlb, )
November 26, 2004 Filing 364 STATUS REPORT by University of Colorado at Boulder *filed under seal, located in sealed area. (dlb, )
November 24, 2004 Filing 369 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages re: mtn in limine to preclude evidence of other incidents of alleged midsconduct that fall outside the scope of Title IX by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder. (dlb, )
November 24, 2004 Filing 368 MOTION for Extension of Time to File pla's joint disclosure under Rul 26(a)(2)(A) Fed.R.Civ.Pro., of Daniel Predovich, CPA by Plaintiffs (dlb, )
November 24, 2004 MOTION to Strike portions of pla Simpson's Fifth Supplemental Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures or MOTION to continue trial by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder *filed under seal located in sealed area. (dlb, )
November 24, 2004 STATUS REPORT by University of Colorado at Boulder *filed under seal, located in sealed area. (dlb, )
November 24, 2004 Filing 363 MOTION to file under Seal its mtn in limine to preclude evidence of other incidents of alleged midsconduct that fall outside the scope of Title IX by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder. (dlb, )
November 24, 2004 Filing 362 MOTION in Limine to preclude evidence of other incidents of alleged misconduct that fall outside the scope of Title IX by Defendant University of Colorado at Boulder *filed under seal, located in sealed area. (dlb, )
November 15, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 361 ORDER denying without prej as withdrawn 324 Motion to Compel by Magistrate Judge Craig B Shaffer on 11/15/04. (dlb, )
November 15, 2004 Filing 360 Dft's List of anticipated Trial preservation depositions by University of Colorado at Boulder. (dlb, )
November 9, 2004 Filing 359 Joint STATUS REPORT by parties(dlb, )
November 3, 2004 Filing 358 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Craig B Shaffer : Telephonic Discovery Hearing held on 11/3/2004. (Court Reporter FTR - Reporter Deck - Ctrm A402.) (dlb, )
October 26, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 357 MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer regarding [324-1] pla's motion to compel production of docs; parties submit status report of current posture by 11/9/04 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 10/27/04 (dlb)
October 26, 2004 Filing 356 TRANSCRIPT of Status Conference on September 29, 2004 before Craig B. Shaffer ( pages: 1 - 85) Prepared By: Avery/Woods (certified copy) (dlb)
October 19, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 355 MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer granting motion to withdraw motion for order reopening the deposition of Gary Barnett for the limited purposes of questioning Barnett regarding his notes [341-1] [352-1] in 1:02-cv-02390, 1:03-cv-02495, withdrawing motion for order reopening the deposition of Gary Barnett for the limited purposes of questioning Barnett regarding his notes [341-1] in 1:02-cv-02390, 1:03-cv-02495 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 10/20/04 (dlb)
October 19, 2004 Filing 354 MEMORANDUM by Judge Robert E. Blackburn referring to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer the motion for leave to allow plas' counsel to appear by phone at hrg on plas' joint mtn to repopen the depo of Gary Barnett [349-1] in 1:02-cv-02390, 1:03-cv-02495 (dlb)
October 19, 2004 Filing 353 MEMORANDUM by Judge Robert E. Blackburn regarding [352-1] motion to withdraw motion for order reopening the deposition of Gary Barnett for the limited purposes of questioning Barnett regarding his notes [341-1] in 1:02-cv-02390, 1:03-cv-02495 (dlb)
October 18, 2004 Filing 352 Notice of Unopposed MOTION by Anne Gilmore to withdraw motion for order reopening the deposition of Gary Barnett for the limited purposes of questioning Barnett regarding his notes [341-1] and to vacate hearing (dlb)
October 18, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 351 MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer granting motion for leave to allow plas' counsel to appear by phone at hrg on plas' joint mtn to repopen the depo of Gary Barnett [349-1] regarding [341-1] motion for order reopening the deposition of Gary Barnett for the limited purposes of questioning Barnett regarding his notes (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 10/18/04 (dlb)
October 15, 2004 Filing 350 Joint STATUS REPORT (dlb)
October 15, 2004 Filing 349 Unopposed MOTION by Lisa Simpson for leave to allow plas' counsel to appear by phone at hrg on plas' joint mtn to repopen the depo of Gary Barnett (dlb)
October 14, 2004 Filing 348 Dft's RESPONSE to motion for order reopening the deposition of Gary Barnett for the limited purposes of questioning Barnett regarding his notes [341-1] in 1:02-cv-02390, 1:03-cv-02495 (dlb)
October 12, 2004 Filing 347 NOTICE of Attorney's Lien by counsel for Anne Gilmore pursuant to CRS 12-5-119 and 12-5-120 (dlb)
October 8, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 346 MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer granting motion to seal corrected page 9 to resp to dft's mtn to compel/strike [340-1] in 1:02-cv-02390 ; pto ddl set for 4/20/05 in 1:02-cv-02390, in 1:03-cv-02495 ; pretrial conf set for 1:30 4/27/05 in 1:02-cv-02390, in 1:03-cv-02495 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 10/12/04 (dlb)
October 6, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 345 MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer regarding [341-1] motion for order reopening the deposition of Gary Barnett for the limited purposes of questioning Barnett regarding his notes, dft has to 10/15/04 to respond; (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 10/7/04 (dlb)
October 5, 2004 Filing 344 COURTROOM MINUTES by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer Hearing Discovery Conference entry date : 10/6/04 Court Reporter: FTR - Reporter Deck - Ctrm 3 (dlb)
October 5, 2004 Filing 343 MEMORANDUM by Judge Robert E. Blackburn referring to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer the motion for order reopening the deposition of Gary Barnett for the limited purposes of questioning Barnett regarding his notes [341-1] (dlb)
October 5, 2004 Filing 342 MEMORANDUM by Judge Robert E. Blackburn referring to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer the motion to seal corrected page 9 to resp to dft's mtn to compel/strike [340-1] (dlb)
October 5, 2004 Filing 341 Joint MOTION by Anne Gilmore for order reopening the deposition of Gary Barnett for the limited purposes of questioning Barnett regarding his notes (dlb)
October 4, 2004 Filing 340 Unopposed MOTION by Lisa Simpson to seal corrected page 9 to resp to dft's mtn to compel/strike (dlb)
October 4, 2004 Filing 339 Corrected Page 9 (SUPPLEMENT) by Lisa Simpson to Simpson's response [321-1] to motion to compel production of Boulder Victim Compensation Records [312-1] and to strike Ms. Lazarus and any other witnesses from testifying as to pla's alleged emotional or psychological dmgs [312-2] *filed under seal, located in sealed areas (dlb)
October 1, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 338 MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer granting motion for leave to file under seal dft's reply to pla's resp to mtn to compel/strike [329-1] (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 10/4/04 (dlb)
October 1, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 337 MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer ; status report ddl set for 10/15/04 ; pretrial conf set for 1:30 4/20/05 ; pto ddl set for 4/15/05 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 10/4/04 (dlb)
October 1, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 336 MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer granting motion for leave to seal pla's resp to dft's mtn to compel/strike [322-1], granting motion for leave to file under seal dft's reply to pla's resp to mtn to compel/strike [329-1], granting motion for leave to to file substitute page 10 to resp to pla's mtn to file second amended and supplemental complaint [332-1] (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 10/4/04 (dlb)
September 30, 2004 Filing 335 MEMORANDUM by Judge Robert E. Blackburn referring to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer the motion for leave to to file substitute dpage 10 to resp to pla's mtn to file second amended and supplemental complaint [332-1] (dlb)
September 30, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 334 MINUTE ORDER : by Judge Robert E. Blackburn telephone conference call to set Trial prep conference set for 10:00 10/12/04 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 10/1/04 (dlb)
September 29, 2004 Filing 333 COURTROOM MINUTES by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer oral motion to withdraw granted; withdrawing motion to amend complaint [270-1] [317-1]; granting in part and denying in part as specified on the record motion to compel production of Boulder Victim Compensation Records [312-1] and motion to strike Ms. Lazarus and any other witnesses from testifying as to pla's alleged emotional or psychological dmgs [312-2] [324-1] re: motion to compel production of docs ruling held in abeyance parties status report ddl set for 10/15/04 to address all discovery; status conf set for 11:00 11/30/04 ; initial pretrial conference/mag conference set for 1:30 2/10/05 ; pto ddl set for 4/15/05 ; pretrial conf set for 1:30 4/20/05 ; entry date : 10/1/04 Court Reporter: FTR - Reporter Deck (dlb)
September 29, 2004 Filing 332 Uncontested MOTION by dft for leave to to file substitute dpage 10 to resp to pla's mtn to file second amended and supplemental complaint (dlb)
September 29, 2004 Filing 331 MEMORANDUM by Judge Robert E. Blackburn referring to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer the motion to compel production of docs [324-1] in 1:02-cv-02390, 1:03-cv-02495 (erv)
September 28, 2004 Filing 330 Pla's joint RESPONSE to dft's status report [326-1] (dlb)
September 28, 2004 Filing 329 Dft's Unopposed MOTION for leave to file under seal dft's reply to pla's resp to mtn to compel/strike (dlb)
September 28, 2004 Filing 328 REPLY to response to motion to compel production of Boulder Victim Compensation Records [312-1] or to strike Ms. Lazarus and any other witnesses from testifying as to pla's alleged emotional or psychological dmgs [312-2] *filed under seal, located in sealed area (dlb)
September 27, 2004 Filing 327 MEMORANDUM by Judge Robert E. Blackburn referring to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer the motion to compel production of docs [324-1] in 1:02-cv-02390, 1:03-cv-02495 (erv)
September 27, 2004 Filing 326 STATUS REPORT of the University of Colorado (dlb)
September 27, 2004 Filing 325 University's RESPONSE to Simpson's motion to amend complaint [270-1] [317-1] (dlb)
September 24, 2004 Filing 324 Pla's Joint MOTION to compel production of docs (dlb)
September 24, 2004 Filing 323 MEMORANDUM by Judge Robert E. Blackburn referring to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer the motion for leave to seal pla's resp to dft's mtn to compel/strike [322-1] in 1:02-cv-02390, 1:03-cv-02495 (erv)
September 23, 2004 Filing 322 MOTION by Lisa Simpson for leave to seal pla's resp to dft's mtn to compel/strike (dlb)
September 23, 2004 Filing 321 RESPONSE by plaintiff Lisa Simpson to motion to compel production of Boulder Victim Compensation Records [312-1] or to strike Ms. Lazarus and any other witnesses from testifying as to pla's alleged emotional or psychological dmgs [312-2] *filed under seal located in sealed area (dlb)
September 15, 2004 Filing 320 MEMORANDUM by Judge Robert E. Blackburn referring to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer the motion to amend complaint [270-1] [317-1] in 1:02-cv-02390, 1:03-cv-02495 (lam)
September 15, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 319 MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer regarding [317-1] pla Simpson's motion to amend complaint; resp due by 9/27/04; parties be prepared to discuss at hrg set for 9/29/04 at 10:00 [270-1] (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 9/16/04 (dlb)
September 14, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 318 MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer granting motion for leave to file dft's mtn to compel/strike under seal [313-1] , regarding [312-1] motion to compel production of Boulder Victim Compensation Records pla Simpson's resp due 9/28/04; mtn will be heard 9/29/04 at 10:00 at previously set hrg; (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 9/15/04 (dlb)
September 14, 2004 Filing 317 MOTION by Lisa Simpson in 1:02-cv-02390 to amend complaint [270-1] (dlb)
September 14, 2004 Tendered Second Amended and supplemental complaint and jury demand submitted by Lisa Simpson re: motion to amend complaint [270-1] [317-1] (dlb)
September 3, 2004 Filing 316 MEMORANDUM by Judge Robert E. Blackburn referring to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer the motion to compel production of Boulder Victim Compensation Records [312-1] in 1:02-cv-02390, 1:03-cv-02495, referring to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer the motion to strike Ms. Lazarus and any other witnesses from testifying as to pla's alleged emotional or psychological dmgs [312-2] in 1:02-cv-02390, 1:03-cv-02495 (erv)
September 3, 2004 Filing 315 Amended CERTIFICATE MAILING BY CLERK OF minute order [314-2] (dlb)
September 3, 2004 Filing 313 Dft's Unopposed MOTION for leave to file dft's mtn to compel/strike under seal (dlb)
September 3, 2004 Filing 312 Dft's MOTION to compel production of Boulder Victim Compensation Records or to strike Ms. Lazarus and any other witnesses from testifying as to pla's alleged emotional or psychological dmgs *filed under seal, located in sealed area (dlb)
September 2, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 314 MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer ; pto ddl and pretrial conf VACATED 9/2/04 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 9/7/04 (dlb)
September 2, 2004 Filing 311 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for defendant University CO Bldr in 1:02-cv-02390, defendant CO, University of in 1:03-cv-02495 by Larry S. Pozner (dlb)
September 1, 2004 Filing 310 COURTROOM MINUTES by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer telephonic discovery dispute entry date : 9/2/04 Court Reporter: FTR - Reporter Deck - Ctrm 3 (dlb)
August 26, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 309 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer granting motion for leave to take depo of witness A beyond the discovery cutoff ddl [307-1] in 1:02-cv-02390, 1:03-cv-02495 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 8/27/04 (dlb)
August 25, 2004 Filing 308 MEMORANDUM by Judge Robert E. Blackburn referring to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer the motion for leave to take depo of witness A beyond the discovery cutoff ddl [307-1] in 1:02-cv-02390, 1:03-cv-02495 (dlb)
August 24, 2004 Filing 307 Uncontested MOTION by Regents of University of CO for leave to take depo of witness A beyond the discovery cutoff ddl (dlb)
August 17, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 306 MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer regarding [304-1] attorney substitution for pla Gilmore, (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 8/18/04 (dlb)
August 16, 2004 Filing 305 MEMORANDUM by Judge Robert E. Blackburn regarding [304-1] attorney substitution (dlb)
August 13, 2004 Filing 304 ATTORNEY SUBSTITUTION: terminating attorney Angela L. Ekker for Anne Gilmore, attorney W. Randolph Barnhart for Anne Gilmore and substituting attorney Seth J. Benezra, John A. Culver (dlb)
July 20, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 303 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer granting motion to extend time to file the expert report of Michael Weissberg MD to 8/20/04 [300-1] in 1:02-cv-02390, 1:03-cv-02495 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 7/21/04 (dlb)
July 14, 2004 Filing 301 REPLY by University to Simpson's response filed 6/30/04 and Gilmore's response file 7/1/04 to dft's motion for summary judgment purs to Rule 56, Fed.R.Civ.P. on the single Title IX claim in the consolidated complaints [219-1] in 1:02-cv-02390, 1:03-cv-02495 (dlb) Modified on 07/15/2004
July 13, 2004 Filing 302 MEMORANDUM by Judge Robert E. Blackburn referring to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer the Unopposed motion to extend to file the expert report of Michael Weissberg MD to [300-1] in 1:02-cv-02390, 1:03-cv-02495 (erv)
July 13, 2004 Filing 300 Unopposed MOTION by dft The Regents to extend time to file the expert report of Michael Weissberg MD to 8/20/04 (dlb)
July 9, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 299 MINUTE ORDER : by Judge Robert E. Blackburn granting motion to seal certain exhibits to response in opp to motion for sum jgm [291-1]regarding [287-1] exhibits; granting motion for leave to substitute amended page 10 to response and to seal Exhibit 107 [293-1]; regarding [292-1] amend (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 7/12/04 (dlb)
July 9, 2004 Filing 298 COURTROOM MINUTES by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer telephonic hrg discovery dispute conference held entry date : 7/12/04 Court Reporter: FTR - Reporter Deck - Ctrm 3 (dlb)
July 8, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 297 MINUTE ORDER : by Judge Robert E. Blackburn granting motion for leave to file consolidated reply brief of no more than 20 pages to pla's seperte resp and briefs in opp to dft's mtn for sum jgm [294-1], granting motion for forthwith decision (ruling) on dft's mtn for leave to file consolidated response [295-1] in 1:02-cv-02390, 1:03-cv-02495 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 7/9/04 (dlb)
July 8, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 296 ORDER by Judge Robert E. Blackburn granting motion to seal certain exhibits to resp in opp to dft's mtn for sum jgm [284-1] regarding [283-1] exhibits (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 7/9/04 (dlb)
July 7, 2004 Filing 295 Request (MOTION) by dft, University for forthwith decision (ruling) on dft's mtn for leave to file consolidated response (dlb)
July 7, 2004 Filing 294 University's MOTION for leave to file consolidated reply brief of no more than 20 pages to pla's seperte resp and briefs in opp to dft's mtn for sum jgm (dlb)
July 2, 2004 Filing 293 Unopposed MOTION by plaintiff Anne Gilmore for leave to substitute amended page 10 to response and to seal Exhibit 107 (dlb)
July 2, 2004 Filing 292 AMENDMENT by plaintiff Anne Gilmore to response [286-1] and exhibit 107 [287-1] *filed under seal, located in sealed area (dlb)
July 1, 2004 Filing 291 Unopposed MOTION by plaintiff Gilmore in 1:03-cv-02495 to seal certain exhibits to response in opp to motion for sum jgm (gms)
July 1, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 290 MINUTE ORDER : by Judge Robert E. Blackburn granting Gilmore's motion for 1 day extension of time to file request for permission to file sealed exh & key to redacted names attached to resp & brief in opp to CU's mtn for sum jgm to 7/1/04 [289-1] in 1:02-cv-02390, 1:03-cv-02495, granting Gilmore's motion for 1 day extension of time to file response and brief in opposition to CU's Motion for Sum Jgm to 7/1/04 [288-1] in 1:02-cv-02390, 1:03-cv-02495 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 7/2/04 (gms)
July 1, 2004 Filing 287 Index and EXHIBITS by plaintiff Anne Gilmore in 1:03-cv-02495 to her response in opposition to CU's motion for sum jgm [286-1] in 1:02-cv-02390, [0-1] in 1:03-cv-02495 (Certain exhibits were submitted under seal and have been placed with the SEALED documents) (gms)
July 1, 2004 Filing 286 RESPONSE by plaintiff Anne Gilmore in 1:03-cv-02495 in opposition to CU's to motion for summary judgment purs to Rule 56, Fed.R.Civ.P. on the single Title IX claim in the consolidated complaints [219-1] in 1:02-cv-02390, 1:03-cv-02495 (gms)
July 1, 2004 Filing 285 BRIEF by plaintiff Anne Gilmore in 1:03-cv-02495 in opposition to motion for summary judgment purs to Rule 56, Fed.R.Civ.P. on the single Title IX claim in the consolidated complaints [219-1] in 1:02-cv-02390, 1:03-cv-02495 (gms)
June 30, 2004 Filing 289 Unopposed MOTION by plaintiff Anne Gilmore in 1:03-cv-02495 for 1 day extension of time to file request for permission to file sealed exh & key to redacted names attached to resp & brief in opp to CU's mtn for sum jgm to 7/1/04 (gms)
June 30, 2004 Filing 288 Unopposed MOTION by plaintiff Gilmore in 1:03-cv-02495 for 1 day extension of time to file response and brief in opposition to CU's Motion for Sum Jgm to 7/1/04 (gms)
June 30, 2004 Filing 284 Unopposed MOTION by plaintiff Lisa Simpson to seal certain exhibits to resp in opp to dft's mtn for sum jgm (dlb)
June 30, 2004 Filing 283 Certain EXHIBITS by plaintiff Lisa Simpson to opposition brief [282-1] and response [281-1] to University of Colorado's motion for summary judgment purs to Rule 56, Fed.R.Civ.P. on the single Title IX claim in the consolidated complaints [219-1] *filed under seal, located in sealed area (dlb)
June 30, 2004 Filing 282 BRIEF by plaintiff Lisa Simpson in opposition to University of Colorado's motion for summary judgment purs to Rule 56, Fed.R.Civ.P. on the single Title IX claim in the consolidated complaints [219-1] in 1:02-cv-02390, 1:03-cv-02495 (dlb)
June 30, 2004 Filing 281 RESPONSE in opposition by plaintiff Lisa Simpson to University of Colorado's motion for summary judgment purs to Rule 56, Fed.R.Civ.P. on the single Title IX claim in the consolidated complaints [219-1] in 1:02-cv-02390, 1:03-cv-02495 (dlb)
June 9, 2004 Filing 280 TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing on May 21, 2004 before Craig B. Shaffer ( pages: 1 - 178) Prepared By: Avery/Woods (certified copy) (dlb)
June 7, 2004 Filing 279 ANSWER by dft The Regents of the University of Colorado to pla Simpson's first amended complaint [269-1] (dlb)
June 7, 2004 Filing 278 ANSWER by dft The Regents of the University of Colorado to pla Gilmore's first amended complaint [270-1] (dlb)
June 1, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 277 ORDER by Judge Robert E. Blackburn granting motion for extension of time in which to file sum jgm responses & briefs (in opposition to mtn for sum jgm by CU) to 6/30/04 [276-1] regarding [219-1] motion for summary judgment purs to Rule 56, Fed.R.Civ.P. on the single Title IX claim in the consolidated complaints (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 6/1/04 (dlb)
May 27, 2004 Filing 276 Joint and Unopposed MOTION by plas Lisa Simpson in 1:02-cv-02390, Anne Gilmore in 1:03-cv-02495 for extension of time in which to file sum jgm responses & briefs (in opposition to mtn for sum jgm by CU) to 6/30/04 (gms)
May 26, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 274 MINUTE ORDER : by Judge Robert E. Blackburn denying motion to extend time in which to file summary jgm responses and briefs to 6/30/04 [267-1] in 1:02-cv-02390 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 5/27/04 (dlb)
May 26, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 273 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer granting in part pla's motion to compel production of disciplinary records of deponent [156-1] and1 denying deponent-intervenor's motion for protective order re: disciplinary records of deponent [171-1] (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 5/27/04 (dlb)
May 26, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 272 Memorandum ORDER by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer granting motion to amend complaint [1-1][183-1] , granting motion to amend complaint [0-1] [159-1] (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 5/27/04 (dlb)
May 26, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 271 MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer denying motion for protective order that plas not be permitted to take certain depos or inquire into depos that relate only to new allegations in the proposed amended complaint [197-1]; granting motion to compel discovery from Player "A" concerning Monique Gillaspie [211-1] ; denying motion to extend discovery ddl [216-1]; denying motion to strike deposition errata sheets of dft's witnesses Barnett and Byyny [225-1]; denying motion to compel production of University Police documents [231-1]; denying motion for an order to compel discovery and prohibiting dft's counsel from invoking improper deposition objections [233-1]; denying motion for protective order regarding depo of Bo Delemos [237-1]; granting motion to seal pla's reply to dft's response to mtn to compel discovery [264-1]; ; discovery ddl set 8/30/04, ; pretrial conf set for 10:00 9/21/04; (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 5/27/04 (dlb)
May 25, 2004 Filing 267 Joint and Unopposed MOTION to extend time in which to file summary jgm responses and briefs to 6/30/04 (dlb)
May 25, 2004 Filing 266 Parties SUPPLEMENT to schedule order [137-1] in 1:02-cv-02390, 1:03-cv-02495 (dlb)
May 24, 2004 Filing 275 COURTROOM MINUTES by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer granting for the reasons stated on the record motion to compel production of disciplinary records of deponent [156-1] in 1:02-cv-02390 ; entry date : 5/27/04 Court Reporter: FTR - Reporter Deck - Ctrm 3 (dlb)
May 21, 2004 Filing 270 First AMENDED COMPLAINT [1-1] by plaintiff Anne Gilmore; jury demand terminating intervenor John Doe (dlb)
May 21, 2004 Filing 269 First AMENDED COMPLAINT [0-1] by plaintiff Lisa Simpson; jury demand terminating intervenor John Doe (dlb)
May 21, 2004 Filing 268 COURTROOM MINUTES by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer taking under advisement on 5/21/04 the motion to compel production of disciplinary records of deponent [156-1] granting motion to amend complaint [0-1] [159-1] granting motion to amend complaint [1-1][183-1] denying dft's motion for protective order that plas not be permitted to take certain depos or inquire into depos that relate only to new allegations in the proposed amended complaint [197-1]; granting pla Simpson's motion to compel discovery from Player "A" concerning Monique Gillaspie [211-1]; denying as moot pla Simpson's motion to extend discovery ddl [216-1] ; denying as moot pla Simpson's motion to strike deposition errata sheets of dft's witnesses Barnett and Byyny [225-1]; denying for reasons stated on the record pla Simpson's motion to compel production of University Police documents [231-1] denying without prej pla Simpson's motion for an order to compel discovery and prohibiting dft's counsel from invoking improper deposition objections [233-1]; denying as moot pla Simpson's motion for protective order regarding depo of Bo Delemos [237-1] ; granting dft's motion for leave to file under seal University's response to pla's motion to compel discovery from Player "A" [247-1]; regarding [246-1] motion response; denying as moot dft CU's motion to extend time to complete depositions of certain lay witnesses [256-1]; granting pla Simpson's motion to seal pla's reply to dft's response to mtn to compel discovery [264-1]; OSC is deemed satisfied; rebuttal reports by 7/30/04; all discovery must be concluded by 8/30/04; parties submit amended schedo by 5/25/04; discovery ddl set 8/30/04 in 1:02-cv-02390, in 1:03-cv-02495 ; pretrial conf set for 10:00 9/21/04 in 1:02-cv-02390, in 1:03-cv-02495 ; in court hrg held 5/21/04 ; entry date : 5/27/04 Court Reporter: FTR Reporter Deck - Ctrm 3 (dlb)
May 21, 2004 Filing 265 MEMORANDUM by Judge Robert E. Blackburn referring to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer the motion to seal pla's reply to dft's response to mtn to compel discovery [264-1] in 1:02-cv-02390, 1:03-cv-02495 (gms)
May 20, 2004 Filing 264 AMENDED MOTION to seal pla's reply to dft's response to mtn to compel discovery regarding motion to seal pla's mtn to compel discovery from Player "A" concerning Monique Gillaspie [actually pla's reply] [260-1] in 1:02-cv-02390, 1:03-cv-02495 (dlb)
May 20, 2004 Filing 263 MEMORANDUM by Judge Robert E. Blackburn referring to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer the motion to extend time to complete depositions of certain lay witnesses [256-1] in 1:02-cv-02390, 1:03-cv-02495 (dlb)
May 19, 2004 Filing 262 MEMORANDUM by Judge Robert E. Blackburn referring to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer the motion to seal pla's mtn to compel discovery from Player "A" concerning Monique Gillaspie [actually pla's reply] [260-1] in 1:02-cv-02390, 1:03-cv-02495 (dlb)
May 19, 2004 Filing 261 MEMORANDUM by Judge Robert E. Blackburn referring to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer the motion to seal pla's mtn to compel discovery from Player "A" concerning Monique Gillaspie [actually pla's reply] [260-1] in 1:02-cv-02390, 1:03-cv-02495 (dlb)
May 19, 2004 Filing 260 Unopposed MOTION by Lisa Simpson to seal pla's mtn to compel discovery from Player "A" concerning Monique Gillaspie [actually pla's reply] (dlb) Modified on 05/25/2004
May 19, 2004 Filing 259 University's RESPONSE to motion for an order to compel discovery and prohibiting dft's counsel from invoking improper deposition objections [233-1] in 1:02-cv-02390, 1:03-cv-02495 (dlb)
May 19, 2004 Filing 258 University's REPLY to response to motion for protective order that plas not be permitted to take certain depos or inquire into depos that relate only to new allegations in the proposed amended complaint [197-1] in 1:02-cv-02390, 1:03-cv-02495 (dlb)
May 19, 2004 Filing 257 Dft's RESPONSE to motion for protective order regarding depo of Bo Delemos [237-1] in 1:02-cv-02390, 1:03-cv-02495 (dlb)
May 19, 2004 Filing 256 Unopposed MOTION by dft to extend time to complete depositions of certain lay witnesses (dlb)
May 19, 2004 Filing 255 University's RESPONSE to motion to compel production of University Police documents [231-1] in 1:02-cv-02390, 1:03-cv-02495 (dlb)
May 18, 2004 Filing 254 Pla's REPLY to University's response to motion to compel discovery from Player "A" concerning Monique Gillaspie [211-1] *filed under seal, located in sealed area (dlb)
May 14, 2004 Filing 253 University's RESPONSE to pla's combined motion to strike deposition errata sheets of dft's witnesses Barnett and Byyny [225-1] in 1:02-cv-02390, 1:03-cv-02495 (dlb)
May 13, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 252 MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer regarding [237-1] motion for protective order regarding depo of Bo Delemos; dft has to 5/19/04 to respond all pending motion/in court hrg set for 9:30 5/21/04 in 1:02-cv-02390, in 1:03-cv-02495 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 5/14/04 (dlb)
May 13, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 251 MINUTE ORDER : by Judge Robert E. Blackburn granting motion to exceed page limitation :re: summary judgment response [250-1], regarding [219-1] motion for summary judgment purs to Rule 56, Fed.R.Civ.P. on the single Title IX claim in the consolidated complaints in 1:02-cv-02390 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 5/14/04 (dlb)
May 12, 2004 Filing 250 Unopposed MOTION by Lisa Simpson in 1:02-cv-02390 to exceed page limitation :re: summary judgment response (dlb)
May 12, 2004 Filing 249 MEMORANDUM by Judge Robert E. Blackburn referring to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer the motion for leave to file under seal University's response to pla's motion to compel discovery from Player "A" [247-1] in 1:02-cv-02390, 1:03-cv-02495 (dlb)
May 11, 2004 Filing 248 REPLY in support by Anne Gilmore to dft's response to pla's motion to amend complaint [1-1] [183-1] in 1:02-cv-02390, 1:03-cv-02495 (dlb)
May 11, 2004 Filing 247 University's Unopposed MOTION for leave to file under seal University's response to pla's motion to compel discovery from Player "A" (dlb) Modified on 05/13/2004
May 11, 2004 Filing 246 University's RESPONSE to pla's motion to compel discovery from Player "A" concerning Monique Gillaspie [211-1] *filed under seal, located in sealed area (dlb)
May 11, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 245 MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer granting motion to extend time to file reply brief to dft's resp to pla's mtn to amend complaint to 5/12/04 [238-1] , regarding [183-1] motion to amend complaint [1-1]; no further extensions will be allowed (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 5/11/04 (dlb)
May 11, 2004 Filing 244 EXHIBITS by plaintiff Lisa Simpson to pla's reply [239-1] in support of pla's motion to amend complaint [0-1] [159-1] (dlb)
May 11, 2004 Filing 243 MEMORANDUM by Judge Robert E. Blackburn referring to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer the motion for protective order regarding depo of Bo Delemos [237-1] in 1:02-cv-02390, 1:03-cv-02495 (dlb)
May 11, 2004 Filing 242 MEMORANDUM by Judge Robert E. Blackburn referring to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer the motion to extend time to file reply brief to dft's resp to pla's mtn to amend complaint to 5/12/04 [238-1] in 1:02-cv-02390, 1:03-cv-02495 (dlb)
May 10, 2004 Filing 241 MEMORANDUM by Judge Robert E. Blackburn referring to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer the motion to compel production of University Police documents [231-1] in 1:02-cv-02390 (dlb)
May 10, 2004 Filing 240 JOINDER by pla Lisa Simpson in pla Ann Gilmore's response [232-1] to dft's motion for protective order that plas not be permitted to take certain depos or inquire into depos that relate only to new allegations in the proposed amended complaint [197-1] in 1:02-cv-02390 (dlb)
May 10, 2004 Filing 239 REPLY by plaintiff Lisa Simpson to dft's response to pla Simpson's motion to amend complaint [0-1] [159-1] (dlb)
May 10, 2004 Filing 238 Unopposed MOTION by plaintiff Anne Gilmore to extend time to file reply brief to dft's resp to pla's mtn to amend complaint to 5/12/04 (dlb)
May 10, 2004 Filing 237 MOTION by plaintiff Lisa Simpson in 1:02-cv-02390 for protective order regarding depo of Bo Delemos (dlb) Modified on 05/11/2004
May 10, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 236 MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer regarding [231-1] motion to compel production of University Police documents and regarding [233-1] motion for an order to compel discovery and prohibiting dft's counsel from invoking improper deposition objections, responses due by 5/19/04; no replies will be permitted; FURTHUR ORDERED: counsel should be prepared to discuss ALL pending motions at the hrg set for 5/21/04 at 9:30 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 5/10/04 (dlb)
May 10, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 235 MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer regarding [225-1] pla's combined motion to strike deposition errata sheets of dft's witnesses Barnett and Byyny; dft has to 5/17/04 to respond; no replies will be permitted (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 5/10/04 (dlb)
May 10, 2004 Filing 234 MEMORANDUM by Judge Robert E. Blackburn referring to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer the motion for an order to compel discovery and prohibiting dft's counsel from invoking improper deposition objections [233-1] in 1:02-cv-02390, 1:03-cv-02495 (dlb)
May 10, 2004 Filing 233 Pla's MOTION for an order to compel discovery and prohibiting dft's counsel from invoking improper deposition objections (dlb)
May 10, 2004 Filing 232 Pla's RESPONSE to dft's motion for protective order that plas not be permitted to take certain depos or inquire into depos that relate only to new allegations in the proposed amended complaint [197-1] in 1:02-cv-02390, 1:03-cv-02495 (dlb)
May 10, 2004 Filing 231 Pla's MOTION to compel production of University Police documents (dlb)
May 7, 2004 Filing 230 MEMORANDUM by Judge Robert E. Blackburn referring to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer the motion to strike deposition errata sheets of dft's witnesses Barnett and Byyny [225-1] in 1:02-cv-02390, 1:03-cv-02495 (dlb)
May 7, 2004 Filing 229 COURTROOM MINUTES by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer regarding [227-1] transcript , regarding [228-1] transcript; REDACTED COPY of hearing, filed under seal and placed in sealed area; UN-REDACTED COPY of hearing placed in court file for public view ; entry date : 5/10/04 Court Reporter: FTR Reporter Deck - Ctrm 3 (dlb)
May 7, 2004 Filing 228 TRANSCRIPT of Hearing - via telephone on March 12, 2004 before Craig B. Shaffer ( pages: 1 - 45) Prepared By: Avery/Woods (certified copy) *RE-DACTED COPY for public view (dlb)
May 7, 2004 Filing 227 TRANSCRIPT of Hearing - via telephone on March 12, 2004 before Craig B. Shaffer ( pages: 1 - 45) Prepared By: Avery/Woods (certified copy) *UN-REDACTED COPY filed under seal, placed in sealed area (dlb) Modified on 05/10/2004
May 7, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 226 MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer denying motion for sanctions for violation of protective order and the 2/10/04 order on discovery [REDACTED COPY] [175-1] in 1:02-cv-02390 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 5/7/04 (dlb)
May 6, 2004 Filing 225 Pla's combined MOTION to strike deposition errata sheets of dft's witnesses Barnett and Byyny (dlb)
May 5, 2004 Filing 224 MEMORANDUM by Judge Robert E. Blackburn referring to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer the motion to extend discovery ddl [216-1] in 1:02-cv-02390, 1:03-cv-02495 (dlb)
May 5, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 223 MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer granting motion to extend time in which to file reply brief to mtn to amend complaint and to file excess pages [215-1] regarding [183-1] motion to amend complaint [1-1] in 1:03-cv-02495 in 1:02-cv-02390 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 5/6/04 (dlb)
May 5, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 222 MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer granting motion to seal pla's mtn to compel discovery from Player "A" concerning Monique Gillaspie [212-1] regarding [211-1] motion to compel discovery from Player "A" concerning Monique Gillaspie in 1:02-cv-02390, 1:03-cv-02495 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 5/6/04 (dlb)
May 5, 2004 Filing 221 University's RESPONSE to pla Gilmore's unopposed motion to extend discovery ddl [216-1] in 1:02-cv-02390, 1:03-cv-02495 (dlb)
May 5, 2004 Filing 220 University of Colorado's Opening BRIEF in support of its motion for summary judgment purs to Rule 56, Fed.R.Civ.P. on the single Title IX claim in the consolidated complaints [219-1] in 1:02-cv-02390, 1:03-cv-02495 (dlb)
May 5, 2004 Filing 219 University of Colorado's MOTION for summary judgment purs to Rule 56, Fed.R.Civ.P. on the single Title IX claim in the consolidated complaints (dlb)
May 4, 2004 Filing 218 MEMORANDUM by Judge Robert E. Blackburn referring to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer the motion to extend time in which to file reply brief to mtn to amend complaint and to file excess pages [215-1] in 1:02-cv-02390, 1:03-cv-02495 (dlb)
May 4, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 217 ORDER by Judge Robert E. Blackburn granting motion for leave file a single motion for summary judgment in excess of twenty pages but not more than twenty-five pages [209-1] in 1:02-cv-02390, 1:03-cv-02495 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 5/4/04 (dlb)
May 4, 2004 Filing 216 Unopposed MOTION by plaintiff Anne Gilmore in 1:03-cv-02495 to extend discovery ddl (dlb)
May 3, 2004 Filing 215 Unopposed MOTION by plaintiff Anne Gilmore to extend time in which to file reply brief to mtn to amend complaint and to file excess pages (dlb)
April 30, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 214 MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer granting motion to extend time to reply in support of mtn to compel [204-1], granting motion for leave to [208-1], granting motion to exceed page limitation :re: reply brief [208-2] regarding [211-1] motion to compel discovery from Player "A" concerning Monique Gillaspie; dft has to 5/11/04 to respond; pla has to 5/18/04 to reply all pending motions/n court hrg set for 9:30 5/21/04 in 1:02-cv-02390, in 1:03-cv-02495 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 5/3/04 (dlb)
April 29, 2004 Filing 213 MEMORANDUM by Judge Robert E. Blackburn referring to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer the motion to seal pla's mtn to compel discovery from Player "A" concerning Monique Gillaspie [212-1], referring to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer the motion to compel discovery from Player "A" concerning Monique Gillaspie [211-1] in 1:02-cv-02390, 1:03-cv-02495 (dlb)
April 28, 2004 Filing 212 Unopposed MOTION by Lisa Simpson to seal pla's mtn to compel discovery from Player "A" concerning Monique Gillaspie (dlb)
April 28, 2004 Filing 211 MOTION by plaintiff Lisa Simpson to compel discovery from Player "A" concerning Monique Gillaspie *filed under seal, located in sealed area (dlb)
April 27, 2004 Filing 210 MEMORANDUM by Judge Robert E. Blackburn referring to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer the motion to extend time to reply in support of mtn to compel [204-1] in 1:02-cv-02390, 1:03-cv-02495 (dlb)
April 27, 2004 Filing 209 MOTION for leave file a single motion for summary judgment in excess of twenty pages but not more than twenty-five pages (dlb)
April 26, 2004 Filing 208 Unopposed MOTION by plaintiff Lisa Simpson in 1:02-cv-02390 for leave to and to exceed page limitation :re: reply brief (dlb)
April 26, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 207 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer regarding [148-1] minutes of hrg 3/12/04; the court reporter will prepare for the record a redacted transcript of the 3/12/04 telephone hrg; the redacted transcript shall be submitted to this court for review; following review the clerk's office will seal and place the ORIGINAL transcript of the 3/12/04 hrg; the redacted version of the 3/12/04 hrg transcript will be placed in the case file and open to public inspection; implementation of this order shall be stayed up to and including 4/28/04 to allow for objections; the courtroom minutes are not sealed [pursuant to Judge Shaffer's chambers] (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 4/26/04 (dlb) Modified on 04/26/2004
April 23, 2004 Filing 206 MEMORANDUM by Judge Robert E. Blackburn referring to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer the motion to extend time to reply in support of mtn to compel [204-1] in 1:02-cv-02390, 1:03-cv-02495 (dlb)
April 23, 2004 Filing 205 REPLY by Lisa Simpson, Anne Gilmore to depoent-intervenor's response to pla's motion to compel production of disciplinary records of deponent [156-1] in 1:02-cv-02390, 1:03-cv-02495 (dlb)
April 23, 2004 Filing 204 MOTION by plaintiff Lisa Simpson, plaintiff Anne Gilmore to extend time to reply in support of mtn to compel [filed with motion] (dlb) Modified on 04/23/2004
April 22, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 203 MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer granting motion to extend time to 4/30/04 to complete depos of certain lay witnesses [201-1] in 1:02-cv-02390, 1:03-cv-02495 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 4/23/04 (dlb)
April 21, 2004 Filing 202 MEMORANDUM by Judge Robert E. Blackburn referring to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer the motion to extend time to 4/30/04 to complete depos of certain lay witnesses [201-1] in 1:02-cv-02390, 1:03-cv-02495 (dlb)
April 21, 2004 Filing 201 Unopposed MOTION by defendant University CO Bldr to extend time to 4/30/04 to complete depos of certain lay witnesses (dlb)
April 20, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 200 MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer regarding [183-1] pla's motion to amend complaint [1-1]; pla's reply due by 5/4/04; regarding [197-1] dft's motion for protective order that plas not be permitted to take certain depos or inquire into depos that relate only to new allegations in the proposed amended complaint; pla has to 5/10/04 to file a response; dft has to 5/19/04 to reply (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 4/20/04 (dlb)
April 19, 2004 Filing 199 MEMORANDUM by Judge Robert E. Blackburn referring to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer the motion for protective order that plas not be permitted to take certain depos or inquire into depos that relate only to new allegations in the proposed amended complaint [197-1] in 1:02-cv-02390, 1:03-cv-02495 (dlb)
April 19, 2004 Filing 198 University of Colorado's RESPONSE to plas' motion to amend complaint [1-1] [183-1] and motion to amend complaint [0-1] [159-1] in 1:02-cv-02390, 1:03-cv-02495 (dlb)
April 19, 2004 Filing 197 MOTION by University CO Bldr for protective order that plas not be permitted to take certain depos or inquire into depos that relate only to new allegations in the proposed amended complaint (dlb)
April 16, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER by Judge Robert E. Blackburn granting motion for leave to file consolidated response of no more than 20 pgs to plas' seperate motions to amend [195-1] , regarding [183-1] motion to amend complaint [1-1][159-1] and motion to amend complaint [0-1] (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 4/19/04 (dlb)
April 15, 2004 Filing 195 Unopposed MOTION by defendant for leave to file consolidated response of no more than 20 pgs to plas' seperate motions to amend (dlb)
April 14, 2004 Filing 194 TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing on March 26, 2004 before Craig B. Shaffer ( pages: 1 - 145) Prepared By: Avery/Woods (certified copy) (dlb)
April 14, 2004 Filing 193 MEMORANDUM by Judge Robert E. Blackburn regarding [192-1] response (Petition) by Rocky Mountain News (dlb)
April 13, 2004 Filing 192 Petition (Response) to ORDER to show cause by Rocky Mountain News re: gag order (dlb)
April 5, 2004 Filing 191 MEMORANDUM by Judge Robert E. Blackburn referring to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer pla Gilmore's motion to amend complaint [1-1] in 1:03-cv-02495 [183-1] in 1:02-cv-02390 (gms)
April 2, 2004 Filing 189 STATEMENT by plaintiff Lisa Simpson re: confidential information covered by the proto (dlb)
April 2, 2004 Filing 188 Response to ORDER to show cause by Lisa Simpson why an order regarding extrajudicial statements should not enter (dlb)
April 2, 2004 Filing 187 University's Response to ORDER to show cause dated 3/26/04 (dlb)
April 2, 2004 Filing 186 Response to ORDER to show cause by Independent Investigative Commission to 3/26/04 order (dlb)
April 2, 2004 Filing 185 SUPPLEMENTAL Response by plaintiff Anne Gilmore to pla's response [182-1] to Magistrate Judge Shaffer's request at hrg on 3/26/04 (dlb)
April 2, 2004 Filing 184 Certificate of Compliance by plaintiff Anne Gilmore re: motion to amend complaint [1-1] in 1:03-cv-02495 [183-1] (dlb)
April 2, 2004 Filing 183 MOTION by plaintiff Anne Gilmore to amend complaint [1-1] in 1:03-cv-02495 (dlb)
April 2, 2004 Filing 182 RESPONSE by plaintiff Anne Gilmore to Magistrate Judge Shaffer's request at the hrg on 3/26/04 (dlb)
April 2, 2004 Filing 181 Dft's STATEMENT of its past and future practices to protect and ensure confidentiality of information designated by plas as confidential (dlb)
April 2, 2004 Filing 180 DFt's STATEMENT of information designated as Confidential under the proto (dlb)
April 2, 2004 Tendered First Amended Complaint and Jury Demand submitted by plaintiff Anne Gilmore re: motion to amend complaint [1-1] in 1:03-cv-02495 [183-1] (dlb)
March 30, 2004 Filing 179 MEMORANDUM by Judge Robert E. Blackburn referring to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer the motion for sanctions for violation of protective order and the 2/10/04 order on discovery [REDACTED COPY] [175-1] in 1:02-cv-02390, 1:03-cv-02495 (dlb)
March 29, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 178 MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer regarding [159-1] motion to amend complaint; pla gilmore must file her mtn to amend on or before 4/2/04; further the dft has up to and including 4/19/04 to file a response to all pending mtns to amend [0-1] (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 3/30/04 (dlb)
March 29, 2004 Filing 177 SUPPLEMENTAL Statement by plaintiff Lisa Simpson to pla's motion for sanctions for violation of the proto and the 2/10/04 order on discovery motions [140-1] *filed under seal (dlb)
March 29, 2004 Filing 176 RESPONSE by defendant University CO Bldr [REDACTED COPY] to Lisa Simpson's motion for sanctions for violation of protective order and the 2/10/04 order on discovery [REDACTED COPY] [175-1] (dlb)
March 29, 2004 Filing 175 MOTION by plaintiff Lisa Simpson for sanctions for violation of protective order and the 2/10/04 order on discovery [REDACTED COPY] (dlb)
March 26, 2004 Filing 190 COURTROOM MINUTES by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer denying pla's motion for order closing the 3/26/04 hrg on mtn for sanctions to the public [163-1]; granting Intervenor John Doe's motion to intervene in order to respond to pla's mtn to compel prod of disciplinary records of deponent [170-1] adding intervenor John Doe to case(s) regarding [171-1] Intervenor's motion for protective order re: disciplinary records of deponent, is held in abeyance pending final briefing; plas shall file written resp by 4/14/04; the mtn will be deemed fully briefed 4/27/04 and a hrg will be set; re: pla's motion to compel production of disciplinary records of deponent, mtn is held in abeyance pending full briefing; the mtn will be deemed fully briefed 4/27/02 and a hrg will be set; [156-1] regarding pla Simpson's [159-1] motion to amend complaint [0-1]; mtn is held in abeyance pending final briefing; dfts has to 4/19/04 to respond; pla Gilmore has to 4/2/04 to file a mtn to amend complaint; dfts have to 4/19/04 to file a response; granting motion for reconsideration minute order [146-1] dated 3/11/04 [169-1]; granting in part and denying in part pla's motion for leave to file supplemental statement of facts and to seal supplemental statement re: mtn for sanctions [172-1]; denying pla's motion for sanctions for violation of the proto and the 2/10/04 order on discovery motions [140-1]; on or before 4/2/04 the parties shall submit a detailed, exhaustive form, all steps in their offices to protect and ensure confidentiality; the parties have to 3/29/04 to submit REDACTED versions of the mtns for sanctions, responses and reply; versions of these docs which were filed UNDER SEAL REMAIN SEALED; these redacted versions shall be filed for public access the parties have to 4/2/04 to show cause why the court should not impose formal restrictions on the parties .... from Extrajudicial comments; entry date : 4/5/04 Court Reporter: FTR Reporter Deck - Ctrm 3 (dlb)
March 25, 2004 Filing 174 MEMORANDUM by Judge Robert E. Blackburn referring to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer the motion to intervene in order to respond to pla's mtn to compel prod of disciplinary records of deponent [170-1] in 1:02-cv-02390, 1:03-cv-02495 (dlb)
March 25, 2004 Filing 173 MEMORANDUM by Judge Robert E. Blackburn referring to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer the motion for leave to file supplemental statement of facts and to seal supplemental statement re: mtn for sanctions [172-1] in 1:02-cv-02390, 1:03-cv-02495 (dlb)
March 24, 2004 Filing 172 Combined MOTION by plaintiff Lisa Simpson for leave to file supplemental statement of facts and to seal supplemental statement re: mtn for sanctions (dlb)
March 24, 2004 Filing 171 MOTION by Deponent-Intervenor John Doe I for protective order re: disciplinary records of deponent (dlb)
March 24, 2004 Filing 170 MOTION by Deponent John Doe I to intervene in order to respond to pla's mtn to compel prod of disciplinary records of deponent (dlb)
March 24, 2004 Filing 169 MOTION by Denver Publishing Co for reconsideration minute order [146-1] dated 3/11/04 (dlb)
March 24, 2004 Filing 168 Supplemental STATEMENT by plaintiff Lisa Simpson of facts in support of pla's motion for sanctions for violation of the proto and the 2/10/04 order on discovery motions [140-1] *filed under seal, located in sealed area (dlb)
March 24, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 167 MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer granting motion to file dft's resp to pla's mtn for sanctions for violation of proto and 2/10/04 oder on discovery motions under seal [162-1] in 1:02-cv-02390, 1:03-cv-02495, regarding [140-1] motion for sanctions for violation of the proto and the 2/10/04 order on discovery motions in 1:02-cv-02390 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 3/24/04 (dlb)
March 23, 2004 Filing 166 MEMORANDUM by Judge Robert E. Blackburn referring to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer the motion to amend complaint [0-1] [159-1] in 1:02-cv-02390, 1:03-cv-02495 (dlb)
March 23, 2004 Filing 165 MEMORANDUM by Judge Robert E. Blackburn referring to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer the motion to file dft's resp to pla's mtn for sanctions for violation of proto and 2/10/04 oder on discovery motions under seal [162-1] in 1:02-cv-02390, 1:03-cv-02495 (dlb)
March 23, 2004 Filing 164 MEMORANDUM by Judge Robert E. Blackburn referring to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer the motion for order closing the 3/26/04 hrg on mtn for sanctions to the public [163-1] in 1:02-cv-02390, 1:03-cv-02495 (dlb)
March 22, 2004 Filing 163 Unopposed MOTION by plaintiff Lisa Simpson for order closing the 3/26/04 hrg on mtn for sanctions to the public under D.C.Colo.L.Civ.R. 7.2(A)(2) (dlb)
March 22, 2004 Filing 162 Dft's Unopposed MOTION to file dft's resp to pla's mtn for sanctions for violation of proto and 2/10/04 oder on discovery motions under seal (dlb)
March 22, 2004 Filing 161 RESPONSE by defendant University CO Bldr to pla, Lisa Simpson's motion for sanctions for violation of the proto and the 2/10/04 order on discovery motions [140-1] *filed under seal, located in sealed are (dlb)
March 22, 2004 Filing 160 Certificate of Compliance by plaintiff Lisa Simpson re: motion to amend complaint [0-1] [159-1] (dlb)
March 22, 2004 Filing 159 MOTION by plaintiff Lisa Simpson to amend complaint [0-1] (dlb)
March 22, 2004 Tendered First Amended Complaint and Jury Demand submitted by plaintiff Lisa Simpson re: motion to amend complaint [0-1] [159-1] (dlb)
March 18, 2004 Filing 158 MEMORANDUM by Judge Robert E. Blackburn referring to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer the motion to compel production of disciplinary records of deponent [156-1] in 1:02-cv-02390, 1:03-cv-02495 (dlb)
March 18, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 157 MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer re: pla's motion to compel production of disciplinary records of deponent, resp due by 3/24/04 [156-1] 1:30 3/26/04 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 3/19/04 (dlb)
March 18, 2004 Filing 156 Pla's MOTION to compel production of disciplinary records of deponent (dlb)
March 17, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 155 MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer resetting hearing on motion for sanctions for violation of the proto and the 2/10/04 order on discovery motions [140-1] in 1:02-cv-02390 1:30 3/26/04 in 1:02-cv-02390, in 1:03-cv-02495 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 3/18/04 (dlb)
March 17, 2004 Filing 154 MEMORANDUM by Judge Robert E. Blackburn referring to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer the motion to seal Exhibit A to pla's joint motion for protective order [150-1] in 1:02-cv-02390, 1:03-cv-02495 (dlb) Modified on 03/25/2004
March 16, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 153 MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer granting motion to file under seal pla's unopposed motion to seal Exhibit A [151-1], granting motion to seal Exhibit A to pla's joint motion for protective order [150-1] (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 3/16/04 (dlb)
March 15, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 152 MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer denying motion for protective order re: limiting its scope to new subjects not inquired into during 10/30/03 depo [144-1] (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 3/15/04 (dlb)
March 12, 2004 Filing 151 MOTION by plaintiff Lisa Simpson to file under seal pla's unopposed motion to seal Exhibit A (dlb)
March 12, 2004 Filing 150 Unopposed MOTION by plaintiff Lisa Simpson to seal Exhibit A to pla's joint motion for protective order *motion filed under seal, located in sealed area (dlb)
March 12, 2004 Filing 149 EXHIBIT A by plaintiff Lisa Simpson in 1:02-cv-02390 to motion for protective order re: limiting its scope to new subjects not inquired into during 10/30/03 depo [144-1] in 1:02-cv-02390, to motion for protective order re: limiting its scope to new subjects not inquired into during 10/30/03 depo [0-1] *filed under seal, located in sealed area (dlb)
March 12, 2004 Filing 148 COURTROOM MINUTES by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer denying motion for protective order re: limiting its scope to new subjects not inquired into during 10/30/03 depo [144-1] in 1:02-cv-02390, 1:03-cv-02495 ; entry date : 3/15/04 Court Reporter: FTR Reporter Deck - Ctrm 3 (dlb)
March 12, 2004 Filing 147 MEMORANDUM by Judge Robert E. Blackburn referring to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer the motion for protective order re: limiting its scope to new subjects not inquired into during 10/30/03 depo [144-1] in 1:02-cv-02390, 1:03-cv-02495 (dlb)
March 11, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 146 MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer granting motion to file pla's mtn for sanctions for violations of proto under seal [141-1] , re: pla's motion for sanctions for violation of the proto and the 2/10/04 order on discovery motions, dft has to 3/22/04 to respond; a hrg is set for [140-1] 3:00 3/26/04 in 1:02-cv-02390, in 1:03-cv-02495 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 3/12/04 (dlb)
March 11, 2004 Filing 145 Pla's Certificate of Compliance re: motion for protective order re: limiting its scope to new subjects not inquired into during 10/30/03 depo [144-1] in 1:02-cv-02390, 1:03-cv-02495 (dlb)
March 11, 2004 Filing 144 Pla's MOTION for protective order re: limiting its scope to new subjects not inquired into during 10/30/03 depo (dlb)
March 10, 2004 Filing 143 MEMORANDUM by Judge Robert E. Blackburn referring to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer the motion to file pla's mtn for sanctions for violations of proto under seal [141-1] in 1:02-cv-02390, 1:03-cv-02495 (dlb)
March 10, 2004 Filing 142 MEMORANDUM by Judge Robert E. Blackburn referring to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer the motion for sanctions for violation of the proto and the 2/10/04 order on discovery motions [140-1] in 1:02-cv-02390, 1:03-cv-02495 (dlb)
March 9, 2004 Filing 141 Unopposed MOTION by plaintiff Lisa Simpson to file pla's mtn for sanctions for violations of proto under seal (dlb)
March 9, 2004 Filing 140 MOTION by plaintiff Lisa Simpson for sanctions for violation of the proto and the 2/10/04 order on discovery motions *filed under seal, located in sealed area (dlb)
February 25, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 138 MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer granting motion to extend time for Gilmore parties to exchange Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures [134-1] in 1:02-cv-02390, 1:03-cv-02495 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 2/26/04 (dlb)
February 24, 2004 Filing 139 COURTROOM MINUTES by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer ; pto ddl set for 9/14/04 in 1:02-cv-02390, in 1:03-cv-02495 ; pretrial conf set for 10:00 9/21/04 in 1:02-cv-02390, in 1:03-cv-02495 ; entry date : 2/27/04 Court Reporter: FTR - Reporter Deck - Ctrm 3 (dlb)
February 24, 2004 Filing 137 Amended SCHEDULING ORDER Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer ; Discovery cutoff 4/30/04 ;dispositive motions due ; pretrial order due 9/14/04 ;pretrial conference set 10:00 9/21/04 in 1:02-cv-02390, in 1:03-cv-02495 (cc: all counsel) (dlb)
February 18, 2004 Filing 136 MEMORANDUM by Judge Robert E. Blackburn referring to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer the motion to extend time for Gilmore parties to exchange Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures [134-1] in 1:02-cv-02390, 1:03-cv-02495 (dlb)
February 18, 2004 Filing 135 TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing on January 27, 2004 before Craig B. Shaffer ( pages: 1 - 113) Prepared By: Avery/Woods (certified copy) (dlb)
February 17, 2004 Filing 134 Unopposed MOTION by plaintiff Anne Gilmore in 1:03-cv-02495 to extend time for Gilmore parties to exchange Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures (lam)
February 11, 2004 Filing 133 TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing on December 8, 2003 before Craig B. Shaffer ( pages: 1 - 69) Prepared By: Avery/Woods (certified copy) (dlb)
February 10, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer granting in part and denying in part as specified dft's motion to compel answers to interrogs and req for prod of docs relating to medical info/records and therapy records [120-1] (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 2/11/04 (dlb)
February 4, 2004 Filing 131 COURTROOM MINUTES by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer ; Status conf held ; entry date : 2/6/04 Court Reporter: FTR (dlb)
February 2, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 130 MINUTE ORDER : by Judge Robert E. Blackburn denying motion to exceed page limitation :re: Opening Summary Judgment Brief [127-1] in 1:02-cv-02390 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 2/2/04 (dlb)
January 30, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer granting motion to consolidate cases 02-RB-2390 (CBS) and 03-RB-2495 (CBS) [90-1] (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 2/2/04 (dlb)
January 27, 2004 Filing 128 COURTROOM MINUTES by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer granting in part and denying in part for reasons stated on the record motion to compel pla's diary [87-1] regarding [90-1] motion to consolidate cases 02-RB-2390 (CBS) and 03-RB-2495 (CBS) shall be consolidated and all future filing shall be filed under 02-RB-1390 (CBS) ; disp mtn ddl vacated 1/27/04 granting motion to compel Rule 35 examination [91-1], granting in part and denying in part motion for forthwith hearing [91-2] granting motion to compel answers to interrogs and req for prod of docs relating to medical info/records and therapy records [120-1] ; entry date : 1/29/04 Court Reporter: FTR - Reporter Deck - Ctrm 3 (dlb)
January 26, 2004 Filing 127 Renewed Unopposed MOTION by defendant University CO Bldr to exceed page limitation :re: Opening Summary Judgment Brief (dlb)
January 22, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 126 MINUTE ORDER : by Judge Robert E. Blackburn denying dft's unopposed motion to exceed page limitation re: Opening Summary Judgment Brief [124-1] (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 1/23/04 (pap)
January 20, 2004 Filing 125 RESPONSE by plaintiff Lisa Simpson to dft's motion to compel answers to interrogs and req for prod of docs relating to medical info/records and therapy records [120-1] (pap)
January 20, 2004 Filing 124 Unopposed MOTION by defendant University CO Bldr to exceed page limitation re: Opening Summary Judgment Brief (pap)
January 20, 2004 Filing 123 REPLY by defendant University CO Bldr to pla's response to dft's motion to compel Rule 35 examination [91-1] (pap)
January 15, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 122 MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer re: dft's motion to compel answers to interrogs and req for prod of docs relating to medical info/records and therapy records, pla's resp due by 1/20/04; a hrg is set for [120-1] 1:30 1/27/04 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 1/16/04 (dlb)
January 14, 2004 Filing 121 MEMORANDUM by Judge Robert E. Blackburn referring to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer the motion to compel answers to interrogs and req for prod of docs relating to medical info/records and therapy records [120-1] (dlb)
January 13, 2004 Filing 120 MOTION by defendant University CO Bldr to compel answers to interrogs and req for prod of docs relating to medical info/records and therapy records (dlb)
January 13, 2004 Filing 119 REPLY by defendant University CO Bldr to pla's response to dft's motion to compel pla's diary [87-1] (dlb)
January 13, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 118 MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer granting motion for leave to file "Reply in support of mtn to designate confidential documents under proto" under seal [104-1] resetting hearing on motion to compel Rule 35 examination [91-1], motion to consolidate cases 02-RB-2390 (CBS) and 03-RB-2495 (CBS) [90-1] and motion to compel pla's diary [87-1] 1:30 1/27/04 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 1/14/04 (dlb)
January 12, 2004 Filing 117 MEMORANDUM by Judge Robert E. Blackburn referring to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer the motion to place diary pages under seal [Exhibit B of response in opp to dft's mtn to compel] [111-1] (dlb)
January 9, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 116 MINUTE ORDER : by Judge Robert E. Blackburn granting motion for leave to file "Reply in supp