August 26, 2014 |
Filing
133
ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO DOCKET TRANSCRIPTS IN REFERENCED CASES: the Clerk is directed to docket transcripts of all coordinated proceedings in each of the referenced actions, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 8/26/2014. (jsmit)
|
August 6, 2014 |
Filing
132
JUDGMENT by Clerk re 131 : Plaintiff is awarded its costs to be taxed upon the filing of a Bill of Costs pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 54.1, by Clerk on 8/6/2014. (jsmit)
|
March 7, 2014 |
Filing
116
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: defendants shall restore to the plaintiffs all funds that were illegally recaptured for fiscal years through and including FY 2008. The defendants' obligation to restore such funds is subject to the 6-year limitati ons period provided by 28 U.S.C. § 2401(a); with respect to grant funding for those fiscal years, HUD shall refrain from threatening recapture from the plaintiffs and shall not act upon any threatened recapture; on or before April 15, 2014, the plaintiffs in each civil action shall submit a proposed form of judgment, specifying the amounts to be paid to each tribe ortribal housing entity and the asserted sources of payment; and for any plaintiff who claims entitlement to payment for underfu nding because HUD excluded units from that plaintiff's FCAS in a particular fiscal year, the proposed form of judgment should include a separate itemization for those amounts and may be submitted by May 15, 2014. An Appendix may be provided to explain the calculation of the amount owed and the record support for the claim, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 3/7/2014. (rpmcd )
|
September 27, 2013 |
Filing
112
ORDER granting 111 Defendants for Leave to File Surreply to Plaintiffs Reply to Defendants Response to Plaintiffs Statement of Relief Requested, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 9/27/2013.(ervsl, )
|
August 1, 2013 |
Filing
107
ORDER Granting 106 Motion for Leave to File a Reply to Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Statement of Relief Requested and Motion to Supplement the Record: Plaintiff shall file its Reply Brief on or before September 3, 2013, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 8/1/2013.(rpmcd)
|
December 26, 2012 |
Filing
99
ORDER Granting 98 re 94 : Plaintiff shall file its Statement of Relief Requested on or before March 4, 2013 and Defendants shall file their response to Plaintiff's Statement of Relief Requested on or before May 6, 2013, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 12/26/2012. (rpmcd)
|
November 19, 2012 |
Filing
94
ORDER REGARDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE re 93 : On or before December 19, 2012, simultaneous briefs shall be filed by the plaintiffs and defendants in the coordinated cases addressing factual and legal questions pertaining to HUD's authority to re capture funds awarded in a previous grant year that the grant recipient spent on affordable housing activities. On or before January 18, 2013, plaintiffs in each case shall file a statement of the relief requested and the court's jurisdiction un der the APA to grant such relief. Proposed supplements to the administrative record may be tendered. Defendants' responses to the plaintiffs' statements are due on or before March 19, 2013, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 11/19/2012. (rpmcd )
|
August 31, 2012 |
Filing
89
MEMORANDUM OPINION And ORDER, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 8/31/2012. (rpmcd )
|
April 16, 2012 |
Filing
84
ORDER FOR COORDINATED HEARING: will held at a time to be scheduled and all counsel representing the parties must be personally present at the hearing, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 4/16/2012. (rpmcd)
|
July 6, 2010 |
Filing
65
ORDER for Consolidated Status Conference. Consolidated status conference will be held on July 23, 2010, at 2:00 p.m. Mountain Daylight Time in Courtroom A201, the Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse, 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado. Because o f the geographical dispersion of plaintiffs' counsel, the conference will be held in a courtroom equipped to accommodate counsel who may wish to participate by telephone conference to avoid travel expense. Personal attendance is, of course, pref erred. Counsel who attend by telephone conference will call the court staff at 303-844-4627 by Monday, July 19, 2010, between the hours of 8:00 a.m. and 4:00 p.m. to provide telephone numbers. The conference call will be initiated by the Courts staff, signed by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 7/6/2010. (rpmcd )
|
May 21, 2010 |
Filing
61
ORDER Vacating Judgment and Dismissing Civil Action. Ordered that the judgment entered on 05/25/06, ad amended 06/30/06, is vacated and this civil action is dismissed by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 05/21/10. (jjh, )
|