USA v. King
Case Number: 1:2005cv00825
Filed: May 3, 2005
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
Presiding Judge: Zita L. Weinshienk
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Student Loan
Cause of Action: 28:1345 Recovery of Debt to US
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting 38 Motion to Vacate Order and to Dismiss Garnishment. ORDERED that the Writ of Garnishment issued on February 13, 2015 31 is DISMISSED. ORDERED that the Garnishment Order issued on February 13, 2016 36 is VACATED. Signed by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 01/04/16.(jhawk, )
February 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 36 GARNESHEE ORDER re 35 Motion for Order. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 02/13/2015. (athom, )
October 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 29 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe: Show Cause Hearing held on 10/21/2014. Withdrawing 21 United States' Motion for Contempt. Order to Show Cause 23 is discharged. Court Reporter: FTR - E. E. Miller. FTR: Courtroom A502. (emill)
July 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 19 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe: Motion Hearing held on 7/14/2014.Granting 11 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Answers to Plaintiffs Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Pro duction of Documents. Defendant shall provide complete and accurate responses to Plaintiff's Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents on or before 8/1/2014. Court Reporter: FTR - E. E. Miller. FTR: Courtroom A502. (emill)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?