August 17, 2011 |
Filing
278
ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a), this matter, and all claims asserted therein, is dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear its own attorneys' fees and costs. The jury trial set for 8/29/2011 is vacated. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 8/17/11. (mnfsl, )
|
August 2, 2011 |
Filing
260
ORDER denying 250 Joint Motion to Certify Orders as Final Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 54(b) and to Stay Proceedings. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 8/2/11.(mnf, )
|
June 29, 2011 |
Filing
234
ORDER denying 154 defendant's Motion to Certify Questions of State Law to the Colorado Supreme Court, and For Stay of Action; denying 218 plaintiff's Motion to Certify Question of State Law. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 6/29/11.(mnf, )
|
April 25, 2011 |
Filing
222
Minute Entry for Motion Hearing proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 4/25/2011. Granting 219 Motion to Vacate. The Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/12/11 at 9:45 a.m. is VACATED and RESET for 6/16/2011 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (FTR: B. Abiakam) (babia)
|
March 24, 2011 |
Filing
217
ORDER. Plaintiff's 183 Motion for Substitution is granted in part and denied in part. The 180 Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Motion in Limine, Submittal of Jury Instructions, Witness and Exhibit Lists and Voir Dire Questions, and for Sta y Pending Substitution of Proper Party Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 25(a) is denied as moot, as Karen Warren, as the personal representative of the estate of Kirk Warren, is now substituted as the plaintiff in this action. Defendant's 148 Motio n for Partial Summary Judgment is denied in part and and denied as moot in part. Plaintiff's 153 Motion for Leave to Supplement Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is denied. The 166 Recommendati on for Rescheduling of Trial Date is moot in light of the resetting of the trial in this case to 8/29/2011. The 170 Joint Motion to Extend Pretrial Deadlines is denied as moot in light of the resetting of the trial in this case to 8/29/2011, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 3/24/11.(mnf, )
|
December 3, 2010 |
Filing
208
MINUTE ORDER granting 205 Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Vacate and Reschedule Final Pretrial Conference. Final Pretrial Conference reset for 5/12/2011 at 9:45 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 12/3/2010. (mehcd)
|
October 22, 2010 |
Filing
192
ORDER: Five-Day Jury Trial set for 8/29/2011 08:00 AM in Courtroom A 701 before Judge Philip A. Brimmer. Trial Preparation Conference set for 8/12/2011 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom A 701 before Judge Philip A. Brimmer, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 10/22/10. (ebs, )
|
September 21, 2010 |
Filing
163
MINUTE ORDER granting 158 Defendant's Motion to Vacate Final Pretrial Conference, Conduct Status Conference, and Extend Deadline for Filing Final Pretrial Order. The Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/30/2010 at 9:30 AM is CONVERTED TO A STAT US CONFERENCE in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Status Conference set for 9/23/2010 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty to address the discovery dispute. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 9/21/2010. (mehcd)
|
July 1, 2010 |
Filing
147
MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part 145 the Parties' Joint Motion to Modify March 22, 2010, Scheduling Order. Fact Discovery due by 8/20/2010. Dispositive Motions due by 7/16/2010. Initial Rule 26(a)(2) Disclosures due by 8/9/2010. Rebuttal Rule 26(a)(2) Disclosures due by 9/10/2010. All expert disclosures due by 9/29/2010. No further extensions of time will be considered. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 7/1/2010. (mehcd)
|
June 29, 2010 |
Filing
144
MINUTE ORDER vacating the Settlement Conference set for 7/1/2010 and denying 142 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Excuse the Personal Appearance of Plaintiff at the July 1, 2010 Settlement Conference, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 6/29/2010. (mehcd)
|
March 11, 2010 |
Filing
132
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Philip A. Brimmer. Status Conference held on 3/11/2010. Denying 129 Motion for Order. Counsel directed to chambers to schedule 7-day jury trial. Counsel directed to Magistrate Judge Hegarty's chambers to schedule a hearing to set deadlines for additional discovery an/or pretrial matters. (Court Reporter Kara Spitler) (pabcd)
|
February 19, 2010 |
Filing
124
ORDER AND MEMORANDUM OF DECISION: Granting 99 Plaintiff Kirk Warren's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment regarding the aggregate cap issue, and no aggregate cap shall be placed on the reformed insurance policy. Denying 111 Defendant Libert y Mutual Fire Insurance Company's Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on the aggregate cap issue. Plaintiff Kirk Warren is entitled to summary judgment on the reformation date issue. The Policy is deemed to be reformed as of March 13, 20 02. Plaintiff Kirk Warren's claims for breach of contract, willful and wanton statutory bad faith, breach of the implied covenant of good faith and fair dealing, and common law bad faith may proceed in this case. Any Final Judgment entered upon resolution of all claims against all parties shall reflect the rulings in this order, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 2/19/10.(ebs, )
|
June 23, 2009 |
Filing
122
MINUTE ORDER granting 118 Defendant's Unopposed Revised Motion to Modify the Previously-Entered Taxation of Costs. The award of costs 70 is modified as follows: no costs are taxed against plaintiff Kirk Warren; costs in the amount of $1,774.26 are taxed against plaintiff Kurt Warren alone, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 6/23/09.(ebs, )
|
May 22, 2009 |
Filing
117
MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 109 Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Modify the Previously-Entered Bill of Costs, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 5/22/09.(ebs, )
|