Sender v. American Family Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2006cv00958
Filed: May 22, 2006
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
Presiding Judge: Edward W. Nottingham
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 92 MINUTE ORDER granting 90 Unopposed Motion for Leave to Amend the Final Pretrial Order. Plaintiff's amended Exhibit List (Docket No. 90-1) is accepted for filing as a separate supplemental document to the Final Pretrial Order 86 . Final Pretrial Order is thus amended. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 11/5/2013.(mjwcd)
June 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER SETTING CASE FOR TRIAL. Five-day Jury Trial set for 1/14/2014 at 08:00 AM in Courtroom A 701 before Judge Philip A. Brimmer. Trial Preparation Conference set for 12/23/2013 at 10:00 AM before Judge Philip A. Brimmer. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 6/26/13. (mnfsl, )
April 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 81 MINUTE ORDER granting 68 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend the Complaint to Add a Claim for Punitive Damages. The tendered Amended Complaint and Jury Demand (docket no. 68-1) is accepted for filing as of the date of this minute order. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 4/1/13.(mnfsl, )
January 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 63 MINUTE ORDER granting 61 Unopposed Motion to Modify the Scheduling Order. The 56 Scheduling Order is thus amended to extend the deadlines for plaintiff to disclose experts and to move for punitive damages up to and including 2/17/2013, and for defendant to disclose its experts up to and including 3/19/2013. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 1/14/13.(mnfsl, )
September 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 60 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 9/13/2012. (mjwcd)
August 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 8/27/2012 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 8/6/12. (mnfsl, )
July 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MINUTE ORDER granting 47 Unopposed Motion to Reopen This Administratively Closed Case. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 7/23/12.(mnfsl, )
February 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting 44 Joint Motion for Administrative Closure. Signed by Chief Judge Edward W. Nottingham on 2/1/08.(sss, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sender v. American Family Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?