Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Corrections Corporation of America et al
Case Number: 1:2006cv01956
Filed: September 29, 2006
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
Presiding Judge: Edward W. Nottingham
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 275 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. This case is dismissed with prejudice, subject to the courts continuing jurisdiction to enforce the terms of the settlement agreement filed with the parties motion, each party to bear its own costs and attorneys fees. By Judge Kathryn H. Vratil on 10/01/2009. (sah, )
August 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 250 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER OF REFERENCE TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE re: 2 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge, by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 8/13/09. (gms, )
March 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 246 ORDER. The Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Defendants Dominion Correctional Services, LLC, Dominion Correctional Properties, LLC and Dominion Venture Group and Brief in Support Thereof 184 filed 03/21/2008, is GRANTED as to defendants Domin ion Correctional Properties, LLC (DCP), and Dominion Venture Group. The plaintiffs claims against defendants, Dominion Correctional Properties, LLC (DCP), and Dominion Venture Group (DVG), are DISMISSED with prejudice. Defendants Dominion Correction al Properties, LLC (DCP), and Dominion Venture Group (DVG) are DROPPED from this action, and the caption of this case shall be AMENDED accordingly. the Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Defendants Dominion Correctional Services, LLC, Dominion Correctional Properties, LLC and Dominion Venture Group and Brief in Support Thereof 184 filed 03/21/2008, is DENIED otherwise by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 03/12/2009.(sah, )
February 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 167 MINUTE ORDER: Defendant CCA's 148 Motion to Compel Discovery from Intervenors and for Sanction is MOOT and therefore DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Each party shall pay their own attorney fees and costs for this motion, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 2/4/08.(sss, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Corrections Corporation of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?