Ledbetter et al v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.

Case Number: 1:2006cv01958
Filed: October 2, 2006
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y. Daniel
Referring Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 11, 2010 279 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE, each party to bear its own attorneys fees, expenses and costs. by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 1/11/2010. (erv, )
November 30, 2009 275 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER The proposed jury instructions, proposed verdict forms and related objections submitted by the parties are hereby STRICKEN. 264 Objections filed by Disa Powell, Joel Ledbetter, Heath Powell, 263 Proposed Jury Instructions filed by Wa l-Mart Stores, Inc., 265 Objections filed by Disa Powell, Joel Ledbetter, Heath Powell, 269 Objections filed by General Electric Company, 270 Proposed Jury Instructions filed by General Electric Company, 267 Objections filed by Disa Powell, J oel Ledbetter, Heath Powell, 261 Objections filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., 262 Proposed Jury Instructions filed by Disa Powell, Joel Ledbetter, Heath Powell, 260 Proposed Jury Instructions filed by Disa Powell, Joel Ledbetter, Heath Powell, 268 Proposed Jury Instructions filed by Disa Powell, Joel Ledbetter, Heath Powell by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 11/30/09. (erv, )
November 13, 2009 252 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: 233 Defendants Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. and Eaton Electrical, Incs Trial Brief Re: Choice of Law for Statutory Employer Analysis. it is ORDERED that Colorado law applies to the statutory employer analysis in this matter. by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 11/13/09. (erv, )
November 10, 2009 247 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part 246 Motion for Leave. The motion is granted to the extent that GE wishes to file a Daubert motion. However, because the Court would like more than one business day to review the submitted materials , the proposed expedited briefing schedule is denied. The expedited briefing schedule is ordered as follows:General Electric may file its Daubert motion not later than November 13, 2009. Plaintiffs may file their response not later than December 1, 2009. General Electric may file a reply not later than December 7, 2009. Entered by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 11/10/09. (wydcd, rrk)
October 20, 2009 234 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER denying 212 Plaintiffs Objection to Defendant General Electric Companys Trial Exhibits or, in the Alternative, Motion to Strike, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 10/20/09.(gmssl, )
October 6, 2009 220 Opinion or Order of the Court Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel: granting 206 Motion to Vacate ; Motion Hearing held on 10/6/2009 ; Set/Reset Hearings: (Jury Trial set for 1/11/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom A1002 before Chief Judge Wiley Y. Danie l. Trial Preparation Conference set for 12/14/2009 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom A1002 before Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel. Further Trial Preparation Conference set for 12/21/2009 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom A1002 before Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel). Defendants shall file trial brief, on choice of law issues, not later than Friday, October 16, 2009. Plaintiffs shall respond to Defendants' trial brief not later than Friday, October 30, 2009. (Court Reporter Therese Lindblom.) (wydcd, rrk)
September 29, 2009 218 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 182 Defendant Wal-Mart's Motion for Summary Judgment Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 56, by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 9/29/09.(ebs, )
August 25, 2009 203 Opinion or Order of the Court COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe: Final Pretrial Conference held on 8/25/2009. Final Pretrial Order entered. Settlement Conference set for 11/5/2009 01:30 PM in Courtroom A 502 before Ma gistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. Denying as moot with leave to renew 200 Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production of Supplemental Discovery Responses and Customer Complaint Database Entries from Defendant General Electric Company. (Court Reporter FTR - Ellen E. Miller) (mjwcd )
June 19, 2009 198 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 192 Defendant Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.'s Motion to Vacate and Reset Pretrial Conference. Granting 194 Joinder of Eaton Electrical Inc. in Motion to Vacate and Reset Final Pretrial Deadlines. Final Pretrial Conference reset for 8/25/2009 08:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 6/19/09.(ebs, )
June 8, 2009 191 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 185 Motion to Compel. Plaintiffs shall forthwith execute consents allowing the Social Networking Sites to produce the information sought in defendants subpoenas by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 06/08/2009.(sah, )
April 29, 2009 181 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER striking 180 Defendant Wal-Marts Motion for Summary Judgment with leave to refile in compliance with this Court's Practice Standards. Specifically, counsel is directed to review and comply with section III.B of my Practice Standards. by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 4/29/09.(erv, )
April 21, 2009 179 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 175 Plaintiffs Motion for Protective Order Regarding Subpoenas Issued to Facebook, My Space, Inc., and Meetup.Com by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 4/21/09.(erv, )
April 14, 2009 177 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 160 Defendant Eaton Electrical Inc.s Motion for Reconsideration by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 4/14/09.(erv, )
February 4, 2008 112 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 110 Motion for Leave to Amend the Scheduling Order.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 2/4/08.(erv, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ledbetter et al v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?