Stine v. Wiley et al
Case Number: 1:2006cv02105
Filed: October 23, 2006
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
Presiding Judge: Patricia A. Coan
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y. Daniel
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 216 MINUTE ORDER. ORDERED that Stine's motions [ECF Nos. 213 & 215] are STRICKEN from the record. ORDERED that the Clerk's Office SHALL NOT ACCEPT any future filings from plaintiff, Mikeal Stine, in this action by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 12/11/13.(jjhsl, )
September 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 211 ORDER AFFIRMED AND ADOPTED 203 Report and Recommendations of United States Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix; Denying 198 Plaintiff's Motion to Reopen Case; Striking 204 Motion for Recusal ; Striking 205 , Plaintiff's letter; Striking 206 Motion for Order; Striking 207 Motion for Hearing/Conference; Striking 208 plaintiff's Supplement/Amendment; Striking 209 Plaintiff's Supplement; Striking 210 Plaintiff's letter; It is FURTHER ORDERED that the clerks office is DIRECTED to NOT accept any further filings in this case consistent with the Courts prior Orders ECF No. 177 , 185 & 190 . by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 9/1/2010.(erv, )
March 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 194 MINUTE ORDER denying 192 Plaintiffs Motion for Amended Court Order by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 3/23/2010.(klmcd)
July 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 190 MINUTE ORDER granting 188 Motion for Order to seal. However, because the subject matter of the filing concerns Defendants thus requiring certification under D.C.COLO.LCivR 7.1, the Clerk of the Court shall serve Docket 182 on counsel for Defendan ts. Furthermore, for the reasons noted in my Minute Order of June 23, 2009 185 , Docket 188 is STRICKEN. Plaintiff is again directed not to submit any further related filings in this case or to have anyone submit any related filings on his behalf in this case. by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 7/7/09.(erv, )
June 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 185 MINUTE ORDER Granting request to Seal document, 182 Sealed Document filed by Mikeal Stine, 184 Letter ; the Clerk of the Court shall serve Docket 182 on counsel for Defendants. However, Plaintiffs request to seal is GRANTED and Docket 182 is SEALED. Further, because this case is closed and this document does not relate to the merits of this case, Docket 182 is STRICKEN. In addition, the letter filed by Philip Green on June 17, 2009 184 is STRICKEN for the same reasons. Plaintiff is directed not to submit any further related filings in this case or to have anyone submit any related filings on his behalf in this case. by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 6/23/09. (erv, )
October 23, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 1 ORDER Directing Clerk to Commence Civil Action and Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiency. Plaintiff has 30 days to either pay the $350.00 filing fee or file a Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915. Plaintiff has 30 days to file a Prisoner Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 10/19/2006. (llr, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stine v. Wiley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?