Information Network for Responsible Mining et al v. Bureau of Land Management
Case Number: 1:2006cv02269
Filed: November 13, 2006
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
Presiding Judge: John L. Kane
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552 Freedom of Information Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting 55 Plaintiffs' Stipulated Motion to Dismiss. This case is dismissed with prejudice, by Judge John L. Kane on 08/02/2010.(wjc, )
July 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER: The 32 Order to Show Cause is DISCHARGED, by Judge John L. Kane on 07/29/09. (wjc, )
July 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER: The Defendant shall file a notice clarifying this issue no later than 07/30/2009 so the Court can determine whether it is necessary to consider whether documents concerning oil and gas activities are within the scope of the 2006 FOIA request as part of the assessment of Defendants response to the pending Order to Show Cause, by Judge John L. Kane on 07/27/09. (wjc, )
April 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER on Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment. The BLMs 14 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED. INFORMs 11 Amended Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED in part. See order for further details. INFORMs motion is DENIED to the extent it se eks immediate disclosure of the portions of the currently identified documents that have been withheld under Exemption 5. See order for further details. With respect to its request for attorney fees and costs, INFORM may file a separate request to recover these fees and costs after the BLM complies with this order, by Judge John L. Kane on 04/28/09.(wjc, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Information Network for Responsible Mining et al v. Bureau of Land Management
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?