Oberhamer v. Deep Rock Water Co. et al
Case Number: 1:2006cv02284
Filed: November 14, 2006
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
Presiding Judge: John L. Kane
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29:621 Job Discrimination (Age)
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 202 ORDER granting 199 Motion For Withdrawal of Katrin Miller Rothgery, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 7/22/10.(lyg, )
April 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 178 MINUTE ORDER granting 176 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Leave for Thomas Schwein to Present Testimony by Telephone at 04/21/2010 Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Award of Attorneys Fees, by Judge John L. Kane on 04/14/2010.(wjc, )
February 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 142 Minute Entry - Courtroom Minutes for Oral Argument on Plaintiff's Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees held before Judge John L. Kane on 2/18/2010. ORDERED: Plaintiff's Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees 129 is granted in part as set forth on the record. The amount of the award is reserved until such time as Plaintiff notifies the Court that the parties are ready for a hearing or that the parties have agreed upon an amount. (Court Reporter Darlene Martinez) (lbush)
November 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 126 STIPULATED ORDER REGARDING CUSTODY OF EXHIBITS AND DEPOSITIONS signed by Judge John L. Kane on 11/19/09.(babia)
October 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 106 Minute Entry for Final Pretrial Conference proceedings held before Judge John L. Kane held on 10/30/09: Granting 95 Motion in Limine; Denying 96 Motion in Limine. A further Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/4/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 802 before Judge John L. Kane. (Court Reporter Gwen Daniel)(babia) Modified on 11/4/2009 to edit text to clarify name of Motions (wjc, ).
April 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 80 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 61 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. Defendants objection to evidence pursuant to Rule 408, F.R.E., is OVERRULED. Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs c laim of age discrimination is DENIED. Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs breach of contract claim is DENIED. Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs claim for willful and wanton breach of contract is GRANTED. Defenda nts Motion for Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs claim for breach of good faith and fair dealing is DENIED. Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs claim of promissory estoppel is GRANTED. Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs claim of negligent misrepresentation is GRANTED. Defendants motion for summary judgment on Plaintiffs claim of outrageous conduct is GRANTED, by Judge John L. Kane on 04/29/09.(wjc, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oberhamer v. Deep Rock Water Co. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?