Yarrito et al v. Meyers et al

Case Number: 1:2006cv02494
Filed: December 13, 2006
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
Presiding Judge: John L. Kane
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 28, 2006 22 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER re: 16 Order to Show Cause is Further Amended as follows: "Respondents may release applicants on bond or on their own recognizance.Respondents may also remove aliens from the United States who request voluntaryremoval pursuant to 8 C.F.R. § 240.5 or who request removal pursuant to a stipulated order of removal pursuant to 8 U.S.C. § 1229a(d) and 8 U.S.C. § 1103(a)(3), if said request was made without coercion, intimidation or harassment. Signed by Judge John L. Kane on 12/28/06. (erv, )
December 26, 2006 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER 2 Order to Show Cause is amended as set forth in this order. This order pertains only to document 14. Document 8 is still pending and will be ruled on by a separate order. Signed by Judge John L. Kane on 12/26/06. (jjh, )
December 22, 2006 13 Opinion or Order of the Court Minute ORDER granting Respondent's 10 Motion for Leave to File Response to Claimed Next Friend's Brief on 12/29/06. Signed by Judge John L. Kane on 12/22/06.(jjh, )
December 20, 2006 11 Opinion or Order of the Court Minute ORDER on Petitioner's 8 Motion to Amend Petition is held in Abeyance pending compliance with D.C.COLO.LCivR7.1A. by Judge John L. Kane on 12/20/06.(jjh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yarrito et al v. Meyers et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?