Bray et al v QFA Royalties Featured Case
Plaintiff: Chris Bray, Sabine Bray, Training Pros Inc., Brad Fix, Jan Fix, BJ and F LLC, Hakim Abid and Allison Abid
Defendant: QFA Royalties LLC
Case Number: 1:2006cv02528
Filed: December 15, 2006
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: John L. Kane
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2010. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER Agreeing with the Tenth Circuits determination in dismissing the sole remaining plaintiffs appeal that the underlying injunction is moot, any claims remaining in this case are also deemed moot and any remaining effects of the injunction are hereby lifted. This case is closed. Signed by Judge John L. Kane on 12/04/08. (wjc, )
October 16, 2008 Filing 89 MANDATE of USCA as to 65 Notice of Appeal filed by QFA Royalties LLC : The appeal is Dismissed and this matter is Remanded to the district court for determination of whether the injunction should be vacated. (USCA Case No. 07-1235) (Attachments: # 1 USCA Order, # 2 Letter)(bjr2, )
May 13, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER of USCA: as to 65 Notice of Appeal filed by QFA Royalties LLC: This matter is before the court on a Stipulated Motion of Dismissal of Brad Fix and Jan Fix as appellees in this appeal. The motion is granted. This appeal remains pending as to appellees Hakim Abid and Allison Abid. USCA case no. 07-1235. (bjr, )
May 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER granting 86 Stipulated Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice. Plaintiffs Brad Fix, Jan Fix and BJ and F LLC are dismissed with prejudice and will be responsible to bear their own costs, including attorneys' fees, incurred in this matter. Signed by Judge John L. Kane on 5/8/08.(sss, )
May 7, 2008 Filing 86 Stipulated MOTION to Dismiss Party with Prejudice Plaintiffs Brad Fix, Jan Fix and BJ and F LLC by Defendant QFA Royalties LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(MacPhee, Leonard)
January 31, 2008 Filing 85 NOTICE of Change of Address and Telephone Number of Gregory R. Stross by Gregory Robert Stross (Stross, Gregory)
January 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 84 MINUTE ORDER granting Plaintiff's Counsel Gregory R. Stross's 83 Motion to Withdraw Representation for Plaintiffs Hakim Abid and Allison Abid. Attorney Gregory Robert Stross terminated as counsel of record for the Abids, by Judge John L. Kane on 1/23/08.(sss, )
January 21, 2008 Filing 83 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney For Plaintiffs Hakim Abid and Allison Abid by Plaintiffs Hakim Abid, Allison Abid. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Order Granting Counsel Stross's Motion To Withdraw Representation For Plaintiffs Hakim Abid and Allison Abid)(Stross, Gregory)
December 24, 2007 Filing 82 NOTICE of Release of Attorney's Lien of Gregory R. Stross Concerning Plaintiffs Christopher Bray, Sabine Bray an Training Pros, Inc. by Plaintiffs Chris Bray, Sabine Bray, Training Pros Inc. (Stross, Gregory)
October 29, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER granting Stipulated 80 Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice Plaintiffs Christopher Bray, Sabine Bray and Training Pros, Inc. Plaintiffs to bear own costs, including attorney fees, incurred in this matter. Signed by Judge John L. Kane on 10/29/07.(sss, )
October 29, 2007 Filing 80 Stipulated MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice Plaintiffs Christopher Bray, Sabine Bray and Training Pros, Inc. by Defendant QFA Royalties LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(MacPhee, Leonard)
September 12, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER Granting Stay of Proceedings. Defendants Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Appeal 67 is GRANTED. Defendants Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 25 which had previously been held in abeyance pending my preliminary injunction ruling, is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to its being refiled, if appropriate, at a later date. Signed by Judge John L. Kane on 09/12/07.(jjh, )
September 7, 2007 Filing 78 Joint STATUS REPORT by Plaintiffs Brad Fix, Jan Fix, BJ and F LLC, Hakim Abid, Allison Abid, Defendant QFA Royalties LLC. (Stross, Gregory)
August 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER In the absence of any other motion or notice having been filed in this case before then, the parties shall file a joint statement setting forth the status of this case on Friday, 09/07/07. Signed by Judge John L. Kane on 08/17/07. (jjh, )
August 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER granting 75 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Justin M. Klein is withdrawn as counsel for Plaintiffs Allison Abid and Brad Fix. Signed by Judge John L. Kane on 08/17/07.(jjh, )
August 16, 2007 Filing 75 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Justin M. Klein by Plaintiffs Brad Fix, Allison Abid. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Klein, Justin)
June 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 74 Minute ORDER granting Plaintiff's 71 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Gregory Robert Stross terminated by Judge John L. Kane on 06/27/07.(jjh, )
June 27, 2007 Filing 73 LETTER TO USCA and all counsel certifying the record is complete as to 65 Notice of Appeal filed by QFA Royalties LLC. ( Appeal No. 07-1235) (bjr2, )
June 26, 2007 Filing 72 NOTICE of Attorney's Lien of Gregory R. Stross Concerning Plaintiffs Christopher Bray, Sabine Bray and Training Pros, Inc. by Plaintiffs Chris Bray, Sabine Bray, Training Pros Inc. (Stross, Gregory)
June 26, 2007 Filing 71 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Gregory R. Stross for Plaintiffs Christopher Bray, Sabine Bray and Training Pros, Inc. by Plaintiffs Chris Bray, Sabine Bray, Training Pros Inc.. (Stross, Gregory)
June 15, 2007 Filing 69 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM re 65 Notice of Appeal by Defendant QFA Royalties LLC (MacPhee, Leonard)
June 5, 2007 Filing 68 USCA Case Number 07-1235 for 65 Notice of Appeal filed by QFA Royalties LLC. (bjr2, )
June 5, 2007 Filing 67 Unopposed MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Appeal by Defendant QFA Royalties LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(MacPhee, Leonard)
June 4, 2007 Filing 66 LETTER re Appeal to all counsel advising of the transmittal of the 65 Notice of Appeal filed by defendant to the U.S. Court of Appeals. (Retained counsel; Fees paid) (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Appeal# 2 Docket Sheet# 3 Receipt)(bjr2, )
June 1, 2007 Filing 65 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 60 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction,, by Defendant QFA Royalties LLC (MacPhee, Leonard)
May 22, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 64 Minute ORDER granting Defendant's Unopposed 62 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. QFA Royalties LLC answer due 06/07/07. Signed by Judge John L. Kane on 05/22/07.(jjh, )
May 18, 2007 Filing 63 Joint STATUS REPORT by Plaintiffs Brad Fix, Jan Fix, BJ and F LLC, Chris Bray, Hakim Abid, Allison Abid, Sabine Bray, Training Pros Inc., Defendant QFA Royalties LLC. (Stross, Gregory)
May 18, 2007 Filing 62 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,, or Otherwise Respond by Defendant QFA Royalties LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(MacPhee, Leonard)
May 7, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MINUTE ORDER Caption of the Order on Motion for Preliminaty Injunction listed the magistrate judge initials in this case number as BNB. The correct case number is actually 06-cv-2528-JLK-CBS. It is noted that at present there has been no referral to a magistrate judge for any purpose by Judge John L. Kane on 05/07/07. (jjh, )
May 3, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER granting 2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. The Temporary Restraining Order currently in place in this case is converted to a preliminary injunction. Quiznos will maintain the status quo that existed before the terminations of Plaintiffs franchise rights pending a trial on the merits of Plaintiffs claims. In this regard, Quiznos will stay enforcement of Plaintiffs terminations and will not take any action, without court approval, to change that status quo ante or otherwise prevent the ongoing operation of the stores. Signed by Judge John L. Kane on 05/03/07.(jjh, )
May 3, 2007 Filing 59 Utility Setting/Resetting Deadlines/Hearings: Status Report due by 5/22/2007 pursuant to Order of 05/03/07. Text only entry - no document attached. (jjh, )
May 3, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER denying Defendant's 40 Motion for Sanctions of Denial of Motion. Ordered the parties are to confer regarding the preparation of a Joint Status Report outlining a proposed course for preparing this case for trial. The Joint Status Report is due by 05/22/07. Signed by Judge John L. Kane on 05/03/07.(jjh, )
April 25, 2007 Filing 57 TRANSCRIPT of preliminary injunction hearing - volume 2 held on 02/13/2007 before Judge Kane. Pages: 162-283. Per statute, copies of transcripts are available for inspection in the clerk's office. Parties interested in a copy may contact the court reporter or, in the case of a transcript prepared from a digital-audio taped record, the courtroom deputy for the judicial officer. (Daniel, Gwen)
April 25, 2007 Filing 56 TRANSCRIPT of preliminary injunction hearing - volume 1 held on 02/12/2007 before Judge Kane. Pages: 1-161. Per statute, copies of transcripts are available for inspection in the clerk's office. Parties interested in a copy may contact the court reporter or, in the case of a transcript prepared from a digital-audio taped record, the courtroom deputy for the judicial officer. (Daniel, Gwen)
March 2, 2007 Filing 55 Docket Annotation re: 54 Transcript. This docket entry was modified to indicate it was a text only entry. Text only entry - no document attached. (gms, )
February 28, 2007 Filing 54 TRANSCRIPT of Preliminary Injunction Hearing held on 12/22/06 before Judge Kane. Pages: 1-20. Prepared by: Avery/Woods Reporting Service. Text only entry - no document attached - Per statute, copies of transcripts are available for inspection in the clerk's office. Parties interested in a copy may contact the court reporter or, in the case of a transcript prepared from a digital-audio taped record, the courtroom deputy for the judicial officer. (gms, ) Modified on 3/2/2007 to indicate this is a text only entry. (gms, ).
February 28, 2007 Filing 53 REPLY to Response to Motion re 40 MOTION for Sanctions of Denial of Motion filed by Defendant QFA Royalties LLC. (MacPhee, Leonard)
February 21, 2007 Filing 52 RESPONSE to Motion re 40 MOTION for Sanctions of Denial of Motion filed by Plaintiffs Brad Fix, Jan Fix, BJ and F LLC, Chris Bray, Hakim Abid, Allison Abid, Sabine Bray, Training Pros Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Declaration of G. Stross# 2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Transcript Protective Order 2-8-07)(Stross, Gregory)
February 21, 2007 Filing 51 Docket Annotation re: 49 Trial Brief, 48 Trial Brief. These docket entries were modified to create a linkage to Doc #2. Text only entry - no document attached. (gms, )
February 20, 2007 Filing 50 TRANSCRIPT of Motion for Protective Order held on 02/08/07 before Judge Kane. Prepared by: Adrienne Whitlow. Pages: 1-13. (certified copy) Text Only Entry - Per statute, copies of transcripts are available for inspection in the clerk's office. Parties interested in a copy may contact the court reporter or, in the case of a transcript prepared from a digital-audio taped record, the courtroom deputy for the judicial officer. (jjh, )
February 20, 2007 Filing 49 TRIAL BRIEF Post Hearing Brief in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction 2 by Defendant QFA Royalties LLC. (MacPhee, Leonard) Modified on 2/21/2007 to create linkage (gms, ).
February 20, 2007 Filing 48 TRIAL BRIEF Post-Hearing Brief Concerning Motion for Preliminary Injunction 2 by Plaintiffs Brad Fix, Jan Fix, BJ and F LLC, Chris Bray, Hakim Abid, Allison Abid, Sabine Bray, Training Pros Inc.(Stross, Gregory) Modified on 2/21/2007 to create linkage (gms, ).
February 13, 2007 Filing 70 Amended Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John L. Kane : Motion Hearing for Preliminary Injunction day 2 held on 2/13/2007. Ordered matter taken under advisement. Ordered Temporary restraining Order is continued. Ordered Briefs may be filed by 02/20/07. (Court Reporter Gwen Daniel.) (jjh, ) Modified on 6/26/2007 to note that these Minutes were amended (jjh, ).
February 13, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 47 Stipulation and ORDER Regarding Custody of Exhibits and Depositions: It is stipulated that upon the conclusion of the preliminary injunction hearing, counsel for the parties shall retain custody of their respective exhibits and depositions until such time as all need for the exhibits and depositions has terminated and the time to appeal has expired or all appellate proceedings have been terminated plus sixty (60) days. Signed by Judge John L. Kane on 02/13/07. (jjh, )
February 13, 2007 Filing 46 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John L. Kane : Motion Hearing day 2 held on 2/13/2007. Ordered: Matter taken under advisement. Ordered: Temporary Restraining Order is continued. Ordered: Briefs may be filed by 02/20/07. (Court Reporter Gwen Daniel.) (jjh, )
February 13, 2007 Filing 45 Exhibit List filed by Defendant QFA Royalties LLC. (jjh, )
February 13, 2007 Filing 44 Exhibit List filed by Plaintiffs.(jjh, )
February 13, 2007 Filing 43 Witness List filed by Plaintiffs. (jjh, )
February 13, 2007 Filing 42 Witness List filed by Defendant QFA Royalties LLC. (jjh, )
February 12, 2007 Filing 41 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John L. Kane : Motion Hearing for Preliminary Injunction day 1 held on 2/12/2007. Ordered: Stipulated Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice Between Plaintiffs Jehad Majed, Ali Majed, Q Food Service, Inc., Richard Newkirk, Maureen Newkirk, David Newkirk, Newkirk Enterprises, Inc., R&M Enterprises LLP, Daniel G. Carter, Jr., Jody L. Carter, Daniel G. Carter, Sr., Madeleine Carter, Carter Group LLC, Carter Group Roseville Llc, Glenn Keane, Anne Keane, LKB LLC, David Tate, Big Little Property Investments, CTH Investments, and Defendant QFA Royalties LLC (Doc. 39) is granted. Ordered: The caption is this case is amended to reflect the remaining parties only. (Court Reporter Gwen Daniel.) (jjh, )
February 11, 2007 Filing 40 MOTION for Sanctions of Denial of Motion by Defendant QFA Royalties LLC. (MacPhee, Leonard)
February 11, 2007 Filing 39 STIPULATION Dismissal of Ali Majed, Jehad Maged, Q Food Service, Inc., Richard Newkirk, Maureen Newkirk, David Newkirk, Newkirk Enterprises, Inc., R&M Enterprises LLP, Daniel G. Carter, Jr., Jody L. Carter, Daniel G. Carter, Sr., Madeleine Carter, Carter Group LLC, Carter Group Roseville LLC, Glen Keane, Anne Keane, LKB LLC, David Tate, Big Little Property Investments, CTH Investments by Plaintiffs Ali Majed, Q Food Service, Inc., Brad Fix, Jan Fix, BJ and F LLC, Richard Newkirk, Maureen Newkirk, David Newkirk, Newkirk Enterprises, Inc., R&M Enterprises LLP, Chris Bray, Hakim Abid, Allison Abid, Daniel G. Carter, Jr, Jody L. Carter, Daniel G. Carter, Sr, Madeleine Carter, Carter Group LLC, Carter Group Roseville LLC, Glenn Keane, Sabine Bray, Anne Keane, LKB LLC, David Tate, Big Little Property Investments, CTH Investments, Training Pros Inc., Jehad Majed, Defendant QFA Royalties LLC. (Stross, Gregory)
February 9, 2007 Filing 38 TRIAL BRIEF for hearing on preliminary injunction by Plaintiffs Ali Majed, Q Food Service, Inc., Brad Fix, Jan Fix, BJ and F LLC, Richard Newkirk, Maureen Newkirk, David Newkirk, Newkirk Enterprises, Inc., R&M Enterprises LLP, Chris Bray, Hakim Abid, Allison Abid, Daniel G. Carter, Jr, Jody L. Carter, Daniel G. Carter, Sr, Madeleine Carter, Carter Group LLC, Carter Group Roseville LLC, Glenn Keane, Sabine Bray, Anne Keane, LKB LLC, David Tate, Big Little Property Investments, CTH Investments, Training Pros Inc., Jehad Majed. (Stross, Gregory)
February 9, 2007 Filing 37 Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendant QFA Royalties LLC. (MacPhee, Leonard)
February 8, 2007 Filing 36 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John L. Kane : Denying Plaintiff 33 Motion for Protective Order; Motion Hearing held on 2/8/2007. Ordered: all settlement documents are due no later than 02/12/07 at 9am. Ordered: Plaintiff Jehad Majed's deposition can be taken telephonically on 02/09/07. (Court Reporter Adrienne Whitlow.) (jjh, )
February 8, 2007 Filing 35 Docket Annotation re: 33 MOTION for Protective Order for Plaintiff Jehad Majed. Modified to correct filer. Text only entry - no document attached. (jjh, )
February 8, 2007 Filing 34 RESPONSE to Motion re 33 MOTION for Protective Order for Plaintiff Jehad Majed filed by Defendant QFA Royalties LLC. (MacPhee, Leonard)
February 7, 2007 Filing 33 MOTION for Protective Order for Plaintiff Jehad Majed by Plaintiff Jehad Majed, (Stross, Gregory) Modified on 2/8/2007 to correct filer (jjh, ).
February 7, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MINUTE ORDER: Parties shall submit a Joint Status Report by 2/9/2007 by Judge John L. Kane on 02/07/07. (jjh, )
February 1, 2007 Filing 31 RESPONSE to Motion re 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Defendant QFA Royalties LLC. (MacPhee, Leonard)
January 31, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Minute ORDER granting Unopposed 29 Motion for Extension of Time for Plaintiffs to File Response to Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Plaintiffs shall have until 02/26/07 to file their response. Defendant's reply is due 03/13/07, by Judge John L. Kane on 01/31/07.(jjh, )
January 31, 2007 Filing 29 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 25 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Plaintiffs Ali Majed, Q Food Service, Inc., Brad Fix, Jan Fix, BJ and F LLC, Richard Newkirk, Maureen Newkirk, David Newkirk, Newkirk Enterprises, Inc., R&M Enterprises LLP, Chris Bray, Hakim Abid, Allison Abid, Daniel G. Carter, Jr, Jody L. Carter, Daniel G. Carter, Sr, Madeleine Carter, Carter Group LLC, Carter Group Roseville LLC, Glenn Keane, Sabine Bray, Anne Keane, LKB LLC, David Tate, Big Little Property Investments, CTH Investments, Training Pros Inc., Jehad Majed. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) proposed order)(Stross, Gregory)
January 30, 2007 Filing 28 RESPONSE to Motion re 25 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Letter to J. Kane filed by Plaintiffs Ali Majed, Q Food Service, Inc., Brad Fix, Jan Fix, BJ and F LLC, Richard Newkirk, Maureen Newkirk, David Newkirk, Newkirk Enterprises, Inc., R&M Enterprises LLP, Chris Bray, Hakim Abid, Allison Abid, Daniel G. Carter, Jr, Jody L. Carter, Daniel G. Carter, Sr, Madeleine Carter, Carter Group LLC, Carter Group Roseville LLC, Glenn Keane, Sabine Bray, Anne Keane, LKB LLC, David Tate, Big Little Property Investments, CTH Investments, Training Pros Inc., Jehad Majed. (Stross, Gregory)
January 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting Stipulated 26 Motion to set Discovery Schedule on Expedited Basis and set Briefing Schedule and Extend Deadlines. Signed by Judge John L. Kane on 01/10/07.(jjh, )
January 10, 2007 Filing 26 Stipulated MOTION to Expedite Discovery Schedule and Set Briefing Schedule and Extend Deadlines by Defendant QFA Royalties LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(MacPhee, Leonard)
January 8, 2007 Filing 25 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Defendant QFA Royalties LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Patrick Meyers)(MacPhee, Leonard)
December 22, 2006 Filing 24 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John L. Kane: Motion Hearing held on 12/22/2006. Granting 23 Motion for Order to Preserve the Status Quo Pending a Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction; Motion for Expedited Discovery following 12/22/06 hearing Granted. Ordered that neither side shall present any further press releases with respect the matter of Bob Baber and Ryan Baber. Preliminary Injunction Hearing 23 is set for 02/12/07, 02/13/07, 02/14/07 at 9am. Discovery may be conducted on 02/08/07. The TSA website regarding donations for Mr. Baber shall be taken down. Discovery due by 2/8/2007, Motion Hearing set for 2/12/2007 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 802 before Judge John L. Kane. (Court Reporter ECR-Shelly Moore.) (jjh, )
December 21, 2006 Filing 23 MOTION for Order to Preserve the Status Quo Pending a Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Defendant QFA Royalties LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Cohen, Fredric)
December 21, 2006 Filing 22 DECLARATION of Richard Newkirk - Supplemental by Plaintiffs Ali Majed, Q Food Service, Inc., Brad Fix, Jan Fix, BJ and F LLC, Richard Newkirk, Maureen Newkirk, David Newkirk, Newkirk Enterprises, Inc., R&M Enterprises LLP, Chris Bray, Hakim Abid, Allison Abid, Daniel G. Carter, Jr, Jody L. Carter, Daniel G. Carter, Sr, Madeleine Carter, Carter Group LLC, Carter Group Roseville LLC, Glenn Keane, Sabine Bray, Anne Keane, LKB LLC, David Tate, Big Little Property Investments, CTH Investments, Training Pros Inc., Jehad Majed. (Stross, Gregory)
December 21, 2006 Filing 21 Proposed Scheduling Order Proposed TRO by Plaintiffs Ali Majed, Q Food Service, Inc., Brad Fix, Jan Fix, BJ and F LLC, Richard Newkirk, Maureen Newkirk, David Newkirk, Newkirk Enterprises, Inc., R&M Enterprises LLP, Chris Bray, Hakim Abid, Allison Abid, Daniel G. Carter, Jr, Jody L. Carter, Daniel G. Carter, Sr, Madeleine Carter, Carter Group LLC, Carter Group Roseville LLC, Glenn Keane, Sabine Bray, Anne Keane, LKB LLC, David Tate, Big Little Property Investments, CTH Investments, Training Pros Inc., Jehad Majed. (Stross, Gregory)
December 21, 2006 Filing 20 LETTER re: 15 Order on Motion for Leave, to Judge Kane by Plaintiffs Ali Majed, Q Food Service, Inc., Brad Fix, Jan Fix, BJ and F LLC, Richard Newkirk, Maureen Newkirk, David Newkirk, Newkirk Enterprises, Inc., R&M Enterprises LLP, Chris Bray, Hakim Abid, Allison Abid, Daniel G. Carter, Jr, Jody L. Carter, Daniel G. Carter, Sr, Madeleine Carter, Carter Group LLC, Carter Group Roseville LLC, Glenn Keane, Sabine Bray, Anne Keane, LKB LLC, David Tate, Big Little Property Investments, CTH Investments, Training Pros Inc., Jehad Majed. (Klein, Justin)
December 20, 2006 Filing 19 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Justin M. Klein on behalf of all plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Klein, Justin)
December 20, 2006 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE of Mailing/Service re 13 Notice of Entry of Appearance by Defendant QFA Royalties LLC. (Cohen, Fredric)
December 19, 2006 Filing 17 Docket Annotation re: 15 ORDER denying Defendant's 12 Motion for Leave to Take Expedited Discovery and for Short Continuance of Hearing. Preliminary Injunction hearing set 12/22/06 at 9:00am. Proposed TRO Order by noon on 12/21/06. [Entry modified to correct typo]. Text only entry - no document attached. (dln, )
December 19, 2006 Filing 16 Utility Setting/Resetting Deadlines/Hearings: Motion for Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 12/22/2006 09:00 AM before Judge John L. Kane, pursuant to Order on 12/19/06. Text only entry - no document attached. (jjh, )
December 19, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER denying Defendant's 12 Motion for Leave to Take Expedited Discovery and for Short Continuance of Hearing. Preliminary Injunction hearing set 12/22/06 at 9:00am. Proposed TRO Order by noon on 12/21/06. Signed by Judge John L. Kane on 12/19/06.(jjh, ) (Modified on 12/19/2006 to correct typo) (dln, ).
December 19, 2006 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by all plaintiffs. QFA Royalties LLC served on 12/19/2006, answer due 1/8/2007. (Stross, Gregory)
December 19, 2006 Filing 13 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Fredric Adam Cohen on behalf of QFA Royalties LLC (Cohen, Fredric)
December 19, 2006 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Take Expedited Discovery and for Short Continuance of Hearing by Defendant QFA Royalties LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Proposed Order re Motion for Leave)(MacPhee, Leonard)
December 18, 2006 Filing 11 DECLARATION of david tate regarding MOTION for Preliminary Injunction 2 , Brief in Support of Motion,, 3 by Plaintiff David Tate. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit exhibits a thru d)(Stross, Gregory)
December 18, 2006 Filing 10 DECLARATION of anne keane regarding MOTION for Preliminary Injunction 2 , Brief in Support of Motion,, 3 by Plaintiff Anne Keane. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit exhibits a thru d)(Stross, Gregory)
December 18, 2006 Filing 9 DECLARATION of daniel g. carter, jr. regarding MOTION for Preliminary Injunction 2 , Brief in Support of Motion,, 3 by Plaintiff Daniel G. Carter, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit exhibits a thru d)(Stross, Gregory)
December 18, 2006 Filing 8 DECLARATION of alison abid regarding MOTION for Preliminary Injunction 2 , Brief in Support of Motion,, 3 by Plaintiff Allison Abid. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit exhibits a thru c)(Stross, Gregory)
December 18, 2006 Filing 7 DECLARATION of richard newkirk regarding MOTION for Preliminary Injunction 2 , Brief in Support of Motion,, 3 by Plaintiff Richard Newkirk. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit exhibits a thru d)(Stross, Gregory)
December 18, 2006 Filing 6 DECLARATION of brad fix regarding MOTION for Preliminary Injunction 2 , Brief in Support of Motion,, 3 by Plaintiff Brad Fix. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit exhibits a thru e)(Stross, Gregory)
December 18, 2006 Filing 5 DECLARATION of jehad majed regarding MOTION for Preliminary Injunction 2 , Brief in Support of Motion,, 3 by Plaintiff Jehad Majed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit exhibit a# 2 Exhibit exhibit b thru g)(Stross, Gregory)
December 18, 2006 Filing 4 DECLARATION of chris bray regarding MOTION for Preliminary Injunction 2 , Brief in Support of Motion,, 3 by Plaintiff Chris Bray. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit exhibits a thru d)(Stross, Gregory)
December 15, 2006 Filing 3 BRIEF in Support of 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Request for Forthwith Hearing filed by Plaintiffs Ali Majed, Q Food Service, Inc., Brad Fix, Jan Fix, BJ and F LLC, Richard Newkirk, Maureen Newkirk, David Newkirk, Newkirk Enterprises, Inc., R&M Enterprises LLP, Chris Bray, Hakim Abid, Allison Abid, Daniel G. Carter, Jr, Jody L. Carter, Daniel G. Carter, Sr, Madeleine Carter, Carter Group LLC, Carter Group Roseville LLC, Glenn Keane, Sabine Bray, Anne Keane, LKB LLC, David Tate, Big Little Property Investments, CTH Investments, Training Pros Inc., Jehad Majed. (llr, )
December 15, 2006 Filing 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Request for Forthwith Hearing by Plaintiffs Ali Majed, Q Food Service, Inc., Brad Fix, Jan Fix, BJ and F LLC, Richard Newkirk, Maureen Newkirk, David Newkirk, Newkirk Enterprises, Inc., R&M Enterprises LLP, Chris Bray, Hakim Abid, Allison Abid, Daniel G. Carter, Jr, Jody L. Carter, Daniel G. Carter, Sr, Madeleine Carter, Carter Group LLC, Carter Group Roseville LLC, Glenn Keane, Sabine Bray, Anne Keane, LKB LLC, David Tate, Big Little Property Investments, CTH Investments, Training Pros Inc., Jehad Majed. (llr, )
December 15, 2006 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against QFA Royalties LLC ( Filing fee $ 350, Receipt Number 273136) Summons issued, filed by Ali Majed, Q Food Service, Inc., Brad Fix, Jan Fix, BJ and F LLC, Richard Newkirk, Maureen Newkirk, David Newkirk, Newkirk Enterprises, Inc., R&M Enterprises LLP, Chris Bray, Hakim Abid, Allison Abid, Daniel G. Carter, Jr, Jody L. Carter, Daniel G. Carter, Sr, Madeleine Carter, Carter Group LLC, Carter Group Roseville LLC, Glenn Keane, Sabine Bray, Anne Keane, LKB LLC, David Tate, Big Little Property Investments, CTH Investments, Training Pros Inc., Jehad Majed. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet # 2 Special Assignment Form # 3 Receipt)(llr, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bray et al v QFA Royalties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Bray
Represented By: Justin M. Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sabine Bray
Represented By: Justin M. Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Training Pros Inc.
Represented By: Justin M. Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brad Fix
Represented By: Gregory Robert Stross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jan Fix
Represented By: Gregory Robert Stross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BJ and F LLC
Represented By: Gregory Robert Stross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hakim Abid
Represented By: Gregory Robert Stross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allison Abid
Represented By: Gregory Robert Stross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QFA Royalties LLC
Represented By: Leonard H. MacPhee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?