Kelly v. Wolpoff & Abramson, L.L.P.

Plaintiff: Dorothy H. Kelly
Defendant: Wolpoff & Abramson, L.L.P.
Case Number: 1:2007cv00091
Filed: January 15, 2007
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Boulder
Referring Judge: Patricia A. Coan
Presiding Judge: Edward W. Nottingham
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 22, 2010 88 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Pursuant to the Court's granting of the defendant's Motion for Assessment of Sanctions against Plaintiff's Counsel Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1927 66 on March 26, 2009, it is ordered that the Court awards attorney's fees in the amount of $10,991.50 and costs in the amount of $54.90 to defendant Wolpoff & Abramson, L.L.P. and against counsel for plaintiff, Terry Wallace, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 2/22/10. (ebs, )
March 26, 2009 79 Opinion or Order of the Court Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Philip A. Brimmer: Motion Hearing held on 3/26/2009. Motion for Sanctions 66 is GRANTED. (Court Reporter Janet Coppock) (pabcd)
January 17, 2007 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 2/28/2007 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge O.Edward Schlatter. Signed by Magistrate Judge O. Edward Schlatter for Patricia A. Coan on 1/17/07. (pap, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kelly v. Wolpoff & Abramson, L.L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wolpoff & Abramson, L.L.P.
Represented By: Ronald S. Canter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorothy H. Kelly
Represented By: Terry Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?