American Family Mutual Insurance Company v. Teamcorp, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: American Family Mutual Insurance Company
Defendant: Kerry Karnan, Teamcorp, Inc., Platt T. Hubbell, Kelley S. Hubbell and Thane Lincicome
Counter Claimant: Teamcorp, Inc. and Kerry Karnan
Counter Defendant: American Family Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2007cv00200
Filed: January 29, 2007
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Phillip S. Figa
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER on Motion to Reopen. Order denying 186 Motion to Reopen Case by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 12/16/11.(jjh, )
September 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER denying 167 Plaintiffs Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 168 Defendants Teamcorp. Inc. d/b/a Laconia Homes/Draft-Tek and Kerry Karnans Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting 169 Hubbells Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the five (5) day trial set to commence Monday, November 30, 2009, and the Final Trial Preparation Conference set Tuesday, November 17, 2009, at 3:00 p.m. are VACATED. Finally, it is ORDERED that this case is ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 41.2, to be reopened for good cause shown as discussed in this Order. by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 9/22/09.(erv, )
April 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 177 MINUTE ORDER denying 174 The Hubbells' Motion to Strike Plaintiffs Untimely Response Briefs by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 4/14/09.(erv, )
February 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER ON MOTIONS TO STRIKE AND SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTIONS: The Hubbells Motion to Strike American Familys Motion for Summary Judgment 99 is GRANTED. Plaintiffs Motion for Summary Judgment 95 is STRICKEN without prejudice to refile in accordance wi th this Order. Defendants Teamcorp. Inc. d/b/a Laconia Homes/Draft-Tek and Kerry Karnans Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Liability for Duty of Defense Obligation 96 is DENIED without prejudice to refile. Teamcorp, Inc. d/b/a Laconia Homes and Draft-Tek and Kerry Karnan Individually Motion to Strike American Family Exhibits Attached to Plaintiffs Response Brief in Opposition to Teamcorp, Inc.s Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Liability for Duty of Defense Obligation 116 is DENIED AS MOOT. The five-day trial to the Court set to commence Monday, 03/09/2009, and the Final Trial Preparation Conference set 02/27/2009 at 3:00 are VACATED by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 02/10/2009.(sah, )
February 5, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 3/26/2007 02:00 PM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe.Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 2/5/07. (pap, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Family Mutual Insurance Company v. Teamcorp, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kerry Karnan
Represented By: Kieth Van Doren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teamcorp, Inc.
Represented By: Kieth Van Doren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Platt T. Hubbell
Represented By: Daniel McKay Fowler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelley S. Hubbell
Represented By: Daniel McKay Fowler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thane Lincicome
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Family Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: James D. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Teamcorp, Inc.
Represented By: Kieth Van Doren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Kerry Karnan
Represented By: Kieth Van Doren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: American Family Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?