Trinity Universal Insurance Company of Kansas, Inc. v. D.R. Horton, Inc. Denver et al
Plaintiff: Trinity Universal Insurance Company of Kansas, Inc.
Defendant: D.R. Horton, Inc. Denver, AIG National Insurance Company, Inc., TIG Insurance Company, Travelers Property Casualty Insurance Company, National Fire & Marine Insurance Co. and Continental Western Insurance Company
Cross Claimant: Travelers Property Casualty Insurance Company, D.R. Horton, Inc. Denver and AIG National Insurance Company, Inc.
Cross Defendant: D.R. Horton, Inc. Denver, AIG National Insurance Company, Inc. and Travelers Property Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2007cv00600
Filed: March 27, 2007
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Walker D. Miller
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201 Declaratory Judgement
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 809 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: Granting 807 Stipulated Motion for Order of Dismissal of All Claims of All Parties With Prejudice and for an Order to the Clerk to Distribute Funds from the Registry. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a), this matte r, and all claims asserted therein, is dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear its own attorneys fees and costs. All pending motions are denied as moot. After payment of the Special Masters final invoice, the Clerk of the Court shall refund the principal balance and accrued interest on the funds held in the Registry of the Court, less the registry fee assessment, to the parties, pro rata by their contributions, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 9/25/09.(ebs, )
May 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 805 ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO PAY SPECIAL MASTER INVOICE re: 804 Monthly Billing Statement. Clerk shall pay Special Master Donald E. Abram $18,975.00, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 5/18/09. (ebs, )
April 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 803 AMENDED ORDER re: 798 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Report and Recommendation - Special Master. Special Master Donald E. Abram filed a recommendation on January 12, 2009 745 that the motion 225 be denied. Denying as moot 225 American Family's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Diversity Jurisdiction, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 4/2/09. (ebs, )
March 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 798 ORDER Re: Report and Recommendation 745 , denying as moot 225 American Family's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Diversity Jurisdiction, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 3/20/09.(gmssl, )
March 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 795 ORDER agreeing with 743 Report and Recommendation and 753 Report and Recommendation. Granting 740 Unopposed, Stipulated Motion to Dismiss Crossclaims with Prejudice. All cross-claims brought by defendants Travelers Indemnity Insurance Company , St. Paul Fire & Marine Insurance Company, and United States Fidelity & Guaranty Company against defendant General Security Indemnity Company of Arizona are dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear its own attorneys fees and costs, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 3/19/09.(ebs, )
March 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 789 ORDER granting 783 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to 770 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. D.R. Horton, Inc. and DRH Insurers shall respond to the motion no later than 3/30/09, by Special Master Donald E. Abram on 3/17/09. (ebs, )
March 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 786 ORDER Overruling Objections and Adopting Recommendation. Adopting the Special Master's Recommendation 746 . Granting 623 Cross-Defendanats Mid-Century Insurance Company and Truck Insurance Exchange's Motion to Dismiss all Cross-Claims Against Mid-Century Insurance Company and Truck Insurance Exchange. Mid-Century Insurance Company and Truck Insurance Exchange, and all cross-claims asserted against them, are dismissed, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 3/16/09.(gmssl, )
March 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 790 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of Special Master that Continental Western Insurance Company's 665 MOTION to Join in Maryland Casualty Insurance Company's 351 MOTION for Summary Judgment, be granted, AND THAT Continental Western Insurance Com pany's 719 MOTION for Summary Judgment, be granted. Judgment should enter dismissing the Complaint of Trinity Universal Insurance Company of Kansas, Inc.[Doc. 101] and the crossclaims of Travelers Indemnity Insurance Company [Doc. 137]; St. P aul Fire & Marine Insurance Company [Doc. 258]; United States Fidelity & Guaranty Company [ Doc. 285]; Valley Forge Insurance Company [Doc. 447]; National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford [ Doc. 447] and Employers Mutual Casualty Company [Doc. 468] . Trinity's 733 MOTION to Strike Continental Western Insurance Company's Motion for Summary Judgment is denied for failure to comply with local rules of pleading. Continental Western's 710 Motion to Clarify is granted, by Special Master Donald E. Abram on 3/13/09. (ebs, )
March 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 792 AMENDED REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of Special Master that 351 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Maryland Casualty Company, be granted. Judgment should enter dismissing the Complaint of Trinity Universal Insurance of Kansas, Inc [Doc. 101] and th e cross-claims of Travelers Indemnity Insurance Company [Doc. 137]; St. Paul Fire & Marine Insurance Company [Doc 258]; United States Fidelity & Guaranty Company [Doc. 285]; Valley Forge Insurance Company [Doc 447]; National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford [ Doc 447] and Employers Mutual Casualty Company [Doc. 468], by Special Master Donald E. Abram on 3/11/09. (ebs, )
March 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 779 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of Special Master That 351 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Maryland Casualty Company be granted and that Judgment should enter dismissing the Complaint of Trinity Universal Insurance of Kansas, Inc [Doc. 101] and the cross-claims of Travelers Indemnity Insurance Company [Doc. 137]; St. Paul Fire & Marine Insurance Company [Doc 258]; United States Fidelity & Guaranty Company [Doc. 285]; Valley Forge Insurance Company [Doc 47]; National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford [ Doc 447] and Employers Mutual Casualty Company [Doc. 468], by Special Master Donald E. Abram on 3/9/09. (gmssl, )
March 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 778 ORDER granting 766 Motion for Modification of Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 7/1/2009, by Special Master Donald E. Abram on 3/4/09.(gmssl, )
January 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 755 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Special Master; Recommending United Security Insurance Companys Motion for Summary Judgment be granted, Judgment should enter dismissing 101 Amended Complaint of Trinity Universal Insurance Company of Kansas, Inc and C rossclaims of 137 Travelers Indemnity Insurance Company, 447 Valley Forge Insurance Company, National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford, 285 United States Fidelity & Guaranty Company, 468 Employers Mutual Casualty Company and 258 St. Paul Fire & Marine Insurance Company. Signed by Special Master Donald E. Abram on 01/29/09. (pap, ) (Modified on 1/30/2009 to add Special Master's name)(pap, ).
January 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 769 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Special Master That 688 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Mid-Century Insurance be granted and 689 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Truck Insurance Exchange be granted, and that Judgment should enter dismissin g the cross-claims of Travelers Indemnity Insurance Company; St. Paul Fire & Marine Insurance Company; United States Fidelity & Guaranty Company; Valley Forge Insurance Company; National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford and Employers Mutual Casualty Company, by Special Master Donale E. Abram on 1/28/09. (gmssl, )
January 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 753 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Special Master That 740 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Crossclaims with Prejudice filed by Fulcrum Insurance Company be granted, by Special Master Donald E. Abram on 1/27/09. (gmssl, )
January 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 747 ORDER Amending 402 Scheduling Order. The parties to designate all experts and provide opposing counsel with all information specified in Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2) no later than March 16, 2009 and to designate all rebuttal experts and provide opposing counsel with all information specified in Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2) no later than April 3, 2009. Signed by Special Master Donald E. Abram on 1/14/09. (gms, )
January 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 746 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Special Master that 623 Mid-Century Insurance Co. and Truck Insurance Exchange's MOTION to Dismiss all Cross-Claims be granted and that judgment enter dismissing the cross-claims of Travelers Indemnity Insurance C ompany [Doc. 137]; St. Paul Fire & Marine Insurance Company [Doc. 258]; United States Fidelity Guaranty Company [Doc. 285]; Valley Forge Insurance Company [ Doc. 447]; National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford [Doc. 467] and Employers Mutual Casualty Company [Doc. 468] as they relate to Mid-Century Insurance Company and Truck Insurance Exchange. Signed by Special Master Donald E. Abram on 1/12/09. (gms, )
February 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 135 Minute ORDER granting 89 Defendant Traveler's Indeminty Insurance Company's Motion for Leave to Assert Counter and Cross Claims; granting 94 Defendant D.R. Horton, Inc.'s Motion to Co-Join Defendants as Necessary Parties; granting 131 Defendant Continental Western Insurance Company's Unopposed Motion For Leave to File Answer to Trinity Universal Insurance Company of Kansas, Inc.'s Amended Complaint, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 02/04/2008.(sah2, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trinity Universal Insurance Company of Kansas, Inc. v. D.R. Horton, Inc. Denver et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trinity Universal Insurance Company of Kansas, Inc.
Represented By: Derek Charles Blass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D.R. Horton, Inc. Denver
Represented By: Debra Ann Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AIG National Insurance Company, Inc.
Represented By: Debra Ann Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TIG Insurance Company
Represented By: Suzanne Marie Meintzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Property Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Laura Trask Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Fire & Marine Insurance Co.
Represented By: Debra Ann Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Continental Western Insurance Company
Represented By: Melissa Wiese Shisler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: Travelers Property Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Laura Trask Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: D.R. Horton, Inc. Denver
Represented By: Debra Ann Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: AIG National Insurance Company, Inc.
Represented By: Debra Ann Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: D.R. Horton, Inc. Denver
Represented By: Debra Ann Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: AIG National Insurance Company, Inc.
Represented By: Debra Ann Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Travelers Property Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Laura Trask Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?