Huber v. Roberts et al
Plaintiff: Michael T. Huber
Defendant: Kristina Ireland, T. Fluharty, Dick Roberts, Kristina (I) Ireland, T. (I) Fluharty and Dick (I) Roberts
Case Number: 1:2007cv00681
Filed: April 5, 2007
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Fremont
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER ACCEPTS AND ADOPTS 50 Report and Recommendations in its entirety. granting 34 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment; It is FURTHER ORDERED that the Complaint and cause of action are dismissed with prejudice, the parties to pay their own costs and attorneys fees. It is FURTHER ORDERED that a separate Judgment shall issue pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 58(a). by Judge Zita L. Weinshienk on 4/23/09.(erv, ) (Modified on 4/28/2009 corrected file date to 4/23/09)(erv, ).
March 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER Plaintiff shall file a notice of change of address within five days of the date of any change of address, or this action may be dismissed. Clerk shall mail copies of the docket entries set forth in this Order, along with a copy of this Order, to the Plaintiff at the address provided, by Judge Zita L. Weinshienk on 3/31/09. (ebs, )
February 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 50 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that 34 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Kristina Ireland, Dick (I) Roberts, Dick Roberts, Kristina (I) Ireland, T. Fluharty, T. (I) Fluharty be granted, and all claims against Defendants Roberts, Ireland, and Fluharty be dismissed, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 2/25/09. (ebs, )
April 5, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Directing Clerk to Commence Civil Action and Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiency. Plaintiff has 30 days to file a Prisoner Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 4/4/2007. (llr, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Huber v. Roberts et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristina Ireland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Fluharty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dick Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristina (I) Ireland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. (I) Fluharty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dick (I) Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael T. Huber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?