Brown v. USA
Plaintiff: |
Brian L. Brown |
Defendant: |
USA |
Interested Party: |
Case Manager for Brian L. Brown |
Case Number: |
1:2007cv00717 |
Filed: |
April 6, 2007 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Colorado |
Office: |
Denver Office |
County: |
XX US, Outside State |
Presiding Judge: |
Boyd N. Boland |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Statutory Actions |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act - Claims Against United States |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
September 22, 2009 |
Filing
141
ORDER granting 81 and 82 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff's Amended Complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Denying 85 Plaintiff's Motion for Change of Venue. Denying as moot 112 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave o f Court to Exhaust Tort Claim Action Complaint. Denying as moot 139 Motion to District Court Judge to Continued [sic] to Proceed Informa [sic] Pauperis. The Clerk shall forthwith enter judgment in favor of defendant the United States and against plaintiff Brian L. Brown, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 9/22/09.(ebs, )
|
May 14, 2009 |
Filing
130
ORDER By the 15th day of each month, plaintiff shall either make the required monthly payment for each month or file a certified copy of his inmate trust fund account statement for the month demonstrating that he is not required pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(b)(2) to make a monthly payment. Furthermore, if payment is made for the preceding month, in order to verify that the appropriate amount is being paid, the plaintiff must file a certified copy of his trust fund account statement for that month. The civil action number should be noted on all payments as well as on any trust fund statements that are filed with the court. If plaintiff fails to comply with this order, this court may recommend dismissal of the complaint and this civil action without further notice, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 5/14/09. (ebs, )
|
April 24, 2009 |
Filing
129
ORDER denying 127 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave of Court to Amend the Informa Pauperis Consent to Withdraw from Funds, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 4/24/09.(ebs, )
|
April 11, 2007 |
Filing
4
ORDER to Cure Deficiency within 30 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 3/22/07. (pap, )
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?