McKinney v. USA
Plaintiff: Sedrick Latroy McKinney
Defendant: USA
Case Number: 1:2007cv00838
Filed: April 24, 2007
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Tort Action
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER denying 102 Plaintiff's Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 8/18/10.(ebs, )
March 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER accepting 97 Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge. Granting 82 Defendant's Jurisdictional Motion to Dismiss. Judgment shall enter in favor of defendant and against plaintiff on all claims. In light of this dismissal, the Magistrate Judge's denial 98 of plaintiff's motion to compel disclosure 94 is affirmed, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 3/2/10.(ebs, )
July 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 97 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that 82 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction be granted and that this case be dismissed in its entirety, with prejudice. Plaintiff's 94 MOTION for Order Compelling Disclosure of Trial Exhibits from Inmate Richie Hill's Central File is denied without prejudice, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 7/21/09. (ebs, )
March 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER granting in part 71 Motion to Utilize Depositions and Exhibits, granting in part 76 Motion to Amend Plaintiff's Proposed Final Pretrial Order with Exhibits, granting in part 88 Motion to Amend Plaintiff's Proposed Final Pretrial Order with Exhibits, denying 74 Request for Expert Witness, denying 80 Motion for Order to Amend with Exhibits Plaintiff's Request for Expert Witness, denying 75 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Subpoena Ad Testificandum and Subpoena Du ces Tecum, denying 77 Motion for Subpoena for Witness Dr. Gary Boston, denying 81 Motion for Review and Preserve for Trial Exhibits from Inmate Richie Hill's Central File, denying 85 Motion for Order Compelling Disclosure of Trial Exhibits from Inmate Richie Hill's Central File, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 3/24/09.(gmssl, )
January 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 67 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya: ORDERED: Plaintiffs Motion to Vacate Final Pretrial Conference and set Status Conference [Document #65, filed January 14, 2009] is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The F inal Pretrial Conference is vacated. All other requests in the motion are DENIED. ORDERED: Plaintiffs Motion to utilize depositions taken in related case will be filed on or before January 22, 2009. Responses due within twenty (20) days from filing a nd reply due within fifteen (15) days after response filed. ORDERED: COLEMAN MEDIUM FEDERAL CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION, Inmate Mail/Parcels, P.O. BOX 1032, COLEMAN, FL 33521 shall carefully monitor Mr. McKinneys incoming legal mail to be sure he receiv es all documents from the Court and that his mail is not confused with another prisoner with the same last name. ORDERED: The Clerk of the Court is directed to send a copy of the Minute Order [Document #58, dated November 26, 2008] to Plaintiff at th e current listed address. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/14/2009 09:30 AM in Courtroom C205 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. ORDERED: Defense counsel shall provide plaintiff a proposed Final Pretrial Order within one week of this hear ing with Plaintiffs portion completed. Plaintiff will have twenty (20) days after receipt to provide his inclusions for the Final Pretrial Order to Defendants counsel. Counsel for Defendant will provide a copy of the complete Final Pretrial Order to Plaintiff for review no later than March 09, 2009. ORDERED: The Dispositive Motion deadline is extended to March 09, 2009. All other deadlines remain the same. (Court Reporter FTR-Debra Brown.) (jjh, )
April 24, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Directing Clerk to Commence Civil Action and Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiency. Plaintiff has 30 days to file a certified copy of prisoner's trust fund statement, and to file a Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 and a Prisoner Complaint on the court's current and proper forms. Signed by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 4/23/2007. (llr, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McKinney v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sedrick Latroy McKinney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?