Hillberry v. Wooden Teddy Bear, Inc., The et al

Plaintiff: J. D. Hillberry
Defendant: Wooden Teddy Bear, Inc., The, All American Crafts, Inc., Winfield Collection, Ltd., The and Jeff Zaffino
Case Number: 1:2007cv00913
Filed: May 3, 2007
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Adams
Referring Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Presiding Judge: Walker D. Miller
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 26, 2009 174 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 158 Motion for Default Judgment Against Cross Defendant Jeff Zaffino. Default judgment in the amount of $69,506.01 (including $68,652.14 in attorneys fees and $853.87 in costs) shall enter for Cross Claimant The Wooden Teddy Bear, Inc., and against Cross Defendant Jeff Zaffino, by Judge Walker D. Miller on 1/26/09.(gms, )
February 5, 2008 97 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting re: 59 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses From Defendant Jeff Zaffino, 60 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses From Defendant All American Crafts, Inc., Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 02/05/2008. (sah2, )
February 1, 2008 95 Opinion or Order of the Court Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya: Motion Hearing held on 2/1/2008. Granting 59 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses From Defendant Jeff Zaffino and 60 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses From Defendant All American Crafts, Inc. Plaintiff is awarded costs and fees associated with these two motion. (Court Reporter FTR - Debra Nawls) (kmtcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hillberry v. Wooden Teddy Bear, Inc., The et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J. D. Hillberry
Represented By: Thomas P. Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wooden Teddy Bear, Inc., The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All American Crafts, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Winfield Collection, Ltd., The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Zaffino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?