USA v. Wagner et al
Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: Dennis Wagner, Carol Wagner, Key Bank and First Community Bank
Case Number: 1:2007cv00978
Filed: May 11, 2007
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Larimer
Presiding Judge: Marcia S. Krieger
Presiding Judge:
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7401 IRS: Tax Liability
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER setting discovery schedule. Discovery due by 1/9/2012. Dispositive Motions due by 1/23/2012. For further information on deadlines, please see order. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 10/26/2011. (kmtcd)
October 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR DISBURSEMENT OF FUNDS: United States' Motion for Disbursement of Funds 117 is granted. by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 10/5/11.(msksec, )
June 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER granting 98 Renewed Motion of BAC Home Loans Servicing L.P. to Intervene. The Clerk of the Court is directed to add BAC Home Loans Servicing L.P. as a Defendant in this action. BAC Home Loans Servicing L.P. shall file its Answer on or before 06/30/2011, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 06/16/2011.(wjc, )
May 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 106 MINUTE ORDER granting 104 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Surreply to Reply to Response to Motion to Intervene. The Clerk of Court shall file the Surreply (Doc. No. 104 -1), by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 05/09/2011.(wjc, )
March 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER CONFIRMING JUDICIAL SALE by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 3/31/11. (msksec, )
May 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER of Foreclosure and Sale. Granting 79 Motion for Order. The federal tax liens against Dennis Wagner are foreclosed. The property described in the order is to be offered for public sale as set forth in the order with proceeds of the sale applied as also set forth in the order, by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 5/24/10.(gmssl, )
October 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 75 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 73 MOTION for Order to Foreclose and Sale by Plaintiff USA be GRANTED and that this court enter an Order of Foreclosure for the property commonly known as 4820 Crest Road, Fort Collins, Colorado 80526 as more particularly described by legal description herein. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 10/21/09. (kmtcd, )
March 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER granting 54 the Government's Motion to Amend Judgment by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 03/30/09.(wjc, )
February 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER granting 67 Motion to Dismiss Defendant Home Federal Savings & Loan Association of the Rockies. Any and all claims against Defendant Home Federal Savings and Loan are hereby dismissed without prejudice. Each party shall bear his, her or its own costs. All future captions shall omit Defendant as a party, by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 02/10/09.(wjc, )
May 15, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER REGARDING CUSTODY OF EXHIBITS AND DEPOSITIONS. Any exhibits and depositions to be used during this case, counsel for the parties shall obtain such exhibits and depositions from the Court within 30 days after any judgment is entered or closure o f the case. Counsel shall retain same for 60 days beyondthe later of the time to appeal or conclusion of any appellate proceedings. Failure to retrieve exhibits and depositions in conformance with this Order may result in their destruction. Signed by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 5/15/07. (dln, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. Wagner et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Chad D. Nardiello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carol Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Key Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Community Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?