Barone v. United Air Lines
Plaintiff: Mary Barone
Defendant: United Air Lines
Case Number: 1:2007cv01277
Filed: June 18, 2007
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Douglas
Presiding Judge: Lewis T. Babcock
Presiding Judge: Kathleen M. Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER. A Stipulated Motion to Dismiss With Prejudice 159 was filed on 1/6/2011. This matter shall be DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, each party to pay their own fees and costs. By Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 1/6/2011. (sah, )
December 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 156 Stipulation and ORDER Regarding Custody of Exhibits, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 12/13/10. (mnf, )
December 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 148 Minute Entry. Jury Trial - Day One - held before Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 12/6/2010. ORDERED:Plaintiffs Motion to Re-List One Trial Witness, And For Expedited Ruling Thereon 146 is DENIED with the proviso, if truly rebuttal, some rebuttal testimony may be presented.(Court Reporter: Gwen Daniel) (ltbcd, ) Trial continued.
December 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER. The Plaintiffs Motion (Doc 144) is granted to clarify my Order 143 does not constitute a blanket exclusion of all statements by Kevin Mortimer. By Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 12/02/2010.(sah, )
December 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER. Defendant United Air Lines, Inc.s Motion for Ruling in Advance of Trial Regarding Sufficiency of Plaintiff Foundation Evidence For Admission of Highly Prejudicial Stray Remarks, filed 11/11/2010 127 is GRANTED. The 05/12/2010 Order 115 an d HEREBY ORDER Defendants Motion in Limine, filed 03/09/2010 101 is GRANTED as to Debra Benjamin, DeeDee Dalvit, Jennifer McInerney, DeniseAmbrose Van-Dyke, Larry Everett, and Rhonda Patterson-Eachus. The Order the May 12, 2010 Order (docket #115)i s REVERSED and GRANT Defendants Motion in Limine as to Kevin Mortimers stray comments, specifically including any comments made by Mortimer illustrating his alleged discriminatory or retaliatory animus. By Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 12/01/2010. (sah, )
July 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER. Plaintiffs claims under Colorados Anti-Discrimination Act are DISMISSED BY STIPULATION. A trial preparation conference is set for Friday, 11/12/2010 at 9:00 a.m.. A 5-7 day jury trial is set to commence on 11/29/2010 at 9:00 a.m.. By Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 07/08/2010. (sah, )
May 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER denying in part and granting in part 101 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Irrelevant and Inadmissible Witnesses, Evidence and Stray Comments, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 5/12/10. (ebs, )
May 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 113 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lewis T. Babcock: Motion in Limine; Motion Hearing held on 5/7/2010.Granting in part and denying in part 101 (Court Reporter Gwen Daniel) (gkram)
February 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER re: 96 Joint Stipulation for Dismissal of Claims Under Colorado Anti-Discrimination Act. Plaintiffs claim under the Colorado Anti-Discrimination Act shall be DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, each party to pay their own fees and costs, and that the dismissal of with the Colorado Anti-Discrimination Act claim shall have no impact on Plaintiffs remaining claims. By Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 02/25/2010. (sah, )
February 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER. Plaintiff shall file either a motion to dismiss or a status report regarding her claim under Colorados Anti-Discrimination Act on or before 02/22/2010. Defendant shall file a status report regarding its position on an advisory jury verdict on Plaintiffs promissory estoppel claim on or before 02/22/2010. A hearing on Defendants motion in limine regarding Plaintiffs comparitor witnesses is set for 04/08/2010 at 9:00 a.m.. Defendants request to retain a vocational rehabilitation expert is DENIED as untimely. By Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 02/18/2010. (sah, )
January 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER. Defendants Motion to Consolidate Cases for Trial and for New Trial Date 79 filed 12/31/2009, is GRANTED. Case No. 08-cv-02487- REB-MJW is consolidated with this matter and all further filings will be made in 07-cv-01277-LTB-KMT. By Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 01/22/2010.(sah, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barone v. United Air Lines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Barone
Represented By: John R. Olsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Air Lines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?