Blackfeet Housing et al v. United States Department of Housing and Urban Development (HUD) et al
Plaintiff: Blackfeet Housing, Zuni Tribe, The, Isleta Pueblo Housing Authority, Pueblo of Acoma Housing Authority, Association of Village Council Presidents Regional Housing Authority, Northwest Inupiat Housing Authority, Interior Regional Housing Authority, Bristol Bay Housing Authority, Aleutian Housing Authority, Chippewa Cree Housing Authority and Big Pine Paiute Tribe
Defendant: United States Department of Housing and Urban Development (HUD), Alphonso Jackson, Orlando Cabrera, Deborah Lalancette and National Office of Native American Programs
Case Number: 1:2007cv01343
Filed: June 26, 2007
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Presiding Judge: Walker D. Miller
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 25:4101 Native American Housing Assistance and Self-Determination Act (NAHASDA)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 132 FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS AND ORDER FOR FINAL JUDGMENT. Pursuant to this Courts [ 78] Memorandum Opinions and Orders dated August 31, 2012 and March 7, 2014, and the following findings and conclusions, the Plaintiffs are entitled to declaratory and injunctive relief. A separate Judgment shall enter for each Plaintiff, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 1/16/2015. (evana, )
September 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER : Defendants shall provide to the Plaintiffs on or before October 22, 2014, copies of relevant signed grant agreements and financial documents that confirm the amounts recaptured by HUD from the Plaintiffs. The Plaintiff shall respond if necessary by November 3, 2014, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 9/22/2014. (jsmit)
August 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO DOCKET TRANSCRIPTS IN REFERENCED CASES: the Clerk is directed to docket transcripts of all coordinated proceedings in each of the referenced actions, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 8/26/2014. (jsmit)
August 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER FOR HEARING ON PROPOSED FINAL JUDGMENT re 106 , 110 , [117-1], 120 , and [120-1]: oral arguments on these matters will be heard at a time to be set after conferring with counsel, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 8/14/2014. (jsmit)
March 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 105 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: defendants shall restore to the plaintiffs all funds that were illegally recaptured for fiscal years through and including FY 2008. The defendants' obligation to restore such funds is subject to the 6-year limitatio ns period provided by 28 U.S.C. § 2401(a); with respect to grant funding for those fiscal years, HUD shall refrain from threatening recapture from the plaintiffs and shall not act upon any threatened recapture; on or before April 15, 2014, the p laintiffs in each civil action shall submit a proposed form of judgment, specifying the amounts to be paid to each tribe ortribal housing entity and the asserted sources of payment; and for any plaintiff who claims entitlement to payment for underfun ding because HUD excluded units from that plaintiff's FCAS in a particular fiscal year, the proposed form of judgment should include a separate itemization for those amounts and may be submitted by May 15, 2014. An Appendix may be provided to explain the calculation of the amount owed and the record support for the claim, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 3/7/2014. (rpmcd)
September 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER granting 100 Defendants Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Surreply to Plaintiffs Reply to Defendants Response to Plaintiffs Statement of Relief Requested, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 9/27/2013.(ervsl, )
August 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER Granting 95 Motion for Leave to File a Reply to Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Statement of Relief Requested and Motion to Supplement the Record: Plaintiff shall file its Reply Brief on or before September 3, 2013, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 8/1/2013.(rpmcd )
December 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER Granting 86 Motion re 83 Order: Plaintiffs shall file their Statement of Relief Requested on or before March 4, 2013 and Defendants shall file their response to Plaintiffs' Statement of Relief Requested on or before May 6, 2013, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 12/26/2012. (rpmcd)
November 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER REGARDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE re 82 : On or before December 19, 2012, simultaneous briefs shall be filed by the plaintiffs and defendants in the coordinated cases addressing factual and legal questions pertaining to HUD's authority to r ecapture funds awarded in a previous grant year that the grant recipient spent on affordable housing activities. On or before January 18, 2013, plaintiffs in each case shall file a statement of the relief requested and the court's jurisdiction under the APA to grant such relief. Proposed supplements to the administrative record may be tendered. Defendants' responses to the plaintiffs' statements are due on or before March 19, 2013, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 11/19/2012. (rpmcd )
August 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 78 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER ON ISSUES PRESENTED IN THE SPECIAL BRIEF OF PLAINTIFF BIG PINE PAIUTE TRIBE : Defendant HUD violated 25 U.S.C. § 4152(d) and 24 C.F.R. § 1000.340 by withholding amounts from Plaintiff Big Pine Paiute Tribes Ind ian Housing Block Grants for fiscal years 2005, 2006 and 2007. Defendants are prohibited from any further withholding from Plaintiff Big Pine Paiute Tribe's Indian Housing Block Grant award to the extent such withholding would reduce Big Pine Paiute Tribes annual grant to less than $304,988, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 8/31/2012. (rpmcd)
April 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER FOR COORDINATED HEARING: will held at a time to be scheduled and all counsel representing the parties must be personally present at the hearing, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 4/16/2012. (rpmcd )
July 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER for Consolidated Status Conference. Consolidated status conference will be held on July 23, 2010, at 2:00 p.m. Mountain Daylight Time in Courtroom A201, the Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse, 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado. Because o f the geographical dispersion of plaintiffs' counsel, the conference will be held in a courtroom equipped to accommodate counsel who may wish to participate by telephone conference to avoid travel expense. Personal attendance is, of course, pref erred. Counsel who attend by telephone conference will call the court staff at 303-844-4627 by Monday, July 19, 2010, between the hours of 8:00 a.m. and 4:00 p.m. to provide telephone numbers. The conference call will be initiated by the Courts staff, signed by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 7/6/2010. (rpmcd )
June 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER Status conference set 6/30/10 is vacated. Reference to a Magistrate Judge is vacated. Granting 48 Joint Motion to Dismiss the Interior Regional Housing Authority as plaintiff is granted and they are dismissed as a plaintiff, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 6/24/10.(gmssl, )
July 13, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 10/2/2007 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland. Signed by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 7/13/07. (gms, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blackfeet Housing et al v. United States Department of Housing and Urban Development (HUD) et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blackfeet Housing
Represented By: John Fredericks, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zuni Tribe, The
Represented By: John Fredericks, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isleta Pueblo Housing Authority
Represented By: John Fredericks, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pueblo of Acoma Housing Authority
Represented By: John Fredericks, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Association of Village Council Presidents Regional Housing Authority
Represented By: John Fredericks, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Northwest Inupiat Housing Authority
Represented By: John Fredericks, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Interior Regional Housing Authority
Represented By: John Fredericks, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bristol Bay Housing Authority
Represented By: John Fredericks, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aleutian Housing Authority
Represented By: John Fredericks, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chippewa Cree Housing Authority
Represented By: John Fredericks, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Big Pine Paiute Tribe
Represented By: John Fredericks, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Housing and Urban Development (HUD)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alphonso Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orlando Cabrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah Lalancette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Office of Native American Programs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?