Liman et al v. Piper Aircraft, Incorporated
Plaintiff: |
Les Liman, Twin Landfill Corporation and American National Property and Casualty Company |
Defendant: |
Piper Aircraft, Incorporated |
Case Number: |
1:2007cv01384 |
Filed: |
June 29, 2007 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Colorado |
Office: |
Denver Office |
County: |
Routt |
Presiding Judge: |
Richard P. Matsch |
Nature of Suit: |
Airplane Product Liability |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
March 23, 2010 |
Filing
88
ORDER Vacating Dates pursuant to re: 87 Notice. Trial Preparation Conference scheduled for March 26, 2010 and the trial to Court set for April 4, 2010 are vacated. Dismissal Paper due by 5/3/2010, signed by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 3/23/2010. (rpmcd)
|
March 4, 2010 |
Filing
85
Minute Entry - Courtroom Minutes for Motion Hearing held on 3/4/2010 before Judge Richard P. Matsch. ORDERED: Plaintiffs' fourth, fifth and sixth claims are withdrawn and dismissed and Economic Loss Rule is not applicable. Plaintiffs' Color ado Consumer Protection Act Claim is dismissed. Remainder of Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, filed September 15, 2009 66 , is denied. Trial preparation conference scheduled March 26, 2010 at 1:30 p.m.Trial briefs in paper to chambers due by March 24th, 2010 (Reporter FTR - K. Terasaki) (rpmcd)
|
November 4, 2009 |
Filing
82
ORDER Granting 81 Defendant Piper's Motion for Leave to Supplement its Objections to Plaintiffs' Trial Exhibits and Piper's Supplemental Objections attached thereto is accepted for filing, signed by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 11/4/2009.(rpmcd)
|
October 23, 2009 |
Filing
78
ORDER Granting 77 Plaintiffs' Motion to File Corrected Response to Motion forSummary Judgment. Corrected Response Brief attached is accepted for filing, signed by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 10/23/2009.(rpmcd)
|
September 29, 2009 |
Filing
71
ORDER for Dismissal of Defendant Kosola & Associates, Inc. Ordered that defendant Kosola & Associates Inc. is dismissed with prejudice Kosola & Associates Inc. and plaintiffs to bear their own costs and attorney fees by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 09/29/09. (jjh, )
|
September 17, 2009 |
Filing
68
ORDER Setting Bench Trial for 4/5/2010 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom A. Signed by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 9/17/2009. (rpmcd)
|
June 11, 2009 |
Filing
54
Minute Entry - Courtroom Minutes for Motion Hearing held on 6/11/2009 before Judge Richard P. Matsch. ORDERED: Defendant Piper Aircraft, Incorporated's Combined Motion to Compel Plaintiffs' Response to Written Discovery and Motion for Exten sion of Time to File Rebuttal Expert Disclosures, filed April 13, 2009 43 , is granted with respect to e-mails requested and moot ( 49 Order) with respect to motion for extension of time. Defendant Piper Aircraft is awarded attorney fees and costs limited to the Motion to Compel. Counsel shall file their cost amounts and affidavits. Pretrial Conference scheduled September 11, 2009 at 2:00 p.m.(Reporter FTR - K. Terasaki) (rpmcd)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?