November 15, 2010 |
Filing
174
ORDER re: 171 Joint Stipulation for Voluntary Dismissal. This case is dismissed as follows: Relator Pfeifers claims against ELA Medical, Inc. and Physicians are dismissed with prejudice. The United States claims against ELA Medical, Inc. are dism issed with prejudice for the Covered Conduct as defined in the Settlement Agreement only. All of the United States remaining claims against ELA Medical, Inc. are dismissed without prejudice. The United States claims against Physicians are dismissed without prejudice. All contents of the Courts file in this action currently under seal shall remain under seal and shall not be made public without further order of the United States District Court. The parties shall pay expenses, attorney fees, and costs as set forth in the Settlement Agreement, by Judge Walker D. Miller on 11/15/10. (ebs, )
|
September 20, 2010 |
Filing
168
ORDER FOR ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSURE pursuant to the 166 Joint Application to Administratively Close the Case Pending Settlement Negotiations. This case is administratively closed in accordance with D.C.COLO.LCivR 41.2, subject to reopening for good cause, by Judge Walker D. Miller on 9/20/10.(ebs, )
|
August 10, 2010 |
Filing
162
PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 8/10/2010. (mehcd)
|
August 9, 2010 |
Filing
158
MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 154 the Joint Motion for Entry of Protective Order, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 8/9/2010. (mehcd)
|
April 8, 2010 |
Filing
143
Courtroom Minutes/Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Status Conference held on 4/8/2010, granting 141 the Joint Motion for Stay of All Proceedings. Status Conference set for 8/5/2010 09:15 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Beginning 5/15/2010, counsel shall file confidential letters with the Court regarding settlement negotiations. (Court Reporter FTR - C. Coomes) (mehcd)
|
March 31, 2010 |
Filing
139
ORDER: Defendants Ela Medical, Inc., Sorin Group USA, Inc., Sorin Group, and Sorin S.p.A.'s Motion to Dismiss Relator's Complaint 57 , Defendants Advanced Cardiac Specialists Chartered, Dr. Stephen Blumberg, Dr. William Stuck, and Dr. John R. Dylewski's Motion to Dismiss Relator's Complaint 62 , Defendant Dr. Uri Ben-Zur's Motion to Dismiss 68 , Dr. Mark Seifert's Motion to Dismiss 116 , and Dr. Ashkok Garg's Motion to Dismiss 125 , and Dr. A. Tomas Garcia 's Motion to Dismiss 134 are granted in part and denied in part. Relator Pfeiffers claims, based upon expenses incurred for entertainment and personal and unrelated travel are dismissed with prejudice under the first-to-file bar as to all Def endants. Claims based on training contracts remain pending against Defendants Ela Medical, Inc., Advanced Cardiac Specialists Chartered, Dr. Blumberg, Dr. Garcia, Dr. Seigel, and Dr. Garg. Claims against Defendants Sorin Group USA, Inc., Sorin Grou p, Sorin S.p.A., Dr. Ben-Zur, Dr. Seifert, Dr. Stuck, and Dr. Dylewski are dismissed without prejudice. Defendants Sorin Group USA, Inc., Sorin Group, Sorin S.p.A., Dr. Ben-Zur, Dr. Seifert, Dr. Stuck, and Dr. Dylewski may have their costs. Defendant Dr. Seiferts Motion to Dismiss as it pertains to insufficient service of process 116 is denied as moot, by Judge Walker D. Miller on 3/31/10.(ebs, )
|
November 16, 2009 |
Filing
119
Courtroom Minutes/Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Motion Hearing held on 11/16/2009, granting 100 Motion for Extension of Time; granting in part and denying in part 115 Motion to Stay. The deadline for Joinder of Parties/Amendment of Pleadings is extended to 30 days after ruling on the Motion to Dismiss. (Court Reporter FTR - C. Coomes) (mehcd)
|
October 7, 2009 |
Filing
92
ORDER denying 81 Defendants' Joint Motion for a Stay of Discovery and of Entry of Scheduling Order and to Vacate Scheduling Conference Pending Rulings on Defendants' Motions to Dismiss, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 10/7/09.(ebs, )
|
October 6, 2009 |
Filing
91
MINUTE ORDER granting 88 the Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Statement of Interest filed by Interested Party United States. The Clerk of the Court is directed to file the Statement of Interest of the United States in Response to Defendant ELA, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss, found at docket #88-2. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 10/6/2009. (mehcd)
|
August 28, 2009 |
Filing
63
MINUTE ORDER granting 58 Relator's Unopposed Motion to Continue Scheduling Conference Report Deadline and Conference. Scheduling Conference set for 9/9/2009 is VACATED and RESET to 10/5/2009 09:30 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 8/28/2009. (mehcd)
|
May 12, 2009 |
Filing
24
ORDER, The complaint, the notice of non-intervention and this order are unsealed and to be served upon the defendant by the relator. All other contents of file to remain under seal. Seal lifted as to all other matters occurring in this action after the date of this order. Parties to serve all pleadings, motions and notices of appeal on U.S. All court orders to be sent to the U.S. U.S. to be advised of any proposed dismissal of this action, by Judge Walker D. Miller on 5/12/09. (gmssl, )
|