Salameh v. Gonzales et al
Plaintiff: Mohammad Amin Salameh
Defendant: Alberto Gonzales, Harley Lappin, Harrell Watts, Ronald Wiley and Aloma Kidwiler
Case Number: 1:2007cv01561
Filed: July 24, 2007
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Fremont
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y. Daniel
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER OF DISMISSAL: Granting pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(2) 149 Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss This Civil Action. This civil action is dismissed, by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 12/23/09.(ebs, )
October 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 145 MINUTE ORDER denying as moot 142 Plaintiff's Motion to Order Defendants to Provide Plaintiff With All Copies (Xerox) Needed for Handwritten Documentations, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 10/19/2009.(mjwcd )
September 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 141 MINUTE ORDER denying 139 Plaintiff's Motion to Stay Response to the Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment Until Plaintiff Receives a Counsel in This Action, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 09/10/2009.(mjwcd )
July 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER granting 134 Unopposed Motion to Retain the Confidentiality of Certain Documents Pursuant to Third Protective Order, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 7/2/09.(gmssl, )
June 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER denying 130 Plaintiffs Motion to Stay Response to Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment due August 24, 2009. by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 6/24/09.(erv, )
May 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 125 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 5/13/09. (erv, )
January 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 110 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel: deferring ruling on 100 Motion to Withdraw ; Motion Hearing held on 1/29/2009. Granting 102 Joint Motion to Vacate Final Pretrial Conference and Set Status Conference. (Court Reporter Therese Lindblom.) (wydcd, rrk)
August 7, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER, Set Hearings: Scheduling Conference set for 10/3/2007 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 8/7/07. (erv, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Salameh v. Gonzales et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mohammad Amin Salameh
Represented By: Joyce Ellen Rosendahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alberto Gonzales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harley Lappin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harrell Watts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Wiley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aloma Kidwiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?