Parker Excavating, Inc. v. Rio Grande Portland Cement Corporation et al
Plaintiff: |
Parker Excavating, Inc. |
Defendant: |
Rio Grande Portland Cement Corporation and Industrial Company, The |
Case Number: |
1:2007cv01600 |
Filed: |
July 30, 2007 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Colorado |
Office: |
Denver Office |
County: |
Pueblo |
Presiding Judge: |
Kristen L. Mix |
Presiding Judge: |
Edward W. Nottingham |
Nature of Suit: |
Contract: Other |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
April 8, 2010 |
Filing
136
ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSING ORDER. If the parties have not reopened this case within 6 months of this date for the purpose of dismissal pursuant to the settlement and compromise, Plaintiffs action shall be deemed to be dismissed. By Judge Robin J. Cauthron on 04/08/2010. (sah, )
|
March 24, 2010 |
Filing
132
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Defendant and Counterclaimant Rio Grande Portland Cement Corporations Corrected Motion for Entry of Judgment for Treble Damages,Attorneys Fees, Costs and Interest 123 is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part.Plaintiff Pa rker Excavating, Inc.s Combined Post-Trial Motion (A) for Entry of Judgment of Foreclosure of Mechanics Lien, and (B) for Judgment as a Matter of Law or for New Trial on Counterclaimants Trust Fund Claim 121 is GRANTED. As explained herein, notice of the decision on remittur shall be filed with the Court within seven days. By Judge Robin J. Cauthron on 03/24/2010.(sah, )
|
December 22, 2009 |
Filing
126
ORDER granting 125 the parties' Unopposed Motion for Leave to file Reply Briefs in Support of Post-Trial Motions. The parties shall file reply briefs in support of their respective motions on or before 12/31/2009. By Judge Robin J. Cauthron on 12/22/2009.(sah, )
|
November 20, 2009 |
Filing
109
ORDER. The Court finds that all objections from either party, which were not previously withdrawn, are hereby OVERRULED. By Judge Robin J. Cauthron on 11/20/2009. (sah, )
|
September 10, 2009 |
Filing
108
ORDER. The case is set for trial beginning 11/30/2009, at 9:00 a.m. The Court will schedule a pre-trial conference to be held sometime between November 2, 2009, and November 13, 2009. By Judge Robin J. Cauthron on 09/10/2009. (sah, )
|
August 28, 2009 |
Filing
107
ORDER. The pre-trial conference scheduled for 08/28/2009 and the trial set for 09/14/2009, are hereby stricken. They will be reset at a later date. By Judge Robin J. Cauthron on 08/28/2009. (sah, )
|
April 14, 2009 |
Filing
92
(STRICKEN) ORDER Six Day Jury Trial set for 9/14/2009 01:30 PM in Courtroom A 602 before Judge Christine M. Arguello. Trial Preparation Conference set for 8/28/2009 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom A 602 before Judge Christine M. Arguello. by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 4/14/09. (erv, ) Modified on 8/28/2009 to STRIKE pursuant to the Order dated 08/28/2009 (sah, ).
|
January 9, 2009 |
Filing
84
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 55 Motion for Leave to file First Amended Complaint. The motion is GRANTED with respect to amending the complaint to add a promissory estoppel claim. The motion is DENIED with respect to amending the compl aint to add a promissory fraud claim. Plaintiff and Counterclaim Defendant Parker Excavating, Inc., shall file its first amended complaint omitting the claim for promissory fraud no later than January 16, 2009.Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 1/9/09.(erv, )
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?