Stine et al v. Lappin et al
Plaintiff: Mikeal Glenn Stine and Raymond Oechsle
Defendant: Harry Lappin, Michael Nalley and Ron Wiley
Case Number: 1:2007cv01839
Filed: August 31, 2007
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Fremont
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 391 MINUTE ORDER granting 387 Motion to Strike for the reasons given in 369 Order dated 11/16/11 and striking 385 Motion to Modify. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 4/5/13. (mjgsl, )
April 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 373 MINUTE ORDER denying as moot 372 Motion to Strike, or in the Alternative, for Extension of Time to Respond to, Docket Number 370. Entered by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 4/13/12. (wydcd, rrk)
November 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 369 MINUTE ORDER striking 368 Motion for Reconsideration. Plaintiff is ordered not to file any additional motions or other pleadings in this closed case as they will be stricken, and the clerks office is directed to not accept any future filings in this action by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 11/16/11.(jjh, )
September 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 367 MINUTE ORDER STRIKING 366 Motion for Evidentiary Hearing/Conference; STRIKING 366 Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify; The Court construes the pending motion as an improper attempt to circumvent the injunction previously entered against him in this ca se. 344 and 350 . Accordingly, Plaintiff is ordered not to file any additional motions or other pleadings in this closed case as they will be stricken, and the clerks office is directed to not accept any future filings in this action. by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 9/1/2010.(erv, )
March 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 361 MINUTE ORDER denying 359 Plaintiffs Motion for Amended Court Order by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 3/23/2010.(klmcd)
October 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 357 ORDER denying 352 Plaintiff's Motion to Vacate Hon. Wiley Daniel's Orders of Judgment No. (351) in 07-cv-1839; and Judgment Order No. 223 in 07-cv-2203, With Good Cause. Denying as moot 355 Motion for Judicial Notice, by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 10/13/09.(ebs, )
September 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 350 ORDER AFFIRMED AND ADOPTED 344 Report and Recommendations of the United States Magistrate Judge; Granting 258 Defendants Motion to Dismiss and this action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41 and 28 U.S.C. § 1915 ; It is FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff is enjoined from filing future pro se cases as set forth in the Recommendation at pages 30-32. Denying as moot 348 Plaintiffs APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court; Denying as moot 267 Plain tiffs APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court; Denying as moot 302 Plaintiffs APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court; Denying as moot 314 Plaintiffs Motion to Compel; Denying 304 Plaintiffs Motion for Order by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 9/1/09.(erv, )
June 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 347 ORDER denying 345 Plaintiffs Motion to Add Just Obtained Copies of Philip Green Communication Concerning His Safety/and Green Light to Murder him by Latin Kings. The Motion and related pleading 343 and 345 shall be STRICKEN from the record. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 06/29/2009.(sah, )
June 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 344 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 258 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 41 and 28 USC 1915 filed by Michael Nalley, Harry Lappin, Ron Wiley, BE GRANTED; I FURTHER RECOMMEND that the Order to Show Cause 319 be madeABSOLUTE. I FURTHER RECOMMEND that P laintiff be enjoined from filing future pro se cases as set forth above; I FURTHER RECOMMEND that Plaintiffs Motion for Injunction 304 , BE DENIED, I FURTHER ORDER that Plaintiffs Motion to Compel and Motion for Sanctions 314 be DENIED as moot. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 6/25/09. (erv, )
June 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 342 ORDER DENYING MOTIONS AND STRIKING THEM FROM THE RECORD, Denying 337 Plaintiff's Motion for Order to have mail inspected; Denying 340 Motion for Leave to submit exhibit. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Docket No. 336 shall be unsealed and both Motions and related pleadings 336 , 337 & 340 shall be STRICKEN from the record. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 6/18/09.(erv, )
May 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 335 MINUTE ORDER denying 330 Defendants Motion to Strike Letters from Non- Party Inmates ; granting 333 Motion for Extension of Time. The dispositive motions deadline shall be fifteen (15) days from the date of the District Judges order on the underlying Motion to Dismiss 258 . by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 5/28/09.(erv, ) (Modified on 5/29/2009 corrected linkage)(erv, ).
May 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 326 ORDER Evidentiary Hearing set for 5/22/2009 02:00 PM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 5/8/09. (erv, )
March 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 307 MINUTE ORDER denying as moot 305 Plaintiffs Motion to Add Attached Exhibits (1) Through (9) to Pending Motion for Protective Order and Injunction/Oral Arguments Requested, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 3/16/09.(erv, )
March 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 299 MINUTE ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motions 265 , 271 , 273 , 274 , 276 , 279 , 282 , 286 & 287 are DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Plaintiff may file a single motion that sets forth every allegation he wishes to assert in relation to his request for injunctive relief on or before March 27, 2009. The motion must be comprehensive and any later attempts to supplement or amend the motion will be stricken. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 3/6/09.(erv, )
March 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 289 ORDER denying 268 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Complaint by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 3/2/09.(erv, )
January 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 255 MINUTE ORDER Granting Plaintiffs 223 Motion for Scheduling Conference; and Motion to Discontinue Copies to Dismissed Plaintiff Oechsle. a Status Conference is set for February 12, 2009 at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom C-204, Second Floor, Byron G. Rogers United States Courthouse, 1929 Stout Street, Denver, Colorado. On the date and time set for the conference, Plaintiff shall contact the Court at (303) 335-2770 to participate. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Motion No. 232 is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall remove former Plaintiff Oeshcles name from the list of parties who receive electronic mailings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 1/15/09.(erv, )
January 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 254 ORDER AFFIRMED AND ADOPTED 222 Report and Recommendations of United States Magistrate Judge; granting in part and denying in part 163 Defendants Motion to Dismiss; It is FURTHER ORDERED that all claims against Defendants Lappin and Nailey in thei r individual capacities are DISMISSED. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Claim II is DISMISSED. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants Motion is DENIED as to Claim I to the extent that Claim I asserts a claim for injunctive or nonmonetary relief against Defendants in their official capacities and a claim for monetary relief against Defendant Wiley in his individual capacity.Signed by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 1/14/09.(erv, )
January 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 251 MINUTE ORDER denying 247 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; denying 247 Motion for TRO; denying 249 Motion to Amend/Correct/Modif; In addition to providing notice of filing of this Minute Order to the parties, it is ORDERED that the office of the Clerk shall mail a copy of this Minute Order to the following: CASE MANAGER FOR: Mikeal Glenn Stine #55436-098, Florence ADX US Penitentiary, P.O. Box 8500, Florence, CO 81226. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 1/12/09.(erv, )
August 31, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Directing Clerk to Commence Civil Action and Instructing Plaintiff Raymond Oechsle to Cure Deficiencies. Plaintiff Oechsle has 30 days to file a Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915, and to file a certified copy of prisoner's trust fund statement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 8/31/2007. (llr, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stine et al v. Lappin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mikeal Glenn Stine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Oechsle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harry Lappin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Nalley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Wiley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?