Olson v. Golden, Colorado, City of, The et al
Plaintiff: |
Marian L. Olson |
Defendant: |
Golden, Colorado, City of, The, Golden, Colorado, City Council for the City of, The and Campaign Election Board for the City of Golden, Colorado, The |
Case Number: |
1:2007cv01851 |
Filed: |
September 4, 2007 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Colorado |
Office: |
Denver Office |
County: |
Jefferson |
Presiding Judge: |
Marcia S. Krieger |
Presiding Judge: |
Craig B Shaffer |
Nature of Suit: |
Constitutional - State Statute |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 2201 Constitutionality of State Statute(s) |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
September 1, 2011 |
Filing
93
ORDER GRANTING JUDGMENT TO DEFENDANT by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 9/1/11. (msksec, )
|
February 7, 2008 |
Filing
28
MINUTE ORDER granting 26 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Amend Complaint, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 02/07/08.(jmp, )
|
September 11, 2007 |
Filing
4
ORDER setting Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference and Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting set for 10/29/2007 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B Shaffer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Craig B Shaffer on 9/10/07. (dln, )
|
September 7, 2007 |
Filing
2
ORDER REGARDING CUSTODY OF EXHIBITS AND DEPOSITIONS. Any exhibits and depositions to be used during this case, counsel for the parties shall obtain such exhibits and depositions from the Court within 30 days after any judgment is entered or closure o f the case. Counsel shall retain same for 60 days beyondthe later of the time to appeal or conclusion of any appellate proceedings. Failure to retrieve exhibits and depositions in conformance with this Order may result in their destruction. Signed by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 9/7/07. (dln, )
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Search for this case: Olson v. Golden, Colorado, City of, The et al |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Marian L. Olson |
Represented By: |
John Stuart Zakhem |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Golden, Colorado, City of, The |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Golden, Colorado, City Council for the City of, The |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Campaign Election Board for the City of Golden, Colorado, The |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?