Muniz v. Department of Health and Human Services, Washington, D.C.
Plaintiff: Edward Muniz
Defendant: Department of Health and Human Services, Washington, D.C.
Case Number: 1:2007cv01914
Filed: September 11, 2007
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Crowley
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER denying 123 Motion to Alter Judgment. By Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 7/12/10.(msklc2, )
February 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 136 USCA ORDER as to Edward Muniz. The petition for a writ of mandamus is denied. USCA case no. 09-1547. (bjr, )
December 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER to Cure Deficiency re: 127 Notice of Appeal filed by Edward Muniz, by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 12/21/09. (bjrsl, )
August 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 119 OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Plaintiffs Objections 94 are OVERRULED as moot. The Court ADOPTS the 12/12/2008 Recommendation 69 of United States Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, and the Plaintiffs 60 Motion to Amend the Complaint is GRANTED IN PART, insofar as the Complaint is deemed amended to include a demand for non-economic damages, and DENIED IN PART, insofar as the Plaintiff is not permitted to raise a claim under Senate Bill 164. The Plaintiffs 96 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED. The Plaintiffs 109 Objections are OVERRULED as moot, and the Court AFFIRMS the 04/16/2009 107 Order of the Magistrate Judge. The Defendants 110 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED, and judgment in favor of the Defendants shall enter contemporaneously with this Order. The Plaintiffs 116 Motion for Hearing is DENIED AS MOOT, by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 08/14/09.(wjc, )
January 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 88 MINUTE ORDER denying 71 Pro Se Incarcerated Plaintiff's Motion for Physical Examination, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 01/14/09.(wjc, )
January 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 87 MINUTE ORDER granting 81 Motion to Continue Settlement Conference; granting 82 Motion for Leave to Take Deposition of Plaintiff as set forth in the motion. Settlement conference set on 01/30/09 at 1:30 PM is vacated, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 01/13/09.(wjc, )
September 11, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Directing Clerk to Commence Civil Action and Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiency. Plaintiff has 30 days to file a certified copy of prisoner's trust fund statement, and to file a Prisoner Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 9/10/2007. (llr, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Muniz v. Department of Health and Human Services, Washington, D.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Muniz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Health and Human Services, Washington, D.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?