Lenox-MacLaren Surgical Corporation v. Medtronic Sofamor Danek USA, Inc.
Plaintiff: Lenox-MacLaren Surgical Corporation
Defendant: Medtronic Sofamor Danek USA, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2007cv02054
Filed: October 1, 2007
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Boulder
Presiding Judge: Marcia S. Krieger
Presiding Judge: Kathleen M. Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER denying 66 Motion to Deposit Documents in Court Registry and Alternative Motion to Obtain Relief from Protective Order to Maintain the Status Quo by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 11/29/2010.(wjc, )
June 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AND TO CLOSE CASE. The 63 Joint Motion to Dismiss With Prejudice is GRANTED. All claims asserted in the above-captioned matter are dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear his, her or its own costs and attorneys' fees incurred in connection with this action. The Clerk shall close this case, by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 06/21/2010.(wjc, )
October 11, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REGARDING CUSTODY OF EXHIBITS AND DEPOSITIONS. Any exhibits and depositions to be used during this case, counsel for the parties shall obtain such exhibits and depositions from the Court within 30 days after any judgment is entered or closure o f the case. Counsel shall retain same for 60 days beyondthe later of the time to appeal or conclusion of any appellate proceedings. Failure to retrieve exhibits and depositions in conformance with this Order may result in their destruction. Signed by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 10/10/07.(dln, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lenox-MacLaren Surgical Corporation v. Medtronic Sofamor Danek USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medtronic Sofamor Danek USA, Inc.
Represented By: James Edward Hartley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lenox-MacLaren Surgical Corporation
Represented By: Stanley M. Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?