Drussel Wilfley Design, LLC v. Youngwerth et al

Plaintiff: Drussel Wilfley Design, LLC
Defendant: Albert J. Youngwerth, Rekluse Motor Sports, Inc. and Eagle Motor Works, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2007cv02069
Filed: October 3, 2007
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y. Daniel
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER of Dismissal With Prejudice. Ordered that the Stipulated Notice of Dismissal With Prejudice 147 is Approved. This matter is dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear its own attorney fees and costs by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 07/06/11. (jjh, )
May 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER. The stay of proceedings is continued at the parties request to and including 07/15/11. A supplemental scheduling conference is set for 07/15/11, at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland. The supplemental scheduling conference will be vacated on notice from the parties that a settlement of this action has been reached by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 05/03/11. (jjhsl, )
March 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER. The stay of proceedings is continued at the parties' request to and including 04/29/11. On or before 04/29/11, the parties shall file a status report addressing the status of the case by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 03/08/11. (jjh, )
April 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER of Administrative Closure. Ordered that the Clerk of the Court shall administratively close this action with leave to be reopened for good cause good by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 04/01/09. (jjh, )
January 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER Sustaining Defendants Objections 88 , the 84 Order of United States Magistrate Judge dated 9/15/08 on 72 MOTION to Stay is SET ASIDE. Granting 72 Defendants' MOTION to Stay Litigation Pending Outcome of Concurrent USPTO Reexamination Proceedings. This action is STAYED. Parties shall file a status report within 30 days of the USPTO reaching a decision, by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 1/30/09.(pap, )
January 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 127 MINUTE ORDER Plaintiffs Motion to Strike Defendant Albert J. Youngwerths Reply to Plaintiffs Opposition for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement or, alternatively, Motion for Leave to File a Surreply and Plaintiffs Motion to Strike Defendant Rekluses Reply to Plaintiffs Opposition for Summary Judgment for Invalidation of the Asserted Claims or, Alternatively, Motion for Leave to File a Surreply, filed January 14, 2009 120 , and 121 are GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. Plaintiffs motions are granted as to the leave to file a surreply and denied as to the motions to strike. by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 1/21/09.(erv, )
January 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER Granting 108 MOTION to Compel Discovery to on or before 2/16/09 to produce responsive documents in a manner organized and labeled to correspond to the categories in the request, as required by Rule 34(b)(2)(E)(i), Fed. R. Civ. P.; and DENIED in all other respects.filed by Albert J. Youngwerth, Rekluse Motor Sports, Inc., Denying Defendant's 106 MOTION for Leave to Join Third Parties as Counterdefendants filed by Albert J. Youngwerth, Rekluse Motor Sports, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 1/15/09. (erv, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Drussel Wilfley Design, LLC v. Youngwerth et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Drussel Wilfley Design, LLC
Represented By: William R. Rapson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albert J. Youngwerth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rekluse Motor Sports, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eagle Motor Works, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?