Frazier v. Ortiz et al
Plaintiff: Keith Frazier
Defendant: Joe Ortiz, Colorado Department of Corrections, Limon Correctional Facility, Al Estep, Lou Archuleta, DeLayne Tornowski, Anthony A. DeCesaro, Higgenbothem, A. Cosner, Office of Corrections/Legal Services, Anthony, P. Gabriel, C. Jacques, Sandi Patrick-Hendrix, Mailroom, Central Reading Committee, Cathie Holst, Accounting Department/Banking Service, Trevor Williams, Tony Outen, Mental Health/Sex Offender Treatment Program Staff, Bill Rusher, Tom O'Brien and James D.
Case Number: 1:2007cv02131
Filed: October 10, 2007
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Crowley
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER to Cure Deficiency re 139 Notice of Appeal by Keith Frazier, by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 04/01/10. Appellant has 30 days to either pay the filing fee or file a proper 1915 motion with district court.(bjr, )
March 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER that the Recommendation of the United States Magistrate Judge 106 is ACCEPTED AND AFFIRMED as an Order of this Court. Accordingly, the Court ORDERS that Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment 68 is GRANTED and this case is DISMISSED WITH PR EJUDICE. In light of that ruling, Plaintiffs Combined Motion for Summary Judgment and Response to Defendants Memorandum Brief in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment 73 and Plaintiffs Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and an Order to Show C ause for a Preliminary Injunction 102 are DENIED AS MOOT. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall bear their own costs and attorneys fees. In light of the Courts dismissal of this case, all remaining motions, objections, and recommendations, in particular, those identified at docket numbers 87 , 88 , 112 , 113 , 123 , 125 , 129 , and 132 are DENIED AS MOOT. by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 3/11/2010.(erv, )
January 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 132 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 129 MOTION to Amend 8 Amended Complaint, by Plaintiff be DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 1/27/2010. (kmtcd, )
December 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 125 RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE that 123 Plaintiff's Combined MOTION Requesting Permissions to Amend 8 Amended Complaint and Permission for Extension of Time to do so be DENIED, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 12/23/2009. (wjc, )
August 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 106 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 102 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Keith Frazier, BE DENIED, 73 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Keith Frazier, BE DENIED, 68 MOTION for Summary Judgment and M emorandum Brief in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Al Estep, Lou Archuleta, Tom O'Brien, Sandi Patrick-Hendrix, Trevor Williams, DeLayne Tornowski, Cathie Holst, Joe Ortiz, Tony Outen, C. Jacques, Bill Rusher, BE GRANTED and this case Dismissed in its entirety, with Prejudice by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 8/21/09. (erv, )
June 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER denying 80 Plaintiffs Motion Requesting Permission to Amend Complaint to Add Previously Unknown Defendants.By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 06/30/2009.(sah, )
April 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 58 MINUTE ORDER denying 56 Plaintiff's Motion for Order to Compel Compliance With Request for Limited Interrogatories and Production of Documents by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 4/8/09.(erv, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Frazier v. Ortiz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Frazier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colorado Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Limon Correctional Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Al Estep
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lou Archuleta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DeLayne Tornowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony A. DeCesaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Higgenbothem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Cosner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of Corrections/Legal Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P. Gabriel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Jacques
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandi Patrick-Hendrix
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mailroom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Reading Committee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cathie Holst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Accounting Department/Banking Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trevor Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Outen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mental Health/Sex Offender Treatment Program Staff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Rusher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?