Rezaq v. Nalley et al
Case Number: 1:2007cv02483
Filed: November 29, 2007
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
Presiding Judge: Richard P. Matsch
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Federal Question: Bivens Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER. The Defendants Motion to Alter Judgement to Tax Costs Against Plaintiff 169 is DENIED. By Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 1/12/2011.(sah, )
December 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER. The Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment 112 and Supplement 147 is GRANTED. Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to Supplement Objections to the Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge 160 is GRANTED. The above action is DISMISSED. By Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 12/14/2010.(sah, )
November 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 166 MINUTE ORDER. Upon Defendants Response 163 , Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to Supplement Objections to Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge 160 is GRANTED, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 11/22/10.(ltbcd, )
October 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 159 MINUTE ORDER granting 158 Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion to Withdraw Appearances of Former Student Attorneys. Student Attorneys Karl Kuenhold, mary Kiernan, Nathan Swanson, Chandler Kelley, Kimberly Chavez Cook, Olawumni Ogunwo, and Laura Campbell are allowed to withdraw as counsel for Plaintiff herein. Plaintiff will continue to be represented by Laura Rovner and Brittany Glidden. by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 10/19/2010.(erv, )
March 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER granting 121 Plaintiff's Motion to Reinstate Claim I(a) of Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint Or, In the Alternative, For Leave to File Supplemental Pleading. The Court accepts for filing Plaintiffs Supplemental Pleading. The Cler k is directed to file Docket No. 121 attachment #2 as a separate document entitled Plaintiffs Supplemental Claim. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Supplemental Claim on or before 04/05/2010. Limited discovery as to the Supplemental Claim shall be completed on or before 04/30/2010. Any supplemental summary judgment briefing regarding the Supplemental Claim shall be filed on or before 05/17/2010, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 03/15/2010.(wjc, )
February 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER denying 100 Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Discovery by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 2/8/2010.(klmcd)
September 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER granting 94 Student Attorneys Kimberly Chavez Cook and Olawumni Ogunwo are allowed to appear as counsel for Plaintiff herein under the supervision of Laura Rovner. By Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 09/29/2009.(sah, )
September 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 98 MINUTE ORDER granting 96 Defendants Motion for Leave to Take the Deposition of Federal Bureau of Prisons Inmate Rezaq. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 09/28/2009.(sah, )
August 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 89 MINUTE ORDER denying 87 Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion to Conduct Deposition via Video- conference at the U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 8/12/09.(erv, )
June 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 83 MINUTE ORDER granting 81 Defendants Unopposed Motion for Leave to Designate an Additional Expert Per Side. The Scheduling Order is modified to increase the number of experts to each side may designate to three (3) experts per side by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 06/08/2009.(sah, )
March 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER granting 78 parties Joint Motion to Compel Production of Presentence Investigation Report. Defendants shall produce the PSI report to Plaintiffs attorneys on or before 03/13/2009 by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 03/05/2009.(sah, )
February 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 77 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 02/20/2009. (sah, )
January 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 70 MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part plaintiff's 68 Unopposed Motion for an Entry of an Amended Scheduling Order. Granted to amend the 63 Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 11/9/2009. Dispositive Motions due by 12/14/2009. Mo tion denied as to setting of dates for the Trial Preparation Conference or trial. Final Pretrial Conference is RESET to 2/22/2010 09:30 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 1/30/09. (ecmsl, )
January 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER granting 66 Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion to Vacate and Reset Trial Preparation Conference, Trial Date and Other Deadline in Scheduling Order. The trial preparation conference set 09/11/2009 and the trial set 10/05/2009 are VACATED. Signed by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 01/08/2009.(sah, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rezaq v. Nalley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?