Archuleta v. Adams County et al
Case Number: 1:2007cv02515
Filed: December 3, 2007
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 261 ORDER ON MOTION TO STAY PENDING EXHAUSTION AND MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM JUDGMENT: Victor S. Archuleta's Post-Trial Motion to Stay Action Pending Exhaustion of Administrative Remedies 248 and Mr. Archuleta's Motion Seeking Relief From Judgment 249 are DENIED. by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 4/18/12.(msksec, )
January 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 246 ORDER to Cure Deficiency re 243 Notice of Appeal by Victor Archuleta, by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 01/31/12. (bjrsl, )
January 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 240 ORDER DISMISSING CASE FOR FAILURE TO EXHAUST ADMINISTRATIVE REMEDIES. This action is dismissed notwithstanding the jury's findings as to the substantive claim, by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 01/13/2012. (wjcsl, )
September 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 219 ORDER SETTING FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/1/2011 04:00 PM in Courtroom A 901 before Judge Marcia S. Krieger. by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 9/28/11. (msksec, )
August 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 214 OPINION AND ORDER ACCEPTING RECOMMENDATION OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE: IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED THAT: 1. Plaintiff's objections are overruled and the Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge 211 is adopted. 2. The Motion for Summary Judgment [ 169] filed by Defendants Adams County Board of County Commissioners, Darr, Gregory, McKenzie, Hinrichs, and Potter is granted. Upon resolution of the remaining issues, the Clerk shall enter judgment against Plaintiff and in favor of these Defendants on all claims asserted against them.3. The claims asserted against Defendants Nanney and Spence in their individualcapacities remain pending. by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 8/25/11.(msksec, )
May 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 210 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: A Telephonic Status Conference was held on 5/23/2011. ORDERED: Discovery is REOPENED for the limited purpose of taking depositions only. Depositions must be completed by 6/22/2011. The Motion to Amend Complaint, doc # 172 is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. By Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. (FTR: Linda Kahoe) (cbscd)
December 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 184 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: Telephonic Status Conference held on 12/29/2010. Taking under advisement 172 The plaintiffs motion to amend complaint. The court will file a written recommendation that mot ion be denied. Denying 179 Motion for Order re discovery. Defense counsel to supplement responses to discovery and to explain in detail with factual support why she feels that these discovery requests are overly broad and unduly burdensome. These responses shall be served on the court and Mr. Archuleta on or before January 7, 2011. The plaintiff shall respond to defendants motion for summary judgement on or before January 14, 2011. (FTR: G.Mattei) (bnbcd, )
August 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 152 COURTROOM MINUTES - Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: A Motion Hearing was held on 8/4/2010. ORDERED: Defense counsel shall provide Mr. Archuleta with documentation establishing when the camera was installed , and with an affidavit regarding video footage by 5:00 p.m. on 8/6/2010. Plaintiff's Motion to Compel # 144 is DENIED. Plaintiff's Motion to Modify Scheduling Order # 150 is DENIED. By Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. (Court Reporter FTR - Linda Kahoe) (cbscd)
May 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER. Plaintiffs Objection Re Appointment Of Counsel 133 is overruled. Plaintiffs filing entitled Status Of the Court 138 , which the Court treats as a motion for a ruling on Plaintiffs Objection Re Appointment Of Counsel, is granted. By Judge Zita L. Weinshienk on 05/26/2010.(sah, )
March 31, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER. The Court declines to adopt the 10/27/2009, Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge. Plaintiffs Motion To Alter Or Amend Judgment 125 which the Court has construed as an objection to the 10/27/2009 Recommendation of Magistrate Judge Craig B . Shaffer, is sustained. Defendants Motion For Summary Judgment Re Exhaustion Of Administrative Remedies 113 is denied. The case caption is amended, as set forth above, to correctly spell Defendant McKenzies name. The case is returned to the Magistrate Judge for further proceedings and to set the case for trial. By Judge Zita L. Weinshienk on 03/31/2010.(sah, )
October 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 124 RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Defendants' 113 MOTION for Summary Judgment be GRANTED and that judgment on the 24 Amended Complaint be entered in favor of Defendants and against the Plaintiff, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 10/27/2009. (wjc, )
August 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER Court responds to 122 Plaintiff's Petition for Inquiry as set forth in the order, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 8/11/09. (gms, )
March 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER Preliminary Scheduling Conference set for 5/1/2009 09:15 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. Mr. Archuleta and/or his case manager shall arrange for his participation in the hearing via telephone by calling the Court at the scheduled time, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 3/26/09. (ebs, )
March 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER accepting and adopting 90 Report and Recommendation. Overruling 93 Plaintiff's Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment, which the Court has construed as an objection to the 1/20/09 Report and Recommendation. Denying 35 Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint. Denying as unnecessary 59 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint. The case caption is amended to correctly spell certain Defendants' names. This case is referred back to the Magistrate Judge for further recommendations and/or to prepare the case for trial or disposition, by Judge Zita L. Weinshienk on 3/20/09.(ebs, )
January 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 90 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that 35 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint be denied and that 59 Plaintiff's MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint be denied as unnecessary. Signed by Magistrate Judge Craig B Shaffer on 1/20/09. (gmssl, )
February 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER to Dismiss in Part and to Draw Case to a District Judge and to a Magistrate Judge. James McKinzie is dismissed from this action. Case to be drawn to a judge and a magistrate judge. Signed by Judge Zita L. Weinshienk on 2/7/08. (gms, )
February 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Minute ORDER denying as premature and unnecessary 4 Motion for Service by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 02/01/08.(jjh, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Archuleta v. Adams County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?