September 23, 2010 |
Filing
326
ORDER Denying Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis on Appeal after Review re 321 Notice of Appeal, by Abeer Faragalla, by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 09/23/10. (bjrsl, )
|
September 10, 2010 |
Filing
319
ORDER. The plaintiffs Motion for Stay of Judgment and Order Pending Appeal 301 filed 09/16/2009, is DENIED. The objections stated in plaintiffs Objection To Having a Conference Held on Defendants Bills of Cost, Before the Court Has Ruled on My Pra y To Defer any Estimation of those Bills, and without Giving me a Notice To Attend And Motion To Overrule Any Decisions Made by the Conference Which Was Held in (sic) 9/30/2009 and To Order That This Conference Be Rescheduled 312 filed 09/30/2009, are DENIED. The plaintiffs Motion To Strike the Bill of Costs Entered by the Clerk of the Court 314 filed 10/05/2009, is DENIED. The plaintiffs Request/Motion To Forward To the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit Sealed Records and Pleadings that were Conventionally Filed With the District Court as Part of the Records on Appeal 315 filed 10/13/2009, is DENIED as moot. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 09/10/2010.(sah, )
|
September 14, 2009 |
Filing
300
ORDER Granting Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis on Appeal after Review and authorizing production of transcripts at the expense of the USA re 295 Notice of Appeal by Abeer Marie Faragalla, by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 09/14/09. (bjrsl, )
|
September 8, 2009 |
Filing
291
MINUTE ORDER denying as moot 290 Motion for Leave, by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 9/8/09.(rebsec, )
|
September 4, 2009 |
Filing
289
ORDER. The Recommendation of United Sates Magistrate Judge 277 filed 08/10/2009, is APPROVED and ADOPTED. The Recommendation of United Sates Magistrate Judge 278 filed 08/10/2009, is APPROVED and ADOPTED. The Recommendation of United Sates Magis trate Judge 279 filed 08/10/2009, is APPROVED and ADOPTED. The plaintiffs objections 283 filed 08/28/2009, are OVERRULED. The plaintiffs objections 284 filed 08/28/2009, are OVERRULED. The plaintiffs objections 285 filed 08/28/2009, are OVERR ULED. Defendant Douglas County Federation for Classified Employees Revised Motion for Summary Judgment 149 filed 01/23/2009, is GRANTED. Defendant Cerebral Palsys Second Motion for Summary Judgment 152 filed 01/23/2009, is GRANTED. Defendant DC SDs Motion for Summary Judgment 157 filed 01/23/2009 is GRANTED. JUDGMENT SHALL ENTER in favor of the defendants, Douglas County School District RE 1, Douglas County School District Board of Education, Douglas County Federation for Classified Emplo yees, and Cerebral Palsy of Colorado, against the plaintiff, Abeer Faragalla. The defendants are AWARDED their costs. The Trial Preparation Conference set for 09/17/2009, at 10:00 a.m., is VACATED. The trial set to begin on 10/05/2009, is VACATED. This case is CLOSED. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 09/03/2009.(sah, )
|
September 1, 2009 |
Filing
287
ORDER granting 286 plaintiffs Emergency Motion To Order the Clerk to Docket the Missing Pages from My Objection to the Magistrates Recommendation to Grant DCFCE Summary Judgment And Emergency Motion To Correct My Objections to the Magistrates Recommendation to Grant DCFCE Summary Judgment. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 08/31/2009.(sah, )
|
August 10, 2009 |
Filing
279
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of United States Magistrate Judge re 149 Revised MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Douglas County Federation for Classified Employees be GRANTED and that summary judgment enter in favor of the defendant and against the plaintiff on the plaintiffs constitutional and federal statutory claims. RECOMMEND that the court decline to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the remaining state law claims, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 08/10/09. (wjc, )
|
July 10, 2009 |
Filing
276
ORDER: re: denying 272 Motion for Leave by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 7/10/09.(bnbcd, )
|
June 11, 2009 |
Filing
263
ORDER granting 260 plaintiffs Motion for Clarification of the Courts Order. The plaintiffs responses to DCSD and DCFCEs motions for summary judgment are due on or before 06/19/2009. The 06/19/2009, deadline will not be extended for any reason by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 06/11/2009.(sah, )
|
June 8, 2009 |
Filing
259
MINUTE ORDER granting 258 plaintiffs Motion For Clarification of the District Courts Order by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 06/08/2009.(sah, )
|
May 27, 2009 |
Filing
255
MINUTE ORDER denying 253 Motion to Vacate the June 1st Deadline to File Revised Responses to DCSDs and to DCFCEs Summary Judgment Motions, Pending a Ruling on Plaintiffs Appeal 252 by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 05/27/2009.(sah, )
|
May 12, 2009 |
Filing
251
MINUTE ORDER denying 249 Motion for Reconsideration of the Courts Order 247 , Which Denied in Part and Granted in Part 245 by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 05/12/2009.(sah, )
|
May 11, 2009 |
Filing
247
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 245 plaintiffs Motion for Clarification of the Courts Order by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 05/11/2009.(sah, )
|
April 13, 2009 |
Filing
235
ORDER. The objection stated in the 168 plaintiffs Motion for Reconsideration of Plaintiff Second Motion To Compel or Objection to the Magistrates Order on Plaintiffs Second Motion to Compel is OVERRULED AND DENIED. The plaintiffs Motion for a Ruling on the Motion for Reconsideration of Plaintiff Second Motion To Compel or Objection to the Magistrates Order onPlaintiffs Second Motion to Compel 231 is DENIED as moot by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 04/13/2009.(sah, )
|
April 3, 2009 |
Filing
224
MINUTE ORDER denying 204 Motion for Reconsideration of the Order to Resubmit my Response to DCFCEs Summary Judgment Motion by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 04/03/2009.(sah, )
|
March 30, 2009 |
Filing
219
ORDER. Plaintiffs Revised Response to DCSDs Summary Judgment Motion 218 filed 03/23/2009 is STRICKEN. On or before 04/10/2009, the plaintiff shall submit a second revised response which complies with this Order and my Order of 02/24/2009. Failure to submit a second revised response which complies with my Order dated 02/24/2009, may result in sanctions, including dismissal of this case by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 03/30/2009. (sah, )
|
March 16, 2009 |
Filing
214
ORDER. A supplemental final pretrial conference is set for 04/09/2009, at9:00 a.m., in Courtroom 401, 4th floor, Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse, 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado. The parties shall prepare a second revised final pretrial or der and submit it to the court on or before 04/03/2009. Plaintiffs Status Report on the Pretrial Order, Motion Extend the Time to Submit the Final Pretrial Order and Motion to Compel Defendants to Cooperate in the Preparation of the Pre Trial Order [ 207] is DENIED as moot. The plaintiffs Motion to Leave to Reply to Defendants Joint Response to My Status Report and Motion to Extend Time to File Pre Trial Order 210 is GRANTED insofar as the response is accepted for filing and DENIED as moot in a ll other respects. Plaintiffs Amended/Correction to PlaintiffsStatus Report on the pretrial order and Motion to Extend time to file pre trial order Or Leave to Amend or Correct Plaintiffs status report on the pretrial order and the motion to Extend time to file pretrial order 212 is DENIED as moot by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 03/16/2009.(sah, )
|
March 6, 2009 |
Filing
203
SECOND TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER: Five (5) Day Jury Trial set for 10/5/2009 08:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Trial Preparation Conference set for 9/18/2009 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 03/06/2009. (sah, )
|
March 5, 2009 |
Filing
202
ORDER granting 198 plaintiffs Motion For Leave To Resubmit My Response To DCFCEs Summary Judgment Motion Or In The Alternative Motion For Leave To Amend/Correct/Modify My Response To DCFCEs Summary Judgment Motion by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 03/05/2009.(sah, )
|
February 27, 2009 |
Filing
187
MINUTE ORDER denying 185 Motion for Reconsideration of the Courts Order on the Length of My Affidavit by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 02/27/2009.(sah, )
|
February 24, 2009 |
Filing
184
MINUTE ORDER denying as moot 178 Motion to Direct the Clerk to Docket the Remainder of My Response Brief to DCSDs Motion for Summary Judgment by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 02/24/2009.(sah, )
|
February 12, 2009 |
Filing
175
ORDER. The plaintiff shall provide to the defendants, in writing and on or before 02/20/2009, a list of each of the claims she is asserting against each of them. The parties shall prepare a revised final pretrial order,modified as discussed on the record, and shall submit it to the court on or before 03/09/2009. A supplemental final pretrial conference is set for03/16/2009, at 8:30 a.m., in Courtroom 401 by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 02/12/2009. (sah, )
|
January 27, 2009 |
Filing
164
ORDER. The Motion to Compel 146 and the Amendment to Motion to Compel 61 are GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Signed by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 01/27/2009.(sah, )
|
January 13, 2009 |
Filing
145
PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 01/13/2009. (sah, )
|