Wilson v. Continental Casualty Company, The
Case Number: 1:2007cv02618
Filed: December 17, 2007
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
Presiding Judge: Richard P. Matsch
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333 Admiralty
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER for Dismissal With Prejudice. Each party to bear its own costs by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 07/08/10. (jjh, )
April 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER Granting 53 Joint Motion to Modify Second Amended Scheduling Order to Extend Discovery Cut-Off to June 30, 2010, signed by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 4/2/2010. (rpmcd)
December 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER Granting 45 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Amend the Complaint and the Amended Complaint tendered as Document 46 is accepted for filing, signed by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 12/29/2009.(rpmcd)
October 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 43 Minute Entry - Courtroom Minutes for Motions Hearing held on 10/23/2009 before Judge Richard P. Matsch. ORDERED: Motion of Defendant, Continental Casualty Company, for Entry of Partial Summary Judgment Under Rule 56, Fed.R.Civ.P., filed October 20, 2 008 25 , is denied. Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.56, filed October 28, 2008 33 , is denied. Counsel shall confer, prepare and submit a revised scheduling order by November 12, 2009. (Reporter FTR - K. Terasaki) (rpmcd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson v. Continental Casualty Company, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?