Hill et al v. Pope et al
Plaintiff: James Hill and Constance Hill
Defendant: Donald Pope, Option One Mortgage Corp., Wells Fargo, N.A., Entrust Mortgage, Inc., EMC Mortgage Corp., Mortgage Electronic Registration System, Tanya Pope, Linda Rightmer, Act Investments, Inc., Charles R. Swigart, Paul T. Pfeifer, Benson M. Juarez, Mastiff Financial Group, LLC, Charles S. Riley, Ron Ackerman, Williams Title Guaranty & Escrow Agency, Ltd., Legacy Title & Escrow, Inc., Fine Construction, Kevin Narans, Jeffrey Barber, Barber Real Estate, LLC, Joseph Van Dyke and Evette Van Dyke
Case Number: 1:2007cv02722
Filed: December 28, 2007
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Elbert
Presiding Judge: Walker D. Miller
Presiding Judge: Craig B Shaffer
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1601 Truth in Lending
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 251 ORDER of Dismissal. Case is dismissed without prejudice as to all remaining defendants, with the exception of Defendant BNC Mortgage, LLC. Upon the filing of the allegedly forthcoming state court action, Defendants Ackerman; Countrywide Home Loans, Inc.; Greenpoint Mortgage Funding, Inc.; Aurora Loan Services, LLC; and Option One Mortgage Corp. may have their costs and reasonable attorneys fees consistent with my orders. In making such claims, these five defendants shall, within twenty days of the filing of the new action, file an affidavit which complies with D.C.COLO.LCivR 54.1, 54.3 and Section 7 of the Pretrial and Trial Procedures. Plaintiff shall have two weeks thereafter to respond. Case remains stayed re: Defendant BNC Mortgage, LLC and is now administratively closed, by Judge Walker D. Miller on 2/24/09. (gmssl, ) Modified on 2/25/2009 to correct 2 spelling errors (gms, ).
February 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 250 NOTICE (ORDER) of Dismissal. Court takes notice of 249 Notice of Dismissal of Party. Complaint against Title Company of Denver, Inc. is dismissed with prejudice, each party to pay their own costs and attorneys' fees, by Judge Walker D. Miller on 2/23/09. (ebs, )
February 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 248 ORDER Action is stayed as to Defendant BNC Mortgage, LLC pending outcome of bankruptcy proceedings. Granting in part and denying in part 198 Plaintiffs' Motion to Dismiss Without Prejudice Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 41(a)(2) as to All Defendant s. Plaintiffs have to 2/20/09 to withdraw their motion to voluntarily dismiss, should they find the conditions of this Order too onerous. If Plaintiffs do not file a withdrawal, the case shall be dismissed without prejudice as to all defendants, wit h the exception of Defendant BNC. Provided Plaintiffs do not withdraw their motion to voluntarily dismiss, Defendants Ackerman; Title Company of Denver, Inc.; Countrywide Home Loans, Inc.;Greenpoint Mortgage Funding, Inc.; and Aurora Loan Services, L LC; and OptionOne Mortgage Corp. may have their costs and reasonable attorneys fees. Upon the filing of the allegedly forthcoming state court action, these defendants shall file an affidavit which complies with D.C.COLO.LCivR 54.1 and Section 7 of the Pretrial and Trial Procedures. Plaintiff shall have two weeks thereafter to respond, by Judge Walker D. Miller on 2/9/09.(gms, )
February 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Notice (ORDER) of Dismissal of party re: 26 Stipulation of Dismissal of Party, Evette Van Dyke and Joseph Van Dyke terminated,complaint is dismissed with prejudice as to Joseph Van Dyke and Evette Van Dyke only, each party to pay his or its own costs and attorneys fees. Signed by Judge Walker D. Miller on 02/06/08. (sah2, )
February 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER granting 10 Motion for Extension of Time; granting 11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; denying 12 Motion for Order; granting 14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Charles S. Riley answer due 2/8/2008; Kevin Narans an swer due 2/8/2008; Barber Real Estate, LLC answer due 2/8/2008; Option One Mortgage Corp. answer due 2/25/2008; Wells Fargo, N.A. answer due 2/25/2008; EMC Mortgage Corp. answer due 2/19/2008. Entered by Magistrate Judge Craig B Shaffer on 2/1/08.(cbssec)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hill et al v. Pope et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Hill
Represented By: Mary Kimberly Naron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Constance Hill
Represented By: Mary Kimberly Naron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Pope
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Option One Mortgage Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Entrust Mortgage, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EMC Mortgage Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration System
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tanya Pope
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Rightmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Act Investments, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles R. Swigart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul T. Pfeifer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benson M. Juarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mastiff Financial Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles S. Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Ackerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Williams Title Guaranty & Escrow Agency, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Legacy Title & Escrow, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fine Construction
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Narans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Barber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barber Real Estate, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Van Dyke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evette Van Dyke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?