Trujillo v. Lakewood, Colorado, City of, The et al
Plaintiff: Edward Trujillo
Defendant: Lakewood, Colorado, City of, The, Troy (I) Lutman, Troy Lutman, Ron (I) Burns and Ron Burns
Case Number: 1:2008cv00149
Filed: January 23, 2008
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Walker D. Miller
Presiding Judge: Craig B Shaffer
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 75 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL pursuant to the Stipulation for Dismissal in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(ii). The complaint is dismissed with prejudice, each party to pay his or its own costs and attorneys' fees, by Judge Walker D. Miller on 3/17/10. (ebs, )
February 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 71 MINUTE ORDER granting 70 Joint Motion to Vacate Trial Preparation Conference and Trial. The 69 Motion for Extension of Time to File Jury Instructions, etc. is moot. Settlement Papers (Dismissal Papers) due by 3/3/2010, by Judge Walker D. Miller on 2/12/10.(ebs, )
October 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 32 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. Summary judgment shall enter in favor of the City of Lakewood and Police Chief Ron Burns and against Plaintiff on all claims asserted against these Defendants. The claims against Agent Lutman in his individual capacity remain pending, by Judge Walker D. Miller on 10/9/09.(ebs, )
July 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER denying 52 Defendants' Motion to Stay Pending the Court's Disposition of Defendant Lutman's Objection to the Magistrate Judge's Ruling, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 7/31/09.(gms, )
July 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 49 COURTROOM MINUTES - Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: Motion Hearing held on 7/15/2009. ORDERED: The Motion to Stay Pending Determination of Entitlement to Qualified Immunity From Defendant Lutman (doc # 43 , filed 5/29/2009) is DENIED. The Final Pretrial Conference set for August 7, 2009 at 9:15 a.m. will go forward. A proposed Final Pretrial Order is due 5 days prior to the Final Pretrial Conference. (Court Reporter FTR - Linda Kahoe) (cbscd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trujillo v. Lakewood, Colorado, City of, The et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Trujillo
Represented By: David Arthur Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lakewood, Colorado, City of, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Troy (I) Lutman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Troy Lutman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron (I) Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?